Allnut v. Friedman, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00011-JRH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fred W. Allnut, Sr., Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lowell H. Becraft, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lowell H. Becraft, Jr. +1 256 533 2535 becraft@hiwaay.net
No Logo IN THE MATTER OF, Debtor
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Appellee
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GREGORY HREBINIAK +1 202 307 6346 +1 202 514 6866 gregory.s.hrebiniak@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mark J Friedman, Appellee
No Logo Jfc Inc., Garnishee

Toggle Switch Represented by mfe.bz Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph C LaVerghetta +1 410 825 8400 +1 410 825 8407
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 11 U.S.C. § 101 Bankruptcy
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 4/11/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 95-2431(DebbieDaniel)[], 92-57401-JS[Bankruptcy-Baltimore], 93-5121-JFS[Adversary #]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/8/1998 Remark
A certified copy of docket sheet and order with all pleadings returned to the United States Bankruptcy Court, Baltimore, Md. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: 4/7/1998 Satisfaction of Judgment
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Mark J. Friedman, Chapter 11 Trustee. (cc Judgment Box) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 9/18/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 Order
      ORDER (Copy), from the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the fourth circuit, "Dismissing" the appeal as untimely. (Certified copy rec'd 10/23/95.) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/08/1995
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 Certificate of Clerk
        Copy of Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [28-1] appeal (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/2/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995, Terminated: 2/24/1998 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
          NOTICE of Docketing ROA from USCA Re: [28-1] appeal by Fred W. Allnut Sr. USCA NUMBER: 95-2431 (Debbie Daniel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 Designation of Record on Appeal
            DESIGNATION by Allnut of record on appeal (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/2/1995 USCA Appeal Fees
              USCA appeal fees received $ 105.00 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995, Terminated: 2/24/1998 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [28-1] appeal by Fred W. Allnut Sr. (c/m 7/13/95 akc)(appeal packet mailed to counsel 7/12/95 akc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 28 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: 7/13/1995 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Fred W. Allnut Sr.. Fee Status: (Filing fee not paid) Appeal record due on 8/9/95 (c/s 7/10/95 akc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/26/1995, Terminated: 2/24/1998 Response to Habeas Petition
                    ANSWER by J.F.C. Inc. to [16-1] writ requested (Attorney Joseph C. LaVerghetta). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 5/31/1995, Entered: 6/9/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying as moot [22-1] motion of debtor to Strike [16-1] writ requested ( signed by Sr. Judge John R. Hargrove May 30, 1995) (c/m 5/31/95-mjl) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/25/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Motion to Withdraw
                        MOTION by Chapter 11 Trustee Mark J. Friedman to Withdraw [23-1] writ of Garnishment of Wages and Exhibit A. (c/s) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/23/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Response
                          RESPONSE by Chapter 11 Trustee Mark J. Friedman to [22-1] motion to Strike [16-1] writ requested, [22-1] writ answer (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/22/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 Application/Request for Writ
                            REQUEST FOR WRIT by Mark J. Friedman for Writ of Garnishment of Wages of Fred W. Allnutt, Sr. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995, Terminated: 5/31/1995 Response to Habeas Petition
                              ANSWER by Fred W. Allnut Sr. to [16-1] writ requested (Attorney ) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995, Terminated: 5/31/1995 Motion to Strike
                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendant Fred W. Allnut Sr. to Strike [16-1] writ requested and Exhibits A & B. (c/s) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/10/1995, Entered: 5/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying plaintiff's [19-1] motion to Alter or Amend Order of the District Court entered on April 11, 1995 ( signed by Sr. Judge John R. Hargrove 5/10/95 c/m 5/10/95-bel) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/24/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Response in Opposition
                                    RESPONSE by Mark J. Friedman in opposition to [19-1] motion to Alter or Amend Order of the DistrictCourt entered on April 11, 1995 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/21/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995, Terminated: 5/10/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Fred W. Allnut Sr. to Alter or Amend Order of the DistrictCourt entered on April 11, 1995 and Exhibits 1 and 2. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Writ of Garnishment Executed
                                        WRIT of garnishment Wages executed as to J.F.C., Inc., Garnishee for Fred W. Allnutt, Sr. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                          WRIT of Garnishment of Wages issued as to J.F.C., Inc., Garnishee for Fred W. Allnutt, Sr. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Application/Request for Writ
                                            REQUEST FOR WRIT Garnishment of Wages by Mark J. Friedman for J.F.C. Inc., Garnishee as to Fred W. Allnutt, Sr. (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Dismiss Appeal; "ORDERING" [5-2] Sanctions prusuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9011 against the Appellant/Debtor, Fred W. Allnutt, Sr. in the amount of $28,121.00; and Jointly and severally against the Appellant/Debtor Fred W. Allnutt, Sr. and his counsel, Lowell H.Becraft, Jr., in the amount of $1,404.00 ( signed by Sr. Judge John R. Hargrove ) dated April 10, 1995 (c/m 4/12/95 cl) (MICROFILMED 4/14/95 rk) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION (signed by Sr. Judge John R. Hargrove) dated April 10, 1995 (c/m 4/12/95 cl) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/11/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Terminated Case
                                                  Case closed (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Response in Support of Motion
                                                    Affidavit by Mark J. Friedman in support of [5-2] motion for Sanctions against Appellant Fred W. Allnutt, Sr.and in Addition against Appellant's counsel Lowell H.Becraft, Jr. and Exhibit A (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      REPLY by Mark J. Friedman to response of debtor's opposition to Trustee's [5-1] motion to Dismiss Appeal, [5-2] motion for Sanctions and Exhibit A (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER "granting" [10-1] motion of appellant to Extend Time to file Reply Brief; and "extending" time no later than 03/08/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge John R. Hargrove ) (c/m 03/10/95 lkc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/9/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995, Terminated: 3/9/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                          MOTION by Fred W. Allnut Sr. to Extend Time to file Reply Brief (Received 02/24/95) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                            RESPONSE by Fred W. Allnut Sr. in opposition to [5-1] motion of appellee to Dismiss Appeal and [5-2] motion for Sanctions, Declaration and Attachment. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/24/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Response in Opposition
                                                              RESPONSE by Mark J. Friedman in opposition to Motion of appellant for extension of time to file Reply Brief and Attachment. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/23/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Remark
                                                                BRIEF of creditor USA. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995 Appellees Brief
                                                                  Appellee's BRIEF by Mark J. Friedman (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/9/1995, Terminated: 4/11/1995 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Mark J. Friedman to Dismiss Appeal , and for Sanctions and Exhibits 1 thru 9. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 1/31/1995 Appellants Brief
                                                                      Appellant's BRIEF by Fred W. Allnut Sr. and Attachment. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/07/1995
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Correspondence
                                                                        CORRESPONDENCE Mailed to Parties. (cdl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/07/1995
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/6/1995, Entered: 1/12/1995 Remark
                                                                          Supplement to Record on Appeal Consisting of Pleading Number 497 Received from Bankruptcy Court. (cdl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/07/1995
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Bankruptcy Appeal
                                                                            Record on APPEAL from Bankruptcy Court (Baltimore) Consisting of Copy of Docket Entries and Copies of Pleadings 424,434,445,458,469,476,486 and Adversary Pleading 51; Appellant's brief due 1/26/95 for Fred W. Allnut Sr. (cdl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?