High Speed IPO v. High Speed Access
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-09743
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 11:52 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo E. Howard King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo Ruthy Parnes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY ROBERT J. BERG +1 914 920 7400 +1 914 761 1900 rberg@denleacarton.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeehae Jennifer Koh +1 212 326 2194 +1 212 326 2061 jkoh@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Joseph Merrick +1 212 326 4450 +1 212 326 2061 mmerrick@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2005 Jonathan D. Polkes +1 212 504 6021 +1 212 504 6666 jonathan.polkes@weil.com
No Logo CIBC World Markets Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo George E. Willett, Defendant
No Logo High Speed Access Corp., Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Officer/Director, Goodrich Petroleum Corp
Officer/Director, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Lehman Brothers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Moses Silverman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 ATauber@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Ron Pittock, Defendant
No Logo Richard S. Allegood, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo The Lunter Family, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, Settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Change of Address by Brooke Bass, Ronit Setton on behalf of High Speed Access Corp. IPO Securities Litigation, High Speed Access Corp.. New Address: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, One World Financial Center, New York, NY, 10281, (212) 504-6000. (sac, ) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by CIBC World Markets to [16-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Scott D. Musoff from the Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [16-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by Lehman Brothers to [16-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Banc of America to [16-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Jonathan D. Polkes from the Firm: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER; this action voluntarily dismissed without prejudice as to deft Charter Communications, Inc. purs. to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the FRCP. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTY AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; substituting Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft (Jonathan D. Polkes appearing) in place of Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP (Kenneth J. King appearing) as attys for deft Banc of America Securities LLC in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by E. Howard King amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Ron Pittock by personal service on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to George E. Willett by Marvie Swan, co-worker, on 4/1/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to High Speed Access by Marvie Swan, managing agent, on 4/1/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to CIBC World Markets by Dan Greenstone, managing agent, on 3/26/02. Answer due on 4/15/02 for CIBC World Markets. (sac) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Lehman Brothers mailed on 1/2/02. Answer due on 3/4/02 for Lehman Brothers. (sac) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to J.P. Morgan Sec. mailed on 1/2/02. Answer due on 3/4/02 for J.P. Morgan Sec. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Lehman Brothers by Andrew Tauber. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Randi B. Guest mailed on 1/2/02. (sac) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Banc of America. (sac) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by High Speed Access Corp. (sac) (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. by E. Howard King and the Lunter Family in support Re: [3-1] motion for an order, appointing Movants as Lead Pltffs, [3-2] motion for an order, approving Movants' selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) Modified on 01/23/2002 (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by E. Howard King and the Lunter Family in support of [3-1] motion for an order, appointing Movants as Lead Pltffs, [3-2] motion for an order, approving Movants' selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) Modified on 01/23/2002 (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION by E. Howard King and the Lunter Family for an order, appointing Movants as Lead Pltffs ; for an order, approving Movants' selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel ; Return date not indicated. (sac) Modified on 01/23/2002 (Entered: 01/23/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Sec. . (bai) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 420857. (gmo) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367. (sac, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 7974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Richard S. Allegood. (sac, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Document filed by Richard S. Allegood. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195. (sac, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Ron Pitcock and George E. Willett. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              OMNIBUS ORDER, E. Howard King is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MASTER ALLEGATIONS by E. Howard King RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 16, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Case accepted as related to 21 mc 92. (gmo) Modified on 12/13/2001
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (gmo)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?