Torres v. Bellagio, LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01025
District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey
Last Updated August 7, 2019 at 3:38 PM EDT (5.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Bellagio, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce A. Aquilera +1 702 693 7206

Represented by Durham Jones & Pinegar, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig S. Newman +1 702 870 6060 +1 702 870 6090 cnewman@djplaw.com

Represented by Fennemore Craig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Dachelet +1 702 692 8000 +1 702 692 8099 ddachelet@fclaw.com

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Tyler R. Andrews +1 702 792 3773 +1 702 792 9002 andrewst@gtlaw.com
, , , , , Mark G Tratos , +1 702 792 3773 +1 702 792 9002 tratosm@gtlaw.com

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deverie Jean Christensen +41539 494 00x6328 +1 415 394 9401 christensend@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua A Sliker +1 702 921 2460 +1 702 921 2461 joshua.sliker@jacksonlewis.com

Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael J. McCue +1 702 949 8200 +1 702 949 8363 mmccue@lrrc.com
, , Andrew Sedlock +1 702 796 5555 +1 702 369 2666 usdnotices@gordonsilver.com

Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Patrick H. Hicks +1 702 862 8800
, , , Sandra Ketner +1 775 348 4888 +1 775 562 8147 sketner@littler.com
, , , Montgomery Y Paek +1 702 862 8800 +1 702 862 8811 mpaek@littler.com
, , , Timothy Roehrs +1 702 862 8800 +1 702 862 8811 troehrs@littler.com
, , , Marcus B. Smith +1 702 862 8800 +1 702 862 8811 mbsmith@littler.com

Represented by Mgm Resorts International

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/13/2017 R. Calder Huntington +1 702 692 1289 chuntington@mgmresorts.com
TERMINATED: 06/13/2017 Hilary Barrett Muckleroy +1 702 692 1959 +1 702 669 4501 hmuckleroy@mgmresorts.com
, , Amy L Thompson +1 702 692 1284 abaker@mgmresorts.com

Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Ronald D Green, Jr. +1 888 667 1113 +1 305 437 7662 rdg@randazza.com
v.
No Logo Hector Torres, Defendant

Represented by Giuffre Law Offices, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shunyi Joonho Hong +1 516 358 5300 +1 516 358 0400 sjhong@yourlawyer.com

Represented by Kemp & Kemp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JAMES P. KEMP +1 702 258 1183 +1 702 258 6983 jp@kemp-attorneys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Victoria Lynn Neal +1 702 258 1183 +1 702 258 6983 vneal@kemp-attorneys.com

Represented by McCorriston Miller Mukai MacKinnon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Troy J.H. Andrade andrade@m4law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , David J. Minkin minkin@m4law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Page C. Ogata ogata@m4law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Jessica M. Wan +1 808 529 7300 +1 808 524 8293 jwan@m4law.com

Represented by Moskowitz & Book, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Avraham Chaim Moskowitz +1 212 221 7999 +1 212 398 8835 amoskowitz@mb-llp.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Timeline
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 46 Motion for Summary Judgment,, by Plaintiff Hector Torres. Replies due by 7/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F) (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/22/2018. Replies due by 7/23/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fifth STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) re Discovery re 45 Order on Stipulation, 44 Stipulation by Plaintiff Hector Torres. (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. Responses due by 5/25/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Moreno Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 2012 Medical Records, # 4 Exhibit Harbaugh Deposition, # 5 Exhibit 2015 Records, # 6 Exhibit Manager FAQs, # 7 Exhibit Moreno Deposition, # 8 Exhibit Torres Deposition, # 9 Exhibit Busser Job Description, # 10 Exhibit CBA, # 11 Exhibit 2014 Complaint, # 12 Exhibit Stipulation and Order of Dismissal, # 13 Exhibit Comparison Chart, # 14 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Hadley) (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 43 Order (Fourth Request). Motions due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re 43 Order, filed by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. (Sliker, Joshua) Modified on 4/24/2018 to add docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (TR). (Entered: 04/23/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines 35 Order (Third Request). Motions due by 4/27/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Third STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadlines 35 Order, by Plaintiff Hector Torres. (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 36 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Deposition of Jessica Harbaugh is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 37 Motion for Sanctions, 36 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Hector Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1) (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 01/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 37 Motion for Sanctions, 36 Motion to Compel, by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. Replies due by 1/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Additional Excerpts from Deposition Transcript of Jessica Harbaugh) (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 36 the Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel Further Deposition of Percipient Witness Jessica Harbaugh and 37 Motion for Sanctions will be briefed in the ordinary course. The deadlines to file dispositive motions and the joint pretrial order are stayed pending resolution of the instant motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Modified to add additional language on 1/9/2018 (MR). (Entered: 01/09/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Emergency MOTION for Sanctions re 36 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Hector Torres. Responses due by 1/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10) (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 01/07/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Emergency MOTION to Compel, filed by Plaintiff Hector Torres. Responses due by 1/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10) (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 01/07/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation. Discovery due by 12/18/2017. Motions due by 1/17/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re emergency motion for protective order 28 and stipulation for extention of time 30 held on 11/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: James Kemp; Def Counsel: Joshua Sliker; Time of Hearing: 2:00 p.m.; Recording start and end times: 1:58 - 2:25; Courtroom: 3D; The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties. The emergency motion for protective order 28 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The parties will try and submit a stipulation as discussed during this hearing. If the parties are unable to agree to a stipulation then the emergency motion for protective order 28 will proceed as stated on the record. The court will sign the stipulation for extension of time 30 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 28 Motion for Protective Order, by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Emily Q. Santiago) (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 28 Motion for Protective Order, by Plaintiff Hector Torres. Replies due by 11/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 11/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. The Court will defer deciding on 30 the Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines until the 11/17/2017 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re 26 27 ORDER, filed by Plaintiff Hector Torres. (Neal, Victoria) Modified on 11/6/2017 to correct docket entry relationship (TR). (Entered: 11/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 11/1/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 28 Defendant's Emergency Motion for a Protective Order Regarding the 11/6/2017 Deposition of Defendant's FRCP 30(b)(6) Witness is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 11/17/2017, in Courtroom 3D. Any opposition must be filed on or before 11/10/2017. Any reply must be filed on or before 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2014 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation & Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of 2014 Case, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Deposition of Defendant Bellagio, LLC Pursuant to FRCP Rule 30(b)(6), # 4 Exhibit Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition Topics)(Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 16 Scheduling Order (First Request). Discovery due by 11/15/2017. Motions due by 12/15/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 16 Scheduling Order, ; by Plaintiff Hector Torres. (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bellagio, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International, Other Affiliate Mirage Resorts Inc. for Bellagio, LLC added. . (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint filed by Bellagio, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/31/2017.(Christensen, Deverie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/16/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Joshua A Sliker for Bellagio, LLC and Deverie J. Christensen substituted for Attorney R. Calder Huntington and Hilary Barrett Muckleroy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Substitution of Counsel by Bellagio, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bellagio, LLC, filed by Hector Torres. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 9/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2017 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Victoria Neal; Def Counsel: Calder Huntington; Court Reporter/Recorder: Felicia Zabin; Time of Hearing: 10:02 a.m. - 10:16 a.m.; Courtroom: 6D; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representation of counsel on the motion to dismiss 9 . The Court places it's findings and conclusions on the record. The Court GRANTS the motion to dismiss 9 with leave to amend as stated on the record. Plaintiff has 10 days to file their amended complaint. The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the Court's official ruling. No separate order to follow. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/30/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Pla Counsel: J.P. Kemp, Victoria Neal; Pla present; Interpreter Josie Brito present; Def Counsel: Hilary Muckleroy, Calder Huntington; Def rep. Rick Jost present; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m. - 11:14 a.m. The Court, counsel, and the parties conferred, but no settlement was reached. This case returns to the normal litigation track. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC ยง 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER re 15 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/16/2017. Motions due by 11/15/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Hector Torres . (Kemp, James) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 5/17/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. RE: 9 Motion to Dismiss. Due to a scheduling conflict, the motion hearing set for 5/30/2017 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 6/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to 9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. (Huntington, R.) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to 9 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Hector Torres. Replies due by 5/8/2017. (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE of Hearing on 9 First MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2017 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/30/2017 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," directly to undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office not later than 3:00 p.m. on 5/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. Responses due by 5/1/2017. (Huntington, R.) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Bellagio, LLC. (Huntington, R.) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FIRST NOTICE of Non-Compliance with LR IC 5-1. ERROR: 1 Petition for Removal, 2 Certificate of Interested Parties, and 5 Statement re: Removal were not properly signed/filed in accordance with LR IC 5-1(b). The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. Attorneys Hilary Barrett Muckleroy and R. Calder Huntington are advised in the future that documents submitted using CM/ECF, must be filed by the attorney who signed the document, pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). No further action is required regarding documents 1, 2, or 5 at this time. (no image attached) (TR) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Hector Torres. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Neal, Victoria) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bellagio, LLC. (Muckleroy, Hilary) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 4/10/2017. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/25/2017. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached)(MR) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Bellagio, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Muckleroy, Hilary) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-17-751638-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4556617), filed by Bellagio, LLC.(Muckleroy, Hilary) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 30 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?