Krokos v. Schooner Nighthawk
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00009-FAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter S. Krokos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Jason Sevel +1 410 752 1960 +1 410 837 7820
Space Bernard J Sevel +1 410 837 0215 +1 410 837 7820 berniesevel@aol.com
v.
No Logo Schooner Nighthawk Cruises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman & Minton, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Miller Goldman +1 410 783 7575 +1 410 783 1711 kgoldman@charmcitylegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lord and Whip PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Paul Mullen +1 410 539 5881 +1 410 685 6726 mullen@lordwhip.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $551000
Nature of Suit 340 - Personal Injury: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Carroll
Terminated 7/17/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice and "APPROVAL". (signed Judge Frank A. Kaufman 8/14/95)(c/m 8/17/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER "DISMISSING" the case as SETTLED without prejudice as to all claims; cross, third-party, and counter, if any; "DIRECTING" each party to bear their own costs unless otherwise agreed upon; ALLOWING" either party to move for reopening for good cause within 30 days if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 7/14/95 c/m 7/17/95-dc micro/jb 7/18/95-lew) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/18/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Rule
        Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 3/6/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Rule
          Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/22/95 ) (c/m 2/24/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995, Terminated: 2/27/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
              LETTER/MOTION by Schooner Nighthawk to Amend [11-1] Scheduling order . (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 2/13/1995, Entered: 2/14/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/10/95 ) (c/m 2/13/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER "WITHDRAWING" Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with regard to payment of maintenance and cure, Attorneys Fees and Punitive Damages. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/6/95 ) (c/m 2/8/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER "DISMISSING" Count IV of Plaintiff's Complaint. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/2/95 ) (c/m 2/8/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/8/1995, Entered: 2/8/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER "WITHDRAWING" Count II of the complaint, Plaintiff reserving the right to refile this Count should a future dispute arise. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/6/95 ) (c/m 2/8/95-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Answer
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Schooner Nighthawk (Attorney J. Paul Mullen, Kathryn Miller Goldman), (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/5/1995, Terminated: 1/31/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [6-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which defendant may respond to complaint to and including Feb. 6, 1995 ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) dated Jan. 30, 1995 (c/m by chambers 1/30/95 cr) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 2/5/1995, Terminated: 1/31/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            JOINT MOTION by Peter S. Krokos, Schooner Nighthawk to Extend Time within which to respond to complaint to and including Feb. 6, 1995 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Local Rule
                              Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Plaintiff (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Schooner Nighthawk 1/11/95 Answer due on 1/31/95 for Schooner Nighthawk (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Summons Issued
                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Schooner Nighthawk. (bma, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Peter S. Krokos for Partial Summary Judgment regarding to payment of maintenance and cure , Attorney Fees , and Punitive damages . (1c/s) (bma, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Jury Demand
                                      DEMAND for jury trial by Peter S. Krokos. (bma, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT filed; (bma, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 287 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?