Stephenson v. US Atty General

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:91-cv-00413
District Judge William M. Steger, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge William M. Steger
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 11:06 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo **CAN'T FILE CA Walter Earl Stephenson, Sr, Plaintiff

Represented by #02007-078

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Earl Stephenson, Sr
v.
No Logo Barney Frank, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elliott S. Hall +1 313 568 6516 elliotthall19@yahoo.com

Represented by Constitutional Accountability Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , David H. Gans +1 202 296 6889 +1 202 296 6895 david@theusconstitution.org

Represented by Fifth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Eldon V. C. Greenberg +1 202 965 7880 +1 202 965 1729 egreenberg@gsblaw.com

Represented by Foley Hoag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , John M. Stevens, Jr. +1 617 832 1159 +1 617 832 7000 jstevens@foleyhoag.com

Represented by Morganroth & Morganroth, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Cherie Morganroth +1 248 864 4000 +1 248 355 3017 mmorganroth@morganrothlaw.com

Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard J Landau +1 734 865 1580 rjlandau@rjlps.com
No Logo Benjamin L Cardin, Defendant
No Logo Bill McCollum, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diana J. Ryan +3304 330 330 4410 diana.ryan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Bruce A Morrison, Defendant
No Logo Carlos J Moorehead, Defendant
No Logo Charles Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Claw E Shaw, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Dan Glickman, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Amy M Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Amy M Allen

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Friedrich A. P. Siekert +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 fred.siekert@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dan Lungrem, Defendant
No Logo Don Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Edward F Feigham, Defendant
No Logo French D Slaughter, Defendant
No Logo George Gekas, Defendant
No Logo George W Crockett, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Hamilton Fish, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Harley O Staggers, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Henry J Hyde, Defendant
No Logo Howard Coble, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael J Meehan +1 520 529 1969 +1 520 747 1550 mmeehan.az@msn.com

Represented by American Center for Law & Justice - Virginia Beach, VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jay Allen Sekulow +1 804 569 2489

Represented by American Center for Law & Justice - Washington, DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Colby M May +1 202 546 8890 +1 202 546 9309

Represented by Immigration Reform Law Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael M. Hethmon +1 202 232 5599 +1 202 464 3590 mhethmon@irli.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Garrett R. Roe +1 202 232 5590 +1 202 464 3590 groe@irli.org

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diana J. Ryan +3304 330 330 4410 diana.ryan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jack Krooks, Defendant
No Logo James F Sensengbenner, Defendant
No Logo Jim Wright, Defendant
No Logo John Bryant, Defendant

Represented by Gordon Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Philip J. Gordon +1 617 536 1800 +1 617 536 1802 pgordon@gordonllp.com

Represented by Russell & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Peter Francis Russell +1 781 444 5151 +1 781 444 5252 prussell@russlegal.com

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diana J. Ryan +3304 330 330 4410 diana.ryan@usdoj.gov
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph R Biden, Jr"
No Logo Lawerance Smith, Defendant
No Logo Michael Dewine, Defendant
No Logo Mike Synar, Defendant
No Logo Pat Swindall, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Schroeder, Defendant
No Logo Peter Rodino, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Pomano Mazzoli, Defendant
No Logo Rick Boucher, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diana J. Ryan +3304 330 330 4410 diana.ryan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert W Kastenmeir, Defendant
No Logo Ronald C Burkhart, Defendant
No Logo US Attorney General's Office, Defendant
No Logo US Congressman, Defendant
No Logo William E Danneneyer, Defendant
No Logo William J Hughes, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Howard Berman, Amicus

Represented by Law Offices of Margo Schlanger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Margo Schlanger +1 617 495 9299

Represented by Law Offices of Samuel R Bagenstos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel R Bagenstos +1 617 495 9299

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen Mary Wahle +1 202 383 5366 +1 202 383 5313 kwahle@omm.com
No Logo John Conyers, Jr, Amicus

Represented by Law Offices of Margo Schlanger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Margo Schlanger +1 617 495 9299

Represented by Law Offices of Samuel R Bagenstos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel R Bagenstos +1 617 495 9299
No Logo Lamar Smith, Amicus

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael J Meehan +1 520 529 1969 +1 520 747 1550 mmeehan.az@msn.com

Represented by American Center for Law & Justice - Virginia Beach, VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jay Allen Sekulow +1 804 569 2489

Represented by American Center for Law & Justice - Washington, DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Colby M May +1 202 546 8890 +1 202 546 9309

Represented by David T Hardy PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T David T Hardy +1 520 749 0241 dthardy@mindspring.com

Represented by Immigration Reform Law Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael M. Hethmon +1 202 232 5599 +1 202 464 3590 mhethmon@irli.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Garrett R. Roe +1 202 232 5590 +1 202 464 3590 groe@irli.org

Represented by Tuggey Rosenthal Pauerstein Sandoloski Agather LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Jonathan D. Pauerstein +1 210 244 8830 +1 210 354 4034 jpauerstein@trpsalaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certified copy of judgment of USCA Re: [5-1] appeal issd as mandate; DISMISSING APPEAL for want of prosecution for failure ot appellant to file his brief. (former empl) (Entered: 11/29/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/28/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of appeal by Walter Earl Stephenson Sr of Order dated 8/16/91 Fee Status: ifp Appeal record due on 9/27/91 cc:pla/WWJ on 8/29/91 (former empl) Modified on 08/29/1991 (Entered: 08/29/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order, dismissing case with prejudice as frivolous and malicious OB Ref: v151p140 ( signed by Judge William M. Steger ) cc:pla (former empl) (Entered: 08/16/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/7/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order, transferring case from US District Judge William Wayne Justice to US District Judge William S Steger ( signed by Judge William W. Justice ) cc:pla/WWJ/WMS on 8/9/91 (former empl) (Entered: 08/09/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion for Judicial Attention (mll) (Entered: 07/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division (mll) (Entered: 07/31/1991)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?