Patricia Smith v. Hillary Clinton
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 17-5133

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 6:56 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Woods, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo Patricia Smith, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained, COR LD NTC Retained LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo Hillary Rodham Clinton, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Retained David Evan Kendall +1 202 434 5145 +1 202 434 5029 dkendall@wc.com
COR LD NTC Retained Amy Mason Saharia +1 202 434 5847 asaharia@wc.com
COR LD NTC Retained Katherine M. Turner +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 kturner@wc.com
United States of America United States of America, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ Mark B. Stern +1 202 514 5089 +1 202 514 8151 mark.stern@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR LD NTC Gvt US DOJ Weili Justin Shaw, Attorney weili.j.shaw@usdoj.gov
COR NTC Gvt US Attorney Jessie Liu +1 202 514 7549 jessie.k.liu@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit 2320 - Assault Libel and Slander
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208012167 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPINION [1723900] filed PER CURIAM OPINION (Pages: 12). [17-5133] [Entered: 03/27/2018 10:01 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208012164 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1723899] filed that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed, for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Rogers, Millett, and Pillard. [17-5133] [Entered: 03/27/2018 09:57 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208012161 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      PER CURIAM ORDER [1723897] filed upon consideration of appellants’ renewed request for recusal contained in the notice of supplemental case authority [1723586-2], it is ORDERED that the request be denied. Before Judge: Millett. [17-5133] [Entered: 03/27/2018 09:55 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208011559 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE [1723586] of Supplemental Case Authority filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 03/23/2018 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 03/23/2018 01:06 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208001387 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE [1718071] Notice of Intent to Seek En Banc Review filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 02/14/2018 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/14/2018 08:16 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208001221 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            PER CURIAM ORDER [1717998] filed denying appellant's motion to disqualify [1716983-2]. The single contribution to the Clinton campaign referred to in the motion was made in 2008 prior to Judge Millett’s 2013 appointment to the court. Merits Panel are selected randomly by a computer program that automatically checks for known recusals and screens for the specific date and case mix acceptable to the court. See D.C. Circuit Handbook of Practice and Internal Procedures 47 (2017). Before Judges: Millett. [17-5133] [Entered: 02/14/2018 02:51 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207999425 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION [1716983] Disqualify Hon. Patricia Millett filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods (Service Date: 02/07/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1589 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 02/07/2018 05:15 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207997073 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE [1715761] filed Disqualify the Honorable Patricia Millet filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 01/31/2018 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 01/31/2018 02:10 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207997032 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  PER CURIAM ORDER [1715736] filed denying appellants' corrected request for clarification concerning selection of judicial panel and request for randomly assigned new judicial panel [1715257-2]. Before Judges: Rogers, Millett and Pillard. [17-5133] [Entered: 01/31/2018 12:55 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207996291 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CORRECTED NOTICE [1715257] REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION CONCERNING SELECTION OF JUDICIAL PANEL AND REQUEST FOR RANDOMLY ASSIGNED NEW JUDICIAL PANEL filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 01/29/2018 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 01/29/2018 02:58 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207996015 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE [1715089] REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION CONCERNING SELECTION OF JUDICIAL PANEL AND REQUEST FOR RANDOMLY ASSIGNED NEW JUDICIAL PANEL filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 01/26/2018 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 01/26/2018 08:15 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207995971 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        PER CURIAM ORDER [1715070] filed that the court will dispose of the appeal without oral argument on the basis of the record and presentations in the briefs pursuant to Fed. R. App. 34(a)(2); D.C.Cir.Rule 34(j). Before Judges: Rogers, Millett and Pillard. [17-5133] [Entered: 01/26/2018 05:05 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207989936 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1711707] filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton [Service Date: 01/05/2018 ] Length of Brief: 8192 Words. [17-5133] (Kendall, David) [Entered: 01/05/2018 02:34 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207989924 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1711701] filed by USA [Service Date: 01/05/2018 ] Length of Brief: 4,187 Words. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili) [Entered: 01/05/2018 02:22 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207989375 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1711375] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 01/03/2018 ] Length of Brief: 5513 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 01/03/2018 08:48 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207989372 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1711374] filed by Patricia Smith [Service Date: 01/03/2018 ] Length of Brief: 6450 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 01/03/2018 08:47 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207987306 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  JOINT APPENDIX [1710228] filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton, USA and Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 12/22/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 12/22/2017 12:36 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207985793 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AMENDED APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1709375] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 12/18/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5548 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 12/18/2017 06:14 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207985393 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1709193] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 12/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 5305 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 12/15/2017 08:09 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207984910 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CLERK'S ORDER [1708938] filed scheduling oral argument on Friday, 02/09/2018. [17-5133] [Entered: 12/14/2017 12:21 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207980990 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1706718] filed granting appellants' unopposed motion to extend time [1706694-2], setting revised briefing schedule: APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/15/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/22/2017. FINAL BRIEFS due 01/05/2018. [17-5133] [Entered: 11/30/2017 09:45 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207980947 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION [1706694] to extend time to file motion to 12/15/2017 filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods Length Certification: 151 words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 11/29/2017 08:09 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207977618 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              APPELLEE BRIEF [1705013] filed by USA [Service Date: 11/17/2017 ] Length of Brief: 4,218 Words. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili) [Entered: 11/17/2017 11:43 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207977218 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                APPELLEE BRIEF [1704780] filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton [Service Date: 11/16/2017 ] Length of Brief: 8,247 words. [17-5133] (Kendall, David) [Entered: 11/16/2017 04:15 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207970205 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CLERK'S ORDER [1700799] filed granting appellee's unopposed motion to extend time [1700438-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 11/17/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/01/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/08/2017. Final Briefs due 12/22/2017. [17-5133] [Entered: 10/23/2017 11:19 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207969690 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION [1700438] to extend time to file brief to 11/17/2017 filed by USA Length Certification: 353 Words. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili) [Entered: 10/19/2017 11:15 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207963918 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AMENDED APPELLANT BRIEF [1695374] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/28/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6518 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 09/28/2017 12:09 PM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207963570 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        APPELLANT BRIEF [1695097] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/27/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6518 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 09/27/2017 02:36 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207958594 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CLERK'S ORDER [1691959] filed granting appellants' consent motion to extend time [1691539-2], Th following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 09/27/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/27/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/13/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/20/2017. Final Briefs due 12/04/2017. [17-5133] [Entered: 09/07/2017 05:04 PM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207958401 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1691851] for motion to extend time [1691539-2] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 09/07/2017 12:29 PM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207957910 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1691539] to extend time to file brief to 09/27/2017 filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/05/2017 ] Length Certification: 80 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 09/05/2017 07:37 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207948642 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CLERK'S ORDER [1686401] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/06/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/06/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/20/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 10/27/2017. Final Briefs due 11/13/2017. [17-5133] [Entered: 07/28/2017 04:50 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207942123 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  AMENDED DOCKETING STATEMENT [1682795] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/06/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/06/2017 12:18 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941893 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1682677] submitted by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:23 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941890 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1682676] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:21 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941887 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1682675] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:20 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941884 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1682674] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:20 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941878 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682672] filed by Larry Klayman, Esq. on behalf of Appellants Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:19 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941875 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT [1682671] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:17 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941872 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682670] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 07/05/2017 02:16 PM]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941577 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682503] filed by USA [Service Date: 07/03/2017 ] [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili) [Entered: 07/03/2017 02:29 PM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941574 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682502] filed by Weili J. Shaw and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellee USA. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili) [Entered: 07/03/2017 02:28 PM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941282 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682332] filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton [Service Date: 06/30/2017 ] [17-5133] (Kendall, David) [Entered: 06/30/2017 06:09 PM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941279 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682331] filed by David E. Kendall and co-counsel Katherine M. Turner, Amy Mason Saharia on behalf of Appellee Hillary Rodham Clinton. [17-5133] (Kendall, David) [Entered: 06/30/2017 06:08 PM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207933836 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL [1678240] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01606-ABJ filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 17-5133. [17-5133] [Entered: 06/05/2017 02:27 PM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207933830 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CLERK'S ORDER [1678237] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/20/2017; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/20/2017 [17-5133] [Entered: 06/05/2017 02:22 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?