Anderson v. Bridgestone Retail Operations
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-01281
District Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 6, 2019 at 2:13 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bridgestone Retail Operations, Defendant
No Logo Michael Anderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Ira R. Abel +1 212 799 4672 iraabel@verizon.net
, , , William James Luse +1 843 455 6049 lusewilliam@yahoo.com
, Wendell A Odom, Jr. +1 713 223 5575 +1 713 224 2815 wendellodom@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kathleen J. Love +1 505 843 6161 +1 505 242 8227 kathy@mcginnlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Randi McGinn +1 505 843 6161 randi@mcginnlaw.com
, , , Tracy Scanlan +1 415 398 8700 tscanlan@ilglegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BAXTER & BAXTER LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , JUSTIN M. BAXTER +1 503 297 9031 justin@baxterlaw.com
, , Michael C. Baxter +1 503 297 9031 +1 503 291 9172 michael@baxterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Bryan L. Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@caffertyclobes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carey, Danisand Lowe, L.l.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Corey D Sullivan +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 678 3401 csullivan@careydanis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Francis & Mailman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Erin Amanda Novak +1 215 735 8600 +1 215 940 8000 ENOVAK@consumerlawfirm.com
Space John Soumilas +1 215 735 8600 jsoumilas@consumerlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas A. Millen +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4519 doug@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg & Osborne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David J Diamond +1 520 620 3975 ddiamond@goldbergandosborne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Swathi Bojedla +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 sbojedla@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hawks Quindel SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Larry A. Johnson +1 414 271 8650 +1 414 271 8442 ljohnson@hq-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HEIDEMAN NUDELMAN & KALIK, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Noel Jason Nudelman +1 202 463 1818 +1 202 463 2999 njnudelman@hnklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Herman, Herman & Katz, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Leonard A. Davis +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 ldavis@hhkc.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Russ M. Herman +1 504 581 4892 +1 504 561 6024 rwestenfeld@hhkc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HKM EMPLOYMENT ATTORNEYS PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Rachel M. Emens +1 206 739 5098 remens@hkm.com
, Donald W Heyrich +1 206 838 2504 +1 206 260 3055 dheyrich@hkm.com
, , , Jason A Rittereiser +1 206 838 2504 jrittereiser@hkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopelman & Paige, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Janelle M. Austin +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 jaustin@k-plaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jackie A. Cowin +1 617 654 1735 jcowin@k-plaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Darren R. Klein +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 DKLEIN@k-plaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel V. Santiago P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel V Santiago +1 866 306 9527 +1 866 306 9528 dvs@dvslawoffices.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter Stutheit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Peter Stutheit +1 503 493 7488 peter@peterstutheit.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rosemary M. Rivas +1 415 291 2420 +1 415 484 1294 rrivas@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LOUISIANA CAPITAL ASSISTANCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard Bourke +1 504 558 9867 +1 504 558 0378 rbourke@thejusticecenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by MEYER GLITZENSTEIN & EUBANKS LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Katherine Meyer

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Anderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Anderson

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Cecilia Maria Barber +1 954 318 0268 +1 954 333 3515 cbarber@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orleans Public Defender's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anna K. VanCleave +1 504 821 8101 avancleave@opdla.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James Stephen Holt +1 501 868 2500 holt@rainfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael R. Rainwater +1 501 868 2500 rainwater@rainfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard Celler Legal, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard Bernard Celler +1 954 243 4295 +1 954 337 2771 richard@floridaovertimelawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steven Wayne Pepich +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 stevep@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlesinger Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shatzkin & Mayer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra Anne Mayer +1 212 684 3000 +1 212 684 5333 dmayer@shatzkinmayer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spivak Lipton Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@spivaklipton.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Hope Allison Pordy +1 212 765 2100 +1 212 541 5429 hpordy@spivaklipton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Christopher William Espy +1 601 718 2087 +1 601 718 2102 cespy@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 201

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marybeth E Mullaney +1 800 385 8160 +1 800 385 8160 marybeth@mullaneylaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Luis A. Cabassa +1 813 224 0431 +1 813 229 8712 lcabassa@wfclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/11/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Russell A. Wood +1 479 967 9663 +1 479 967 9664 woodlaw@suddenlinkmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Buzbee Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Anthony G. Buzbee +1 713 223 5393 +1 713 223 5909 tbuzbee@txattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Traber & Voorhees

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Theresa M Traber +1 626 585 9611 +1 626 577 7079 tmt@tvlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tran Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Andrew Hideki Iwata +1 713 223 8855 +1 713 623 6399 ahi@tranlawllp.com
, , , , , , , Trang Q Tran +1 713 223 8855 +1 713 623 6399 ttran@tranlawllp.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing case Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/30/2012. (VMF) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Without Prejudice by Michael Anderson (Barber, Cecilia) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion to substitute counsel. The Clerk is directed to substitute Cecilia Barber, Esq., for Richard Celler, Esq., as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/27/2012. (JBR) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MOTION to substitute attorney by Michael Anderson. (Barber, Cecilia) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 09/27/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Anderson. Related case(s): No (Celler, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order by Michael Anderson. (Celler, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/18/2012. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/4/2012. (VMF) (copies mailed/emailed) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/18/2012. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1, # 2, # 3 )(VMF) (copies mailed/emailed) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Consent to Join by Michael Anderson. (LMM) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons issued as to Bridgestone Retail Operations. (LMM) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      COMPLAINT against Bridgestone Retail Operations with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ORL-19161) filed by Michael Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LMM) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?