United States v. Steele
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00077
District Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 9:26 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo John K. Steele, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
GENERAL ORDER 17-15: 1. Effective immediately, the Clerk is DIRECTED to REASSIGN all matters referred to Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman to another Magistrate Judge accepting cases on the docket of the pending matter as set forth in General Order 15-1 except cases reassigned pursuant to General Order 17-14. 2. A copy of this Order shall be filed in each appropriate case with a copy to all counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 09/18/2017.(KRB)cc: COR (Entered: 09/18/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: 1. The Government's Motion to Consolidate Cases [R. 43 in 3:16-cv-95] is GRANTED; 2. United States v. Steele, et al., 3:16-cv-00095-GFVT, and United States v. Steele, 2:17-cv-00077-GFVT, shall hereby be CONSOLIDATED into one action for all further purposes, including trial; and 3. United States v. Steele, et al., 3:16-cv-00095-GFVT shall be designated as the LEAD case, with all further docketing done in that action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/30/2017.(CBD)cc: COR, Steele via US Mail (Entered: 06/30/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED TO THE HONORABLE GREGORY VAN TATENHOVE. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/17/2017.(ECO)cc: COR Modified bold text on 5/17/2017 (ECO). (Entered: 05/17/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Kyle Bishop, an ECF Filing User re 18 Notice of Substitution of Counsel was RECEIVED AS A PAPER PLEADING AND FILED BY THE CLERK, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by USA (ECO) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to United States Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case will revert back to the undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy to John K. Steele, pro se Def, at address listed on the docket sheet Modified text to correctly describe order on 5/4/2017 (ECO). (Entered: 05/04/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 1:16-cv-01119. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR, dft w/ a copy of the docket via US Mail (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 13 Motion to Change Venue: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1404(a), the Court finds that the convenience of the parties and the interests of justice would be served by transferring this action to the Eastern District of Kentucky, which is a district where this action might have been brought. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky, Covington Division. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/4/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Kentucky by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hume, Lauren) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2017. The proposed schedule shall be filed no later than May 22, 2017.. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/1/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 7 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/28/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 7 MOTION to Quash filed by Defendant John K. Steele. (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 03/01/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Quash, 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Hume, Lauren) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by John K. Steele. (bc) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Dismiss/Quash idictment No Jurisdiction or Standing by Defendant John K. Steele. (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant John K. Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: IT IS ORDERED that said motion (Doc. 4) be, and is hereby, GRANTED, and the defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to plaintiffs complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 1/6/2017. (jlw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant John K. Steele. (jlw) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant John K. Steele. John K. Steele served on 12/10/2016, answer due 1/3/2017. (Hume, Lauren) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Summons Issued as to John K. Steele. (eh) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          COMPLAINT against John Kevin Steele, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Form) (Hume, Lauren) [Transferred from ohsd on 5/4/2017.] (Entered: 12/02/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?