Multex.com, Inc. IPO v. Multex.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03910
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 6:40 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Raymond B. Dooley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo SDR Investors, L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 sroffe@stark-stark.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Herbert L. Skeete, Defendant
No Logo I. Robert Greene, Defendant
No Logo Isaak Karaev, Defendant
No Logo Lennert J. Leader, Defendant
No Logo Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Milton J. Pappas, Defendant
No Logo Multex.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronit Setton +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6591 ronit.setton@cwt.com
No Logo Peter G. Labonte, Defendant
No Logo Philip Callaghan, Defendant
No Logo Philip Scheps, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
Space Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gandolfo V. Diblasi +1 212 558 4992 +5583 558 558 3588 diblasig@sullcrom.com
Space John Louis Hardiman +1 212 558 4070 +1 212 558 3588 hardimanj@sullcrom.com
Space David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
, Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo Arnold B. Stoller, Movant
No Logo Mindful Partners, Movant
No Logo Benson W. Campbell, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Boris Kalandar, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
, Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
, , Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Ellen Evans, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com
No Logo Ellis Investment Ltd., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gainey McKenna & Egleston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo Rachel Schwartz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Nadeem Faruqi +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 nfaruqi@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
, Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Goldman Sachs & Co., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action as to 01 Civ. 3910. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; The following related actions are dismissed without prejudice as to the individual defendants listed on Schedule 1, and dismissed pursuant to the Opinion and Order dated 2/19/03, as the individual defendants listed on Schedule 2. The dismissal of the related actions is without costs to the individual defendants listed on Schedules 1 and 2. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/22/09) This Document Relates to: 01cv2359, 01cv3225, 01cv3360, 01cv3910, 01cv5143, 01cv5644, 01cv5838, 01cv6000, 01cv6008, 01cv6120, 01cv6271, 01cv6277, 01cv6322, 01cv6747, 01cv6846, 01cv6870, 01cv7002, 01cv7046, 01cv7247, 01cv7344, 01cv9618, 01cv9651, 01cv9797, 01cv9799, 01cv9800, 01cv10040, 01cv10051, 01cv10075, 01cv10092, 01cv10108, 01cv10140, 01cv10161, 01cv10738, 01cv10753, 01cv10838, 01cv10867, 01cv10884, 01cv11230, 01cv11234.(sac) (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Brooke Bass, Ronit Setton on behalf of Multex.com, Inc. IPO Securities Litigation, Multex.com, Inc.. New Address: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, One World Financial Center, New York, NY, 10281, (212) 504-6000. (sac, ) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. Related document: 36 Amended Complaint filed by Raymond B. Dooley.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by Goldman Sachs & Co. to [36-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [36-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [36-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:29 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Occam Networks, Agency.com, Airspan Networks, Autobytel.com, Autoweb.com, Avantgo, BSquare Corp., Caldera Systems, CBS Marketwatch, Digitas, Inc., drugstore.com, Equinix, GT Group Telecom, Hoover's Inc., iBeam Broadcasting, SBI and Co., Metasolv Software, Multex, Net2000, United Online, Onvia.com, PlanetRx.com, Portal Software, Radware, Axeda Systems, Register.com, Silicon Laboratories, Sycamore Networks, theglobe.com, Tickets.com; Verado Holdings (FirstWorld Communications), Viador, Inc., Vignette Corp., and Z-Tel Technologies; Firm Name: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft. (sac) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs Group. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Raymond B. Dooley amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Merrill Lynch by Sueanne Codman on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Isaak Karaev by Edward Fargis, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Multex.com, Inc. by Edward Fargis on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Lennert J. Leader by Edward Fargis, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to I. Robert Greene by Edward Fargis, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Philip Scheps by Edward Fargis, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs Group by Patricia A. McGraw, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Salomon Smith Barney by Andres Arroyo, managing agent, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Bancboston Robertson by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Objection(s) by Multex.com, Inc., Isaak Karaev, Philip Callaghan, Philip Scheps, I. Robert Greene, Peter G. Labonte, Lennert J. Leader, Milton J. Pappas, Herbert L. Skeete to Pltffs' Proposed Supplemental Omnibus Order appointing lead pltffs and approving selection of lead counsel. (sac) (Entered: 07/19/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Egan, Esq. by Raymond B. Dooley, Mindful Partners, Arnold B. Stoller in support of [23-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases, [23-2] motion to approve movants' selection of counsel for the Class, [23-3] motion appointing movants to serve as lead plaintiffs . (bai) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Raymond B. Dooley, Mindful Partners, Arnold B. Stoller in support of [23-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases, [23-2] motion to approve movants' selection of counsel for the Class, [23-3] motion appointing movants to serve as lead plaintiffs . (bai) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Raymond B. Dooley, Mindful Partners, Arnold B. Stoller for an order to consolidate cases, to approve movants' selection of counsel for the Class, appointing movants to serve as lead plaintiffs Return Date not indicated. (bai) (Entered: 05/21/2002)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Objection(s) by Multex.com, Inc., Isaak Karaev, Philip Callaghan, Philip Scheps, I. Robert Greene, Lennert J. Leader, Herbert L. Skeete to [5-2] motion for an order appointing class member Ellen Evans to serve as lead plaintiff, [5-3] motion for an order directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by a sealed bid auction (sac) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group . (df) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch. (sac) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group. (kkc) (Entered: 11/08/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Salomon Smith Barney. (kkc) (Entered: 11/08/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Multex.com, Inc. (kkc) (Entered: 11/08/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER,... that all cases involving Multex.com in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-04026, 1:01-cv-04266 and 1:01-cv-04698), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 3910. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 3910,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03910 Document No. 15. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-04026; 1:01-cv-04266; 1:01-cv-04698] (dcap) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER; the last day for defts Multex.com, Inc., Isaak Karaev, Philip Callaghan, Philip Scheps, I. Robert Greene, Lennert J. Leader and Herbert L. Skeete to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended to 60 days after: (1) appointment of Lead Pltff(s) and Lead Counsel purs. to 15 U.S.C. 78z-1(a)(3) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3); or (2) the filing of a consolidated amended complaint in this action. Add defts Stip. signed - reminded that they shall have a conference on 7/9. ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones ) (sac) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Raymond B. Dooley in opposition to re: [10-1] motion for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 3910, 01 civ. 4026, and 01 civ. 4266 for all purposes, [10-2] motion for an order appointing class member Ellen Evans to serve as lead plaintiff, [10-3] motion for an order directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by a sealed bid auction; in further support of their motion for consolidation, appointment as lead pltffs, and for approval of their selection of lead counsel. (sac) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [10-1] motion for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 3910, 01 civ. 4026, and 01 civ. 4266 for all purposes, [10-2] motion for an order appointing class member Ellen Evans to serve as lead plaintiff, [10-3] motion for an order directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by a sealed bid auction. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/9/01 at 11:57 p.m.). (kw) (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Bancboston Robertson by Andrew J. Frackman on 6/8/01 . Answer due on 6/28/01 for Bancboston Robertson . (djc) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Merrill Lynch by Sue Ann Todman on 6/1/01. Answer due on 6/21/01 for Merrill Lynch . (cd) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Goldman Sachs Group by Rebecca Knowles on 5/31/01. Answer due on 6/20/01 for Goldman Sachs Group . (cd) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Salomon Smith Barney by Charise Bolling-Sharpe on 5/31/01. Answer due on 6/20/01 for Salomon Smith Barney . (cd) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER; defts Multex.com, Inc., Isaak Karaev, Philip Callaghan, Philip Scheps, I. Robert Greene, Lennert J. Leader and Herbert L. Skeete acknowledge and accept service of the summons and complaint . The last day for defts Multex.com, Inc., Isaak Karaev, Philip Callaghan, Philip Scheps, I. Robert Greene, Lennert J. Leader and Herbert L. Skeete to move, answer or respond to the complaint is extended to the date 60 days after the later of: (1) appointment of Lead Pltff(s) and Lead Counsel purs. to 15 U.S.C. Sec. 78z-1(a)(3) and 15 U.S.C. Sec. 78u-4(a0(3) or (2) the filing of a consolidated amended complaint . ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones ) (sn) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 06/07/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Ellen Evans, for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 3910, 01 civ. 4026, and 01 civ. 4266 for all purposes ; for an order appointing class member Ellen Evans to serve as lead plaintiff ; for an order directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by a sealed bid auction . Affidavit of Michael P. Reynolds in support is attached. No return date. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/9/01 at 11:57 p.m.) (kw) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER, extending deft's time to answer to the complaint in this action extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones ) (kg) (Entered: 05/30/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Multex.com, Inc. by Edward Fargis on 5/16/01. Answer due on 6/5/01 for Multex.com, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by SDR Investors, L.P. (kkc) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 405263. (kkc) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?