Allen v. Shalala
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00012-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles A. Allen, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Donna Shalala, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Baltimore City
Terminated 4/6/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 95-2344:->[], 95-2344:->[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1997 Appeal Record Returned
Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [17-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, [0-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00094. (One Volume): (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) Re: [17-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, [0-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00094 "Dismissing" the appeal and copy of opinion attached hereto. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/19/1995, Entered: 7/19/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1997 USCA Case Number
      USCA Case Number Re: [17-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, [0-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00094 USCA NUMBER: 95-2344: -> {Barbara Rowe is the case manager at the fourth circuit}: (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1997 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [17-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, [0-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00094. --> {One Volume}: (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995, Terminated: 12/15/1997 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
          Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [17-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, [0-1] appeal by Charles A. Allen, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00094. (d/s and copies mailed). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 7/7/1995 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00094. Fee Status: In forma pauperis: Appeal record due on 7/30/95 in 1:95-cv-00012, in 1:95-cv-00094. (c/s 7/3/95 akc). -> [Original filed in S-95-12, See Paper #17]: (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/07/1995
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995 Correspondence
              CORRESPONDENCE from plaintiff RE: Case. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER dated 6/23/95 denying [14-1] motion for production and inspection of documents and to expedite, amend and reconsider ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/1995, Entered: 6/26/1995, Terminated: 6/26/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  MOTION by Charles A. Allen in 1:95-cv-00012, Donna Shalala in 1:95-cv-00012 for production and inspection of documents and to expedite, amend and reconsider (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/22/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                    MOTION by Charles A. Allen to Amend [11-1] order (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Donna Shalala in 1:95-cv-00012 1/31/95 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER dated 4/6/95 granting [10-1] motion to Remand, and that this case be remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further administrative action, and that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (microfilmed 4/6/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995, Terminated: 4/6/1995 Motion to Remand
                          MOTION by Donna Shalala in 1:95-cv-00012 to Remand (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 Terminated Case
                            Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER dated 3/20/95 granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time file responsive pleading is extended to 4/26/95. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: 3/20/1995, Terminated: 3/20/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MOTION by Donna Shalala to Extend Time file responsive pleading (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Donna Shalala in 1:95-cv-00012 1/30/95 Answer due on 3/30/95 for Donna Shalala (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/7/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Donna Shalala in 1:95-cv-00012 1/26/95 Answer due on 3/26/95 for Donna Shalala (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER, dated 1/25/95 to Consolidate Cases , that Cases Nos. 95-12 and S 95-94 are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes under Civil Action No. S 95-12. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/26/1995 Create Case Association
                                        Consolidated Lead Case (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Donna Shalala (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/19/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER dated 1/12/95 granting [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and that the Clerk of court is Directed to issue summons as therein set forth. signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m 1/18/95) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995, Terminated: 1/13/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                              MOTION by Charles A. Allen to Proceed in Forma Pauperis , and Affidavit. (mjl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT filed. (mjl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?