RIGGLEMAN v. KRUEGER
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00380

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 6:56 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELISHA RIGGLEMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ELISHA RIGGLEMAN
v.
No Logo A WIBLE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by A WIBLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A WIBLE
No Logo A. SCHOEFFEL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by A. SCHOEFFEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A. SCHOEFFEL
No Logo C ZIPPERLE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by C ZIPPERLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C ZIPPERLE
No Logo D PORTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by D PORTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D PORTER
No Logo MATTHEW TUSSEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MATTHEW TUSSEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW TUSSEY
No Logo N MARTIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by N MARTIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space N MARTIN
No Logo R MOSLEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by R MOSLEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R MOSLEY
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracy A. Quinlan +1 202 785 9773 +1 202 265 7756 tracy.quinlan@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark H. Hamer +1 202 452 7077 +1 202 416 7177 mark.hamer@bakermckenzie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , David Lewis Snyder +1 202 274 1169 dsnyder@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Libby +1 202 326 2694 +1 202 326 3396 klibby@ftc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by HERBERT A. ROSENTHAL, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles F. Gormly +1 202 785 9773 +1 202 659 3536 cfgormly@earthlink.net
Space Herbert A. Rosenthal +1 202 785 9773 +1 202 659 3526 herbert@herbertrosenthal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, VIRGINIA A. GIBSON +1 267 675 4635 +1 267 675 4601 virginia.gibson@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MAURO LAW OFFICES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Mauro +1 202 452 9865 +1 202 452 0092 tmauro@tmaurolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the District of Columbia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jane Drummey +1 202 727 2658 jane.drummey@dc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Brodie Brown +1 202 252 7153 +1 202 514 9155 christopher.brown6@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Margaret J. Chriss +1 202 307 0874 +1 202 514 8784 margaret.chriss@usdoj.gov
Space Brian P. Hudak +1 202 514 7143 +1 202 252 2599 brian.hudak@usdoj.gov
Space MARGARET L. HUTCHINSON +1 215 861 8282 +1 215 861 8618 margaret.hutchinson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Space Jennifer Joy Lee +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jennifer.lee@usdoj.gov
, Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov
Space Diane G. Lucas +1 202 514 7912 +1 202 514 9155 diane.lucas@usdoj.gov
, Jane M. Lyons +1 202 514 7161 +1 202 514 8780 jane.lyons@usdoj.gov
, Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
, Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
, Michelle Jean Seo +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 514 8780 michelle.seo@usdoj.gov
Space Allessandra Elizabeth Stewart +1 202 252 7828 allessandra.stewart@usdoj.gov
Space Darrell C. Valdez +1 202 307 2843 darrell.valdez@usdoj.gov
, Barry Wiegand +1 202 514 7315 william.b.wiegand@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by PERKINS COIE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Jon B. Jacobs +1 202 654 1758 +1 202 624 9535 JBJacobs@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ROSENAU & ROSENAU

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Kenneth Hanson Rosenau +1 202 387 8680 +1 202 387 8682 kenneth.rosenau@rosenaulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone & Magnanini, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , ROBERT A. MAGNANINI +1 973 218 1111 rmagnanini@stonemagnalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shelese M. Woods +1 317 226 6333 +1 317 226 5027 shelese.woods@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zia Faruqui +1 202 252 7117 zia.faruqui@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Leslie Ann Gerardo +1 202 252 7578 Leslie.Gerardo@usdoj.gov
Space Jill Z. Julian +1 317 229 2417 +1 317 226 6125 jill.julian@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Soyoung Choe +1 202 598 2436 soyoung.choe@usdoj.gov
, Arvind Kumar Lal +1 202 353 8833 +1 202 514 8707 arvind.lal@usdoj.gov
Space Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
, Keith V. Morgan +1 202 514 7228 +1 202 514 8780 keith.morgan@usdoj.gov
, Carl Ezekiel Ross +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 carl.ross@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Pamela Stever Satterfield +1 202 353 2485 pamela.satterfield@usdoj.gov
Space Peter Sklarew +1 202 307 6571 +1 202 514 5238 Peter.A.Sklarew@usdoj.gov
, Jesse Dyer Stewart +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jesse.stewart@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas P. Swanton +1 202 740 4655 thomas.swanton@usdoj.gov
Space John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Jesus Manuel Alvarado-Rivera +1 202 598 8325 +1 202 514 7308 jesus.alvarado-rivera@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Bryson Love Bachman +1 202 705 4510 +1 202 514 7308 bryson.bachman@usdoj.gov
Space Bradley Bruce Banias +1 202 532 4809 bradley.b.banias@usdoj.gov
Space Laura Beckerman +1 202 307 6560 +1 202 514 5238 Laura.C.Beckerman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
Space Jacqueline Marie Blaesi-Freed +1 202 353 2809 +1 202 514 8742 jacqueline.m.blaesi-freed@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Nathan Daniel Brenner +1 202 598 2649 +1 202 305 4766 nathan.brenner@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Eaton Carter +1 202 598 6490 thomas.carter2@usdoj.gov
, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Comenetz +1 202 616 8955 +2 026 916 8544 aaron.comenetz@usdoj.gov
Space Kerala Thie Cowart +1 202 353 3881 +1 202 514 8742 kerala.t.cowart@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Susan Crauthers +1 212 598 8129 robin.crauthers@usdoj.gov
, John Charles Cruden +1 202 514 2718 +1 202 514 0057 john.cruden@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jean Marie Cunningham +1 202 616 4164 +1 202 616 4314 jean.cunningham@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher W. Dempsey +1 202 532 4110 christopher.dempsey@usdoj.gov
, Marsha Stelson Edney +1 202 514 4520 +1 202 318 1287 marsha.edney@usdoj.gov
Space Mary Margaret Englehart +1 202 307 0088 +1 202 514 8742 megan.englehart@usdoj.gov
Space Tracy L. Fisher +1 202 616 1650 tracy.fisher@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Ivan Fitzgerald-DOJ +1 202 353 3863 +1 202 307 5802 scott.fitzgerald@usdoj.gov
, James Kenneth Foster +1 202 514 8362 +1 202 514 9033 james.foster@usdoj.gov
, Kerrie J. Freeborn +1 202 514 3203 +1 202 307 6283 kerrie.freeborn@usdoj.gov
, David Michael Glass +1 202 514 4469 +1 202 616 8470 david.glass@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan H Gold +1 202 353 7123 +1 202 616 3085 jonathan.gold@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
Space Adam Anderson Grogg +1 202 514 2395 adam.a.grogg@usdoj.gov
, Daniel Edward Haar +1 202 598 2846 +1 202 514 0536 daniel.haar@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Jennifer Kazuko Hane +1 415 934 5361 +1 415 934 5399 jennifer.hane@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Henry Jake Hauser +1 202 598 2652 +1 202 307 5802 henry.hauser@usdoj.gov
Space Ian David Hoffman +1 202 598 2456 ian.hoffman@usdoj.gov
, Richard George Jacobus +1 202 616 0553 +1 202 514 6866 Richard.G.Jacobus@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Jones, II +1 202 514 0230 +1 202 514 7308 bill.jones2@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Justl +1 202 598 8164 jonathan.justl@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mona S. K. Haar +1 202 598 8295 mona.haar@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Charles Kelly +2 020 616 9447 david.kelly@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen Simpson Kiernan +1 202 353 3100 +1 202 307 5802 kathleen.kiernan@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ihan Kim +1 202 532 4283 +1 202 616 8544 ihan.kim@usdoj.gov
, , , , Adam Kirschner +1 202 249 0920 adam.kirschner@usdoj.gov
Space Karl Dodd Knutsen +1 202 514 0976 +1 202 307 5802 karl.knutsen@usdoj.gov
Space Ari David Kunofsky +1 202 353 9187 ari.d.kunofsky@usdoj.gov
, Lynn Lee +1 202 305 0531 lynn.lee@usdoj.gov
, Robert A. Lepore +1 202 532 4928 +1 202 514 6381 Robert.lepore@usdoj.gov
, Brant S. Levine +1 202 616 4373 +1 202 616 4314 Brant.Levine@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ERIC JOHNSON MAHR +1 202 532 4753 eric.mahr@usdoj.gov
Space Gregg I. Malawer +1 202 616 5943 +1 202 514 8397 gregg.malawer@usdoj.gov
Space Bennett J. Matelson +1 202 616 5871 +1 202 514 7308 bennett.matelson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel McCuaig +1 202 514 7308 daniel.mccuaig@usdoj.gov
Space Ryan O'Connor McMonagle +1 202 307 1355 +1 202 514 6866 ryan.mcmonagle@usdoj.gov
, Mark Andrew Merva +1 202 616 1398 +1 202 514 7308 mark.merva@usdoj.gov
Space Suzanne Morris +1 202 307 1188 suzanne.morris@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cara M Mroczek +1 202 514 1447 +1 202 353 0296 cara.mroczek@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Joseph Mucchetti +1 202 353 4211 +1 202 307 5802 peter.j.mucchetti@usdoj.gov
, Jay David Owen +1 202 598 2987 jay.owen@usdoj.gov
Space Shannon L Pedersen +1 202 532 4490 Shannon.L.Pedersen@usdoj.gov
Space Kimberly Kiefer Peretti +1 202 353 4249 +1 202 514 6113 kimberly.peretti@usdoj.gov
Space Michelle A. Pionkowski +1 202 307 6349 michelle.pionkowski@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jacek Pruski +1 202 616 2035 +1 202 616 8470 jacek.pruski@usdoj.gov
, Kevin Connell Quin +1 202 307 0922 kevin.quin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Read +1 202 307 0468 +1 202 514 7308 john.read@usdoj.gov
Space Erez R Reuveni +1 202 307 4293 erez.r.reuveni@usdoj.gov
, Laurel Loomis Rimon +1 202 514 1315 laurel.loomis.rimon@usdoj.gov
Space Elliot Morris Rockler +1 202 514 2653 +1 202 616 6583 elliot.rockler@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Peter Joseph Schwingler +1 202 598 2395 +1 202 307 5802 peter.schwingler@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Karen Patricia Seifert +1 202 305 0891 karen.p.seifert@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Rose Seltzer +1 202 353 3865 +1 202 307 5802 michelle.seltzer@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Adam T. Severt +1 202 307 6158 +1 202 616 8544 adam.severt@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelsey Walter Shannon +1 202 551 1790 +1 202 514 7308 kelsey.shannon@usdoj.gov
, Patricia Leigh Sindel +1 202 598 8300 patricia.sindel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Reginald M. Skinner +1 202 616 3111 +1 202 616 4314 Reginald.M.Skinner@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Colin Speegle +1 202 616 5932 adam.speegle@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Stoltzfus +1 202 598 2978 david.stoltzfus@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan Scott Struve +1 202 514 4890 +1 202 616 8544 ryan.struve@usdoj.gov
, NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yvette F. Tarlov +1 202 514 5621 +1 202 514 6381 yvette.tarlov@usdoj.gov
Space Adam R. Tarosky +1 202 307 0404 +1 202 307 3852 adam.r.tarosky@usdoj.gov
Space Olga L. Tobin +1 202 737 4700 +1 202 514 6866 olga.l.tobin@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Grant Vernon +1 202 598 8197 jeffrey.vernon@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Paul Elias Werner +1 202 616 4152 +1 202 616 4314 paul.werner@usdoj.gov
Space Bashiri Wilson +1 202 598 8794 bashiri.wilson@atr.usdoj.gov
Space Angela Yuen Yuk Ting +1 202 616 7721 angela.ting@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, United States of America

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jake A. Schmidt +1 312 886 3284 +1 312 353 7398 schmidtj@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAM R. COWDEN, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , William Rakestraw Cowden +1 202 642 0209 +1 202 232 7566 wcowden@cowdenllc.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Declaration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None response
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None response
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None response
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None response
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None response
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None response
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to appoint counsel
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to appoint counsel
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Copy Request
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Motion (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Copy Request
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to appoint counsel
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time-Other
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RESPONSE, re 76 Entry, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Correspondence Requesting Copies (Docket Nos. 67, 68, 69, 70, 71, and 72, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) Modified on 4/3/2018 to reflect copies requested have been sent to plaintiff(JRT). (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Notice Regarding Copies for the Defendants filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope). (MAC) Modified on 4/3/2018 to reflect notice (JRT). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Entry - The Court acknowledges the plaintiff's letter regarding received copies, Dkt. No. 77 . The Court previously sent the plaintiff a copy of docket entries 48 and 49. See Dkt. No. 57 . Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/22/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Letter regarding received copies, filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (JKS) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Entry Discussing Status of Defendant N Martin - On March 15, 2018, counsel for the United States of America, an interested party in this litigation, informed the Court that defendant N Martin has not been served and is currently a military service member on active duty overseas. Before the Court takes extraordinary measures to attempt to serve N Martin overseas, the plaintiff shall have through April 12, 2018, in which to inform the Court whether he wishes to pursue his claim against N Martin or to dismiss N Martin as a defendant in this action. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/19/2018.(RSF) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant Tussey's deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Plaintiff' s Complaint by fifty-two days, making such response due on or before May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/16/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, Dkt. No. 63, is denied as premature. the plaintiff's motion to submit evidence, Dkt. No. 64, is denied as premature. The plaintiff's motion requesting copies, Dkt. No. 62, is denied as moot because the Court previously sent the plaintiff the copies he requests. The plaintiff's motion for specific wording on envelopes, Dkt. No. 65, is denied (SEE ENTRY). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/16/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) Modified on 3/16/2018 (DW). (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to 52 days, filed by Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            RETURN of USM Service A. SCHOEFFEL served on 3/7/2018. (BRR) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              RETURN of USM Service D PORTER served on 3/7/2018. (BRR) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RETURN of USM Service A. WIBLE served on 3/7/2018. (BRR) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RETURN of USM Service C ZIPPERLE served on 3/7/2018. (BRR) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RETURN of USM Service R MOSLEY served on 3/8/2018. (BRR) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      RETURN of USM Service N. Martin (BRR) (Main Document 67 replaced on 3/14/2018) (RSF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2018: # 1 Service of Process and Unredacted return) (RSF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2018) (RSF). (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Certificate of Service, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (DW) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for specific wording on envelopes, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Submit Evidence, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(BRR) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(BRR) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MOTION Requesting Copies, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(BRR) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, Dkt. No. 59, is denied as premature. The plaintiff's motion for copies of case file, Dkt. No. 60, is granted to the extent that the clerk is directed to include with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry copies of all documents on the docket, except Dkt. No. 48 and Dkt. No. 49 which were previously sent to the plaintiff (SEE ENTRY). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/27/2018. Copy of Entry and documents sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Requesting Copies, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(BRR) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(BRR) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to the Court, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope) (BRR) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Entry - The plaintiff's motion for copies of case file, Dkt. No. 55, is granted to the extent that the clerk is directed to include copies of the docket, Dkt. No. 48, and Dkt. No. 49 with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/7/2018. Copy of Entry and documents sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RETURN of USM Service - Defendants c/o US Attorney General, Washington, DC served by CMRRR on 1/29/2018. (DW) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Copies of Case File, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(BRR) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN of USM Service UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 1/29/2018 c/o Office of the U.S. Attorney, Southern IN. (MAC) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet. Copy/Copies provided via US Mail. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (MEJ) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time. the Individual Defendants'deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Plaintiff' s Complaint by sixtydays, making such response due on or before March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 1/17/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Documents for service by USM - re 48 ENTRY, 49 Amended Complaint, 50 Summons Issued. Paper copies to USM.(DW) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to N MARTIN, R MOSLEY, D PORTER, A. SCHOEFFEL, A WIBLE, C ZIPPERLE. (Attachments: # 1 USM 285 Form United States Attorney General, # 2 USM 285 Form A. WIBLE, # 3 USM 285 Form Office of the United States Attorney, # 4 USM 285 Form C. ZIPPERLE, # 5 USM 285 Form A. SCHOEFFEL, # 6 USM 285 Form Lt. R. MOSLEY, # 7 USM 285 Form N. MARTIN, # 8 USM 285 Form D. PORTER)(DW) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against N MARTIN, R MOSLEY, D PORTER, A. SCHOEFFEL, A WIBLE, C ZIPPERLE, filed by ELISHA RIGGLEMAN.(DW) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Entry Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Directing Service of Process - The plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint, Dkt. No. 43, is granted. The clerk is directed to docket the proposed complaint, Dkt. No. 43-1, as the amended complaint in this action. The plaintiff's motion to correct and to clarify, Dkt. No. 44, is denied as moot. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), to issue process to C. Zipperle, A. Wible, D. Porter, N. Martin, A. Schoeffel, and Lt. R. Mosley. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summons, together with a copy of the amended complaint and a copy of this Entry, on the defendant and on the officials designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2), at the expense of the United States (SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 1/17/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to 60 days, filed by Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Interested Party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 01/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS for Amended Complaint re 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope).(MAC) Modified on 1/3/2018 (MAC). (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Correct and to Clarify for the Court's Records, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope). (MAC) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Envelope). (MAC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2018: # 3 Cover Letter) (MAC). (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Discussing Motion to Appoint Counsel - Accordingly, the plaintiff's motion for assistance with recruiting counsel, Dkt. No. 41, is denied without prejudice (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/20/2017. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DW) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The plaintiff's motion to identify claims, Dkt. No. 35, is denied without prejudice because adding defendants requires the filing of a motion for leave to file an amended complaint along with a tendered amended complaint. The plaintiff shall have through January 4, 2018, in which to file an amended complaint. The plaintiff's motion to correct, Dkt. No. 36, is granted and denied. The plaintiff's motion to re-enter prior motions, Dkt. No. 37, is denied. The plaintiff's motion for demand for jury trial, Dkt. No. 38, is granted (SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/6/2017. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (Attachments: # 1 motion for counsel form) (DW) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN of USM Service MATTHEW TUSSEY served on 11/30/2017. (REO) Modified on 12/4/2017 (REO). (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAC) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Re-Enter Motions, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAC) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Correct, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAC) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Identify Claims as stated in part of Order dated 11/3/2017 of Entry Screening Complaint, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAC) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RECEIPT #IP058220 for partial filing fee in the amount of $5.68, paid by plaintiff. (NAD) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN of USM Service MATTHEW TUSSEY c/o US Attorney, Indianapolis, IN served on 11/16/2017. (DW) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY - The plaintiff's motion for service of the complaint, Dkt. No. 29, is granted to the extent that the defendant was served on November 15, 2017. Dkt. No. 31 . The plaintiff's motion for discovery, Dkt. No. 30, is denied as premature (SEE ENTRY). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/17/2017. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail (DW) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN of USM Service - MATTHEW TUSSEY served on 11/15/2017. (RSF) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for service of Complaint to be served upon Respondent, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY - The plaintiff's motion to amend exhibits, Dkt. No. 23, is denied. It is not the proper stage in litigation to submit evidence. Furthermore, the letter referring to a tort claim is not relevant to this case because the plaintiff did not state a claim under the Federal Tort Claims Act and the government has not yet responded to his claim. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/6/2017. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail (DW) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Plaintiff regarding accompanying filing fee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (DW) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Documents for service by USM - re 25 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 24 Entry. Paper copies to USM.(DW) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to MATTHEW TUSSEY. (Attachments: # 1 USM 285 Form United States Attorney General, # 2 USM 285 Form Office of the United States Attorney, # 3 USM 285 Form Matthew Tussey)(DW) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTRY Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), to issue process to Matthew Tussey and the United States of America. The Marshal for this District or his Deputy shall serve the summons, together with a copy of the complaint (docket 1) and a copy of this Entry, on the defendant and on the officials designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2), at the expense of the United States. The clerk is directed to update the docket to reflect that Jeff Krueger, USP Terre Haute Warden, and any and all John or Jane Does involved are no longer defendants in this action (SEE ENTRY). Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/3/2017.(DW) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Exhibits, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits (note - page two is extremely dark), # 2 Cover Letter)(DW) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RECEIPT #IP057841 for partial filing fee in the amount of $5.68, paid by plaintiff. (NAD) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The plaintiff's motion for Court's assistance, Dkt. No. 12 is granted to the extent the clerk is directed to provide the petitioner with a copy of the docket in this case. The plaintiff's motion for extension of time, Dkt. No. 15, is granted. The plaintiff shall have through December 1, 2017, in which to pay the initial partial filing fee of Five Dollars and Sixty-Eight Cents ($5.68). The plaintiff's motions to appoint counsel, Dkt. No. 13 and Dkt. No. 16, are denied as premature. The plaintiff's motions for subpoena, Dkt. No. 14 and Dkt. No. 17, is denied (SEE ENTRY). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/30/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Docket Sheet) (DW) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 10/16/2017 from Plaintiff regarding filing fee status. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (DW) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Plaintiff regarding filing fee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (DW) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to subpoena, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) Modified on 10/26/2017 (DW). (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Subpoena, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAT) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAT) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Court's Assistance and Requesting Copies, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MAT) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The plaintiff's motion for extension of time, Dkt. No. 9, is granted. The plaintiff shall have additional time, through November 10, 2017, in which to pay the initial partial filing fee of Five Dollars and Sixty-Eight Cents ($5.68). The plaintiff's motion for information asks whether the initial partial filing fee has been received and states that this case should be combined with his habeas action. The plaintiff's motion, Dkt. No. 10, is granted to the extent that he is informed that the Court has not received the partial payment and is denied to the extent that this action should not and will not be combined with his habeas action. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/5/2017. (DW) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for information and status of payment, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Elisha Riggleman regarding filing fee. (Attachments: # 1 Trust Account Statement, # 2 Envelope) (LBT) (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Five Dollars and Sixty-Eight Cents ($5.68). He shall have through October 23, 2017, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 9/19/2017. (JRB) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION (letter) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Inmate Transactions, # 2 Envelope)(DW) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address for ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (DW) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTRY Discussing Filing Fee - The plaintiff shall have through September 11, 2017, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so (SEE ENTRY). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/10/2017.(DW) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against ANY AND ALL JOHN OR JANE DOES INVOLVED, JEFF KRUEGER, MATTHEW TUSSEY, filed by ELISHA RIGGLEMAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: # 1 exhibits containing records for administrative remedy, discipline hearing, and health care, # 2 proposed subpoena, # 3 Cover Letter, # 4 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?