Harris v. Transoceanic Cable
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00010-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Walter Harris, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Jason Sevel +1 410 752 1960 +1 410 837 7820
Space Bernard J Sevel +1 410 837 0215 +1 410 837 7820 berniesevel@aol.com
v.
Transocean, Ltd. Transocean, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Transoceanic Cable Ship Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ober, Kaler, Grimes & Shriver, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey S Tobias +1 410 685 1120 +1 410 547 0699 gstobias@ober.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $525000
Nature of Suit 340 - Personal Injury: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 4/4/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 4/8/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Status Report
STATUS REPORT by Walter Harris Sr., Transoceanic Cable (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER "DISMISSING" without prejudice all claims, counterclaims, cross-claims and third-party claims with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed, to the right of a party to move for good cause within thirty (30) days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated and if no such motion is filed within thirty (30) days, the dismissal of this action is with prejudice. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 4/4/96; c/m & Micro) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/8/1996 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER dated 8/29/95 denying [2-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment with regard to payment of maintenance and cure, attorneys' fees and punitive damages ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/8/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER dated 7/6/95. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by Walter Harris Sr. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995 Affidavit
                AFFIDAVIT of Adam J. Sevel. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/17/1995 Response in Opposition
                  RESPONSE by Walter Harris Sr. in opposition to [2-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment with regard to payment of maintenance and cure, attorneys' fees and punitive damages (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/16/1995, Entered: 3/16/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by Walter Harris Sr. to response to [2-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment with regard to payment of maintenance and cure, attorneys' fees and punitive damages (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER dated 3/6/95. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995 Response in Opposition to Motion
                        MEMORANDUM by Transoceanic Cable in opposition to [2-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment with regard to payment of maintenance and cure, attorneys' fees and punitive damages (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 2/28/1995, Terminated: 4/4/1996 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint by Transoceanic Cable (Attorney Geoffrey S. Tobias), (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Local Rule
                            Local Rule 103.3 of plaintiff. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 1/23/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Transoceanic Cable 1/11/95 Answer due on 1/31/95 for Transoceanic Cable (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Summons Issued
                                SUMMONS issued for Transoceanic Cable. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995, Terminated: 8/30/1995 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Walter Harris Sr. for partial Summary Judgment with regard to payment of maintenance and cure, attorneys' fees and punitive damages filed with attachments. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Jury Demand
                                    DEMAND for jury trial by Walter Harris Sr. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT filed; (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?