Hill v. Lanham, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00017-AW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Garnell Steven Hill, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Director of Correctional Medical System - Division of Correction, Defendant
No Logo Richard A. Lanham, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Office Baltimore
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Somerset
Terminated 7/27/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "granting" [7-1] motion of defendant Lanham to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, "granting" [7-2] motion for Summary Judgment; "entering" judgment in favor of defendant Lanham and against the plaintiff; "dismissing" the cause of action against defendant Director of Correctional Medical System - Division of Correction; and "directing" that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. ( signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. 7/26/95 ) (c/m 7/31/95 pt) (microfilmed 7/31/95) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. 7/26/95 ). (c/m 7/31/95 pt) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Terminated Case
      Case closed. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/20/1995 Rule
        Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed to Plaintiff. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 7 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995, Terminated: 7/27/1995 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION with memorandum in support by Richard A. Lanham to Dismiss , or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1 thru 4 and Attachments 1 thru 3. (c/s). (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 6 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/21/1995 Correspondence
            CORRESPONDENCE from the Attorney General's Office "Accepting" service as to Defendant Richard Lanham and "Refusing" service as to Defendant Director of Correctional Medical Systems (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995 Summons Returned Unexecuted
              Return of service unexecuted as to Director CMS (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER "Granting" [1-1] motion of Plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; "Directing" Plaintiff to inform this Court of any change of address; "Directing" Clerk to mail copies and withhold service; and "Directing" Defendants to answer the complaint within 60 days, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. 04/12/95 ) (c/m: 04/13/95 hsg) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/1995, Entered: 4/7/1995, Terminated: 7/27/1995 Response
                  RESPONSE by Garnell Steven Hill to [2-1] order regarding ARP. (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER "Continuing" proceedings to await the requested information regarding administrative exhaustion of Plaintiff's grievances; "Directing" Plaintiff to file evidence of such exhaustion within 100 days of the entry of this Order; and "Directing" Clerk to mail copies, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Alexander Williams Jr. 01/13/95 ) (c/m: 01/17/95 hg) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995, Terminated: 4/13/1995 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                      MOTION by Garnell Steven Hill to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995, Terminated: 4/13/1995 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT filed; (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 46 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?