Jennings v. Lee

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:04-cv-00303
District Judge Timothy J. Corrigan, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Timothy J. Corrigan
Last Updated October 22, 2018 at 2:47 AM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Angelo Jennings, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lisa Jeanne Butler +1 207 584 5011 lisajeannebutler@yahoo.com
No Logo Frederick Green, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lisa Jeanne Butler +1 207 584 5011 lisajeannebutler@yahoo.com
No Logo Ronald Jones, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Ronald E. Clark +1 386 328 2778 +1 386 325 6785 plumacy@bellsouth.net
, Michael Edward Lawlor +1 301 474 3404 +1 301 474 3406 mlawlor@verizon.net
Space Nicholas G Madiou +1 301 474 3404 +1 301 474 3406 nickmadiou@gmail.com

Represented by Adams & Commissiong LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Martin Ellis Adams +1 212 430 6590 +1 212 981 3305 martin@amcmlaw.com

Represented by AG Law, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE N Anthony Garcia +1 813 259 9555 +1 813 254 9555 anthony@aglawinc.com

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael A. Benefield +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 mab@emafirm.com

Represented by Andrus Anderson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Jennie Lee Anderson +1 415 896 1000 +1 415 896 2249 jennie@andrusanderson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Lori Erin Andrus +1 415 986 1400 +1 415 986 1474 lori@andrusanderson.com

Represented by Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie Lee Ann Pescia +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 leslie.pescia@beasleyallen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Clay Barnett, III +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 Clay.Barnett@BeasleyAllen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew England Brashier +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 Andrew.Brashier@beasleyallen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Archie I. Grubb, II +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 archie.grubb@beasleyallen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Wilson Daniel Miles, III +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 dee.miles@beasleyallen.com

Represented by Carter Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Pamela W. Carter +1 504 527 5055 +1 504 527 5056 pcarter@carterlawgroupllc.com

Represented by Daryl Allan Deutsch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daryl Allan Deutsch

Represented by DiCello Levitt & Casey LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Daniel Richard Ferri +1 312 214 7900 +1 440 953 9138 dferri@dlcfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Elisabeth Keller +1 312 214 7900 akeller@dlcfirm.com
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Adam J. Levitt +1 312 214 7900 alevitt@dlcfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T John E Tangren +1 312 214 7900 jtangren@dlcfirm.com

Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stefanie Tina Scott +1 512 539 2624 +1 512 539 2627 sscott@dpelaw.com

Represented by Elizabeth G McCulley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elizabeth G McCulley

Represented by Federal Defender Program

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sergio Fidel Rodriguez +1 312 621 8300 sergio_rodriguez@fd.org

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com

Represented by J. Richard Aramburu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , J. Richard Aramburu

Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Calvin Johnson +1 504 439 2514 fourwakes@aol.com

Represented by Jay D. Ellwanger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jay D. Ellwanger +1 512 539 2626

Represented by Jeffrey M Eustis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey M Eustis

Represented by Johnson Becker PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J Becker +1 612 436 1800 +1 612 436 1801 tbecker@johnsonbecker.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennell Kristine Shannon +1 612 436 1904 jshannon@johnsonbecker.com

Represented by Kayin Paige, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael J. Smith +1 586 254 0200

Represented by Kean Miller LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Jason deBarros +1 225 389 3445 michael.debarros@keanmiller.com

Represented by Kennedy Hodges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Donny J Foty +1 713 523 0001 +1 713 523 1116 dfoty@kennedyhodges.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Udyogi Apeksha Hangawatte +1 713 523 0001 +1 713 523 1116 unhangawatte@kennedyhodges.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Galvin B Kennedy +1 713 523 0001 +1 713 523 1116 gkennedy@kennedyhodges.com

Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/24/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT SHAYNA E. SACKS ssacks@napolilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/24/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT HUNTER J. SHKOLNIK +1 212 397 1000 +1 646 843 7603 hunter@napolilaw.com

Represented by Office of the Federal Public Defender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Katherine Tang Newberger +1 410 962 3962 +1 410 962 0872 katherine_newberger@fd.org

Represented by P-35850

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Jones

Represented by THE DICELLO LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Mark A. DiCello +1 404 953 8888 madicello@dlcfirm.com

Represented by Thomas E Hornish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas E Hornish

Represented by Thomas S. Stewart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas S. Stewart

Represented by Valli Kane & Vagnini LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Deborah Lee Rubin +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 drubin@vkvlawyers.com

Represented by Valli, Kane and Vaginin, LLP Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert J Valli, Jr. +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248

Represented by Valli, Kane and Vagnini, LLP Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James Aldo Vagnini +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 jav@vkvlawyers.com

Represented by Vaughn, Bowden & Wooten, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara Wyn Kane +1 516 203 7180 +1 516 706 0248 skane@vkvlawyers.com

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Bulls-Hit Ranch & Farm, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Scott & Sheppard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Allen C.D. Scott, II +1 904 825 4991 +1 904 825 0975 allen@scottandsheppard.com
No Logo Thomas R. Lee, Sr., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing with prejudice, parties to pay costs and attorney's fees as provided in the settlement agreement of the parties; The clerk should close the case ( Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan ) ctc (map) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of dismissal of action by Angelo Jennings, Frederick Green (map) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER set dispositive motion filing deadline for 6/30/04 ; if the parties have not filed settlement pleadings or a request for extension of time by 06/30/04, this case will be dismisses without prejudice; The clerk is directed to close the file, subject to reopening if the parties file papers by 06/30/04 ( Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan ) ctc (map) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Angelo Jennings, Frederick Green (mgg) (Entered: 05/26/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - TRACK 2. (ctc) (map) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to the Honorable Judge Timothy J. Corrigan . ctc (map) (Entered: 05/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER transferring case ( Signed by Sr. Judge Howell W. Melton ) ctc (map) (Entered: 05/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Angelo Jennings, Frederick Green of pendency of other actions re: order of compliance to local rule (pwd) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT for damages, declaratory relief, injunctive relief and costs of litigation filed; Filing fee $ 150.00 Receipt # J15259 (map) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 14 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?