Equal Employment v. Firearms Training
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-01358
District Judge Horace T. Ward, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 3:17 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Firearms Training Systems, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 161(2)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/30/1994, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER directing deft to comply w/pla's administrative subpoena & directs deft to be more attentive in future to its obligation to furnish court w/accurate representations of the facts of the case by Judge Horace T. Ward. cc. (fmr emp) (Entered: 09/30/1994)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/1994, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Response by pla to show cause order [4-1] with affidavits in support. (bj) (Entered: 04/19/1994)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/1994, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER directing plaintiff to show cause in writing by 4/18/94, why court should not dismiss this action by Judge Horace T. Ward. cc (bj) (Entered: 04/01/1994)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/1993, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Response by dft to show cause order [2-1] (bj) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/1993, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER GRANTING motion for show cause order by EEOC [1-1] dft to SHOW CAUSE in writing by 10/22/93 by Judge Horace T. Ward. cc/cert copy rrr to dft. (bj) Modified on 10/08/1993 (Entered: 10/08/1993)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Application by pla for show cause order, to enforce subpoena with brief in support. (to HTW) (cbm) (Entered: 06/30/1993)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 29 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?