The Celotex Corporation and Carey Canada Inc. - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 8:97-ap-00668
District Judge Paul M. Glenn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 2:31 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Edgewater Associates, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
,

Represented by Edgewater Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edgewater Associates
v.
No Logo Allied-Signal, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Advansix Inc.
Officer/Director, Garrett Motion Inc.
Officer/Director, HH Spinco Inc.
Officer/Director, Honeywell, Inc.

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
,

Represented by Allied-Signal, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alliedsignal Inc.
No Logo THE CELOTEX CORPORATION, Debtor

Represented by Bush Ross PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Cox +1 813 224 9255
, Andrew T. Jenkins +1 813 224 9255
, Jeffrey W. Warren +1 813 224 9255
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER Granting agreed joint motion for entry of an agreed order [i] w/drawing the reference of non-core adversary pro and [ii] transferring venue to District Court for New JerseyOrder from Dist Ct. Re: Item # 36, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #37 (Entered: 04/21/1998)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Withdrawal of [joint] and an agreed order [i] the reference of non-core adversary proceeding and [ii] transferring venue to District Court for New Jersey and Memorandum of law in supportTransmitted to Dist Ct. 2/18/98Dist. Ct. Case # 98-20-MISC-T-25B on, [GM ], ORIGIN AL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #36 (Entered: 02/03/1998)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER Granting Re: Item # 34, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #35 (Entered: 12/22/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to Dismiss [joint ex parte] adversary proceeding as to The Celotex Corp only, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #34 (Entered: 12/22/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/18/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Withdrawal of motion to withdraw the reference of the pending non-core adversary proceeding from the Bankruptcy Court to The District Court filed by Edgewater Re: Item # 31, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #33 (Entered: 11/18/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SUPPLEMENT to certificate of service Re: Item # 31, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #32 (Entered: 11/10/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/6/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Withdrawal of the Reference of the pending non-core adv pro from The Bankruptcy Court to The District Court filed by Edgewater Associates on, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #31 (Entered: 11/06/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/6/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION [joint ex parte] to dismiss adv pro in its entirety filed by Celotex and Edgewater[unsigned], [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #30 (Entered: 11/06/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATE of Service re: Re: Item # 28, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #29 (Entered: 11/05/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    OPPOSITION by def. AlliedSignal to plaintiff's m/strike affirmative defenses and jury demand Re: Item # 11, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #28 (Entered: 11/04/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT in support filed by Kenneth E. Stroup Re: Item # 26, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #27 (Entered: 11/03/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by AlliedSignal, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #26 (Entered: 11/03/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/19/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AMENDED re-ntc of depo to dtr pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30[b] 6 filed by Edgewater. New location: 4921 Memorial Hwy, Ste 320, Tampa - 9/23/97 @ 10 am Re: Item # 24, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #25 (Entered: 09/19/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED re-ntc to change the date to September 23, 1997 @ 10:00 am Re: Item # 23, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #24 (Entered: 09/19/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AMENDED re-ntc to correct the date to September 22, 1997 Re: Item # 22, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #23 (Entered: 09/12/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Taking Deposition [re-notice] of debtor pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30[b] 6 at 4010 Boyscout Blvd., Tampa on September 17, 1997 @ 10:00 am Re: Item # 10, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #22 (Entered: 09/12/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CERTIFICATE of Service re: subpoena to custodian of records Bergen County for depo 10/1/97 @ 10 am, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #21 (Entered: 08/29/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE of Service re: of subpoena to custodian of records Boswell Engineering 10/1/97 @ 10 am, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #20 (Entered: 08/29/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE of Service re: subpoena to Custodian of Records of depo 10/1/97 @ 10:00 a.m., [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #19 (Entered: 08/27/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CERTIFICATE of Service re: subpoena issued to E. Robert Keihl, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #18 (Entered: 08/27/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Hearing set: on 11/07/1997 at 9:00 a.m. at Courtroom B, 4921 Memorial Highway, Tampa, Florida 33634 Re: Item # 14, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #17 (Entered: 08/26/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM by Celotex in opposition to Edgewater Associates' motion to dismiss counterclaim for contribution and indemnification Re: Item # 8, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #16 (Entered: 08/25/1997)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RE-NOTICE of deposition as to location of depo of E. Robert Kiehl. Westin Suites, 4400 West Cypress St., The Citrus Room, Tampa Re: Item # 9, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #15 (Entered: 08/25/1997)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION to Strike AlliedSignal's affirmative defenses and jury demand filed by Edgewater Associates, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #14 (Entered: 08/21/1997)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Hearing set: on 11/07/1997 at 9:00 a.m. at Courtroom B, 4921 Memorial Highway, Tampa, Florida 33634 Re: Item # 11, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #13 (Entered: 08/19/1997)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of service of answers to dtr's interrogs filed by Edgewater, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #12 (Entered: 08/14/1997)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Strike def, The Celotex Corp's affirmative defenses filed by plaintiff, Edgewater, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #11 (Entered: 08/14/1997)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Taking Deposition of dtr 9/10/97 @ 10 am at 4010 Boy Scout Blvd, Tampa filed by plaintiff, Edgewater, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #10 (Entered: 08/14/1997)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Taking Deposition of E. Robert Kiehl on 9/3/97 @ 10 am; 550 North Rio St., Ste 300, Tampa filed by Plaintiff, Edgewater, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #9 (Entered: 08/14/1997)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss defendant The Celotex Corp's counterclaim for contribution and indemnification filed by Plaintiff, Edgewater Associates, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #8 (Entered: 08/12/1997)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ANSWER of AlliedSignal to complaint, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #7 (Entered: 08/04/1997)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ANSWER of Celotex Corp to Edgewater Associated Adversary Complaint, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #6 (Entered: 07/22/1997)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  PRETRIAL and Discovery Conference Order on 11/07/1997 at 9:00 a.m. at Courtroom B, 4921 Memorial Highway, Tampa, Florida 33634 Re: Item # 1, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5 (Entered: 07/11/1997)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service re: Re: Item # 1, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #4 (Entered: 07/03/1997)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service re: Re: Item # 1, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #3 (Entered: 07/03/1997)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SUMMONS Issued x 2, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #2 (Entered: 06/27/1997)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          COMPLAINT Environmental claim to recover investigation and remediation costs filed by Edgewater Associates, [GM ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1 (Entered: 06/27/1997)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?