Directv Inc v. Greg A Fischer

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:01-cv-00370
District Judge David O. Carter, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge David O. Carter
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 8:57 PM EDT (6.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Brad Alexander, Plaintiff

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael David Kinkley +1 509 484 5611 +1 509 484 5972 mkinkley@qwestoffice.net

Represented by MORRISON, SHERWOOD,WILSON & DEOLA, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Farris-Olsen +1 406 442 3261 +1 406 443 7294 rfolsen@mswdlaw.com
, David K.W. Wilson, Jr. +1 406 442 3261 +1 406 443 7294 kwilson@mswdlaw.com
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Wayne Anderson, Jr. +1 918 254 1414 +1 918 254 1888 jwajrpc@aol.com
TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, , , , , , , , , , , , , , La Rond Baker +1 206 516 2999 larondb@atg.wa.gov
, , , Janice M Bellucci +1 805 896 7854 +1 805 896 7854 JMBellucci@aol.com
Space Joseph Pacifico Berra +1 512 474 5073 +1 512 474 0726 joe.tcrp@gmail.com
, Christina N Boffen +1 410 718 2929 +1 410 747 3741 cboffen@gmail.com
Space Jack Boland +1 216 374 2566 jackboland34@gmail.com
Space Melissa Lynne Brabender +1 312 201 8310 +1 312 332 4663 mlbrabender@gmail.com
Space Yasha Bronshteyn +1 310 914 3222 +1 310 914 4242 yashagbllp@yahoo.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ben Elton Bruner +1 334 323 4463 +1 334 263 4766 brunerlawfirm@gmail.com
Space Jerome F Buting +1 262 821 0999 +1 262 821 5599 jfbbrook@aol.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Jose E. Carreras-Rovira +1 787 645 0380 +1 787 724 2190 jecarrerasrovira@gmail.com
, , , Christopher E. Chang +1 212 208 1470 +1 212 208 1468 cechang@juno.com
, , , , , Douglas A. Clark +1 570 307 0702 clarkesquire@comcast.net
Space Robert V. Clark, Jr. +1 301 572 5000 +1 301 572 9500 rvcj@verizon.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Patricia Cofrancesco +1 203 467 6003 +1 203 467 6004 pattycofrancesco@sbcglobal.net
, David Louis Cohen +1 718 793 1553 +1 718 793 4719 DLCCrimlaw@aol.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark Louis Collier +1 918 742 4062 +1 918 743 6103 mlcollier@sbcglobal.net
, Jeffery B. Cox +1 615 896 3233 +1 615 848 9099 jcoxatty@yahoo.com
, William C. Cumbie +1 904 554 4904 billcumbie@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Tammy Daniels +1 248 433 2705 +1 248 433 2706 tdaniels671@yahoo.com
, , Suzanne E. Durrell +1 617 333 9681 suzanne.durrell@verizon.net
Space Sophie Marie Dye +1 773 706 0856 sophie.dye@gmail.com
, , , , , , Albert Ettinger +1 773 818 4825 ettinger.albert@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , B. Kent Felty +1 918 587 9958 bkentfelty@aol.com
Space Daniel P. Finley +1 734 475 4659 +1 734 475 4672 dpfinleyesq@comcast.net
, , , , , , , , John J. Garzon +1 718 433 1331 +1 718 433 1330 attyjohngarzon@msn.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas Drew Gearon +1 212 736 5300 +1 212 971 9840 gearonthomas@aol.com
Space Peter Linn Goldman +1 703 684 6476 +1 703 549 3335 pgoldmanatty@aol.com
, Matthew Stafford Green +1 251 434 8500 +1 251 434 8500 mattgreenlaw@comcast.net
, , , , , , , , Paul S. Grosswald +1 201 692 0444 pgrosswald@hotmail.com
, , , Thomas W Harris, Jr. +1 949 477 2390 +1 949 477 2394 twharrisjr@hotmail.com
, , , , Robert M Hatch +1 808 524 5644 +1 808 599 1881 rhatch@bhhawaii.net
Space Brandie L. Hawkins +1 419 225 5706 +1 419 225 6003 gsubum@yahoo.com
, John T. Hermann +1 248 591 9291 +1 248 591 2304 Hermannlawoffices@comcast.net
Space Carmen D. Hernandez +1 240 472 3391 +1 202 628 2881 chernan7@aol.com
, , , , , James C Holland +1 559 741 1112 jchfirm@sbcglobal.net
, William W Houck +1 425 392 7118 +1 206 337 0916 houcklaw@gmail.com
Space William W Houck +1 425 392 7118 +1 206 337 0916 houcklaw@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , Stephen Brian Irwin +1 718 874 8423 sbirwin@live.com
Space Lauren Izzo +1 512 474 5073 +1 512 474 0726 lauren.tcrp@gmail.com
, , Jacqueline Marie James +1 914 358 6423 +1 914 358 6424 jjameslaw@optonline.net
, , , , , , , , , , , Bruce L. Jorgensen +1 808 589 6125 +1 680 488 4594 email4blj@yahoo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , Catherine Hannah Josh +1 585 423 1973 chjesq@gmail.com
, , , , , Noah Aaron Kinigstein +1 212 285 9300 +1 212 385 2608 Nakasequal@aol.com
, Bryan Matthew Konoski +1 212 897 5832 +1 718 668 1094 bkonoski@aol.com
, , Andreas Koutsoudakis +1 516 357 3777 +1 516 357 3792 akoutsoudakis@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
Space Stephanie A. Linam +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5912 stephaniealinam@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , Reginald I Lloyd +1 803 413 4840 lloydlaw3@gmail.com
, , John Gregory Lockwood +1 509 624 8200 +1 509 623 1491 jgregorylockwood@hotmail.com
, , , , Timothy R. Lord +1 415 847 0159 lordlbbs@gmail.com
, , , , , , , Thomas Joel Manning +1 937 776 4856 +1 866 454 6229 tmanning@woh.rr.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard David Marrs +1 918 599 8600 +1 918 599 8673 attorneyrichardmarrs@me.com
, , , Charles E. McFarland +1 502 845 2754 +1 502 845 2754 mcfarlandc@bellsouth.net
, , , Keith Lane Miller +1 855 523 5803 klm4law@aol.com
Space Keith S. Moheban +1 612 335 1500 keith.moheban@stinson.com
, Matthew Gerald Monforton +1 406 570 2949 +1 406 586 3869 matthewmonforton@yahoo.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Allison E Neal +1 334 333 5203 allison.neal@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , C. Burt Newell +1 501 321 2222 +1 501 372 6025 burtnewell@mac.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , H Ernie Nishii +1 714 372 7600 +1 714 372 7610 ernie.nishii@gmail.com
, Lauri K O Neal +1 443 454 2163 +1 443 571 8564 lawoneal@gmail.com
Space Adryane Omens +1 510 527 4500 donadryane@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gregory G Petersen +1 949 864 2200 +1 949 640 8983 ggpetersenlaw@gmail.com
, , , , , Joel Emery Rabb +1 312 593 8661 joelrabb@gmail.com
, Igor Raykin +1 720 748 8888 +1 720 748 8894 iraykin@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lei Z. Reilley +1 617 299 6627 leizhaolaw@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert W. Roddis +1 313 319 5045 +1 313 885 1803 bobroddis@gmail.com
, , Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 239 5796 +1 631 239 5796 peteraromero@gmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Daniel Roth +1 312 922 6262 +1 202 639 6490 markdroth@gmail.com
, Maurice J Salem +1 708 277 4775 salemlaw@comcast.net
, Ronald Lee Schwartz +1 301 474 2300 +1 301 474 6607 ronaldschwartz@verizon.net
, , , , , Conrad O. Seifert +1 860 434 2097 +1 860 434 3657 conradlaw@aol.com
, , , William J. Sheppard +1 904 356 9661 +1 904 356 9667 sheplaw@att.net
, , , , , Thomas Milby Smith +1 509 327 9902 +1 509 327 6238 thomasmsmithlaw@gmail.com
, William Joseph Stampur +1 212 619 4240 +1 212 619 6743 wjstampur@hotmail.com
, , , James Michael Steinberg +1 914 478 4293 +1 914 478 4142 james.steinberg4@verizon.net
, Richard H Stevens +1 417 889 4400 rstevensatty@sbcglobal.net
, Anne L Tamashasky +1 513 445 9611 +1 513 492 8989 ladylawalt@mac.com
, Leif Thompson +1 907 617 9256 +1 888 363 1007 leifthompson@outlook.com
, Rodney Darrin Thompson +1 251 434 8500 +1 251 408 3265 darrin.thompson1066@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Curtright C. Truitt +1 239 277 5225 +1 239 277 0943 ctruittpa@aol.com
, , , , , , Victor Tsai +1 212 625 9028 +1 212 697 7777 ourlawyers@aol.com
, Tracy L Turner +1 614 657 3454 tracy.rblaw@gmail.com
, John W. Walker +1 501 374 3758 johnwalkeratty@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antoinette S Waller +1 323 359 5793 antoinette.waller@att.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard David Willstatter +1 914 948 5656 +1 914 948 8730 willstatter@msn.com
, , , , , , , , , Alan P. Woodruff +1 828 676 1245 alan.jd.llm@gmail.com
, , Stephen C. Woodruff +1 670 235 3872 +1 670 235 3873 scwlaw.spn@gmail.com
, Michael Anthony Young +1 770 698 5700 +1 770 698 5714 myoungesquire1@aol.com
Space Adam Ross Zurbriggen +1 202 640 2850 +1 202 280 1034 adam.zurbriggen@gmail.com

Represented by 100 South Fifth Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jill A Brisbois +1 612 455 7050 jill@newmarkdefense.com
, , , Jeffrey S Storms +1 612 455 7050 +1 612 455 7051 jeff@newmarkstorms.com

Represented by 101 Arch Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jackie A. Cowin +1 617 654 1735 jcowin@k-plaw.com

Represented by 12th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Megan B. Bayer +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 mbayer@k-plaw.com

Represented by 371 Dogwood Way

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Richard Ranallo +1 831 703 4011 +1 831 533 5073 nick@ranallolawoffice.com

Represented by 446 Main Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terri D. Leary +1 508 796 5691 +1 508 798 8006 terri@learylegalservices.com

Represented by 5th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael Kurt Allen +1 513 321 5297 +1 513 579 8703 mike@mkallenlaw.com

Represented by A New Way of Life Reentry Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Eunsuk Kim +1 323 563 3575 +1 323 563 3445 joshua@anewwayoflife.org

Represented by Aaron T. Brooks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron T. Brooks +1 814 852 8264 atb15@psu.edu

Represented by ACLU - Atlanta, GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Justin B. Cox +1 404 523 2721 +1 404 653 0331 jcox@aclu.org

Represented by ACLU - New York, NY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/24/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Lucas Guttentag +1 415 343 0773 +1 415 395 0950 lguttentag@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Omar C. Jadwat +1 212 549 2620 +1 212 549 2654 ojadwat@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/19/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/19/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/19/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/19/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/19/2011, ATTORNEY T Tanaz Moghadam +1 212 284 7316 +1 212 549 2654 tmoghadam@aclu.org

Represented by ACLU - Phoenix, AZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N James Duff Lyall +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 jlyall@acluaz.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Daniel Joseph Pochoda +1 602 650 1854 +1 602 650 1376 dpochoda@acluaz.org

Represented by ACLU Immigrants' Rights Project (CA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/07/2010, ATTORNEY T Harini Raghupathi +1 415 343 0780 +1 415 395 0950 hraghupathi@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kenneth J Sugarman +1 415 343 0777 irp_ks@aclu.org

Represented by ACLU of Alabama Foundation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall C. Marshall +1 334 265 2754 +1 334 269 5666 rmarshall@aclualabama.org

Represented by ACLU of Alabama, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Brock Boone +1 334 420 1743 bboone@aclualabama.org

Represented by ACLU of Iowa Foundation, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Rita Nanda Bettis +1 515 243 3576 rita.bettis@gmail.com
, , Joseph Anthony Fraioli +1 515 259 7047 +1 515 243 8506 Joseph.Fraioli@aclu-ia.org

Represented by ACLU SC National Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan King Dunn +1 843 720 1425 +1 843 720 1428 sdunn@aclusouthcarolina.org

Represented by Adams+Crow, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Alana M. De Young +1 505 582 2819 alana@adamscrow.com

Represented by Advocates For Basic Legal Equality Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Aneel L. Chablani +1 419 930 2370 +1 419 259 2880 achablani@ablelaw.org
, , , , , , , , , , , Robert A Cole +1 419 255 0814 +1 419 259 2880 rcole@ablelaw.org

Represented by Aiken & Scoptur SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J Scoptur +1 414 225 0260 +1 414 225 9666 paul@aikenandscoptur.com

Represented by Albert Adam Breud , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Albert Adam Breud, II

Represented by Aldarondo & Lopez Bras

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz +1 787 474 5447 +1 787 474 5451 alb@alblegal.net

Represented by Aldarondo & Lopez Bras, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez +1 787 474 5447 +1 787 474 5441 eliezer.aldarondo@alblegal.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz +1 787 474 5447 +1 787 474 5451 alb@alblegal.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Claudio Aliff-Ortiz +1 787 474 5447 +1 787 474 5451 califf@alblegal.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael C. McCall +1 787 474 5447 +1 787 474 5451 michaelm@caribe.net

Represented by Alex Mendoza Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberto Alejandro Mendoza +1 219 200 2000 +1 866 676 4550 alex@alexmendozalaw.com

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROSE A. SAXE +1 212 549 2605 +1 212 549 2650 rsaxe@aclu.org

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Justin B. Cox +1 404 523 2721 +1 404 653 0331 jcox@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Katherine Desormeau +1 415 343 0778 kdesormeau@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lee Gelernt +1 212 549 2616 +1 212 549 2654 lgelernt@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Omar C. Jadwat +1 212 549 2620 +1 212 549 2654 ojadwat@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Omar C. Jadwat +1 212 549 2620 +1 212 549 2654 ojadwat@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Elora Mukherjee +1 212 549 2664 emukherjee@aclu.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Jessica Polansky +1 212 549 2621 +1 212 549 2654 irp_jp@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andre Segura +1 212 549 2660 asegura@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andre Segura +1 212 549 2660 asegura@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Tan +1 212 284 7316 mtan@aclu.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Cecillia Derphine Wang +1 415 343 0775 +1 415 395 0950 cwang@aclu.org

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Lye +1 415 621 2493 +1 415 255 1478 llye@aclunc.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Temple Risher +1 415 621 2493 +1 415 255 8437 michael@risherlaw.com

Represented by American Humanist Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , William James Burgess +1 202 238 9088 +1 202 238 9003 bburgess@americanhumanist.org
, , , , , , , , Monica Lynn Miller +1 202 238 9088 +1 202 238 9003 mmiller@americanhumanist.org

Represented by Anderson Agostino & Keller PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter J. Agostino +1 574 288 1510 +1 574 288 1650 agostino@aaklaw.com
Space Stephanie L Nemeth +1 574 288 1510 +1 574 288 1650 nemeth@aaklaw.com

Represented by Andrew Kenneth Preston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Kenneth Preston

Represented by Angeli Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Angeli +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 david@angelilaw.com
Space Kristen Lynn Tranetzki +1 503 954 2232 kristen@angelilaw.com

Represented by Antonelli Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey J Antonelli +1 312 201 8310 +1 312 201 8310 jeffrey@antonelli-law.com
Space Nicole A Nguyen +1 312 201 8311 +1 312 984 1504 nnguyen@antonelli-law.com
Space Amelia Rose Niemi +1 312 201 8310 +1 888 211 9624 aniemi@antonelli-law.com

Represented by Antonelli Law Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey J Antonelli +1 312 201 8310 +1 312 201 8310 jeffrey@antonelli-law.com

Represented by Aranda & Guttlein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jorge De Jesus Guttlein +1 212 608 7575 +1 212 385 0231 info@jorgeguttlein.com

Represented by ArentFox Schiff LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Krista Marie Ellis +1 212 484 3900 +1 212 484 3990 ellis.krista@arentfox.com

Represented by Arthur Benson & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Arthur A. Benson, II +1 816 531 6565 +1 816 531 6688 abenson@bensonlaw.com
, , Jamie Kathryn Lansford +1 816 531 6565 +1 816 531 6688 jlansford@bensonlaw.com

Represented by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, CA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTO Zulaikha Aziz +1 213 241 0245 +1 213 977 7595
TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/13/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carmina OCampo +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 cocampo@apalc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/09/2013, ATTORNEY T Yungsuhn Park +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 ypark@apalc.org
TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/22/2011, ATTORNEY T Julie Ann Su +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 jsu@apalc.org

Represented by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Washington, DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Marita Cecilia Etcubanez +1 202 255 3365 +1 202 296 2318 metcubanez@advancingjustice-aajc.org

Represented by Asian Americans Advancing Justice Aajc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Erin Emi Oshiro +1 202 296 2300 +1 202 296 2318 eoshiro@advancinjustice-aajc.org

Represented by Asian Law Caucus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Winifred Virginia Kao +1 415 848 7702 +1 415 896 1702 winifredk@asianlawcaucus.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sin Yen Ling +1 415 896 1701 +1 415 896 1702 sinyenl@asianlawcaucus.org

Represented by ASU Alumni Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/21/2014 Kelly Joyce Flood +1 602 251 3620 +1 602 251 8055 kelly.flood@asualumnilawgroup.org

Represented by Atkinson Andelson Loya Rudd & Romo, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/0 Sharon J Ormond +1 562 653 3200 +1 562 653 3333 sormond@aalrr.com

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joshua L. Bailey +1 479 444 6311 +1 479 444 6455 josh@hoguelawfirm.com
, Jonathan H Cox +1 713 752 2300 jhc@coxpradialaw.com
, Douglas E Dilley +1 210 225 0111 +1 210 228 0493 stacies@dilleylawfirm.com
, Ricardo Antonio Garcia +1 956 630 2882 +1 956 630 5393 ric@gomlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , Ralph C. Ohm +1 501 624 7555 +1 501 624 7575 aperma@hotspringslaw.net

Represented by Attorney General's Office - Elm St (Htfd)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, W. Joseph Nielsen +1 860 808 5396 +1 860 808 5033 Joseph.Nielsen@ct.gov

Represented by Ayoub & Mansour, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , John Ayoub +1 404 892 2599 +1 404 806 7414 ayoub@ayoubmansour.com

Represented by BABICH GOLDMAN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harris Goldman +1 515 244 4300 +2442 244 244 2650 dgoldman@babichgoldman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip F. Van Liew +1 515 244 4300 +1 515 309 6823 phillip@vanliewlaw.com

Represented by Baddley & Mauro, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Thomas Edmund Baddley, Jr. +1 205 939 0090 +1 205 939 0064 tbaddley@baddleymauro.com
, Jeffrey P Mauro +1 205 939 0090 +Pleas eus eavalid jpmauro@baddleymauro.com
, John Parker Yates jpy@baddleymauro.com

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Glen A Smith +1 213 975 1600
, Gregory L Vinson +1 213 975 1600

Represented by Balber, Pickard, Battistoni, Maldonado, & Van Der Tuin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas Patrick Battistoni +1 212 246 2400 +1 212 765 4212 tbattistoni@schiffhardin.com

Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP-Atl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Christopher Scott Anulewicz +1 404 261 6020 canulewicz@balch.com

Represented by Baltimore City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Daniel C Beck +1 410 396 3297 +1 410 396 2126 Daniel.Beck@BaltimorePolice.org

Represented by Bantle & Levy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee Frederick Bantle +1 212 228 9666 +1 212 228 7654 bantle@civilrightsfirm.com

Represented by Barclay Damon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeremy J. Hourihan +1 607 398 3707 +1 607 398 3638 jhourihan@barclaydamon.com

Represented by Barris, Sott, Denn & Driker, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Morley Witus +1 313 965 9725 mwitus@bsdd.com

Represented by Barth, Sullivan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David H. Walsh, IV +1 315 234 1864 +1 315 410 1262 dwalsh@barthbehr.com

Represented by Bartlett, McDonough, Bastone & Monaghan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott Andrew Singer +1 516 877 2900 +1 516 877 0732 scott.singer@bmbmlaw.com

Represented by Bassford Remele, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Andrew L Marshall +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 andym@bassford.com
, , , , , David A Turner +1 612 333 3000 +1 612 333 8829 dturner@bassford.com

Represented by Bennett & Zydron PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Carlton F. Bennett +1 757 486 5454 cbennett@bandzlaw.com

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eleanor Michelle Drake +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 emdrake@bm.net
Space Joseph C. Hashmall +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 jhashmall@bm.net
, , Shauna B. Itri +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4671 sitri@bm.net
, , DANIEL R. MILLER +1 215 875 5702 +1 215 875 4604 dmiller@bm.net

Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jason Mathew Leviton +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 jason@blockesq.com

Represented by Betts Patterson Mines, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Leta E. Gorman +1 503 961 6338 +1 503 961 6339 lgorman@bpmlaw.com

Represented by Beys, Stein & Mobargha LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nader Mobargha +1 646 755 3603 +1 646 755 3599 nmobargha@blmpllp.com

Represented by Bilfield & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Murray D. Bilfield +1 216 696 5297 +1 216 573 9725 mbilfield@bilfieldandassociates.com

Represented by Block & Leviton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey Craig Block +1 617 398 5600 +1 617 507 6020 jeff@blockleviton.com
, Lesley Elizabeth Weaver +1 415 968 8999 +1 617 507 6020 lweaver@blockesq.com

Represented by Bodoff & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Richard A. Goren +1 617 742 7300 +1 617 742 9969 rgoren@bodofflaw.com

Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jason James Carter +1 404 881 4100 +1 404 881 4111 carter@bmelaw.com
, Christopher Todd Giovinazzo +1 404 881 4100 giovinazzo@bmelaw.com
, , Steven J. Rosenwasser +1 404 881 4167 +1 404 881 4111 rosenwasser@bmelaw.com
, , Randi Engel Schnell +1 404 881 4100 schnell@bmelaw.com
, , Michael B. Terry +1 404 881 4100 terry@bmelaw.com

Represented by Booth Sweet LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Daniel G. Booth +1 646 573 6596 +1 617 250 8883 dan@danboothlaw.com

Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , James Wallace Porter, III +1 202 393 7150 +1 202 719 8332 jporter@babc.com
, , , , , , , , John Parker Sweeney +1 202 719 8216 +1 202 719 8316 jsweeney@babc.com
, , , , , , , , , Tara Sky Woodward +1 202 719 8214 +1 202 719 8314 swoodward@babc.com

Represented by Brady Mertz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Brady H. Mertz +1 503 385 0121 +1 503 375 2218 brady@bradymertz.com

Represented by Brais & Associates PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Keith Steven Brais +1 305 416 2901 +1 305 416 2902 Kbrais@braislaw.com
, , Julieth A Fresco +1 305 416 2901 jfresco@braislaw.com
, , Richard Dennis Rusak +1 305 416 2901 +1 305 416 2902 RRusak@Braislaw.com

Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David E Breskin +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 dbreskin@bjtlegal.com

Represented by Bronster Hoshibata

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Margery S Bronster +1 808 524 5644 +1 808 599 1881 mbronster@bhhawaii.net

Represented by Brophy & Lenahan P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joseph A Brophy +1 215 558 7600 alex.brophy@brophylenahan.com

Represented by Brown & Hutchinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael Cobbs +1 585 454 5050 +1 585 454 5066 mcobbs@brownhutchinson.com
, Joseph A. Gawlowicz +1 585 454 5050 +1 585 454 5066 jgawlowicz@brownhutchinson.com

Represented by Bryce Downey & Lenkov, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Edward Kehl +1 312 377 1501 jkehl@brycedowney.com

Represented by Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Courtney Angeli +1 503 974 5021 +1 971 230 0337 courtney@baaslaw.com

Represented by Buckner+Miles

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Elliott von Borke +1 786 523 0480 +1 786 523 0485 vonborke@bucknermiles.com

Represented by Burns & Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Taher Kameli +1 312 427 4529 kameli@aol.com

Represented by Burr & Forman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2016 Baya Whitman Harrison, IV +1 407 540 6661 bharrison@burr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/26/2016 Howard Scott Marks +1 407 647 4455 +1 407 540 6601 Howard.Marks@burr.com

Represented by Butler Mordock, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Craig James Mordock +1 504 304 2335 +1 504 342 2154 cjmordock@butlermordock.com

Represented by C. Ronald Ellington, Attorney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , C. Ronald Ellington +1 706 543 4684 cre@uga.edu

Represented by Campbell & Campbell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael R Campbell +1 423 266 1108 mikecampbell@campbellattorneys.com

Represented by Cancio, Nadal, Rivera & Diaz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Maraliz Vazquez-Marrero +1 787 767 9625 +1 787 622 2238 mvazquez@cnrd.com

Represented by Capital One Bank (USA) NA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Stuart Hubbard +1 804 855 6529 +1 804 284 1182 jon.hubbard@capitalone.com

Represented by Carpenter Lipps & Leland LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Cyrluk +1 312 777 4300 cyrluk@carpenterlipps.com
Space Josh Goldberg +1 312 777 4825 +1 312 777 4839 goldberg@carpenterlipps.com

Represented by Castelli & Knox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Kerry Knox +1 615 896 1000 +1 615 896 1027 kek@castelliknox.com

Represented by Catholic Charities

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joe W McDoulett +1 405 523 3001

Represented by Center for Individual Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael E. Rosman , +1 202 833 8400 +1 202 833 8410 rosman@cir-usa.org
, , Michelle Ann Scott +20208 338 400 X114 scott@cir-usa.org

Represented by Center for Justice & Accountability

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Daniel McLaughlin dmclaughlin@cja.org
, , , , , L Kathleen Roberts +1 415 544 0444 +1 415 544 0456 kroberts@cja.org

Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JENNY R. KRAMER +1 212 408 1054 jkramer@chadbourne.com

Represented by Charles M. Cobbe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Cobbe +1 214 573 7300 +1 214 573 7399

Represented by Chicago Housing Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Ryan James Harrington +1 312 913 7094 RHarrington@thecha.org

Represented by Choate Hall & Stewart, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Matthew Barrett +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 5000 mbarrett@choate.com
Space Jacqueline K. Mantica +1 617 248 4729 jmantica@choate.com

Represented by Cinnamon Mueller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heidi I. Schmid +1 312 372 3930 hschmid@cm-chi.com

Represented by City of Bridgeport, Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard G. Kascak, Jr. +1 203 452 9077 +1 203 452 9087 richard.kascak@bridgeportct.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , John Richard Mitola +1 203 576 7647 +1 203 576 8252 john.mitola@bridgeportct.gov

Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mardell Nereim +1 312 744 9010 mnereim@cityofchicago.org

Represented by City Of Detroit Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , David J. Demps +1 313 224 4550 +1 313 224 5505 dempd@detroitmi.gov

Represented by Clackamas County Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Scott C. Ciecko +1 503 655 8362 +1 503 742 5397 sciecko@co.clackamas.or.us
, , , Stephen Lewis Madkour +1 503 655 8362 +1 503 742 5397 smadkour@co.clackamas.or.us

Represented by clackamas.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Alexander Gordon +1 503 742 5392 +1 503 742 5397 agordon@clackamas.us

Represented by Cockey Brennan and Maloney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Thomas Joseph Maloney +1 410 546 1750 tjmaloney@cbmlawfirm.com

Represented by Cockey Brennan and Maloney PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Robin R Cockey +1 410 546 1750 +1 410 546 1811 rrcesq@cbmlawfirm.com
, , , , , , , Laura Evelyn Hay +1 410 546 1750 +1 410 546 1811 hay@cbmlawfirm.com

Represented by Cohen & Slamowitz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Leandre' M. John +1 516 364 6006 +1 516 364 2715 leandrejohn@cslawllp.com

Represented by Cohn & Dussi LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tracy A. Kish +1 781 494 0200 +1 781 494 0208

Represented by Cole Associates Civil Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn K. Cole +1 603 227 9196 ccole@coleandersonlaw.com

Represented by Conrad O'Brien

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ANDREW S. GALLINARO +1 215 864 8083 +1 215 864 7403 agallinaro@conradobrien.com
, , Patricia Mary Hamill +1 215 864 8071 +1 215 864 0793 phamill@conradobrien.com

Represented by CONRAD O'BRIEN GELLMAN & ROHN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Patricia Mary Hamill +1 215 864 8071 +1 215 864 0793 phamill@conradobrien.com

Represented by Conrad O'Brien, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , JEANNETTE M. BRIAN +1 215 864 8078 jbrian@cogr.com
, , Lorie Dakessian +1 215 864 9600 ldakessian@conradobrien.com
, Lorie Dakessian +1 215 864 9600 ldakessian@conradobrien.com

Represented by Consumer Watchdog

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Antonini +1 310 392 0522 +1 310 392 8874 laura@consumerwatchdog.org
Space Gerald Sinclair Flanagan +1 310 392 0522 +1 310 392 8874 Jerry@consumerwatchdog.org
, Gerald Sinclair Flanagan +1 310 392 0522 +1 310 392 8874 Jerry@consumerwatchdog.org
, , , , , , , , , , , Pamela Pressley +1 310 392 0522 pam@consumerwatchdog.org
, , , , , , , , , , , Harvey Rosenfield +1 310 392 0522 +1 310 392 8874 harvey@consumerwatchdog.org

Represented by Conwway, Farrell, Curtin & Kelly, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Robert Scott Delmond +1 212 785 2929 rdelmond@conwayfarrell.com

Represented by Cook County State's Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , James Stephen Murphy-Aguilu +1 312 603 5669 james.murphy-aguilu@cookcountyil.gov
, , , Anthony E. Zecchin +1 312 603 3373 azecchin@cookcountygov.com

Represented by Cook County State's Attorneys Office (50 W)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Thomas Edward Nowinski +1 312 603 6672 Thomas.Nowinski@cookcountyil.gov

Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Robert B Lovett +1 617 937 2300 +1 617 937 2400 rlovett@cooley.com

Represented by Coontz Cochran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, J Gregory Coontz +1 817 295 1195 +1 817 295 9444 gcoontz@coontzcochran.com

Represented by Cooper White & Cooper LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott M McLeod +1 415 433 1900 +1 415 433 5530 smcleod@cwclaw.com
, Christopher James Mead +1 415 433 1900 cmead@cwclaw.com

Represented by Corporation Counsel's Office-Htfd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan H. Beamon +1 860 757 9700 +1 860 722 8114 beamj001@hartford.gov

Represented by Cors & Bassett, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jack B. Harrison +1 513 852 8200 +1 513 852 8222 jbh@corsbassett.com

Represented by Courtney A Bowie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Courtney Alyssa Bowie +1 212 549 2682 cbowie@aclu.org

Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Mari Kristine Bonthuis +1 212 841 1054 +1 646 441 9054 mbonthuis@cov.com
, , Thomas L. Cubbage, III +1 202 662 5464 +1 202 778 5464 tcubbage@cov.com
, , Jeffrey H. Lerner +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 662 6291 jlerner@cov.com

Represented by Cowdery, Ecker & Murphy, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Steven David Ecker +1 860 278 5555 +1 860 249 0012 ecker@cemlaw.com

Represented by Cowen Mask Blanchard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Alberto Luis Guerrero +1 956 541 4981 +1 956 504 3674 beto@cmbtrial.com
, Jody Ray Mask +1 956 541 4981 +1 956 504 3674 jody@cmbtrial.com

Represented by Cox Padmore Skolnik & Shakarchy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Sanford Jay Hausler +1 212 953 6633 +1 212 949 6943 hausler@cpsslaw.com

Represented by Coyne, von Kuhn, Brady & Fries

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kevin S. Coyne +1 203 378 7100 +1 203 378 7711 kscoyne@coynevkbf.com

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samira Shah +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 474 3700 sshah@cravath.com

Represented by Criden & Love, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jason G Andrew +1 305 357 9000 +1 305 357 9050 jandrew@cridenlove.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Elliot Criden +1 305 357 9000 +1 305 357 9050 mcriden@cridenlove.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Elliot Criden +1 305 357 9000 +1 305 357 9050 mcriden@cridenlove.com

Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Emily T Kuwahara +1 213 443 5556 +1 213 622 2690 ekuwahara@crowell.com

Represented by Cullen and Dykman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Cynthia Ann Augello +1 516 357 3753 +1 516 296 9155 caugello@cullenanddykman.com

Represented by Cullen Weston Pines & Bach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara Beth Packard +1 608 251 0101 +1 608 251 2883 tpackard@pinesbach.com
Space Lester A. Pines +1 608 251 0101 +1 608 251 2883 Pines@cwpb.com

Represented by Cynthia Conlin, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Cynthia Ariel Conlin +1 407 965 5519 +1 407 545 4397 cynthiaconlin@cynthiaconlin.com

Represented by D'Angelo & Hashem LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen L. D'Angelo +1 978 687 8100 +1 978 687 8111 steve.dangelo@lawyeradvocates.com

Represented by David Aylor Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Fletcher Aylor +1 843 577 5530 david@davidaylor.com

Represented by David Dong Ann Lin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Dong Ann Lin

Represented by David G. Hill & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mark T. Altermatt +1 860 657 1016 +1 860 657 9264 maltermatt@hill-lawassociates.com
, , , , , , , David G. Hill +1 860 657 1013 +1 860 657 9264 dhill@dhill-law.com

Represented by Davidson Law Firm, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Darwin +1 501 374 9977 +1 501 374 5917 skipd@dlf-ar.com
Space David Louis Gershner +1 501 374 9977 davidg@dlf-ar.com

Represented by Davies Pearson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joseph Michael Diaz +1 253 620 1500 +1 253 572 3052 jdiaz@dpearson.com

Represented by Davis Cowell & Bowe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/14/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/14/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/14/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/14/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/14/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Yuval M Miller +1 415 597 7200 +1 415 597 7201 ymiller@dcbsf.com

Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Robert Corn-Revere +1 202 973 4200 +1 202 973 4499 bobcornrevere@dwt.com
, , , Janet Lynn Grumer +1 213 633 6800 +1 213 533 6899 janetgrumer@dwt.com
, , , , , , , Ronald G. London +1 202 973 4235 +1 202 508 6699 ronnielondon@dwt.com
, , , Matthew D Peterson +1 213 633 6800 +1 213 633 6899 matthewpeterson@dwt.com

Represented by DeAntonio Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephen F DeAntonio +1 843 577 8080 +1 843 577 4188 sdeantonio@deanlawfirm.com

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jyotin Hamid +1 212 909 6000 jhamid@debevoise.com
, , , , , Joseph William Weissman +1 212 909 6999 jweissman@debevoise.com
, , , , , Derek Wikstrom +1 212 637 1085 +1 212 521 7093 derek.wikstrom@usdoj.gov

Represented by Deborah Gordon Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin I. Shipper +1 248 258 2500 +1 248 258 7881 bshipper@deborahgordonlaw.com
Space Irina Vaynerman +1 248 258 2500 ivaynerman@deborahgordonlaw.com

Represented by Deborah L. Gordon Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah L. Gordon +1 248 258 2500 dgordon@deborahgordonlaw.com

Represented by Deputy Corp Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Rodger W. Lehr, Jr. +1 203 946 7964 +1 203 946 7942 tude@newhavenct.net

Represented by Detroit City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Dennis Burnett - INACTIVE +1 313 224 4550 +1 313 224 5505
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Michael M. Muller +1 313 237 5052 +1 313 237 5505 MullM@detroitmi.gov

Represented by Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Jerry Glas +1 504 581 5141 jglas@dkslaw.com

Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard J. Cairns +1 212 424 8000 +1 212 649 9347 rcairns@dl.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Donna Lynn Gordon +1 212 424 8191 +1 212 649 0919 dlgordon@dl.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca Marie Reilly +1 212 259 6333 rreilly@dl.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Colin Gregory Stewart +1 212 424 8434 +1 212 649 1184 cstewart@post.harvard.edu
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kelly Hsiao-I Tsai +1 212 259 8000 +1 212 649 0938 ktsai@crowell.com

Represented by Dickinson Wright PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas G. McNeill +1 313 223 3500 TMcNeill@dickinsonwright.com

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Matthew J. Iverson +1 617 406 6038 +1 617 406 6138 matthew.iverson@dlapiper.com
, , , , , Elisha Anne King +1 202 861 3417 +1 202 689 7431 elisha.king@dlapiper.com
, , , , , Charles B. Wayne +1 202 799 4253 +1 202 799 5253 charles.wayne@dlapiper.com

Represented by do Campo & Thornton, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Orlando do Campo +1 305 358 6600 +1 305 358 6601 od@dandtlaw.com
, John Thornton +1 305 358 6600 +1 305 358 6601 jt@dandtlaw.com

Represented by Donovan Rose Nester PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Sean K. Cronin +1 618 212 6500 +1 618 212 6501 scronin@drnpc.com

Represented by DOUGLAS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - CIVIL DIVISION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Sandra K. Connolly +1 402 444 3992 +1 402 444 6817 sandra.connolly@douglascounty-ne.gov
, , Kristin L. Huber +1 402 444 7311 +1 402 444 6817 kristin.huber@douglascounty-ne.gov

Represented by DOUGLAS LEONARD & GARVEY PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Charles G. Douglas, III +1 603 224 1988 mail@nhlawoffice.com

Represented by Douglas M Mansfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Douglas M Mansfield

Represented by DOWNEY & MUNDY LAW OFFICES, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Glen Stephen Downey +1 515 288 1552 +1 515 259 7599 glen@downeymundy.com

Represented by Downton Clark, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Wesley B. Clark +1 615 984 4681 +1 615 514 9674 wesley@downtonclark.com
, , , Mark J. Downton +1 615 984 4681 mark@downtonclark.com

Represented by Draneas & Huglin, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Brooks F. Cooper +1 503 496 5511 +1 503 496 5510 brooks@draneaslaw.com

Represented by Driggers, Schultz & Herbst, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark Kelley Schwartz +1 248 649 6000 +1 248 649 6442 MSchwartz@DriggersSchultz.com

Represented by Driscoll & Omens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Donald Peter Driscoll +1 510 527 4500 +1 510 250 0770 dond@driscoll-law.com

Represented by Dunn, Janice V

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Kathryn Goater +1 206 622 8000

Represented by DuPage County States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William R Roberts +1 630 407 8200 william.roberts@dupageco.org
, Lisa Ann Smith +1 630 407 8200 lisa.smith@dupageco.org

Represented by Durbin Larimore & Bialick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Timothy L Martin +1 405 235 9584 +1 405 235 0551 tmartin@dlb.net

Represented by Earth Rights International

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marco Simons +1 202 466 5188 +1 202 466 5189 marco@earthrights.org

Represented by Eckberg, Lammers, Briggs, Wolff & Vierling, P.L.L.P

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Amanda E Prutzman +1 651 351 2116 +1 651 439 2923 aprutzman@eckberglammers.com

Represented by Edmondson IP Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joseph Curtis Edmondson +1 503 701 9719 +1 503 214 8470 jcedmondson@edmolaw.com
Space Kirenjeet Rockenstein +1 503 336 3749 kirenr@edmolaw.com

Represented by Edwards Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeff Edwards +1 512 623 7727 +1 512 623 7729 jeff@edwards-law.com
, Sean P. Flammer +1 512 623 7727 +1 512 623 7729 sean@edwards-law.com
, Scott Medlock +1 512 623 7727 +1 512 623 7729 scott@edwards-law.com

Represented by Ehrhard & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, James P. Ehrhard +1 508 791 8411 +1 508 752 6168 ehrhard@ehrhardlaw.com

Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Daniel Cardozo +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 nate@eff.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cindy Ann Cohn +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 cindy@eff.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Tien +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 tien@eff.org

Represented by Emmet, Marvin & Martin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karlene J. Rogers +1 203 425 1400

Represented by Erikson Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Erikson +1 323 465 3100 +1 323 465 3177 david@daviderikson.com

Represented by Erin Kathryn Russell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Erin Kathryn Russell

Represented by Eugene Kroner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Eugene Kroner

Represented by Eymann Allison Hunter Jones PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Richard C Eymann +1 509 747 0101 eymann@eahjlaw.com

Represented by Falkenberg Fieweger & Ives LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Peter Fieweger +1 312 566 4802 jpf@ffilaw.com

Represented by Farrar Wright, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Amy J. Farrar +1 615 800 4747 +1 615 900 3473 amy@farrarwright.com
, , Sonya S. Wright +1 615 800 4747 +1 615 900 3473 sonya@farrarwright.com

Represented by Farrell, Hamilton & Julian, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Tammy Julian +1 618 466 9080 tammy.julian@farrellhamiltonjulian.com

Represented by Fausone Bohn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Donald L. Knapp, Jr. +1 248 380 0000 +1 248 380 3434 dknapp@fb-firm.com

Represented by Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tracey E. Gaffey +1 631 712 6500 +1 631 712 6505 tracey_gaffey@fd.org
, Michelle A. Gelernt +1 718 330 1204 +1 718 855 0760 michelle_gelernt@fd.org
, Lisa Hoyes +1 718 330 1253 +1 718 855 0760 lisa_hoyes@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Padden +1 718 330 1240 +1 718 855 0760 michael_padden@fd.org
, , , , Stylianus Sinnis +1 617 223 8061 +1 617 223 8080 stellio_sinnis@fd.org

Represented by Feldman Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Edward Feldman +1 212 532 8585 +1 212 532 8598 sfeldman@feldman-law.com

Represented by Feldman Law Group, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Nupur Shah +1 212 532 8585 +1 212 532 8598 nupur@nupurshahlaw.com

Represented by Fiddler Law Office, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mark D Fiddler +1 612 822 4095 +1 612 822 4096 mark@fiddler-law.com

Represented by Fleischer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert M. Fleischer +1 203 283 3369 +1 212 326 0806 robf@ctnylaw.com

Represented by Foley Bezek Behle & Curtis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert Allen Curtis +1 805 962 9495 +1 805 962 0722 rcurtis@foleybezek.com

Represented by Foster Rieder & Jackson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Travis G Jackson +1 505 767 0577 +1 505 242 9944 travis@frjlaw.com

Represented by Fowler White Burnett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael A. Garcia +1 305 789 9200 +1 305 789 9201 mgarcia@fowler-white.com

Represented by Francis & Mailman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Francis +1 215 735 8600 +1 215 940 8000 jfrancis@consumerlawfirm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Searles +1 215 735 8600 +1 215 940 8000 dsearles@consumerlawfirm.com

Represented by Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Cameron Ann Myler +1 212 826 5545 +1 212 593 9175 cmyler@fkks.com
, , , , , , , Edward Henry Rosenthal +1 212 980 0120 +1 212 593 9175 erosenthal@fkks.com
, , , , , , , Maura J Wogan +1 212 980 0120 +1 212 593 9175 mwogan@fkks.com

Represented by Frost Brown Todd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Shannah Jean Morris +1 513 651 6167 smorris@fbtlaw.com

Represented by Fryer & Ross

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Gerald Elliott Ross +1 212 286 0099 +1 212 286 0495 geraldross@fryerross.com

Represented by Fulton County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Ashley Jenell Moore Palmer +1 404 612 0245 +1 404 730 6324 Ashley.Palmer@fultoncountyga.gov

Represented by fzmlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Frank Zorrilla-Maldonado +1 787 250 1510 +1 787 754 4951 fzorrilla@fzmlaw.com

Represented by G BRIAN SPEARS PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , G Brian Spears +1 404 872 7086 +1 404 892 1128 bspears@mindspring.com

Represented by Gage, Spencer & Fleming, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Joseph B. Evans +1 212 768 4900 jevans@gagespencer.com
, , G. Robert Gage, Jr. +1 212 768 4900 +1 212 769 3629 grgage@gagespencer.com

Represented by Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , David Clay Clarke +1 337 735 1760 +1 337 993 0933 dclarke@gjtbs.com

Represented by Garcia Ochoa & Mask LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lino Humberto Ochoa +1 956 630 2882 +1 956 630 5393 lino@gomlaw.com

Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Represented by Generally Admitted

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , William E. Coonan +1 618 628 3700 +1 618 628 3720 Liam.Coonan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , James M. Cutchin +1 618 439 3808 +1 618 439 2401 Jim.Cutchin@usdoj.gov
, , Zachary R. Pancoast +1 314 421 5364 +1 314 421 5640 zpancoast@moser.com

Represented by Gentry Locke Rakes & Moore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , JUSTIN MICHAEL LUGAR +1 540 983 9300 jlugar@gentrylocke.com
, William David Paxton +1 540 983 9334 +1 540 983 9400 paxton@gentrylocke.com
, , Bradley Clark Tobias +1 540 983 9396 +1 540 983 9400 tobias@gentrylocke.com

Represented by George Washington University Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Arturo Carrillo +1 202 994 7659 +1 202 994 4693 acarrillo@law.gwu.edu

Represented by Geragos & Geragos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Mark John Geragos +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 mark@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellin Gurvitch +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 232 3255 ellin@geragos.com

Represented by Geragos & Geragos, Apc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark John Geragos +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 mark@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Y Hahn +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 232 3255 eric@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Jared Meiselas +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 meiselas@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zack Vincent Muljat +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 232 3255 muljat@geragos.com

Represented by Glenn L. Cavanagh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Glenn L. Cavanagh

Represented by Goldberg & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Julie Ann Goldberg +1 718 432 1022 +1 718 432 1044 uscis@goldbergimmigration.com

Represented by GOLDBERG & ASSOCIATES PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Julie Ann Goldberg +1 718 432 1022 +1 718 432 1044 uscis@goldbergimmigration.com

Represented by Good Schneider Cormier & Fried

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael R. Schneider +1 617 523 5933 +1 617 227 7766 ms@gscfboston.com

Represented by Gordon Law Offices, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard R Gordon +1 312 332 5200 richard.gordon@gordonlawchicago.com

Represented by Gourley, Rehkemper & Lindholm, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Matthew T Lindholm +1 515 226 0500 +1 515 244 2914 mtlindholm@grllaw.com
, , Robert G. Rehkemper +1 515 226 0500 rgrehkemper@grllaw.com

Represented by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Alejandro Febres-Jorge +1 787 729 6438 +1 787 728 6646 alejandro.febres@bgfpr.com

Represented by Gray Matters

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Megan E Gray +1 202 265 2738 +1 202 280 1225 mg@megangray.com

Represented by Green & Noblin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lesley Elizabeth Weaver +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 gnecf@classcounsel.com

Represented by Griffin Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Clarence Davis +1 803 744 0800 +1 803 744 0800 cdavis@griffindavislaw.com

Represented by Grodner and Associates, APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Donna Unkel Grodner +1 225 769 1919 dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com

Represented by Grossman Roth, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Brett Elliott von Borke +1 305 442 8666 +1 305 285 1668 bvb@grossmanroth.com

Represented by Hagan & Farrar, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Joshua A. Jenkins +1 615 800 4747 +1 615 900 3473 josh@haganlg.com

Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steve W. Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hbsslaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , Thomas Matthew Sobol +1 617 482 3700 +1 617 482 3003 tom@hagens-berman.com

Represented by HammondLaw, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Ari Nathan Cherniak +1 443 739 5758 +1 310 295 2385 acherniak@hammondlawpc.com
, , , Julian Ari Hammond +1 310 601 6766 +1 310 295 2835 JHammond@hammondlawpc.com

Represented by Hancock & Estabrook, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Alan J. Pierce +1 315 471 3151 +1 315 471 3167 apierce@hancocklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , Mark J. Schulte +1 315 471 3151 +1 315 471 3167 mschulte@hancocklaw.com

Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Eric Rosenberg +1 740 644 1027 +1 866 498 0811 eric.rblaw@gmail.com

Represented by HARVEY & BINNALL, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jesse R. Binnall +1 703 888 1943 +1 703 888 1930 jbinnall@harveybinnall.com
, Louise Tavey Gitcheva +1 703 888 1943 +1 703 888 1930 lgitcheva@harveybinnall.com

Represented by Hemmer DeFrank PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard A. Brueggemann +1 859 344 1188 +1 859 578 3869 rbrueggemann@hemmerlaw.com

Represented by Hemmer Defrank Wessels Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Scott R Thomas +1 859 578 3862 +1 859 578 3869 sthomas@hemmerlaw.com

Represented by Henginger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, James F. McDonough +1 404 996 0861 +1 205 547 5502 jmcdonough@hgdlawfirm.com

Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Taylor Christopher Bartlett +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 380 8085 tbartlett@hgdlawfirm.com
Space W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 326 3332 wlgarrison@hgdlawfirm.com
, , , WILLIAM LEWIS GARRISON, JR. +1 205 326 3336 lewis@hgdlawfirm.com
, , , Christopher Boyce Hood +1 205 326 3336 +1 205 327 3332 chood@hgdlawfirm.com

Represented by Hickman & Lowder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , John Richard Harrison +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 jharrison@schraffking.com

Represented by HICKMAN & LOWDER, L.PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Linda M. Italiano Gorczynski +1 216 861 0360 +1 216 861 3113 lgorczynski@hickman-lowder.com

Represented by HILLYARD ANDERSON & OLSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Mack Herm Olsen +1 435 752 2610

Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Z LaForge +1 775 327 3000 +1 775 786 6179 fzlaforge@hollandhart.com

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes +1 305 789 7482 +1 305 789 7799 eleni.kastrenakes@hklaw.com
, , , Kevin Christopher Paule +1 305 789 7592 +1 305 789 7799 kevin.paule@hklaw.com
, LEE P TEICHNER +1 305 349 2279 +1 305 789 7799 lee.teichner@hklaw.com

Represented by Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Andrew B Breidenbach +1 646 837 8401 abreidenbach@hsgllp.com
, Lauren Nicole Giudice +1 646 837 8381 lgiudice@hsgllp.com
, Vincent Gregory Levy +1 646 837 5120 +1 646 837 5150 vlevy@hsgllp.com
, Matthew Noller +1 646 837 8381 mnoller@hsgllp.com
Space Sarah Michelle Sternlieb +1 646 837 8381 ssternlieb@hsgllp.com
, Andrei Vrabie +1 646 837 8381 avrabie@hsgllp.com

Represented by Horton, Shields & Knox, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Karen L. Dowd +1 860 522 8338 +1 860 728 0401 kdowd@hortonshieldsknox.com
, , , , , , , , Brendon P. Levesque +1 860 522 8338 +1 860 728 0401 blevesque@hortonshieldsknox.com

Represented by Humphries, Odum & Eubanks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Banks Odum +1 870 247 7035 +1 870 247 7459 michelle@humphrieslaw.net

Represented by HYLTON AND ADAMSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sasha A. Watson +1 407 802 3223 +1 407 377 1971 swatson@hawmlaw.com

Represented by Illinois Department Of Transportation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael A. Forti +1 312 793 2255 Michael.Forti@Illinois.gov

Represented by Immigrants' Rights Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/25/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Christine P. Sun - PHV +1 212 549 2661 +1 212 549 2650 csun@aclu.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Cecillia Derphine Wang +1 415 343 0775 +1 415 395 0950 cwang@aclu.org

Represented by Internet Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jon Linden Praed +1 703 243 8100 jon.praed@i-lawgroup.com

Represented by Iverson Reuvers, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephanie A Angolkar +1 952 548 7200 +1 952 548 7210 stephanie@irc-law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jason M Hiveley +1 952 548 7209 +1 952 548 7210 jasonh@irc-law.com

Represented by Ivey Law Firm.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , John Kemmerer Ivey +1 512 695 1334 jkivey@jkivey.com

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith David Hudolin +1 410 415 2012 +1 202 663 8007 keith.hudolin@jacksonlewis.com
, Paul V. Kelly +1 617 338 9300 +1 617 338 9911 paul.kelly@jacksonlewis.com

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, John K Edwards +1 713 752 4319 +1 713 752 4221 jedwards@jw.com
Space Cedric Donnell Scott +1 713 752 4227 +1 713 308 4158 cscott@jw.com

Represented by James J. Roche & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , LeeAnn Marie Crow +1 312 335 0044 lcrow@jjroche.net
, , , , , James J. Roche +1 312 335 0044 jroche@jjroche.net

Represented by Janet Hoffman & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer E. Roberts +1 503 222 1125 +1 503 222 7587 jennifer@jhoffman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Stamm +1 503 222 1125 +1 503 222 7589 doug@jhoffman.com

Represented by Janet Hoffman & Associates LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janet Lee Hoffman +1 503 222 1125 +1 503 222 7529 janet@jhoffman.com

Represented by Janice M Bellucci

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Janice M Bellucci

Represented by Jardine Logan & O'Brien PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joseph E Flynn +1 651 290 6500 +1 651 223 5070 jflynn@jlolaw.com

Represented by Jarvis, McArthur & Williams, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks G. McArthur, Esq. +1 802 658 9411 +1 802 658 3551 bmcarthur@jarvismcarthur.com
Space David J. Williams, Esq. +1 802 658 9411 +1 802 658 3551 dwilliams@jarvismcarthur.com

Represented by Jeff Anderson and Associates PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey R Anderson +1 651 227 9990 +1 651 297 6543 jeff@andersonadvocates.com
Space Michael G. Finnegan +1 651 227 9990 +1 651 297 6543 mike@andersonadvocates.com
, Patrick W Noaker +1 612 839 1080 +1 651 297 6543 patrick@noakerlaw.com

Represented by Jennifer Opheim Whitener

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Opheim Whitener

Represented by Jerry Rios

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Rios

Represented by Jessica K Philemond

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jessica K Philemond

Represented by Jill S. Schwartz & Associates, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jill Steinberg Schwartz +1 407 628 4994 jschwartz@schwartzlawfirm.net

Represented by John C Lowe PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , John C. Lowe +1 301 321 3300 +1 301 320 8878 johnlowe@johnlowepc.com

Represented by John Doe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doe

Represented by Johnson Johnson Larson & Schaller PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Derek C. Johnson +1 541 484 2434 +1 541 484 0882 djohnson@justicelawyers.com

Represented by Johnson Johnson Lucas & Middleton, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Arthur C. Johnson +1 541 484 2434 +1 541 484 0882 ajohnson@justicelawyers.com

Represented by Jonathan Evan Kroner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jonathan Evan Kroner +1 305 310 6046 +1 305 455 9570 jk@floridafalseclaim.com

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James A. A. Kirk +1 212 326 8374 +1 212 755 7306 jkirk@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shay Dvoretzky +1 202 879 3939 +2 026 326 1700 sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arthur J. Margulies +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 ajmargulies@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Evan Miller +1 202 879 3840 +1 202 626 1700 emiller@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kevin R. Noble +1 202 879 3882 +1 202 626 1700 krnoble@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sara Pikofsky +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 spikofsky@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Steven J. Sacher +1 202 879 5402 +1 202 626 1700 sjsacher@jonesday.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert T. Smith +1 212 326 3939 +1 212 755 7306 rtsmith@jonesday.com

Represented by Jordan Ramis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Diane R. Lenkowsky +1 503 598 5579 diane.lenkowsky@jordanramis.com

Represented by JT Legal Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scumbags Co, Llc ryan@daviderikson.com

Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Paul J. Orfanedes +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 porfanedes@judicialwatch.org
, James F. Peterson +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 jpeterson@judicialwatch.org

Represented by Kain & Associates, Attorneys at Law, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Kain, Jr. +1 954 768 9002 +1 954 768 0158 rkain@complexip.com
Space Darren Joel Spielman +1 954 768 9002 +1 954 768 0158 dspielman@complexip.com

Represented by Kaiser LeGrand & Dillon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Allison Marie Lansell +1 202 640 2850 +1 202 280 1034 alansell@kaiserlegrand.com

Represented by Kaplan, Massamillo & Andrews, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Anthony William Eckert, III +1 212 922 0450 +1 212 922 0530 aeckert@kmalawfirm.com

Represented by Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Patrick D Allen +1 860 233 5600 PAllen@kt-lawfirm.com
, , , , , , , Kateryna Lagun +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 klagun@kt-lawfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , James Newhall Tallberg +1 860 233 5600 +1 860 233 5800 jtallberg@kt-lawfirm.com

Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Urvashi Sen +1 212 922 9499 +1 212 922 1799 urvashisen@gmail.com

Represented by Kazerouni Law Group, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Seyed Abbas Kazerounian +1 800 400 6808 +1 800 520 5523 ak@kazlg.com

Represented by Keith A Ward PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Keith Allen Ward +1 918 764 9011 +1 918 764 9384 keith@keithwardlaw.com

Represented by Keith Michael Corbett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Keith Michael Corbett

Represented by Kelley Warner PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Paul David Ticen +1 480 331 9397 +1 866 961 4984 paul@kellywarnerlaw.com

Represented by Kenneth N. Flaxman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel A. Flaxman +1 312 427 3200 +1 312 427 3930 jaf@kenlaw.com
, Kenneth N. Flaxman +1 312 427 3200 +1 312 427 3930 knf@kenlaw.com

Represented by Kerns, Frost & Pearlman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/28/2015 David A Argay +1 312 261 4550 +1 312 261 4565 dargay@kfplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc J. Pearlman +1 312 261 4550 mpearlman@kpfplaw.com

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Eric Baskin +1 202 508 5800 +1 202 585 0044 sbaskin@kilpatricktownsend.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Pickle +1 202 508 5800

Represented by Kindlon, Shanks Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gennaro D. Calabrese +1 518 434 1493 +1 518 432 7806 gcalabrese@kindlon.com

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Lewis Balser +1 404 572 4600 +1 404 572 5100 dbalser@kslaw.com

Represented by Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Nicholas Soltman +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 nsoltman@kwikalaw.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eugene Frank Assaf, Jr. +1 202 879 5196 +1 202 879 5200 eassaf@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan M. Davies +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 susan.davies@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Adam Glick +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5100 michael.glick@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Liam Patrick Hardy +1 202 879 5000 liam.hardy@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Claire Murray +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 claire.murray@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey Powell +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 jeffrey.powell@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John W. Reale +1 312 861 3452 +1 312 660 7970 jreale@kirkland.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , James H Sprayregen +1 312 862 2481 +1 312 862 2200 james.sprayregen@kirkland.com

Represented by Kopelman & Paige, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joseph L. Tehan, Jr. +1 617 556 0007 +1 617 654 1735 jtehan@k-plaw.com

Represented by KOSNOFF FASY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com

Represented by Kotin, Crabtree & Strong, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert K. Crabtree +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 rcrabtree@kcslegal.com
, , , , , Michelle A. Moor +1 617 227 7031 +1 617 367 2988 mmoor@kcslegal.com

Represented by Krevolin & Horst, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher E. Adams +1 404 888 9545 adams@khlawfirm.com
Space Jonathan E. Hawkins +1 404 888 9700 +1 404 888 9577 Hawkins@khlawfirm.com

Represented by Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld +1 415 955 1155 +1 415 955 1158 jeff@krinternetlaw.com

Represented by Kuzas Neu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luc Ulmet, Esq.

Represented by Lalchandani Simon, PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , DANIEL JORDAN SIMON +1 305 926 3634 +1 305 671 9282 danny@lslawpl.com

Represented by Landman Corsi Ballanine & Ford PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jason Alan Buskin +1 212 393 7928 +1 212 238 4848 jason.buskin@ag.ny.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Donald Nowve +1 212 416 8227 +1 212 416 6075 Donald.Nowve@ag.ny.gov

Represented by Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa B. Shelkrot +1 802 864 0217 +1 802 864 0137 lshelkrot@langrock.com

Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Carolyn A. Kubitschek +1 212 349 0900 ckubitschek@lanskub.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ghita Schwarz +1 212 614 6445 +1 212 614 6422 gschwarz@ccrjustice.org

Represented by Laske Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arthur C. Laske, III +1 203 576 7647 +1 203 576 8252 acl@laskelaw.com

Represented by LatinoJustice PRLDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jackson Chin +1 212 219 3360 +1 212 431 4276 Jchin@LatinoJustice.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christina Iturralde +1 212 219 3360 +1 212 431 4276 citurralde@latinojustice.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ghita R Schwarz +1 212 219 3360 gschwarz@latinojustice.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Diana Sagorika Sen +1 212 219 3360 dsen@latinojustice.org

Represented by Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory B. Paddison +1 313 237 0435 +1 313 224 5505 paddisong@detroitmi.gov

Represented by Law Firm of Chinyere Okoronkwo, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Chinyere Yvette Okoronkwo +1 212 634 6846 cokoronkwo@cyoesq.com

Represented by Law Office of Elizabeth Knight Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Elizabeth Knight Adams +1 860 724 0377 +1 860 278 3802 eadams@ekadamslaw.com

Represented by Law Office of Gregory P Gorman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory P Gorman +1 214 905 3739 greg@gormanlaw.com

Represented by Law Office of J Curtis Edmondson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Curtis Edmondson +1 503 701 9719 +1 503 214 8470 jcedmondson@edmolaw.com

Represented by Law Office of J. Wade Bainum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jack Wade Bainum +1 713 222 0375 +1 713 228 0321 wade@bainumlawfirm.com

Represented by Law Office of R. Andrew Free

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Andrew Free +1 615 873 0837 +1 615 628 0431 andrew@immigrantcivilrights.com

Represented by Law Office of Timothy J. McInnis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Richard F. Bernstein +1 212 794 9609 +1 212 292 4574 plaintifflaw@igc.org
, , , Timothy J. McInnis +1 212 292 4573 +1 212 292 4574 tmcinnis@mcinnis-law.com

Represented by Law Offices of Alexei M. Schacht

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , , Alexei Marc Schacht +1 646 729 8180 +1 212 504 8341 alexei@schachtlaw.net

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Shubin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Andrew J. Shubin +1 814 867 3115 shubin@statecollegelaw.com

Represented by Law Offices Of Bradford A Patrick Pa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, TTAB Attorney Placeholder bap@baplegal.com

Represented by Law Offices of Brian J. Farrell Jr. - NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Joshua Aaron Yahwak +1 203 782 4107 jyahwak@bfarrelllaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Charles D. Chalmers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles David Chalmers +1 415 860 8134 +1 801 382 2469 cchalmers@allegiancelit.com

Represented by Law Offices Of Cohen & Slamowitz, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charis M. Ford +1 516 364 2715 charisford@cslawllp.com

Represented by Law Offices of Craig Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig M Davis +1 415 857 5820 +1 415 795 4595 cdavis@craigdavislaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICES OF DALE COOK PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dale R Cook +1 425 605 7036 d_cook_lawyer@thirdwaysusefulartsii.net

Represented by Law Offices of Daniel D Resheter Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Andrew Bersin +1 212 868 3322 +1 212 868 1127 andrewbersin@hotmail.com

Represented by Law Offices of Devin H Fok

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Devin H. Fok +1 310 430 9933 +1 323 563 3445 devin@devinfoklaw.com

Represented by Law Offices Of Gary Kurtz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Gary Kurtz +1 818 884 8400 +1 818 884 8404 gary@garykurtzlaw.com
, Gary Kurtz +1 818 884 8400 +1 818 884 8404 gary@garykurtzlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Gilbert Shasha

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gilbert Shasha +1 203 442 4428

Represented by Law Offices of James A.H. Bell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Edward L Holt +1 865 637 2900 eholt@jamesahbell.com

Represented by Law Offices of Jedd L. Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jedd L. Hall +1 413 329 4339 +1 413 499 6349 jhall.law@roadrunner.com

Represented by Law Offices of Jeremy Pasternak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jeremy David Pasternak +1 415 693 0300 +1 415 693 0393 rs@pasternaklaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of John Francis Kennedy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , John Francis Kennedy +1 253 853 6223 +1 253 853 6479 jfk@kennedy-law.com

Represented by Law Offices of Joseph Stephen Schmutz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joseph Stephen Schmutz +1 803 577 5530 +1 843 577 9204 steve@schmutzlaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Julie C. Ferguson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Julie C. Ferguson +1 305 358 0155 +3580 358 358 0133 julie@jcfimmigration.com

Represented by Law Offices of Kurt D Hermansen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kurt David Hermansen +1 619 236 8300 +1 619 315 0436 KDH@KurtDavidHermansen.com

Represented by Law Offices of Leonard J. French

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , LEONARD J. FRENCH +1 610 537 3537 ljfrench@leonardjfrench.com

Represented by Law Offices of Maloney & Campolo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Tim Maloney +1 210 922 2200 +1 210 923 1313 tmaloney@maloneyandcampolo.com

Represented by Law Offices of Marci A Hamilton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marci A Hamilton +1 215 353 8984

Represented by Law Offices of Mark B. Conlan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark B. Conlan

Represented by Law Offices of Mark S. DeMarco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Steven DeMarco +1 718 239 7070 +1 718 239 2141

Represented by Law Offices of Philip J. McGowan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeff Nix +1 918 587 3193 +1 918 582 6106 jeff.nix@morelaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of R. Scott Garley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Scott Garley

Represented by Law Offices of Rosemarie Elizabeth Arnold

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Rosemarie Arnold +1 201 461 1111

Represented by Law Offices of Sean P. McGraw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sean P. McGraw +1 814 867 3115 +1 814 867 8811 mcgraw@statecollegelaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Sonja L. Deyoe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonja L. Deyoe +1 401 864 5877 +1 401 354 7464 sld@the-straight-shooter.com

Represented by Law Offices of Stanley J. Hochberg, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stanley J. Hochberg +1 718 624 2348 +1 717 624 2348 stan@hochberg.co

Represented by Law Offices of Wesley Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wesley Smith

Represented by Lawlor, Mahon & Rooney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James John Mahon +1 212 584 2990 +1 212 584 2991 j.mahon@lmrnylaw.com

Represented by Lawrence Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Tara Lawrence +1 503 387 5571 +1 888 660 7336 tara@taralawrencelaw.com

Represented by Lee Litigation Group, Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Taimur Alamgir +1 212 465 1124 taimur@leelitigation.com
, Angela Saeyun Kwon +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 angela@leelitigation.com
, , , , , , C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
, Geoffrey Luan +1 212 661 1309 +1 212 465 1181 geoffrey@leelitigation.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Anne Seelig +1 212 465 1124 +1 212 465 1181 anne@leelitigation.com
, , , , , Anne Seelig +1 212 465 1124 +1 212 465 1181 anne@leelitigation.com

Represented by Lee Nolan Jacobs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Lee Nolan Jacobs

Represented by Legal Action Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sally Friedman +1 212 243 1313
Space Paul Nathan Samuels +1 212 243 1313

Represented by Leonard Carder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2012, TERMINATED: 09/26/2 Robert Steven Remar +1 415 771 6400 +1 415 771 7010 rremar@leonardcarder.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Phil A Thomas +1 415 771 6400 +1 415 771 7010 pthomas@leonardcarder.com

Represented by Lerner & Guarino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Edward N. Lerner +1 203 817 0850 +1 203 817 0849 ENLerner@lernerandguarino.com

Represented by Levine Kellogg Lehman Schneider & Grossman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stuart Isaac Grossman +1 305 403 8788 +1 305 403 8789 sig@lkllaw.com

Represented by Lewis & Lin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Justin Mercer +1 718 243 9323 +1 718 243 9326 justin@iLawco.com

Represented by Lewis, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Katrina Atchley Arbogast +1 865 541 5258 +1 865 523 6529 katchley@lewisking.com
, Linda Hamilton Mowles +1 865 546 4646 +1 865 523 6529 lmowles@lewisking.com

Represented by Lexero Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric J. Menhart +1 202 904 2818 +1 202 403 3436 Eric.Menhart@Lexero.com

Represented by Lipsitz Green Scime Cambria LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Paul J. Cambria, Jr. +1 716 849 1333 +1 716 855 1580 pcambria@lglaw.com

Represented by Litchfield Cavo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jeffrey D. Kiesling +1 781 309 1526 +1 781 246 0167 kiesling@litchfieldcavo.com

Represented by LITE DEPALMA GREENBERG LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Katrina Carroll +1 973 623 3000 +1 973 877 3845 kcarroll@ldgrlaw.com
, Kyle Alan Shamberg +1 312 750 1265 kshamberg@litedepalma.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Patrick Joseph Gennardo +1 212 308 4411 +1 212 308 4844 patrick.gennardo@dentons.com

Represented by Loevy & Loevy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Heather Lewis Donnell +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 heather@loevy.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gayle M Horn +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 gayle@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Michael I Kanovitz +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 mike@loevy.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED: 01/23/2013, TERMINATED Aaron S Mandel +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 aaron@loevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Julie Thompson PHV +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 julie@loevy.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark Reyes +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 loevyreyes@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Cindy Tsai +1 312 243 5900 +1 312 243 5902 cindy@loevy.com

Represented by Louison, Costello, Condon & Pfaff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Bradford N. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 blouison@lccplaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Douglas I. Louison +1 617 439 0305 +1 617 439 0325 dlouison@lccplaw.com

Represented by Lowenbaum Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Heidi L. Eckert +1 314 746 4845 +1 314 746 4848 heckert@lowenbaumlaw.com

Represented by Lyngklip Assoc Consumer Law Center, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Priya Bali +1 248 208 8864 +1 248 208 9073 Priya@MichiganConsumerLaw.com
Space Ian B. Lyngklip +1 248 208 8864 +1 248 208 9073 ian@michiganconsumerlaw.com

Represented by Malacko Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard J Malacko +1 651 340 0488 +1 651 340 0542 rick@malackolaw.com

Represented by MALDEF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2011, TERMINATED: 01/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/28/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/28/2011, ATTORNEY T Cynthia Valenzuela Dixon +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 cvalenzuela@maldef.org
TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/18/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Ivan E Espinoza-Madrigal +1 210 224 5476 +1 210 224 5382 iespinoza@maldef.org
TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 02/07/2011, ATTORNEY T Gladys Limon +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 glimon@maldef.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY Nina Perales +1 210 224 5476 +1 210 224 5382 nperales@maldef.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Thomas Andrew Saenz +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 opaniagua@maldef.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Victor Viramontes +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 vviramontes@maldef.org

Represented by MALDEF - Los Angeles, CA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Jorge Martin Castillo +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 jcastillo@maldef.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Martha L Gomez +1 213 629 2512 +1 213 629 0266 mgomez@maldef.org

Represented by Malis Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Daniel M. Malis +1 617 491 1099 +1 617 491 1022 Daniel.Malis@MalisLaw.com

Represented by Mallison & Martinez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stanley S. Mallison +1 510 832 9999 +1 510 832 1101 allstaff@themmlawfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Hector Rodriguez Martinez +1 510 832 9999 +1 510 832 1101 hectorm@themmlawfirm.com

Represented by Marks Gray, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tyler James Oldenburg +1 904 398 0900 +1 904 399 8440 toldenburg@marksgray.com

Represented by Marrero & Wydler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Oscar Edmund Marrero +1 305 446 5528 +4460 446 446 0995 oem@marrerolegal.com

Represented by Martin Harding & Mazzotti, LLP - Niskayuna Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Nannette R. Kelleher +1 800 529 1010 Nannette.Kelleher@1800LAw1010.com

Represented by MASTANDO & ARTRIP LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eric J Artrip +1 256 532 2222 +1 256 536 2689 artrip@mastandoartrip.com

Represented by Mavronicolas & Dee Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, PETER CARO DEE +1 646 770 0024 pdee@mavrolaw.com

Represented by MBTA Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan P. Feltner +1 617 722 3175 +1 617 222 3194 jfeltner@mbta.com

Represented by McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Charles O Williams, III +1 864 239 4032 +1 864 242 3199 cwilliams@mgclaw.com

Represented by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan C. Stone +1 216 696 1422 +1 216 696 1210 scs@mccarthylebit.com
Space Kristina Walter Supler +1 216 696 1422 +1 216 696 1210 kws@mccarthylebit.com

Represented by McGraw Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Beau D McGraw +1 651 209 3200 +1 651 209 0550 beau@mcgrawlawfirm.com

Represented by McLeod Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael T Cooper +1 843 277 6655 +1 352 351 3859 michael@mcleod-lawgroup.com
, Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton +1 843 277 6655 jackie@mcleod-lawgroup.com
, W Mullins McLeod, Jr. +1 843 277 6655 mullins@mcleod-lawgroup.com
, Harry Cooper Wilson, III +1 843 277 6655 +1 843 277 6660 cooper.wilson@hoodlaw.com

Represented by Mcpherson Rane Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Edwin F McPherson +1 310 553 8833 +1 310 553 9233 emcpherson@mcpherson-llp.com

Represented by McQuaide Blasko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James M. Horne +1 814 238 4926 +1 814 238 9624 jmhorne@mqblaw.com

Represented by Mel S. Harris & Associates(5 Hanover Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Scott Evan Wortman +1 212 984 7723 +1 212 972 9150 swortman@wbcsk.com

Represented by Mendoza Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul E Luka +1 312 971 7309 +1 312 268 1089 paul@alexmendozalaw.com

Represented by Messerli & Kramer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Derrick N. Weber +1 763 548 7942 +1 763 548 7922 dweber@messerlikramer.com
, Jennifer M Zwilling +1 763 548 7900 +1 763 548 7922 jzwilling@messerlikramer.com

Represented by Mexican American Legal Defense & Education Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Amy R Pedersen +1 202 293 2828 +1 202 735 6585 apedersen@maldef.org

Represented by Michael Aaron Brand

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael Aaron Brand

Represented by Michael Fatta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Fatta

Represented by Mikowski & Leonard, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Justin C. Mikowski +1 617 651 1150 +1 617 300 8940 justin@mlattorneysatlaw.com

Represented by Milavetz Gallop & Milavetz, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Alan Scott Milavetz +1 952 236 4298 +1 952 920 6869 alanmilavetz@comcast.net
, , , , Chad William Schulze +1 952 920 7777 +1 952 920 6869 attorneyschulze@netscape.net

Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Michiyo Michelle Furukawa +1 213 617 1200 +1 213 617 1975 mfurukawa@milberg.com
, , , , Sabrina Seungyoun Kim +1 213 617 1200 +1 213 617 1975 skim@milberg.com

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Saul A. Green - INACTIVE +1 313 963 6420

Represented by Miller Edwards Rambicure PLLC - Lexington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, T. Scott White +1 859 977 6208 +1 859 253 4702 scottwhite@fkplaw.com

Represented by Milling Benson Woodward, LLP (Mandeville)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Normand Francis Pizza +1 504 569 7000 npizza@millinglaw.com
Space Thomas S. Schneidau +1 985 871 3924 +1 985 871 6957 tschneidau@millinglaw.com

Represented by Milman Labuda Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Jamie Scott Felsen +1 516 328 8899 +1 516 328 0082 jamiefelsen@mmmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , , , Joseph Martin Labuda +1 516 328 8899 +1 516 328 0882 joe@mmmlaborlaw.com

Represented by Minneapolis City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Andrea Kloehn Naef +1 612 673 2010 Andrea.Naef@minneapolismn.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Timothy S Skarda +1 612 673 2553 +1 612 673 3362 Timothy.Skarda@ci.minneapolis.mn.us

Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Kevin M. Brown +212 212 696 4848 brown@mintzandgold.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Jeffery D. Pollack +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 pollack@mintzandgold.com

Represented by Moarbes Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Geoffrey Colbourne Mason +1 202 507 5720 +1 202 507 5601 gmason@mpapllc.com

Represented by Montgomery County Prosecutor's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Anne Jagielski +1 937 232 5698 jagielskia@mcohio.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph D. Saks +1 937 225 5705 +1 937 225 4822 saksj@mcohio.org

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Minn Chung +1 415 268 7685 +1 415 268 5722 MChung@mofo.com
, , , , , Arturo Jorge Gonzalez +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 agonzalez@mofo.com

Represented by Morrison Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William J. Flanagan +1 617 439 7500 +1 617 342 4887 jflanagan@morrisonmahoney.com

Represented by Moses & Singer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Barnes McFarlane +1 212 554 7869 +1 917 206 4369 rmcfarlane@mosessinger.com
, Robert S. Wolf +1 212 554 7800 +1 212 554 7700 rwolf@mosessinger.com

Represented by MOURELAW, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles P Moure +1 206 300 2351 +1 206 374 2293 charles@mourelaw.com

Represented by Mudd Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Charles Lee Mudd, Jr. +1 773 588 5410 cmudd@muddlawoffices.com

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/08/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 08/08/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Susan Traub Boyd +1 415 512 4005 +1 415 644 6905 Susan.Boyd@mto.com
TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED: 04/21/2014, TERMINATED Aaron G Leiderman +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 512 4077 aaron.leiderman@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Margaret G Maraschino +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3708 margaret.maraschino@mto.com
TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED: 05/29/2014, TERMINATED Lika Cynthia Miyake +1 213 683 9165 +1 213 683 4065 lika.miyake@mto.com
TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/17/2011, TERMINATED Elisabeth Jill Neubauer +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 4003 vivian.rodriguez@mto.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/30/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Paul J Watford +1 213 683 9172 +1 213 683 4072 paul.watford@mto.com
TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 06/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Joseph J Ybarra +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 joseph.ybarra@mto.com

Represented by Murphy Pearson Bradley & Feeney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Steven W. Yuen +1 415 788 1900 +1 415 393 8087 syuen@mpbf.com

Represented by Nassau County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Erica Michelle Haber +1 516 571 6074 +1 516 571 3058

Represented by National Center for Lesbian Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Asaf Orr aorr@nclrights.org
, , , , , Christopher Francis Stoll +1 415 392 6257 +1 415 392 8442 cstoll@nclrights.org

Represented by National Day Laborer Organizing Network

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jessica Karp Bansal +1 213 380 2214 +1 213 380 2878 jbansal@ndlon.org
TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/09/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Lisa Kung , +1 213 380 2785 +1 213 380 2787 kung@ndlon.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Chris Newman , +1 213 380 2785 +1 213 380 2787 newman@ndlon.org

Represented by National Immigration Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Tanya Broder +1 510 663 8282 Broder@nilc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shiu-Ming Cheer +1 213 639 3900 cheer@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Nicholas David Espiritu +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 espiritu@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Alvaro M Huerta +1 213 639 3900 huerta@nilc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Linton Joaquin +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 joaquin@nilc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Melissa S Keaney +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 keaney@nilc.org
TERMINATED: 09/12/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/12/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/12/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/12/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/12/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Vivek Mittal +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 mittal@nilc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Nora A Preciado +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 preciado@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Nora A Preciado +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 preciado@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Esther Sung +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 sung@nilc.org
TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED: 09/22/2010, TERMINATED Ghazal Tajmiri +1 213 639 3900 +1 213 639 3911 tajmiri@nilc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen Cassandra Tumlin +1 213 674 2850 +1 213 639 3911 tumlin@nilc.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Karen Cassandra Tumlin +1 213 674 2850 +1 213 639 3911 tumlin@nilc.org

Represented by Nelkin & Nelkin, P C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stuart Murray Nelkin +1 713 526 4500 +1 713 526 8915 snelkin@nelkinpc.com

Represented by Nesenoff & Miltenberg, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey S. Berkowitz +1 212 736 4500 jberkowitz@nmllplaw.com
, Stuart Bernstein +1 212 736 4500 sbernstein@nmllplaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Arwood Byler +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 philb@optonline.net
, , Philip Arwood Byler +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 philb@optonline.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tara J. Davis +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 tdavis@nmllplaw.com
, Tara J. Davis +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 tdavis@nmllplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara Gorycki +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 kgorycki@nmllplaw.com
, , Andrew Todd Miltenberg +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 amiltenberg@nmllplaw.com
, Andrew Todd Miltenberg +1 212 736 4500 +1 212 736 2260 amiltenberg@nmllplaw.com
, , Diana R. Zborovsky +1 212 736 4500 DZBOROVSKY@NMLLPLAW.COM

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Bahrenburg +1 212 356 2338 +1 212 356 3509 rbahrenb@law.nyc.gov
, , , , Beth J Hoffman +1 212 356 2372 +1 212 356 3509 bhoffman@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lesley Berson Mbaye +1 212 788 0408 +1 212 788 0940 lmbaye@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Amy Robinson +1 212 356 3518 +1 212 356 3509 arobinso@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kathryn M Sprovieri +1 212 356 2383 +1 212 356 3509 ksprovie@law.nyc.gov

Represented by Newman Du Wors LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek Alan Newman +1 206 274 2800 +1 206 274 2801 Derek@newmanlaw.com
, Keith P Scully +1 206 274 2826 keith@newmanlaw.com

Represented by Newport Beach, Ca. 92660

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie F Vandale +1 949 719 7246 +1 949 719 7210 lvandale@olenproperties.com

Represented by Nichols Kaster LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ROBERT L. SCHUG +1 612 256 3200 +1 612 215 6870 schug@nka.com

Represented by Nichols Kaster, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , E Michelle Drake +1 612 256 3228 +1 612 338 4878 drake@nka.com

Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , , , Elizabeth Sheehan Edmonds +1 212 788 0860 +1 212 788 8877 eedmonds@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Joshua J. Lax +1 212 442 2359 +1 212 788 9776 jlax@law.nyc.gov
, , , , Eric Howard West +1 212 788 0563 +1 212 788 0605 ewest@law.nyc.gov

Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , James Mirro +1 212 788 8026 +1 212 788 9776 jmirro@law.nyc.gov

Represented by O'Brien Hatfield, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Victoria E. Hatfield +1 813 250 3553 +1 866 203 2532 veh@markjobrien.com
, Mark J. O'Brien +1 813 228 6989 +1 866 202 5964 mjo@markjobrien.com

Represented by O'Connor & O'Connor, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Matthew J. Haftel +1 407 843 2100 +1 407 843 2061 mhaftel@oconlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Dennis R. O'Connor +1 407 843 2100 +1 407 843 2061 doconnor@oconlaw.com

Represented by O'Toole McLaughlin Dooley & Pecora

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Anderson Dooley +1 440 930 4001 +1 440 934 7208 mdooley@omdplaw.com

Represented by Office of Cobb County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Deborah L. Dance +1 770 528 4000 ddance@cobbcounty.org
, , , , , Hugh William Rowling, Jr. +1 770 528 4000 browling@cobbcounty.org

Represented by Office of Corporation Counsel - City of Rome

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Gerard F. Feeney, II +1 315 339 7670 +1 315 838 1166 gfeeney@romecitygov.com

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Susanne Brody +1 914 428 7124 +1 914 997 6872 susanne_brody@fd.org
Space Federal Public Defender - YAK +1 956 630 2995 +1 713 718 4610 deborah_hill@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/28/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/28/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/28/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hanni M. Fakhoury +1 619 234 8467 +1 619 687 2666 hanni_fakhoury@fd.org
, Geremy C. Kamens +1 703 600 0800 Geremy_Kamens@fd.org

Represented by Office of Fulton County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Overtis Hicks Brantley +1 404 730 7750 ov.brantley@co.fulton.ga.us
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert L. Martin +1 404 730 7140 robert.martin@fultoncountyga.gov

Represented by Office of Legal Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Dana B. Lee +1 203 977 4081 +1 203 977 5560 dlee@ci.stamford.ct.us

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Dana Martin Johnson +1 804 786 8115 +7864 786 786 4239
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Richard Sarnoski +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 stephen.sarnoski@ct.gov

Represented by Office of the Child Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Willie Jake Lovett, Jr. +1 404 612 4407 willie.lovett@fultoncountyga.gov

Represented by Office of the Federal Public Defender

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffrey Dahlberg +1 509 248 8920 jeff_dahlberg@fd.org
Space Chris Kerkering +1 206 553 1100 +1 206 553 0120 chris_kerkering@fd.org
Space David J Walsh-Little +1 410 962 3962 +1 410 962 0872 david_walsh-little@fd.org

Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lee Alan Adlerstein +1 212 416 6157 +1 212 416 6009 lee.adlerstein@oag.state.ny.us
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Efthimios Parasidis +1 212 416 8118 +1 212 416 6075 efthimios.parasidis@oag.state.ny.us

Represented by Office of the Prosecuting Attorney - Summit County

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Susan Baker Ross +1 330 628 4691 +1 330 628 4771 ross@prosecutor.summitoh.net

Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gwendolyn Dewees Hodge +1 501 340 2629
, , , , , , , , , William L. Woodard +1 313 226 9100 william.woodard@usdoj.gov

Represented by Office of the Vermont Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Robert C. Menzel ,. +1 802 828 3895 +82828215 828 828 2154 robert.menzel@state.vt.us

Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jane D. Hickey +1 804 786 1927 +1 804 371 8718 jhickey@oag.state.va.us

Represented by Ohio Justice & Policy Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Bess Messerman Okum +1 513 562 3200 bokum@ohiojpc.org
, , , , , , , , , , , David A Singleton +1 513 421 1108 +1 513 562 3200 dsingleton@ohiojpc.org

Represented by One Metropolitan Square

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Ashley A. Diaz +1 314 659 2026 +1 314 754 9383 AADiaz@littler.com

Represented by Ortega Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Daniel R Ortega, Jr. +1 602 386 4455 +1 602 386 4480 danny@ortegalaw.com

Represented by Outten & Golden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Rachel Megan Bien +1 212 245 1000 +1 212 997 4005 rmb@outtengolden.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Juno Emmeline Turner +1 212 245 1000 +1 212 977 4005 jturner@outtengolden.com

Represented by P.O. Box

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Lawson Hester +1 601 987 5300 +1 601 987 5353 lhester@pbhfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Tolle High +1 601 987 5300 +1 601 987 5353 mhigh@pbhfirm.com

Represented by P.O. Box 40116

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Timothy J Feulner +1 360 586 1445 timf1@atg.wa.gov

Represented by P.O. Box 899

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Cheryl Ann Schuetze cheryl.schuetze@ago.mo.gov

Represented by P.O. Box 910

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael W. Turner +1 508 748 2362 +1 508 748 6836 mturner@cape.com

Represented by P.O. Box 920

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise Ann Vinet +1 225 292 7410 + 225 292 4149 denise@vinetlaw.com

Represented by P.O.Box 587

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , James M. Bendell +1 360 379 5221 +1 360 379 3238 bendell@cablespeed.com

Represented by PAOLI LAW FIRM, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David R. Paoli +1 406 542 3330 +1 406 542 3332 davidpaoli@paoli-law.com

Represented by Pennsylvania Institutional Law Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ANGUS R. LOVE +1 215 925 2966 alove@pailp.org

Represented by PETER S. VOGEL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Peter S. Vogel

Represented by PFAU COCHRAN VERTETIS AMALA, PLLC (SEATTLE)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com

Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah Brand Baum +1 202 663 8773 deborah.baum@pillsburylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Eden Judish +1 202 663 9266 +1 202 663 8007 julia.judish@pillsburylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colin T Kemp +1 415 983 1000 +1 415 983 1200 colin.kemp@pillsburylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian D Martin +6 192 344 5000 brian.martin@pillsburylaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S McNamara +1 206 663 9386 michael.mcnamara@pillsburylaw.com

Represented by Pines Bach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Magdalene Alison TenBruggencate +1 608 251 0101 +1 608 251 2883 tenbruggencate@pinesbach.com

Represented by PO Box 970

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian D. Dover +1 870 934 1511 +1 870 934 1512 doverlaw@ritternet.com

Represented by PO Box AA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Geoffrey D. Rieder +1 505 346 4646 +1 505 346 1370 gdr@keleher-law.com

Represented by Pohl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Matthew Pohl +1 212 202 1614 +1 646 924 3100 david.pohl@pohllaw.com

Represented by Poltrock & Giampietro

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Wayne B. Giampietro +1 312 236 0606 +1 312 236 9264 wgiampietro@wpglawyers.com

Represented by Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Steven S. Broadley +1 617 973 6100 +1 617 722 4909 sbroadley@pbl.com

Represented by Prenda Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Brett Langdon Gibbs +1 415 325 5900 blgibbs@wefightpiracy.com

Represented by Psych-Appeal, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Meiram Bendat +1 310 564 0040 meiram@psych-appeal.org

Represented by Puerto Rican Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Foster S. Maer +1 212 739 7507 +1 212 431 4276 foster_maer@prldef.org

Represented by Quadra & Coll, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rebecca Coll +1 415 426 3502 +1 415 625 9936 rcoll@quadracoll.com
Space James Andrew Quadra +1 415 426 3502 +1 415 625 9936 jquadra@quadracoll.com

Represented by Ramey Assoc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Steve Ramey - INACTIVE +1 517 853 9770 +1 517 853 9761

Represented by Ramirez Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eddie Dee Ramirez +1 918 392 7800 +1 918 392 7802 eddieramirez@edrlawyer.com

Represented by Randazza Legal Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , TTAB Attorney Placeholder ecf@randazza.com

Represented by Ratcliffe Burke Harten & Elias, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Biolchini +1 401 331 3400 +1 401 331 3440 jbiolchini@rhbglaw.com

Represented by Ratcliffe Harten Burke & Galamaga LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Richard Ratcliffe +3313 331 331 3440 rratcliffe@rhgllp.com

Represented by RAY BECKERMAN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ray Beckerman +1 718 544 3434 +1 718 559 6584 ray@beckermanlegal.com

Represented by Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jason Saul Remer +1 305 416 5000 +4165 416 416 5005 jremer@rgpattorneys.com
, Brody Max Shulman +1 305 416 5000 +1 305 416 5005 bshulman@rgpattorneys.com

Represented by Rick Klingbeil, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rick Klingbeil +1 503 473 8565 +1 503 546 0598 rick@klingbeil-law.com

Represented by Robert Joshua Ontell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert Joshua Ontell

Represented by Robles Rael & Anaya, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Christina E Anaya +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 tina@roblesrael.com
, Marcus J Rael, Jr. +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 marcus@roblesrael.com
, , , , , , , , , Luis E. Robles +1 505 242 2228 +1 505 242 1106 luis@roblesrael.com

Represented by Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Matthew Patrick Connelly +1 312 494 1000 +1 312 494 1001 mpc@rockfuscoconnelly.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael P. Connelly +1 312 251 2255 mconnelly@rockfuscoconnelly.com

Represented by RODOLF & TODD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Elizabeth K Hall +1 918 295 2100 +1 918 295 7800 ehall@rodolftodd.com
, , , , , , LESLIE ALLENE WEEKS +1 918 295 2100 +1 918 295 7800 lweeks@rodolftodd.com

Represented by Roemer Wallens Gold & Mineaux LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Matthew J. Kelly +1 518 464 1300 +1 518 464 1010 mkelly@rwgmlaw.com

Represented by Rosen Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Christopher S. Hinton +1 212 686 1060 +1 212 202 3827 chinton@rosenlegal.com

Represented by Rosen Livingston & Cholst Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Denise M. Campbell +1 212 252 0300 +1 212 779 7295 dcampbell@kll-law.com

Represented by Rosen Rosen and Hagood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lorene Stuhr Dukes +1 843 577 6726 rdukes@rrhlawfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , Alice Fountain Paylor +1 843 577 6726 +1 843 724 8036 apaylor@rrhlawfirm.com

Represented by Rosenberg & Ball Co. LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Eric J Rosenberg +1 740 644 1027 erosenberg@rosenbergball.com

Represented by Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bradford deLeeuw +1 302 656 4433 bdeleeuw@rmgglaw.com
, , Jeffrey S. Goddess +1 302 656 4433 jgoddess@rmgglaw.com

Represented by Roth Fioretti Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Fioretti +1 312 922 6262 +1 312 922 7747 rwf@rothfioretti.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Young Hurst +1 312 922 6262 ken@rothfioretti.com

Represented by Rozas Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Rozas +1 225 343 0010 +1 225 343 5018 david@rozaslaw.com

Represented by Ryan Ryan Deluca, LLP - Stamford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , John Wade Cannavino, Jr. +1 203 357 9200 jwcannavino@ryandelucalaw.com

Represented by Sadowski Fischer PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Raphael Katz +1 212 913 9678 +1 646 502 5357 rkatz@sflawgroup.com
, Robert Wayne Sadowski +1 646 502 5760 +1 646 502 5357 rsadowski@sadowskikatz.com

Represented by Samuel D. Zurier, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel D. Zurier +8612 861 861 2922 sdz@zurierlaw.com

Represented by Santen & Hughes, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , H Louis Sirkin +1 513 721 4450 +1 513 852 5994 HLS@santen-hughes.com

Represented by Saper Law Offices Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Chad David Nold +1 312 527 4100 chad@saperlaw.com
Space Daliah Saper

Represented by Sarah Almy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sarah Almy

Represented by Sasson, Turnbull & Hoose

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David P. Hoose +1 413 586 4800 +1 413 746 5767 dhoose@strhlaw.com
, Luke S. Ryan +1 413 586 4800 +4 123 746 5767 lryan@strhlaw.com

Represented by Scarlett, Gucciardo & Hirsch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott David Hirsch +1 561 278 6707 shirsch@sghlawyers.com

Represented by Schiffer & Buus APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William L Buus +1 949 825 6140 +1 949 825 6141 wbuus@schifferbuus.com
Space Eric M Schiffer +1 949 825 6140 +1 949 825 6141 eschiffer@schifferbuus.com

Represented by Schneider Wallace Cottrell Brayton Konecky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Geoffrey Konecky +1 415 421 7100 +1 415 421 7105 jkonecky@schneiderwallace.com

Represented by Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ellie T. Schilling +1 504 680 6050 +1 504 680 6051 ellie@semmlaw.com

Represented by School Law Center, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Amy J Goetz +1 651 222 6288 +1 651 222 7193 agoetz@schoollawcenter.com
, Andrea L Jepsen +1 651 222 6288 +1 651 222 7193 ajepsen@schoollawcenter.com

Represented by SCHROETER GOLDMARK & BENDER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca Jane Roe +1 206 622 8000 +1 206 682 2305 roe@sgb-law.com

Represented by Schuster & Aguilo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Shiara L. Dilone-Fernandez +1 787 282 7768 +1 787 765 4611 sdilone@salawpr.com
, , , , , Anabel Rodriguez-Alonso +1 787 282 8619 +1 787 765 4611 arodriguez@salawpr.com

Represented by SEVASTIANOS AND ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noel A. Sevastianos +1 314 725 7577 +1 314 862 8050 Noel@NoelsLaw.com

Represented by sggimmigration.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/05/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Connie Choi +1 213 977 7500 +1 213 977 7595 connie@sggimmigration.com

Represented by Shaheen & Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. Christie +1 603 225 7262 wchristie@shaheengordon.com

Represented by Shaw Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Shaw +1 607 273 2900 +Pleas eus eavalid wmrshaw@shawlawfirm.com

Represented by SHAY KEPPLE PHILLIPS, LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jonathan LA Phillips +1 309 494 6155 +1 309 494 6156 jphillips@skplawyers.com

Represented by Shay Phillips, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Lucas Allen Phillips +1 309 494 6155 jphillips@shay-law.com

Represented by Sherwood, Harper, Dakan, Unruh & Pratt LC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Corlin J. Pratt +1 316 267 1281 +1 316 267 4086 corlin.pratt@sherwoodharper.com

Represented by Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Sheryl Rebecca Neufeld

Represented by Shoken Legal, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shorge Kenneth Sato +1 773 206 7630 ssato@shoken-legal.com

Represented by Silverman and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Gerald Stephen Smith, Jr. +1 914 574 4510 +1 914 574 4515 gsmith@silvermanandassociatesny.com

Represented by Silverman, Thompson, Slutkin & White, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Stephen G. Grygiel +1 410 385 2225
, , , , , , , Steven J Kelly +1 443 909 7502 +1 410 547 2432 skelly@mdattorney.com
Space Anne Toomey McKenna +1 410 385 2225 +1 410 547 2432 amckenna@silvermckenna.com
, , , , , , , Edward P. Parent +1 410 385 2225
, , , , , , , Steven D. Silverman +1 410 385 2225
, Andrew C White +1 410 385 2225 +1 410 547 2432 awhite@mdattorney.com

Represented by Siprut, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , John S. Marrese +1 312 460 5467 +1 312 460 7074 jmarrese@seyfarth.com
, , , , Michael Loren Silverman +1 312 286 4915 msilverman@brunolawus.com
, , , Joseph Jeremy Siprut , +1 312 588 1440 +1 312 427 1850 jsiprut@siprut.com

Represented by Slusarz Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Frances Codd Slusarz +1 203 733 2049 +1 203 778 1985 frances@slusarzlaw.com

Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Carlos Del-Valle-Cruz +1 787 774 5959 +1 787 774 8181 CDVLawPR@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , Susan L. French +1 202 202 7397 susanfrench19@gmail.com
, Eric John Rosenberg +1 740 644 1027 +1 866 498 0811 rosenberglawoffice@gmail.com

Represented by Smith Lee Nebenzahl, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Beth M. Nussbaum +1 781 784 2322 bnussbaum@slnlaw.com

Represented by Smith Moore Leatherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , F Marion Hughes +1 864 242 6440 +1 864 240 2477 marion.hughes@smithmoorelaw.com

Represented by Sommers & Schwartz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank F. Sommers, IV +1 415 955 0925 +1 415 955 0927 ffs@sommersschwartz.com

Represented by Southdale Office Centre

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , R Daniel Rasmus +1 612 746 0321 drasmus@rasmuslaw.net

Represented by Southern Poverty Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mary C. Bauer - PHV +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 mary.bauer@splcenter.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samuel Jacob Brooke +1 334 956 8200 +1 334 956 8481 samuel.brooke@splcenter.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle R. Lapointe - PHV +1 404 521 6700 +1 404 221 5857 michelle.lapointe@splcenter.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle R. Lapointe - PHV +1 404 521 6700 +1 404 221 5857 michelle.lapointe@splcenter.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Naomi Ruth Tsu +1 404 521 6700 naomi.tsu@splcenter.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew H. Turner +1 334 956 8326 +1 334 956 8481 andrew.turner@splcenter.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel Werner +1 404 521 6700 daniel.werner@splcenter.org

Represented by Speeter & Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Peter J Diessner +1 612 339 7566 +1 612 339 9055 pdiessner@speeterjohnson.com

Represented by Spodek Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Yuriy Yaroslavskiy +1 212 300 5196 +1 212 300 6371 yuriy@spodeklawgroup.com

Represented by State of Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert B. Teitelman +1 860 808 5040 +1 860 808 5033 robert.teitelman@ct.gov

Represented by Ste 210

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , , Joshua A Engel +1 513 445 9600 +1 513 492 8989 engel@engelandmartin.com

Represented by Ste. 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lindsey Vignaud Marshall +1 713 739 0402 lindsey@coxpradialaw.com

Represented by Ste. 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Dillon +1 202 640 2850 +1 202 280 1034 jdillon@kaiserdillon.com
, Justin Dillon +1 202 640 2850 +1 202 280 1034 jdillon@kaiserdillon.com

Represented by Stokes Lawrence, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Findley +1 206 626 6000 eaf@stokeslaw.com

Represented by Stone & Magnanini, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David S. Stone +1 973 218 1111 +1 973 218 1106 dstone@stonemagnalaw.com

Represented by Stoops & Lacourse, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Fred Everett Stoops, Sr. +1 918 744 7100 +1 918 477 2299 fred@stoopslacourse.com

Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert Thomas Wright, Jr. +1 305 858 2900 +1 305 858 5261 RWright@stroock.com

Represented by Suffolk County Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Arlene S. Zwilling +1 631 853 4049 +1 631 853 5833 Arlene.Zwilling@suffolkcountyny.gov

Represented by Suite 100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc John Randazza +1 888 667 1113 +1 305 437 7662 MJR@randazza.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Stephen Albert Smith +1 561 624 1051 +1 561 624 7441 ssmith@pallolaw.com

Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan James Yarnell +1 561 952 0671 +1 561 828 6296 Bryan@CivilLawFlorida.com

Represented by SUITE 105

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James E. Tamm +1 248 433 2000 +1 248 433 2001 jetamm@odtlegal.com

Represented by Suite 1100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie L. Boyer +1 314 259 4546 +1 314 259 4599 jamie.boyer@stinson.com

Represented by Suite 112

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Thomas S Groth +1 203 628 2952 +1 203 793 2526 Groth@grgllp.com

Represented by Suite 1130

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony E. Rothert +1 314 669 3420 +1 314 652 3112 trothert@aclu-mo.org

Represented by Suite 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Lee Brooks +1 312 938 4070 +1 312 540 1162 mbrooks@boodlaw.com

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , David R. Herring Iglesias +1 903 526 6400 +1 903 526 5588 diglesias@hampelaw.com

Represented by Suite 1425

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara E. Burns +1 617 767 2710 sara@seburnslaw.com
, Carmen L. Durso +1 617 728 9123 +1 617 426 7972 dursolaw@tiac.net

Represented by Suite 17

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Edward Jason Atkins +1 859 525 1965 +1 888 789 1475 EJA@Keeneylaw.com

Represented by Suite 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle B. Owens +1 615 300 8546 mowens@ageeowenslaw.com
, Sandra Lynn Ribera +1 415 576 1600 +1 415 842 0321 sribera@riberalaw.com
, R Keith Vaughan +1 501 985 5555 +1 501 457 7224 kvaughan@vflawfirm.com

Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lin L. Blansit +1 512 499 0900 +1 512 474 5594 lblansit@1411west.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Brian E Hurley +1 513 784 1525 bhurley@cbjlawyers.com
Space Michael J. Mirabella +1 303 381 3408 +1 303 381 3401 mmirabella@mbellalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark M. O'Mara +1 407 898 5151 mark@omaralawgroup.com

Represented by Suite 204

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Leslie A Farber lfarber@lfarberlaw.com
, , , , , , , John M. Horn +1 617 589 3007 jhorn@hanover.com

Represented by Suite 206

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Joseph James Blyskal, III +1 860 278 7448 +1 860 560 0185 jblyskal@gordonrees.com

Represented by Suite 210

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher D. Jennings +1 501 218 6064 +1 888 505 0909 cjennings@johnsonvines.com

Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erica V. Mason +1 404 230 6794 +1 678 406 8701 emason@constangy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamika R. Nordstrom +1 404 230 6791 tnordstrom@taylorenglish.com
TERMINATED: 11/29/2016, TERMINATED: 11/29/2016, TERMINATED: 11/29/2016, TERMINATED: 11/29/2016, TERMINATED: 11/29/2016, TERMINATED: 11/29/2016 Sarah M. Phaff +1 478 750 8600 +1 478 750 8686 sphaff@constangy.com

Represented by Suite 2700

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Edward D Greim +1 816 256 3181 +1 816 256 5958 edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
, , , , , Alan Thomas Simpson +1 816 256 3181 +1 816 256 5958 Asimpson@gravesgarrett.com

Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Joshua A. Cossey +1 800 742 1190 jcossey@northflalawyers.com
, John T. Kirtley, III +1 214 521 4412 +1 214 526 6026 jkirtley@lawyerworks.com
Space R. Joshua McKee +1 615 425 4400 +1 615 425 4401 rjm@rjmckeelaw.com
, , , Alexandra Rengel +1 305 892 2525 air@mercadorengel.com
Space Jeffery S. Roberts +1 615 425 4400 +1 615 425 4401 jroberts@griffithroberts.com
, Steven Greg Wenzel +1 813 224 0431 +1 813 229 8712 swenzel@wfclaw.com

Represented by Suite 303

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard M. Upton +1 225 382 2118 +1 225 382 2119 mark_upton@fd.org

Represented by Suite 316

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , HARRY T. COLEMAN +1 570 282 7440 harry@harrycolemanlaw.com

Represented by Suite 3710

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Edward Francis Harold +1 504 522 3303 +1 504 529 3850 eharold@laborlawyers.com

Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Carlos J. Calandriello +1 503 988 3138 +1 503 988 3377 carlo.calandriello@multco.us

Represented by Suite 504

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, James R DeVita +1 914 328 5000 +1 212 946 5906 jdevita@jamesrdevitalaw.com

Represented by Suite 510

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , David M. Lira +1 516 222 2777 +1 516 222 2971 liralaw@igc.org

Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Justin Dillon +1 202 640 2850 +1 202 280 1034 jdillon@kaiserdillon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney Roberts Forrest +1 202 688 1909 cforrest@kaiserdillon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher C. Muha +1 202 640 2850 +1 202 280 1034 cmuha@kaiserdillon.com

Represented by Suite 630

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua L. Holmes +1 504 568 1631 joshua.holmes@crescentcarehealth.org

Represented by Tabitha Anne Taylor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tabitha Anne Taylor +1 561 622 1252

Represented by TACOMA CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher D Bacha +1 253 591 5885 cbacha@cityoftacoma.org
, , , , , , , Elizabeth Ann Pauli +1 253 591 5627 +1 253 591 5755 epauli@cityoftacoma.org

Represented by Tamaroff & Tamaroff, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Fisher Tamaroff +1 305 403 2020 +1 305 403 2021 david@tamarofflaw.com

Represented by Taylor Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Phil A. Taylor +1 781 438 7100 ecf@taylorlawoffice.us

Represented by Texas Civil Rights Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C. Harrington +1 512 771 1759 +1 512 474 0726 jch@utexas.edu
Space Scott Medlock +1 512 474 5073 +1 512 474 0726 scott@texascivilrightsproject.org

Represented by The Aboushi Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tahanie Aboushi +1 212 391 8500 tahanie@aboushi.com

Represented by The Barkley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Thomas H Hull, Jr. +1 918 599 9991 +1 918 584 1110 thull@thebarkleylawfirm.com
, Jeffrey Lee Wilson +1 918 599 9991 +1 918 584 1110 jwilson@thebarkleylawfirm.com

Represented by The Blackburn Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Gary Blackburn +1 615 254 7770 +1 866 895 7272 gblackburn@wgaryblackburn.com
Space Bryant B. Kroll +1 615 254 7770 +1 615 895 7272 bkroll@wgaryblackburn.com

Represented by The Burlington Law Practice, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Joshua L. Simonds ,. +1 802 651 5370 +1 802 651 5374 jls@burlingtonlawpractice.com

Represented by The Buzbee Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Anthony G. Buzbee +1 713 223 5393 +1 713 223 5909 tbuzbee@txattorneys.com

Represented by The Chugh Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Yeon Me Kim +1 703 877 0870 +1 703 877 0871 yeon.kim@chugh.com

Represented by THE CLEARY LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brian J. Cleary +1 208 762 1081

Represented by The Cochran Firm California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer A Bandlow +1 323 435 8205 +1 323 282 5280 jbandlow@cochranfirm.com
Space Brian T Dunn +1 323 931 6200 +1 323 931 9521 bdunn@cochranfirm.com
Space Jonathan D Evans +1 323 435 8205 +1 323 282 5280 jevans@cochranfirm.com

Represented by The Consumer Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Alan M Mansfield +1 619 308 5034 +1 888 341 5048 alan@clgca.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Alan M Mansfield +1 619 308 5034 +1 888 341 5048 alan@clgca.com

Represented by THE COX PRADIA LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Shasta P.C. Blanton +1 713 739 0402 shasta@coxpradialaw.com
, Troy J Pradia +1 713 739 0402 +1 713 752 2812 tjp@coxpradialaw.com

Represented by The Grubb Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John W. Barrett +1 304 345 3356 +3453 345 345 3355
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David L. Grubb +1 304 345 3356 +1 304 345 3355 dgrubb@grubblawgroup.com

Represented by The Harrison Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Unknown Attorney david@harrisonfirm.us

Represented by THE KAISER LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Christopher C Muha +1 202 640 2850 cmuha@tklf.com

Represented by The Kaplan Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Susan Robin Kaplan +1 347 683 2505 skaplan@lawkaplan.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Robin Kaplan +1 347 683 2505 skaplan@lawkaplan.com

Represented by The Kindlon Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lee Carey Kindlon +1 518 434 1493 +1 518 432 7806 lkindlon@kindlon.com

Represented by The Law Center of Akers & Esser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Johnny P Akers +1 918 336 1818 +1 918 338 0888
, , , , , , , , Frederick Scott Esser +1 918 336 1818 +1 918 338 0888 akersesserlaw@aol.com

Represented by The Law Firm of Joel Spivak

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joel Spivak +1 516 829 3939 +1 516 829 3946 joel@joelspivaklaw.com

Represented by The Pattis Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Murphy Erwin +1 203 393 3017 +1 203 393 9745 derwin@pattislaw.com
, , Frederick M. O'Brien +1 203 393 3017 +1 203 393 9745 fobrien@pattisandsmith.com

Represented by The Pietz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Morgan E. Pietz +1 310 424 5557 +1 310 546 5301 mepietz@pietzlawfirm.com

Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com

Represented by The Tammy Tran Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Minh Tam Tran +1 713 655 0737 ttran@tt-lawfirm.com

Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Lydia Ramos Celis +1 212 868 3322 +1 212 868 1127 lydiacelislaw@gmail.com
Space Arlyn G Crow +1 505 427 3227 arlyngcrow@gmail.com
Space Aaron C. Israels +1 303 268 3991 +1 303 268 3996 israelsplc@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joanne Rapuano +1 203 671 8295 +1 203 549 0868 joanne.rapuano@gmail.com

Represented by Thibodeaux Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Jeffery Don Fruge +1 337 433 5523 +1 337 433 9225 jdf@tlfoffice.com
, , , , , Terry Thibodeaux +1 337 433 5523 +1 337 433 9225 terry@tlfoffice.com

Represented by Thomas & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert M. Thomas, Jr. +1 617 371 1072 +1 617 371 1037 rmt@thomasandassoc.net

Represented by Thomas F. Miller, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Thomas F. Miller +1 952 404 3896 +1 952 404 3893 thomas@millerlaw.com

Represented by Todd & Weld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Megan C. Deluhery +1 617 624 4709 +1 617 227 5777 mdeluhery@toddweld.com
Space Hillary Lehmann +1 617 720 2626 hlehmann@toddweld.com
, , , Christopher R. O'Hara +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 cohara@toddweld.com
Space Max D. Stern +1 617 720 2626 +1 617 227 5777 mdstern@toddweld.com

Represented by Tredway Lumsdaine & Doyle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Matthew L Kinley +1 562 901 3050 mkinley@tldlaw.com

Represented by Trial & Technology Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Alan Spanner +1 650 324 2277 +1 650 324 0178 ras@techtriallaw.com

Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Laura Nicole Begun +1 703 734 4334 +1 703 734 6534 laura.begun@troutmansanders.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Curtis Lynch +1 757 687 7765 +1 757 687 1504 john.lynch@troutmansanders.com
, , , , , , , , , Syed Mohsin Reza +1 703 734 4351 +1 703 448 6510 mohsin.reza@troutmansanders.com

Represented by Tully Rinckey PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven L. Herrick +1 518 218 7100 +1 518 218 0496 SHerrick@tullylegal.com
, , , , Sarah L. McKinin +1 202 375 2259 +1 202 640 2054
, , , , , , , , , Allen A. Shoikhetbrod +1 518 218 7100 +1 518 218 0496 ashoikhetbrod@tullylegal.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mathew B. Tully +1 202 787 1900 +1 202 640 2059 mtully@tullylegal.com

Represented by Turley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lacey Turley Stutz +1 214 691 4025 +1 214 361 5802 laceym@wturley.com
Space Linda Turley , +1 214 691 4025 +1 214 361 5802 lindat@wturley.com

Represented by Twin Cities Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark Santi +1 612 466 0010 +1 612 437 4500 ms@twincitiesfirm.com

Represented by U S District Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Houston Interpreter + 713 250 5318

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Earl W. Brown, III +1 417 831 4406 +1 417 831 4511 earl.brown@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lara K. Eshkenazi +1 212 637 2758 +1 212 637 2730 Lara.Eshkenazi@usdoj.gov
, , David W Fuller +1 612 664 5627 +1 612 664 5787 david.fuller@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Andre Jude Lagarde +1 504 680 3009 andre.lagarde@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sarah Sheive Normand +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 sarah.normand@usdoj.gov
, Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrea L. Taylor +1 913 551 6541 andrea.taylor@usdoj.gov
, , Mary Louise Webb +1 404 581 6000 +1 404 581 6181 mary.webb@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jennifer Ellen Blain +1 212 637 2743 +1 212 637 2730 Ellen.Blain@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Vincent Bober +1 212 637 2718 +1 212 637 2786 david.bober@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Mintz +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 jfmintz@debevoise.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Bradley Bruce Banias +1 202 532 4809 bradley.b.banias@usdoj.gov
, , , Timothy Michael Belsan +1 202 532 4596 +1 202 305 7000 timothy.m.belsan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Theodore Hirt +1 202 514 3495

Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant R. Doty +1 314 539 7918 +1 314 539 7895 grant.doty@eeoc.gov

Represented by University Of California, Irvine School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/06/2011, ATTORNEY T Anne Lai +1 203 432 3928 +1 203 432 1426 alai@law.uci.edu

Represented by University Of Tulsa College Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Johnny Clyde Parker +1 918 631 2444

Represented by Varadi, Hair & Checki, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Eric Bicknell, Jr. +1 504 684 5200 john@vhclaw.com
, Galen M. Hair +1 504 684 5200 +1 504 613 6351 hair@vhclaw.com

Represented by Vezina Law PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Monica P. Navarro +1 504 368 5223 mnavarro@vezinalaw.com
, , , , , Joseph Marc Vezina +1 248 558 2700 jmv@vezinalaw.com

Represented by Vincent Wong

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Vincent Wong

Represented by Vitt & Associates, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Geoffrey J. Vitt +1 603 640 6173 gvitt@vittandassociates.com

Represented by Vladeck, Waldman, Elias & Engelhard, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Susan J Walsh +1 212 403 7300 +1 212 221 3172 swalsh@vladeck.com

Represented by Voet, Marc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maryam Jahedi +1 646 455 7678 maryam.jahedi@jahedilaw.com

Represented by Vogels, Ingrid Maria Laurentia Cornelia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chejin Park +1 718 321 7077 +1 347 803 2378 cjparklawyer@gmail.com

Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lindsay E.D. Spillman +1 216 479 6199 +1 216 937 3720 ldspillman@vorys.com

Represented by Warren Benson Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Donald R Warren +1 858 456 1900 +1 858 454 5878 donwarren@warrenbensonlaw.com

Represented by Warshaw Burstein Cohen Schlesinger & Kuh, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kimberly C. Lau +1 212 984 7700 +1 212 972 9150 klau@wbcsk.com

Represented by Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 05/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 05/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 05/18/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine T. Dinan +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 christine_dinan@washlaw.org
, Philip Jerome Fornaci +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 philip_fornaci@washlaw.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hannah E.M. Lieberman +1 202 319 1010 hannah_lieberman@washlaw.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07 Tiffany S. Yang +1 202 319 1000 +1 202 319 1010 tiffany_yang@washlaw.org

Represented by WATSON MCKINNEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Herman Watson, Jr. +1 256 536 7423 +1 256 536 2689 watson@watsonmckinney.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rebekah Keith McKinney +1 256 536 7423 +1 256 536 2689 mckinney@watsonmckinney.com

Represented by Weinberg Roger & Rosenfeld

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Albert Rosenfeld +1 510 337 1001 +1 510 337 1023 courtnotices@unioncounsel.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Albert Rosenfeld +1 510 337 1001 +1 510 337 1023 courtnotices@unioncounsel.net

Represented by Werksman Jackson Hathaway & Quinn Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark M Hathaway +1 213 688 0460 +1 213 624 1946 mhathaway@werksmanjackson.com

Represented by Whatley Kallas, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Edith M Kallas +1 212 447 7070 +1 212 447 7077 ekallas@whatleykallas.com

Represented by WHATLEYKALLAS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Kristin B Libby +1 310 684 2504 +1 888 331 9633 klibby@whatleykallas.com

Represented by White & Associates, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Veronica J. White +1 617 338 9507 +1 617 338 9508 vwhite@vjwlaw.com

Represented by Wiggins Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Cary Stephen Wiggins +1 404 659 2880 cary@wigginslawgroup.com

Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Augustus Howard +1 202 719 7120 +1 202 719 7049 thoward@wileyrein.com

Represented by William M. Brown , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William M. Brown, Jr. +1 203 696 3000 +1 203 579 5575

Represented by William R. Wohlsifer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, William R. Wohlsifer +1 850 219 8888 +1 866 829 8174 william@wohlsifer.com

Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Jerry Walker Kilgore +1 804 783 6933 +7836 783 783 6507 jkilgore@williamsmullen.com

Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Vincent R. Fontana +1 212 490 3000

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Leo Patrick Cunningham +1 650 320 4573 +1 650 565 5100 lcunningham@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , Charlene Koski +1 206 883 2500 ckoski@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , , Luke A Liss +1 650 493 9300 lliss@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , , Nema Milaninia +1 650 493 9300 nmilaninia@wsgr.com
, , , , , Lee-Anne V. Mulholland +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 lmulholland@wsgr.com
, , , , , , , , Anne Veldhuis aveldhuis@wsgr.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kelly Anne Librera +1 212 294 4622 klibrera@winston.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Cardelle Bratton Spangler +1 312 558 5600 cspangler@winston.com

Represented by Witman Stadtmauer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Stephen Mark Charme +1 973 822 0220 +1 973 822 1188 scharme@wsmesq.com

Represented by Witwer, Burlage, Poltrock & Giampietro

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Marie Goss +1 312 236 0606

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Yehuda Kaufman +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 kaufman@whafh.com
Space Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
Space Daniel Tepper +1 212 490 3232 +1 212 490 3263 tepper@whafh.com

Represented by Wong, Wong & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Heng Wang +1 646 543 5848 heng.wang@wanggaolaw.com

Represented by WR Nichols & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , WALLACE R. NICHOLS +1 800 768 0507 +1 800 768 0507 wrn@wrnicholslaw.com

Represented by Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Byron E. Leet +1 502 562 7354 +1 502 589 0309 bleet@wyattfirm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Patrick Hall Neely +1 502 589 5235

Represented by Yelton & Associates P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Robert C. Yelton, III +1 312 223 0200 ryelton@yeltonlaw.com

Represented by Zalkind Duncan & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Monica R. Shah +1 617 742 6020 mshah@zalkindlaw.com
, Naomi Rivkind Shatz +1 617 742 6020 nshatz@zalkindlaw.com

Represented by Zalkind, Rodriquez, Lunt & Duncan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ruth O'Meara-Costello +1 617 742 6020

Represented by Zeichner, Ellman & Krause - CT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Benjamin H. Green +1 203 622 0900 +1 203 862 9889 bgreen@zeklaw.com

Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan David Elliot +20333394 41x 332 5727 +1 203 333 1489 jelliot@znclaw.com

Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jason S. Cowart +1 212 704 9600 +1 212 704 4256 jcowart@zuckerman.com
, , , , , , , , , , , D. BRIAN HUFFORD +1 212 704 9600 dbhufford@zuckerman.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Caroline Elizabeth Reynolds +1 202 778 1800 +1 202 822 8106 creid@zuckerman.com
No Logo Quang Do, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Tomas Espinosa +1 201 223 1803 +1 201 223 1893 attespinosalawfirm@gmail.com

Represented by NATHANS & BIDDLE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Robert W. Biddle +1 410 783 0272 +1 410 783 0518 biddle@nathanslaw.com
No Logo Robert Meadows, Plaintiff

Represented by Cristina A Douglass

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Cristina A Douglass

Represented by Douglas M. Werman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Douglas M. Werman

Represented by J. Nelson Thomas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , J. Nelson Thomas

Represented by Kevin J Calvey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kevin J Calvey

Represented by Kimberly A Glennon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kimberly A Glennon

Represented by Maureen Ann Salas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Maureen Ann Salas

Represented by Robert Meadows

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Meadows +1 678 290 6608
No Logo Sean Donnelly, Plaintiff

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael D. Palmer +1 646 401 0475 +1 646 402 5651 mpalmer@sanfordheisler.com

Represented by Joseph, Herzfeld, Hester & Kirschenbaum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Charles Edward Joseph +1 212 688 5640 +1 212 688 2548 maimon@jhllp.com
, Matthew David Kadushin +1 212 688 5640 +1 212 688 2548 matthew@jhllp.com
v.
No Logo Aalpha Business Services Inc, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices Of Rodney L Donohoo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Rodney Lee Donohoo +1 619 295 3200 +1 619 295 3209 rdonohoo@donohoolaw.com
No Logo Adam Rubinger, Defendant

Represented by Manfield Tannick & Cohen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Stephen H Parsons +1 612 339 4295

Represented by Robert M Mayman Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Robert M Mayman +1 310 553 8111
No Logo Advent Products Inc, Defendant
No Logo American Precision Electronics Inc, Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Neal R Marder +1 310 229 1000 +1 310 229 1001 nmarder@akingump.com

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, John J Lulejian +1 213 894 0721 +1 213 894 0141 john.lulejian@usdoj.gov
No Logo AnnMargret McCullough, Defendant
No Logo Art J Deerey, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jay Marshall Coggan +1 310 407 0922 +1 310 407 0923 cogganlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Baron Technologies, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Allen Turner, Defendant

Represented by Huish Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Karl N Huish +1 602 508 1800

Represented by Robert M Mayman Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Robert M Mayman +1 310 553 8111
No Logo Chris Doane, Defendant

Represented by Glen L Rotner Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Glen L Rotner +1 909 946 4235
No Logo Daniel S Deerey, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jay Marshall Coggan +1 310 407 0922 +1 310 407 0923 cogganlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo David Jones, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Leslie Borgognoni +1 501 371 0310 +1 501 376 6279 lborgognoni@sbcglobal.net
, Matthew Wayne Boyd +1 859 252 0222 +1 859 252 0188 mattboydlaw@aol.com
, John Paul Henderson +1 916 788 1933 +1 916 788 1935 jphend@comcast.net
, Leonard B Levine +1 310 553 6510 +1 310 286 9969 lennyslaw@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Craig Madison Patrick +1 214 665 9510 +1 214 665 9511 craigpatrick@att.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James K Scott +1 865 254 8739 jimscott264@gmail.com
, , , , , , , Daniel M. Shapiro dmslawyer@gmail.com
, Anthony M Solis +1 213 489 5880 +1 213 489 5923 anthonysolislaw@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Keith D Stewart +1 865 437 5081 +1 865 437 5082 keithdstewart@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 07/05/2016 Jonathan David Sussman +1 215 913 9894 lawyerjonathansussman@gmail.com
, , , Edward Zaloba +1 718 261 3000 +1 718 793 0385 ezalobalaw@aol.com

Represented by ACLU of West Virginia Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Lynn Crofts +1 304 345 9246 +1 304 345 0207 jcrofts@acluwv.org

Represented by Agruss Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael S. Agruss +1 312 224 4695 +1 312 253 4451 michael@agrusslawfirm.com

Represented by Allen, Glaessner & Werth Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Peter O. Glaessner +1 415 697 2000 +1 415 813 2045 pglaessner@aghwlaw.com

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E Bower +1 424 256 2884 +1 424 256 2885 dbower@bowerlawgroup.com
, , , David J Diamond +1 520 620 3975 ddiamond@goldbergandosborne.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Perry Primavera +1 201 961 5036 info@perryprimaveralaw.com

Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Michael A. Mosley +1 501 978 6131 +1 501 978 6561 mmosley@arml.org

Represented by Barkan Meizlish Handelman Goodin DeRose Wentz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Katherine S Decker +1 614 221 4221 +1 614 744 2300 kdecker@barkanmeizlish.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert E. DeRose, II +1 614 221 4221 +1 614 744 2300 bderose@barkanmeizlish.com

Represented by Belzley Bathurst Attorneys

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Camille Bathurst +1 502 292 2452 camillebathurst@aol.com

Represented by Burns & Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Gregory A. Belzley +1 502 292 2452 +1 502 494 6186 gbelzley@aol.com

Represented by Craig P Fagan Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Craig P Fagan +1 619 528 9600 +1 619 528 9675 cpfagan@faganlegal.com

Represented by DAVID JONES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Jones

Represented by Driscoll Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Philip Sholtz +1 314 932 3232 +1 314 932 3233 phil@thedriscollfirm.com

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher B Hayes +1 424 256 2884 +1 424 256 2885 chayes@faruqilaw.com

Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lionel Zevi Glancy +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 lglancy@glancylaw.com

Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rex Hwang +1 310 553 3000 +1 310 843 2626 rhwang@glaserweil.com

Represented by Gregory G. Petersen, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gregory G Petersen +1 949 864 2200 +1 949 640 8938 Greg@lawnet.com

Represented by Harrington, Miller & Kieklak, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Thomas N. Kieklak +1 479 751 6464 tkieklak@arkansaslaw.com

Represented by Hedges & Tumposky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Haynes +1 617 722 8220 haynes@htlawyers.com
Space Jessica Diane Hedges +1 617 722 8220 hedges@htlawyers.com
, Michael L. Tumposky +1 617 722 8220 Tumposky@htlawyers.com

Represented by Heygood Orr & Pearson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charles W. Miller +1 214 526 7900 +1 214 526 7900 charles@hop-law.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Eric Donovan Pearson +1 214 237 9001 +1 214 237 9002 eric@hop-law.com

Represented by HIRSCHLER FLEISCHER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Collin Jefferson Hite +1 804 771 9500 +1 804 644 0957 chite@hf-law.com

Represented by Jackson, Demarco, Tidus, Petersen & Peckenpaugh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Roger Mark Franks +1 949 851 7423 +1 949 752 0597 rfranks@jdtplaw.com

Represented by Kane & Papa, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Kane +1 804 225 9500 +1 804 225 9598 jkane@kaneandpapa.com

Represented by KASPER LAW FIRM, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kevin J. Kasper +1 636 922 7100 +1 866 303 2874 kevinkasper@kasperlawfirm.com

Represented by Kevin J Calvey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kevin J Calvey

Represented by Law Offices of Elaine W. Wallace

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Elaine Wendy Wallace +1 510 530 9616 +1 510 482 9285

Represented by Law Offices of Herbert Hafif

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Greg K Hafif +1 909 624 1671 +1 909 625 7772 ghafif@hafif.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Fenja Klaus +1 909 624 1671 +1 909 625 7772 fklaus@hafif.com

Represented by Law Offices of Joseph L Gimbrone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Joseph L Gimbrone +1 619 234 3386

Represented by Law Offices of Peter T Nicholl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Benjamin L Davis, III +1 410 244 7005 +1 410 244 8454 bdavis@nicholllaw.com

Represented by Law Offices of Stephen A Rodriguez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen A Rodriguez +1 323 937 9773

Represented by Law Offices of Stephen J Finita

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Stephen J Finta +1 954 537 5565

Represented by Law Offices Of Tiffany E. Feder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Tiffany E Feder +1 818 380 7500 +1 818 475 1531 tiffany@tiffanyfeder.com

Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Juan Eneas Monteverde +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 jmonteverde@zlk.com

Represented by Lombardi Loper & Conant LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Maria M Lampasona +1 510 433 2600 +1 510 433 2699 mlampasona@llcllp.com

Represented by Los Angeles City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Sharon Siedorf Cardenas +1 213 978 8235 sharon.siedorf.cardenas@lacity.org
, , , , , , , James Kenneth Hahn +1 213 485 0735
, , , , , , , Kevin T Ryan +1 213 485 7268 +1 213 485 8899

Represented by Marshall & Morrow, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Edward Reilley Forman +1 614 463 9790 +1 614 463 9780 eforman@marshallandmorrow.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John S. Marshall +1 614 463 9790 jmarshall@marshallandmorrow.com

Represented by Michael P. Hindelang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Michael P. Hindelang +1 313 465 7412

Represented by Monteverde & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Eldridge Bower +1 310 446 6652 +1 310 210 0605 dbower@monteverdelaw.com

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John David Hayashi +1 714 830 0600 +1 714 830 0700 john.hayashi@morganlewis.com

Represented by Odenbreit Law, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Katherine J Odenbreit +1 888 490 3510 kodenbreit@kjolaw.com

Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan C. Alexander +1 804 786 2071

Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen P. Younger +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 spyounger@pbwt.com

Represented by Pennstuart

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Temple W. Cabell +1 804 819 1770 +1 804 819 1753 tcabell@pennstuart.com

Represented by Perez & Caballero APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Miguel G Caballero +1 213 745 6300 +1 213 746 6060 mcaballero@mpforlaw.com

Represented by Qualls & Workman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel H. Qualls +1 415 782 3660 +1 415 788 1028 qualls@qualls-workman.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Larry M. Roth +1 407 872 7300 +1 407 841 2133 lroth@rumberger.com

Represented by Schaffer & Cabell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Heidi Elizabeth Henderson +1 804 648 0064

Represented by Schumann Rallo & Rosenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Bradley R Mathews +1 714 850 0210 +1 714 850 0551 bmathews@srrlawfirm.com

Represented by Stewart Dupree, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John B Dupree +1 865 437 5081 +1 865 437 5082 john.dupree@knoxtnlaw.com

Represented by Stokes, Williams, Sharp & Davies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Ellis A. Sharp +1 865 544 3833 sandy@stokeswilliams.com

Represented by Suite 1300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry R. Krzys, II +1 330 744 1148 +1 330 744 3807 jkrzys@hendersoncovington.com

Represented by Suite 710

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Philip Justus Dean +1 804 788 0808 +1 804 767 6777 pdean@curwoodlaw.com

Represented by Suite 906

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Renato C. Stabile +1 212 737 0400 +1 212 988 6192 stabile@lefcourtlaw.com

Represented by Thomas & Solomon, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED: 10/03/2016, TERMINATED JARED K. COOK +1 585 272 0540 jcook@theemploymentattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Sarah E. Cressman +1 585 272 0540 +1 585 272 0574 scressman@theemploymentattorneys.com
TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED: 05/24/2017, TERMINATED Elizabeth Claire Curwin +1 585 272 0540 +1 585 272 0963 edavidson@theemploymentattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Jonathan W. Ferris +1 585 272 0540 +1 585 272 0574 jferris@theemploymentattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz +1 585 272 0540 +1 585 272 0574 jlukasiewicz@theemploymentattorneys.com

Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Rudolph F. Aragon +1 305 371 2700 +3585 358 358 5744 raragon@whitecase.com
, , , James Nial Robinson, II +1 305 995 5206 +3585 358 358 5744 jrobinson@whitecase.com

Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY Megan K Mechak +1 202 833 8855 mkm@wmlaborlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DIANA JANE NOBILE +1 202 833 8855 djn@wmlaborlaw.com

Represented by Workman Law Firm, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robin G Workman +1 415 782 3660 +1 415 788 1028 robin@workmanlawpc.com

Represented by Wright & Schulte, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard W. Schulte +1 937 435 7500 +1 937 435 7511 rschulte@yourlegalhelp.com
No Logo Derek E Trone, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Peter J Linden +1 949 548 3529 twotrust1@aol.com

Represented by Derek E Trone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek E Trone +1 714 803 3807

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Stephen Sandor Korniczky +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 stephenkorniczky@sheppardmullin.com

Represented by Shulman Hodges & Bastian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Ronald S Hodges +1 949 340 3400 +1 949 340 3000 rhodges@shbllp.com
No Logo Felix Su, Defendant

Represented by Evans Brizendine & Silver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William David Evans +1 562 436 9001
No Logo Future Capital Corp, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Peter J Linden +1 949 548 3529 twotrust1@aol.com

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Stephen Sandor Korniczky +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2555 stephenkorniczky@sheppardmullin.com

Represented by Shulman Hodges & Bastian LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Ronald S Hodges +1 949 340 3400 +1 949 340 3000 rhodges@shbllp.com
No Logo Global Capital Corp, Defendant

Represented by Huish Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Karl N Huish +1 602 508 1800

Represented by Robert M Mayman Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Robert M Mayman +1 310 553 8111
No Logo Greg A Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Heidi E Mathes, Defendant
No Logo Intertek Electronics Inc, Defendant

Represented by Evans Brizendine & Silver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , William David Evans +1 562 436 9001
No Logo James Lucia, Defendant

Represented by Seo, Eun-kyoung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Donald Segretti +1 949 553 8088 +1 949 553 8188
No Logo Jared Forcier, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephan James Johnson +1 909 483 0515 stephan_johnson12@yahoo.com
No Logo Jeff Gettle, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Zinn, Defendant
No Logo Jesse N Rodriquez, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jay Marshall Coggan +1 310 407 0922 +1 310 407 0923 cogganlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Jim Stevens, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard P Blumberg +1 206 223 0344 rpblumberg@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Edward Anthony Fleck +1 516 742 5200 +1 516 248 1085 flecklaw@yahoo.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Angela M. Ford +1 859 268 2923 +1 859 268 9141 amford@windstream.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Anthony Joseph Ginster +1 425 462 8240 + 425 462 9660 aginster@msn.com
, , , , , , , , , Reino C. Lanto, Jr. +1 217 379 4373 +1 217 379 2844 rlanto@aol.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gerald Alan Role +1 202 547 4678 rolelawdc@gmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lynn Denise Weir +1 206 323 0174 weirandotsea@comcast.net

Represented by 260 Madison Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Joseph Michael Heppt +1 212 973 0839 +1 212 973 0891 joseph.heppt@hepptlaw.com

Represented by 7th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Larry Hutcher +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 286 1884 lkh@dmlegal.com

Represented by ACLU of Michigan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sofia V. Nelson +1 313 578 6806 +1 313 578 6811 snelson@aclumich.org

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Fund of Michigan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael J. Steinberg +1 313 578 6814 msteinberg@aclumich.org

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel R. Dolan, II +1 505 883 1266 +1 505 888 7509 dan@lobo.net
, , , , , Mark D. Guilfoyle +1 859 341 1881 +1 859 341 4879 mguilfoyle@dbllaw.com
, , , , , Mark R. Hervey +1 859 426 2193 +1 859 341 1469 mhervey@dbllaw.com
, , , , , James F. Malloy +1 570 330 7563 james.malloy@selective.com
, , , , , Christopher Markus +1 859 341 1881 +1 859 341 1469 cmarkus@dbllaw.com
, Brian G Maxey +1 206 733 9001 +1 206 684 8284 brian.maxey@seattle.gov
, , , , , Richard G. Meyer +1 859 341 1881 +1 859 341 6239 rmeyer@dbllaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gwenn R Rinkenberger +1 219 465 3329 +1 219 465 3362 grinkenberger@porterco.org
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joanna Frances Sandolo +1 914 517 5000 +1 914 517 5055 jsandolo@mdpcelaw.com
, William W. Swor +1 313 967 0200 wwswor@wwnet.net
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Rebecca E Wardlaw +1 505 768 4666 rwardlaw@cabq.gov

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Van H. Beckwith +1 214 953 6505 +1 214 661 4505 van.beckwith@bakerbotts.com
, , , Allyson N. Ho +1 214 953 6862 +1 214 661 4862 allyson.ho@bakerbotts.com

Represented by Bernalillo County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael I. Garcia +1 505 314 0180 +1 505 314 0282 mikgarcia@bernco.gov

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Hal A. Goldsmith +1 314 259 2533 +1 314 552 8533 hal.goldsmith@bryancave.com

Represented by Byler & Blaker, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Evan A. Blaker +1 856 577 6765 +1 215 238 9301 eblaker@bylerblaker.com
, , , , , , , , , , Anthony L. Byler +1 215 262 7191 +1 215 238 9301 tbyler@bylerblaker.com

Represented by Carolyn Diane Richmond

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Carolyn Diane Richmond

Represented by Cary & Cary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Frederick A. Cary +1 305 767 4800

Represented by CAVANAGH LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Michael Jude Sorich +1 312 425 1900 mjs@CavanaghLawGroup.com

Represented by CHRISTIE LAW GROUP PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert Leslie Christie +1 206 957 9669 +1 206 352 7875 bob@christielawgroup.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas P Miller +1 206 957 9669 +1 206 352 7875 tom@christielawgroup.com

Represented by Christopher P Collins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher P Collins

Represented by City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Laura Gordon +1 915 541 4550 gordonlp@elpasotexas.gov

Represented by City of Akron - Civil Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael J. Defibaugh +1 330 375 2030 +1 330 375 2041 mdefibaugh@akronohio.gov

Represented by City of Albuquerque Legal Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Samantha M. Hults +1 505 768 4500 +1 505 768 4400 shults@cabq.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Rachel Trafican +1 505 768 4500 +1 505 768 4440 rtrafican@cabq.gov

Represented by City of Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Andrew S. Mine +1 312 744 5100 amine@cityofchicago.org

Represented by City of Tampa Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Ursula Danese Richardson +1 813 274 7205 +1 813 274 8809 ursula.richardson@ci.tampa.fl.us

Represented by Cook County State's Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jacqueline B. Carroll +1 312 603 6634 jacqueline.carroll@cookcountyil.gov

Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTI Peter Thomas Barbur +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 pbarbur@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, L Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com

Represented by Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William N. Wright +1 203 351 4677 +1 203 708 3892 wwright@cl-law.com

Represented by Davidoff, Malito & Citron, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, A Michael Wexelbaum +1 646 428 3225 mw@dhclegal.com

Represented by DEARMIN FOGARTY PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Paul E Fogarty +1 206 441 0172 +1 206 826 9405 pfogarty@dearminfogarty.com

Represented by Dolan & Luzzi LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael J. Luzzi +1 203 230 1678 +1 203 230 2552 mluzzi@dolanluzzilaw.com

Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen P. Lucke +1 612 343 7947 +1 612 340 2868 lucke.steve@dorsey.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kirsten E. Schubert +1 612 492 6755 +1 612 340 2868 schubert.kirsten@dorsey.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Thomas Paul Swigert +1 612 492 5677 +1 612 340 2868 swigert.tom@dorsey.com

Represented by Fisher & Phillips LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Theresa Marie Gallion +1 813 769 7500 +7697 769 769 7501 tgallion@fisherphillips.com

Represented by FREY BUCK PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephen Powell Larson +1 206 486 8000 +1 206 902 9660 slarson@freybuck.com

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Lili Zandpour +2 129 833 1100 +2 129 833 1250 lzandpour@fklaw.com

Represented by Gallagher Sharp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Melanie R. Irvin +1 216 522 1074 +1 216 241 1608 mirvin@gallaghersharp.com
, , , , , , Steven D. Strang +1 216 522 1037 +1 216 241 1608 sstrang@gallaghersharp.com

Represented by George F Heidke , Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , George F Heidke, Jr.

Represented by Glenn Thomas Burhans , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Glenn Thomas Burhans, Jr.

Represented by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , John L Kirtley +1 414 273 3500 +1 414 273 5198 jkirtley@gklaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Howard A Pollack +1 414 273 3500 +1 414 273 5198 hpollack@gklaw.com

Represented by Gregg M Mashberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gregg M Mashberg

Represented by HARDIN, JESSON & TERRY, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kynda Almefty-hernandez +1 501 850 0015 kalmefty@hardinlaw.com

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , James Raymond Williams +1 212 545 4010 +1 212 545 4079 williamj@jacksonlewis.com

Represented by James M. Lemonedes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James M. Lemonedes

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Andrew Harrison Bart +1 212 891 1645 +1 212 891 1699 abart@jenner.com

Represented by John Does

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Does

Represented by John Walter Fried

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Walter Fried

Represented by Kane County State's Attorneys Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Joseph Matthew Cullen +1 630 208 5322 cullenjoe@co.kane.il.us

Represented by Keating, Bucklin & McCormack, Inc., P.S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Andrew G Cooley +1 206 623 8861 +1223942 +12 223 9423 acooley@kbmlawyers.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stewart Andrew Estes +1 206 623 8861 +1223942 +12 223 9423 sestes@kbmlawyers.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Richard B Jolley +1 206 623 8861 +1223942 +12 223 9423 rjolley@kbmlawyers.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kimberly J Waldbaum +1 206 623 8861 kwaldbaum@kbmlawyers.com

Represented by Keating, Muething & Klekamp, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael L Scheier +1 513 579 6540 mscheier@kmklaw.com

Represented by Kent Kari Anker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kent Kari Anker

Represented by Kessler & Mullkoff

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Douglas R. Mullkoff +1 734 761 8585 doug@kmhlaw.com

Represented by LAW LYMAN DANIEL KAMERRER & BOGDANOVICH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Guy Bogdanovich +1 360 754 3480 +1 360 357 3511 gbogdanovich@lldkb.com

Represented by Law Offices Of Bradford A Patrick Pa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Bradford Allen Patrick +1 813 384 8548 +1 813 333 7321 notices@baplegal.com

Represented by Law Offices of Gordon C Webb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gordon C Webb +1 425 454 3800 +1 425 454 5399 gordon@webblawfirm.net

Represented by Law Offices of Malathi Echambadi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Malathi Echambadi

Represented by Leahey & Johnson, P.C.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christopher D. Clarke +1 212 269 7308 +1 212 422 4751 cclarke@leaheyandjohnson.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joanne Filiberti +1 212 269 7308 +1 212 422 4751 jfiliberti@leaheyandjohnson.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter James Johnson, Jr. +1 212 269 7308 pjohnsonjr@leaheyandjohnson.com

Represented by Levi Lubarsky & Feigenbaum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Alan Howard Scheiner +1 212 308 7261 +1 212 308 8830 ascheiner@llf-law.com

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jon E Hokanson +1 213 250 1800 +1 213 250 7900 hokanson@lbbslaw.com
, Thomas Sloan Kidde +1 213 680 5061 +1 213 250 7900 kidde@lbbslaw.com

Represented by Logan Jolly and Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James D Jolly, Jr. +1 864 226 1910 +1 864 226 1931 jolly@loganjollysmith.com

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Babatunde Mobolade Animashaun +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6495 anima-shaunt@ag.state.la.us

Represented by LYNCH COX GILMAN & MAHAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Donald L. Cox +1 502 589 4215 +1 502 589 4994 doncox@lcgandm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , David W. Hemminger +1 502 589 4215 +1 502 589 4994 dhemminger@lcgandm.com

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED: 12/11/2017, TERMINATED Dale Joseph Giali +1 213 229 9509 +1 213 576 8121 dgiali@mayerbrown.com

Represented by Michelman & Robinson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jesse J Contreras +1 818 783 5530 +1 818 783 5507 jcontreras@mrllp.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mona Z Hanna +1 818 783 5530 +1 818 783 5507 mhanna@mrllp.com

Represented by Milwaukee City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Susan E Lappen +1 414 286 2601 +1 414 286 8550 slappe@milwaukee.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Jan A Smokowicz +1 414 286 2601 +1 414 286 8550 jsmoko@milwaukee.gov

Represented by Monica Anne Connell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Monica Anne Connell

Represented by Murtha & Murtha, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michelle Murtha +1 631 747 0356 +1 631 991 7168 mmurtha@murthalawfirm.com

Represented by Nassau County Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Liora M. Ben-Sorek +1 516 571 3014 +1 516 571 3058 lben-sorek@nassaucountyny.gov

Represented by Neal & Harwell, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , William Taylor Ramsey +1 615 244 1713 +1 615 726 0573 wramsey@nealharwell.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kendra Elizabeth Samson +1 615 244 1713 +1 615 726 0573 ksamson@nealharwell.com

Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Linda Donahue +1 212 788 0892 +1 212 788 9776 ldonahue@law.nyc.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Fred Michael Weiler +1 212 788 1817 +1 212 788 9776 fweiler@law.nyc.gov

Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Mark David Zuckerman +1 212 442 8248 +1 212 788 9776 mzuckerm@law.nyc.gov

Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael Keith Gertzer +1 212 788 0786 +1 212 788 9776 mgertzer@law.nyc.gov

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw , +1 202 383 5163 +1 202 383 5414 bbradshaw@omm.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Amy J Longo , +1 949 823 7175 +1 949 823 6994 alongo@omm.com

Represented by Office of General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Daniel Ortiz +1 915 594 5578 +1 915 594 5699 daortiz@epwu.org

Represented by Parker Hanski, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Glen Howard Parker +1 212 248 7400 +1 212 248 5600 ghp@parkerhanski.com

Represented by Patterson Buchanan Fobes Leitch & Kalzer PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin J Kay +1 206 462 6739 +1 206 462 6701 kjk@pattersonbuchanan.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susanna Michele Buergel +1 212 373 3553 +1 212 492 0553 sbuergel@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Brad Scott Karp +1 212 373 2384 +1 212 373 2384 bkarp@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Karen R. King +1 212 373 3784 +1 212 492 0784 kking@paulweiss.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard A. Rosen +1 212 373 3305 +1 212 373 2359 rrosen@paulweiss.com

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Renee M. Howard +1 206 359 6751 +1 206 359 7745 rhoward@perkinscoie.com
, , , , , , , David B Robbins +1 206 359 6745 +1 206 359 7745 drobbins@perkinscoie.com

Represented by PFAU COCHRAN VERTETIS AMALA PLLC (TACOMA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Darrell L Cochran +1 253 777 0799 darrell@pcvalaw.com

Represented by PIERCE COUCH HENDRICKSON BAYSINGER & GREEN-OKC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Randall J. Wood +1 405 235 1611 +1 405 235 2904 rwood@piercecouch.com

Represented by PIERCE COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (CIVIL)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michelle Luna-Green +1 253 798 6732 mluna@co.pierce.wa.us

Represented by Richard M. Howard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard M. Howard

Represented by Sadis & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Jennifer Amy Rossan +1 212 788 0867 +1 212 788 9776 jrossan@sglawyers.com

Represented by Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Bennette D. Kramer +1 212 344 5400 +1 212 344 7677 bdk@schlamstone.com

Represented by Seattle City Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dominique L Jinhong +1 206 684 8251 dominique.jinhong@seattle.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sarah K Morehead +1 206 233 2158 sarah.morehead@seattle.gov

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Victoria S. Shin +1 212 218 5539 +1 212 344 1222 vshin@seyfarth.com

Represented by Shea and Larocque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Babak Pourtavoosi +1 917 597 4766 +1 718 732 4514 bpesq2@yahoo.com

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Emily Seymour Costin +1 202 772 5359 +1 202 312 9447 ecostin@sheppardmullin.com

Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Mark Bruce Blocker +1 312 853 6097 +1 312 853 7036 mblocker@sidley.com
, , , , , , David F. Graham +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 5599 dgraham@sidley.com
, , , , , , Rachel B Niewoehner +1 312 853 7588 +1 312 853 7036 rniewoehner@sidley.com
, , , , , , Alison V. Potter +1 312 853 7563 apotter@sidley.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter J Shaw +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036

Represented by Silverman and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gerald Stephen Smith, Jr. +1 914 574 4510 +1 914 574 4515 gsmith@silvermanandassociatesny.com

Represented by SNOHOMISH COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY (CIVIL)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Charlotte F Comer +1 425 388 6300 ccomer@co.snohomish.wa.us
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael C Held +1 425 388 6330 + 425 388 6333 mheld@co.snohomish.wa.us

Represented by Ste 2000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Fred C Wist, II +1 206 464 6430 Fredw@atg.wa.gov

Represented by Ste. 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Riley +1 440 244 5214 +1 440 244 0244 law@rileyresar.com

Represented by Stephen M. Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stephen M. Hall

Represented by Suite 650

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Timothy J. Buckley, III +1 404 633 9230 +1 404 633 9640 tbuckley@bchlawpc.com
, , Kelly L. Christopher +1 404 633 9230 +1 404 633 9640 kchristopher@bchlawpc.com

Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Brian Weinthal +1 312 836 4074 bweinthal@taftlaw.com

Represented by The Pietz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Morgan E. Pietz +1 310 424 5557 +1 310 546 5301 mepietz@pietzlawfirm.com

Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , David Christopher Nelson +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 David.C.Nelson@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Laura Beckerman +1 202 307 6560 +1 202 514 5238 Laura.C.Beckerman@usdoj.gov

Represented by University of Michigan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Bridget M. McCormack +1 734 763 4319 +1 734 764 4702 mclp@umich.edu

Represented by Walz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jerry A. Walz +1 505 275 1800 +1 505 275 1802 jerryawalz@walzandassociates.com

Represented by WEBSTER MRAK & BLUMBERG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James H Webster +1 206 223 0344 +1 206 223 0316 jhwatty@wmblaw.net

Represented by Webster Szanyi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Susan B. Parzymieso +1 716 842 2800 +1 716 845 6709 sparzymieso@websterszanyi.com

Represented by West Michigan Regional Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Miriam J. Aukerman +1 616 301 0930 maukerman@aclumich.org

Represented by Wiggins, Williams & Wiggins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Theresa Gheen +1 505 764 8400 +1 505 764 8585 tgheen@wwwlaw.us

Represented by WILLIAMS KASTNER & GIBBS (SEA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Sheryl Denise Johnson Willert +1 206 628 6600 +1 206 628 6611 swillert@williamskastner.com
, , , , , , , , , , Gregory Douglas Shelton +1 206 628 2416 gshelton@williamskastner.com

Represented by WILLMAN & SILVAGGIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Steven G. Blackmer +1 412 366 3333 +1 412 366 3462 sblackmer@willmanlaw.com

Represented by Withers Bergman Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , James Edward Nealon +1 212 848 9800 +1 212 848 9888 James.Nealon@withersworldwide.com

Represented by Wood Herron & Evans, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gregory F Ahrens +1 513 241 2324 +1 513 241 6234 gahrens@whepatent.com
No Logo Kevin Baronowsky, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Stewart Hjelm, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly Deerey, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jay Marshall Coggan +1 310 407 0922 +1 310 407 0923 cogganlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Li Sang, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alexander G Calfo +1 213 443 4355 +1 310 443 4355 acalfo@kslaw.com
No Logo Mark McHugh, Defendant
No Logo Micro Contract Assembly Inc, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Thomas W Harris, Jr. +1 949 477 2390 +1 949 477 2394 twharrisjr@hotmail.com
No Logo Parcel Handlers Ltd, Defendant
No Logo PCE & Associates Inc, Defendant

Represented by Edwards & Hayden

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mark E Edwards +1 714 730 1792

Represented by Jeffery T Kipi Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jeffery T Kipi +1 407 772 0812
No Logo Property Traders Inc, Defendant

Represented by Seo, Eun-kyoung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Donald Segretti +1 949 553 8088 +1 949 553 8188
No Logo Rick E Trone, Defendant
No Logo Rick Lee, Defendant
No Logo S & J Lucia Family Limited Partnership, -, Defendant

Represented by Seo, Eun-kyoung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Donald Segretti +1 949 553 8088 +1 949 553 8188
No Logo Sandy New, Defendant

Represented by Seo, Eun-kyoung

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Donald Segretti +1 949 553 8088 +1 949 553 8188
No Logo Scott Madzig, Defendant
No Logo Smart Card Solutions Inc, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alexander G Calfo +1 213 443 4355 +1 310 443 4355 acalfo@kslaw.com
No Logo Steven Hutt, Defendant
No Logo Stewart and Tadd Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tdbam Ltd, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jay Marshall Coggan +1 310 407 0922 +1 310 407 0923 cogganlaw@yahoo.com
No Logo Vector Technologies Inc, Defendant

Represented by Huish Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Karl N Huish +1 602 508 1800

Represented by Robert M Mayman Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Robert M Mayman +1 310 553 8111
No Logo William Zinn, Defendant

Represented by William Zinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Zinn +1 714 777 7774
Other Parties
DirecTV Group, Inc. DirecTV Group, Inc., Movant
Officially listed as "Directv Inc"

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Lisa Gilford +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 lisa.gilford@alston.com
, , Michael James Hartley +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 michael.hartley@alston.com
, , Louis A. Karasik +1 213 576 1000 +1 213 576 1100 lou.karasik@alston.com

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deirdre C McGlinchey +1 318 651 0807 +1 318 651 0809 dmcglinchey@mcglinchey.com

Represented by Butler Rubin Saltarelli & Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , JASON S. DUBNER +1 312 444 9660 jdubner@butlerrubin.com
, , Ursula A. Taylor +1 312 696 4461 utaylor@butlerrubin.com

Represented by Finger Fraser and Andrews

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Terry Allan Finger +1 843 681 7000 +1 843 681 8802 tfinger@fingerlaw.com

Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Connie L Chen +1 310 598 4170 +1 310 556 9828 cchen@foxrothschild.com
, , Jonathan David Christman +1 610 397 6500 +1 610 397 0450 jchristman@foxrothschild.com
, , , Colin D Dougherty +1 610 397 6500 +1 610 397 0450 cdougherty@foxrothschild.com
, , Yesenia M Gallegos +1 310 598 4150 +1 310 556 9828 ygallegos@foxrothschild.com

Represented by Greer, Herz & Adams, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Freddie Black +1 409 797 3210

Represented by Karish & Bjorgum PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, A. Eric Bjorgum +1 213 785 8070 +1 213 955 5010 eric.bjorgum@kb-ip.com

Represented by Lonstein Law Office PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Wayne David Lonstein +1 845 647 8500 +1 845 647 6277 Info@SignalLaw.com

Represented by Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, William C Scott +1 505 848 1824 +1 505 848 9710 bscott@modrall.com

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Adam J Karr +1 949 760 9600 +1 949 823 6994 akarr@omm.com

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dale Hugh Oliver +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 daleoliver@quinnemanuel.com
, Michael E. Williams +1 213 443 3251 +1 213 624 0643 michaelwilliams@quinnemanuel.com

Represented by Weston Benshoof Rochefort Rubalcava & MacCuish LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Erin L Curran +1 213 576 1000

Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon Calfo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Deborah T Boylston +1 206 516 3800 +1 206 516 3888

Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Scott T Wilsdon +1 206 516 3800 +1 206 516 3888 wilsdon@yarmuth.com
Attributes
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2510
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (308) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER filed. Case reassigned to Western Division by order filed 6/12/02. New case no. CV 02-5194PA(RCx) assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings; all discovery matters are transferred to Discovery Rosalyn M. Chapman . (Original file transferred.) (cc: all counsel) (csb) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE approved by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the creation of the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson, this case is transferred from the calendar of Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings., Case referred to Discovery Rosalyn M. Chapman (cc: all counsel) (csb) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 6/13/02 of 1) Plf Directv Inc's ntc of w/drawal of mot to amd 3rd A/C & refiling of revised mot to amd 3rd A/C, 2) Plf Directv Inc's ntc of mot & mot to amd 3rd A/C to dismiss trade secret claim & to conform cmp to reflect ptys previously added as Dfts in this actn (see doc for fur details) (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by plaintiff Directv Inc of lodging [proposed] 4th A/C in suppt of mot to amd 3rd A/C to dism trade secret claim & to conform cmp to reflect ptys previously added as Dfts in this actn (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger by plaintiff Directv Inc (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST by plaintiff Directv Inc for Judicial Notice in suppt of motion for leave to amd 3rd A/C to dism trade secret claim to conform cmp to reflect ptys previously added as Dfts in this actn [301-1] (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilsdon by plaintiff Directv Inc in suppt of motion for leave to amd 3rd A/C to dism trade secret claim to conform cmp to reflect ptys previously added as Dfts in this actn [301-1] (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff Directv Inc for leave to amd 3rd A/C to dism trade secret claim & to conform cmp to reflect ptys previously added as Dfts in this actn ; motion hearing set for 8:30 7/22/02 (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by plaintiff Directv Inc withdrawing motion for leave to amd cmp to dism trade secret claim [295-1] & refiling of revised mot to amd 3rd A/C (mg) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Dfts Kevin S Hjelm & Stewart and Tadd Inc dba Help-U-Mail and any persons or entities controlled directly or indirectly by them including but not limited to employees of Help-U-Mail, are hereby permanently enjoined and restrained from (see doc for specifics) (mt) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter for limited stay of proceedings re dfts Kevin S Hjelm and Stewart & Tadd Inc dba Help-U-Mail until 7/1/02. Ptys have settled this actn & intend to file a ntc of dism on the 1st to occur of 30 days after the depos of dft Hjelm, or 6/31/02. (mt) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 6/6/02 of Directv's ntc of mot & mot to amd 3rd amd cmp to dism trade secret claim, decl of Michael Rosenberger, [Proposed] ord GR Directv's mot to amd cmp to dism trade secrets (mg) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger by plaintiff Directv Inc (mg) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff Directv Inc for leave to amd cmp to dism trade secret claim ; motion hearing set for 10:00 7/1/02 (mg) (Entered: 06/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO JUDGMENT by Chris Doane, d/b/a "PC Man" & "PC Ease" authorizing the immediate entry of the fol Permanent Injunction w/out the issuance of process or ntc herein & the entry of jgm in the amount of $50,000.00 in favor of Plf DIRECTV Inc (see doc for fur details) (mg) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 6/5/02 of 1) Consent to Jgm by Dfts Kevin S Hjelm & Stewart & Tadd, Inc D/B/A Help-U-Mail, 2) Stip & [Proposed] Perm Injunction (Re: Dfts Kevin S. Hjelm & Stewart & Tadd, Inc. D/B/A Help-U-Mail) (see doc for fur details) (mg) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO JUDGMENT by Dfts Kevin S Hjelm & Stewart & Tadd, Inc D/B/A Help-U-Mail authorizing the immediate entry of the fol Permanent Injunction w/out the issuance of process or ntc herein & the entry of jgm in the amount of $50,000.00 in favor of Plf (see doc for fur details) (mg) (Entered: 06/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Michael J. Steponovich Jr by defendant Jennifer Zinn and substituting Jennifer Zinn (as pro se) by Judge David O. Carter (rmi) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating atty Michael J. Steponovich Jr by defendant William Zinn and substituting William Zinn (as pro se) by Judge David O. Carter (rmi) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USM Form 285 executed on 3/22/02. Type of process: order & writ (mg) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USM Form 285 executed of Order & Writ on 3/22/02. Remarks: Ind ID 2401-11-4505; DOB 11-4-81. All items released to Atty Spencer Freedman (mg) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBIT A to stip & [proposed] ord forfeiting impounded articles (re: dfts Li Sang and Smart Card Solutions Inc) (mt) (Entered: 04/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBIT A to stip and [prop] ord forfeiting forzen bank accounts & other assets )re: dfts Li Sang & Smart Card Solutions Inc) (mt) Modified on 04/27/2002 (Entered: 04/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter forfeiting impounded articles (re dfts, Li Sang & Smart Card Solutions Inc) (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter that as partial consideration in the sttlmt of plf DIRECTV Inc's clms agnst the Sang dfts, the Sang dfts irrevocably forfeit & assign to DIRECTV any right clm or interest they have or may believe they have in the accts & other assets that were frozen purs to the TRO issued by this crt; the crt shall retain juris (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter dismissing all clms agnst dft, Smart Card Solutions Inc & Li Sang w/prej & w/out attys' fees or cost (rmi) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re permanent injunction : dfts, Li Sang and Smart Card Solutions Inc (the "Sang dfts") & any persons or entities controlled directly or indirectly by them are hereby perm enj & restrained frm: (see doc for specifics; terminating party Smart Card Solutions, party Li Sang ; the crt retain juris to entertain such fur prcdgs & to ent such fur ord as may be necessary or appropriate to implement &/or enforce the provisions of this perm inj (rmi) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re preliminary injunction & ord of asset freeze ; dfts Jun Lui, DSSCity, DSSNA & Digital Source Solutions shall be enj frm: (see doc for specifics); dft June Lui fur consents to the crt's ent of a prelim inj freezing as fol: Jun Lui and any persons or entities acting on Jun Lui's behalf incl but not limited to the financial institutions below are hereby enj frm: (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO JGM by Dft Li Sang & Smart Card Solutions Inc (mg) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (In Chambers) by Judge David O. Carter: The crt continues the hrgs on Contempt of Dft Li Sang & to show cause re prelim injunction against Jun Lui from 4/8/02 at 8:30 to 4/15/02 at 8:30. If the stip orders are submitted to the Crt by noon on 4/11/02, no appearance shall be necessary. The Crt fur orders that the TRO remain in effect up to & includ 4/15/02. CR: (not present) (mg) (Entered: 04/16/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Directv Inc (re 4/8/2 hrg on contempt, prelim inj & impundment ord) (rmi) (Entered: 04/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff on 3/20/02 of ex parte appl re: Sang Contempt and supporting documents (csb) (Entered: 04/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Spencer D. Freeman by plaintiff Directv Inc re ext of time to file prop ord of dism angst dft, Sang dfts [275-2] (rmi) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter that the time to file a stip & prop ord of dism for claims against the Sang dfts is extended to 4/5/02 (mt) (Entered: 04/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AS TO DFT LI SANG held by Judge David O. Carter: Cnsl inform the crt that ptys have reach an agreement. Terms of the agreement are read into the record. Dft Li Sang called, sworn & testified. Crt ord contempt hrg held in abeyance pend submission of sttlmt papers. Cnsl for plf shall prepare & lodge a prop ord & prop writ of seizure for signature. CR: Gail Peeples (mt) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting plf's fourth ex parte appl for (1) TRO, (2) writ of seizure, and (3) OSC: Crt hereby ENJOINS Jun Lui, Dss City, Digital Source Solutions, Dss Zone, & Dss NA from mfg, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in: (see doc for specifics); US Marshal &/or other state, cnty or local law enforcement authorities are fur directed to transf all items seized purs to the writ into the custody of plf DIRECTV who shall act as substitute custodian & who shall store the seized items in secured manner pend fur ord of this crt; The $100,000 bond prev posted by plf DIRECTV shall remain in place & shall satisfy any claims relating to the TRO & writ of seizure authorized by this crt; The dfts affected by this ord are ord to appr 4/8/02 at 8:30am & show cause why a prelim inj should not issue & why the items seized should not remain impounded pend trial in this actn. Dfts shall srv & file any papers in opp NLT 5 crt days prior to hrg. Plf shall srv & file any rply papers NLT 2 crt days prior to hrg. (mt) (Entered: 03/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of William J Thorn by plaintiff Directv Inc (re: Sang Contempt) (mt) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 3/21/02 of decl of William J Thorn (re Sang contempt) (mt) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 3/20/02 of Rply memo in suppt of Plf's ex parte appl (re Sang contempt, decl of Lauren Dunivan (re Sang contempt), decl of Daniel Higgins (re: Sang contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Directv Inc in suppt of Plf's Ex parte appl (re: Sang contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Daniel Higgins by plaintiff Directv Inc (re: Sang contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Lauren Dunivan by plaintiff Directv Inc (re: Sang contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMD AFFIDAVIT of Li Sang (mg) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Li Sang (mg) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION by defendants Li Sang, Smart Card Solutions to finding of Crt contempt & award of sancs & req for sancs under LR 27 (mg) (Entered: 03/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 3/14/02 of personal svc of plf's ex parte appl re (Sang Contempt) (see doc for fur specifics) (mt) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOC WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc re Order GR Plf's appl for lv to file under seal of Crt (re: Sang contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOC WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc re Memo in suppt of Plf's ex parte appl (re: Sang contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/16/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOC WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc re: Memo in suppt of Plf's appl for lv to file under seal of Crt (Re: Sang Contempt) (mg) (Entered: 03/16/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOC WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE RE: Plf's appl for lv under seal of Crt (Re: Sang Contempt) by plaintiff Directv Inc (mg) (Entered: 03/16/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STTLMNT AGREEMENT and release (mg) (Entered: 02/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Derek E Trone in propria persona by defendant Future Capital Corp and substituting attorney Peter J Linden by Judge David O. Carter (mg) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Derek E Trone in propria persona by defendant Derek E Trone and substituting attorney Peter J Linden by Judge David O. Carter (mg) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating Future Capital Corporation, in Propia Persona by defendant Future Capital Corp and substituting attorney Peter J Linden of The Law Offices of Peter J Linden by Judge David O. Carter (mg) Modified on 02/19/2002 (Entered: 02/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL of all claims w/prejudice against dft Adam Rubinger by plaintiff (mt) (Entered: 02/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of crt's minutes granting Marshack Shulman Hodges & Bastian LLP's motion to withdraw as counsel of record by defendant Derek E Trone, defendant Future Capital Corp (mt) (Entered: 02/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Li Sang, defendant Smart Card Solutions (mt) (Entered: 02/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Li Sang, defendant Smart Card Solutions to 3rd amended complaint [163-1] (mt) (Entered: 02/09/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating atty Ronald S Hodges of Marshack Shulman Hodges & Bastian by defendant Derek E Trone and substituting attorney Peter J Linden of Law Offices of Peter J Linden by Judge David O. Carter (mg) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION by plaintiff Directv Inc to Marshack Shulman Hodges & Bastian LLP's motion for leave to w/draw as attys of record for Derek E Trone and Future Capital Corp and to be discharged from further obligations to them [237-1] (mg) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant American Precision Electronics Inc (mg) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant American Precision Electronics Inc to 3d Amd Cmp; jury demand (mg) (Entered: 02/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (In Chambers): Granting Marshack's motion for leave to w/draw as attys of record for Dfts Derek E Trone and Future Capital Corp [237-1] by Judge David O. Carter; Marshak is fur ORD to ensure that represented Dfts rcv a copy of this Ord. Marshak is fur ORD to 1) provide the dfts' current addresses & phone #'s 2) inform represented dfts & all attys of rec that said address will be the address to which all future docs will be svc until changed by appropriate ntc or subst of attys (see doc for fur details); the Clk shall svc this min Ord on all ptys to the actn; CR: (not present) (mg) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Ronald S Hodges for Derek E Trone by defendant Derek E Trone and substituting Derek E Trone (pro per) approved by Judge David O. Carter (mt) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Marshack Shulman Hodges & Bastian LLP's by defendant Derek E Trone, defendant Future Capital Corp for leave to w/draw as attys of record for Derek E Trone and Future Capital Corp and to be discharged from further obligations to them ; decl in suppt; motion hearing set for 8:30 2/4/02 (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION AS TO OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Art J Deerey, defendant Kimberly Deerey, defendant Daniel S Deerey, defendant Jesse N Rodriquez, defendant Tdbam Ltd (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Art J Deerey, defendant Kimberly Deerey, defendant Daniel S Deerey, defendant Jesse N Rodriquez, defendant Tdbam Ltd to 3rd amended complaint [163-1] (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter forfeiting impounded articles re dfts Greg A Fischer and Advent Products Inc (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re: permanent injunction. Dfts Greg A Fischer and Advent Products Inc and any persons or entities controlled directly or indirectly by them are hereby permanent enjoined and restrained from: (see doc for specifics) (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff of defendants Greg A Fischeras and Advent Products Inc (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CROSSCLAIM by defendant Aalpha Business Svc against defendant Art J Deerey; Summons not issued (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Aalpha Business Svc to 3rd amended complaint [163-1] (mt) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff: The crt having ent permanent injunction, plf DIRECTV Inc hereby dism all claims against dfts Bruce Allen Turner, Vector Technologies Inc and Global Capital Corp w/prejudice and w/out attys' fees or costs. (mt) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Kimberly Deerey; Service by (not specificy) on 12/13/01 via personal service by serving - see attached (no attachment) (mt) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Daniel S Deerey; Service by (not specify) on 12/13/01 via personal service by serving summons and 3rd A/C (mt) (Entered: 01/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter extending time to answer or otherwise respond to Plf's third amended complaint [163-1] to 1/28/02 as to defendant American Precision Electronics Inc (mg) (Entered: 01/15/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USM Form 285 Executed on 11/29/01 of (see attached list); Remarks: 1 deputy @ 1 hour; 9 miles roundtrip (mg) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USM Form 285 Executed on 11/29/01 of (see attached list); Remarks: Cost and fees noted on additional USM 285 for same location (mg) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USM Form 285 Executed on 11/29/01 of (see attached). Remarks: 2 deputies @ 8.0 hrs; 43 miles roundtrip (mg) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
USM Form 285 Executed on 11/29/01 of (see attached list). Remarks: 3 deputies 16.0 hours 150 miles R/T (mg) (Entered: 01/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Micro Contract Assembly, Inc; Service by (not specify) on 12/20/01 via personal service by serving summons and 3rd A/C to Alex Greenspan managing agent (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant American Precision Electronics Inc; Service by (not specify) on 12/20/01 via personal service by serving summons and 3rd A/C to Michael J Hall president (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Smart Card Solutions, an Indiana corporation; Service by (not specify) on 12/20/01 via personal service by serving summons and 3rd A/C to Li Sang (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Kevin Stewart Hjelm; Service by (not specify) on 12/20/01 via personal service by serving summons and 3rd A/C (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Stewart and Tadd Inc, a Utah corporation; Service by (not specify) on 12/20/01 via personal service by serving summons & 3rd A/C to Kevin Hjelm, registered agent (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Tdbam Ltd, an Illinois corporation; Service by (not specify) on 12/20/01 via personal service by serving (see attached - no attachment) to Robert C Peithman, President (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Micro Contract Assembly Inc to third amended complaint [163-1] (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant John Doe 1 (Greg Sibold, as yet unnamed in complaint) to third amended complaint [163-1] (mt) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MAIL Returned Stipulation & Permanent Injunction Re Dft Jeff Gettle [191-1][191-2] addressed to Stephen H Parsons, Mansfield Tanick & Cohen, 10100 Santa Monica Blvd, Ste 800, Los Angeles, CA 90067 (mg) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT [208-1] by dft Chris Doane (mg) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter IT IS HEREBY ORD the Consent to Preliminary Injunction rcd on 12/26/01 is to be fld & processed. The filing date is ORD to be the date the doc was stamped "rcd but not fld" w/the Clk. FRCvP Rule 5(d) No proof of svc attached to docs (cc: all counsel) (mg) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 11/29/01 of Third Ex Parte Appl for TRO, Writ of Seizure, & OSC; Ord GR Appl for TRO, Writ of Seizure, & OSC; Memo in Suppt of Appl for TRO, Writ of Seizure, & OSC (see doc for fur details) (mg) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Li Sang dba DSS Pro; Service by (not specified) on 12/7/01 via personal service by serving Summons & 3rd A/C (mg) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re prilim inj & ord of impoundment: The Art Deerey dfts hereby consent to the crt's ent of a prelim inj in a form that incorporates the specific prohibitions set forth in the TRO issued on 11/27/01; The Art Deerey dfts fur consent to the cont impoundment of the items that were seized on 11/29/01: (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 01/02/2002)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 12/18/01 of Order GR Plf's Mot for 1) Preliminary Injunction & Impoundment, & 2) Prelim Injunction Freezing Certain Assets (mg) (Entered: 12/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter (rmi) (Entered: 12/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: scheduling conference held, crt sets the fol case mgt dates: ;discovery ddl set on 9/30/02 ; motion filing ddl set on 12/2/02 ; Pretrial Conference set for 8:30 1/6/03 ; jury trial set on 8:30 2/4/03 ; trial estimate: 15 days; pretrial sched ord signed, served on cnsl in open crt & filed this date; stip & ord re prelim inj & ord of impoundment as to dfts Li Sang & Smart Card Solutions signed & filed this date; accrodingly, the crt vacates the prelim inj hrg presently set for 12/20/01 ; by Judge David O. Carter CR: Debbie Gale (rmi) (Entered: 12/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and order of impoundment by Judge David O. Carter (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 12/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT by dfts James Lucia, Sandy New, Property Traders Inc and S & J Lucia Family Limited Partnership (mt) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIM INJUNCTION & Ord of Impoundment by Dft Jerad Forcier (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 12/12/01 of Consent to Prelim Injunction & Ord of Impoundment by Dft Jerad Forcier, Stip & [Propsd] Ord (re: prelim injunction & ord of impoundment agnst dft Jeff Gettle) (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 12/12/01 of Consent to Jgm by Dft Jeff Gettle, Stip & [Propsd] Permanent Injunction re Dft Jeff Gettle (mg) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO JUDGMENT by dft Jeff Gettle filed by plaintiff (mt) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: order to show cause hearing re preliminary injunction held by Judge David O. Carter: OSC hrg re P/I as to dft Li Sang is contd to 12/20/01 at 7:30am. OSC hrg re P/I as to dfts Art Deerey, Kimberly Deerey & Tdbam Ltd is contd to 12/28/01 at 11:00am. Stip & Ord re P/I & ord of impoundment signed in open crt & filed this date (see doc for details) CR: Noreen Cerge (mt) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter that dft, DSS consents to plf's cont impoundment, pend the OSC hrg, of the specific items seized frm DSS on 11/29/01, & iemts subsequently turned over by DSS consistent w/the writ of seizure issued by this crt on 11/27/01; dft DSS fur consents to cont freezing of those assets (see doc for specifics); IN COURT HEARING RE: OSC is cont to 7:30 12/20/01 (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re re preliminary injunction agnst dfts, Art Deerey, Kimberly Deerey and TDBAM Ltd., the existing TRO ent by the crt on 11/28/01 shal remain in full force & effect thru 12/28/01 or fur ord of the crt; the OSC on plf DIRECTV's motions for prelim inj shall be heard by the crt on 12/28/01 at 11:00 a.m.; dfts shall serve & file any opp to OSC on or bef 12/19/01; plf DIRECTV shall serve & file any rply on or bef 12/26/01 (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re preliminary injunction ; dft, MICRO hereby consents to the crt's ent of prelim inj in a form that incorporates the specific prohibitions set forth in the TRO issued on 11/28/01; dft, MICRO consents to plf's cont impoundment (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter rendering preliminary injunction agnst dfts, Kevin Stewart Hjelm and Steward & Todd Inc, a Utah corp dba Help-U-Mail; dfts hereby consent to the crt's ent of a prelim inj in a formt that incorporates the specific prohibitions set forth in the TRO issued on 11/27/01 (filed on 11/28/01); dfts fur consent to the crt's ent of a prelim inj freezing those assets identified in the TRO freezing certain assets issued by this crt on 11/27/01 (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter rendering preliminary injunction and ord of impoundment; dft, American Precision Electronics Inc, an Illinois corp herby consents to the crt's ent of a prelim inj in a form that incorporates the specific prohibitions set forth in the TRO issued in this matter on 11/27/01 (filed 11/28/01); (see doc for fur specifics re impoundment) (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting plf's motions for prelim inj & impoundment and prelim inj freezing certain assets; the crt hereby enj dfts, Daniel S. Deerey, Jesse N. Rodriquez, Steven Hutt, Shutt (Canada), Inc and Alpha corporate Services Inc and any persons or entities acting on dfts' behalf, frm: (see doc for specifics); this preliminary injunction takes effect immediately & shall remain in effect pend the trial in this actn or fur ord of this crt; the $100,000.00 bond prev posted by plf, DIRECTV shall remain in place and shall satisfy any clms relating to the prelim inj & the ord cont impoundment auth by this ord; (Ent 12/14/01) (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter rendering permanent injunction re dft, Jeff Gettle ; dft Jeff Gettle, dba "Decon Bluez" & "DSS TV Tools" and any persons or entities controlled directly or indirectly by him are perm enj & restrained frm: (see doc for specifics); the crt shall retain juris to enterina such fur prcdgs & to ent such fur ord as may be necessary or appropriate ti implement &/or enforce the provisions of this perm inj; upon proof of any violations by dft, Gettle of the provisions of this perm inj, the crt shall be auth to award damages to DIRECTV for losses sustained prior to the date of this perm inj, in addition to any other damages or other rel auth by law (rmi) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re Prelim Injunction & Ord of Impoundment. Greg Fischer & Advent Products Inc consent to the Crt's entry of a Prelim Inj in a form that incorporates the spec prohibitions set forth in the TRO issued on 11/27/01 (fld on 11/28/01) (see doc for specifics) (SEND) (mg) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter rendering preliminary injunction & Ord of Impoundment w/respect to the undersigned dfts: 1) Dft Jerad Forcier shall be enjoined from manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in any of the items identified in the Writ of Seizure; 2) all items which Dft Jerad Forcier asserts a property interest in that were seized shall remain IMPOUNDED pending trial in this actn or fur Ord from the Crt; 3) Plf's DIRECTV's bond in the amount of $100,000 shall be maintained pending fur Ord of the Crt ; see doc for fur details (PSEND) (mg) (Entered: 12/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Directv Inc re 12/10/01 hrg on prelim injunction and impoundment ord (mt) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO JUDGMENT by defendant Jeffrey Stevens filed by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JOINT RULE 26 DISCOVERY PLAN filed; est length of trial 15-20 days. (ts) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter forfeiting impounded articles re Dft Jeffrey Stevens (mg) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter rendering permanent injunction against Jeffrey Stevens ; see doc for fur details (mg) Modified on 12/19/2001 (Entered: 12/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Sealed Legal Document 165 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**SEALED DOCUMENT** - EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for temporary restraining order freezing certain assets, and order to show cause (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**SEALED DOCUMENT** - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [53-1] by plaintiff Directv Inc. Summons not issued (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION by plaintiff Directv Inc for leave to file 3rd A/C ; motion hearing set for 8:30 a.m., on 12/10/01 (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 161 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**SEALED DOCUMENT** - MOTION by plaintiff Directv Inc for leave to file 3rd A/C (ca) Modified on 12/07/2001 (Entered: 12/07/2001)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE SEAL by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT WITHHELD FROM CASE FILE by plaintiff Directv Inc (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**SEALED DOCUMENT** EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for order shortening time to hear pltfs motion for leave to file 3rd A/C (ca) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 149 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
**SEALED DOCUMENT** - EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for temporary restraining order, for writ of seizure, and for order to show cause (ca) Modified on 12/07/2001 (Entered: 12/07/2001)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter re preliminary injunction and ord of impoundment against dfts James Lucia, Sandy New, Property Traders Inc, and S & J Lucia Family Limited Partnership: Dfts James Lucia, Sandy New, Property Traders, INc and S & J Lucia Family Limited Partnership are h/b ENJOINED from: (see doc for specifics); Plf Directv's bond in the amt of $100,000, proof of which was prev filed w/this crt, shall be maintained pend fur ord of this crt (psend) (mt) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 11/19/01 of plf's appl for ord of dflt (re dft Kevin Baronowsky and Baron Technologies) (mt) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilsdon by plaintiff Directv Inc re plf's application for ord of default re Kevin Baronowsky, Baron Technologies [143-1] (mt) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Heather Roudebush by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re: doc w/held from case file re plf's appl for leave to file under seal of crt by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 11/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for default re Kevin Baronowsky, Baron Technologies ; Lodged ord (mt) Modified on 11/26/2001 (Entered: 11/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter staying case as to dft PCE & Associates Inc until 1/1/02 (mt) (Entered: 11/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Stephen S Korniczky for Future Capital Corp by Future Capital Corp and substituting attorney Ronald S Hodges by Judge David O Carter. (ts) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Stephen S Korniczky for Derek E Trone by Derek E Trone and substituting attorney Ronald S Hodges by Judge David O. Carter. (ts) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter to stay case as to dft Scott Madvig until 1/1/02 (mg) Modified on 11/15/2001 (Entered: 11/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter that actn is stayed as to dfts William & Jennifer Zinn til 1/1/02 (rmi) (Entered: 10/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter rendering permanent injunction : dft Adam Rubinger dba "AAA Card Cleaners" & any persons entities controlled directly or indirectly by him are hereby perm enj & restrained frm: (see doc for specifics); the crt shall retain juris to entertain such fur prcdgs & to ent such fur ord as may be necessary or appropriate to implement &/or enforce the prov of this perm inj (rmi) (Entered: 10/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Brad Alexander dba Card Unlooping; Service by State on 9/17/01 via by personal delivery by serving 2nd A/C (see doc for specifics) to dft (mt) (Entered: 10/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant David Jones dba Test Card Programmers, Blue Monkey Technologies, & Piece of Logic (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff on 9/27/01 of Appl for Order of dflt Re Dft David Jone, Decl of Scott T Wilsdon re appl, Propsd Order (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilsdon by plaintiff Re Application for entry of default as to David Jones dba Test Card Programmers, Blue Monkey Technologies, & Piece of Logic [132-1] (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for entry of default as to David Jones dba Test Card Programmers, Blue Monkey Technologies, & Piece of Logic (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Felix Su to 2nd amended complaint [53-1]; jury demand (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Adam Rubinger by the Law firm Mansfield Tanick & Cohen (Los Angeles), atty Stephen H Parsons. Designating the Law firm Mansfield Tanick & Cohen (Los Angeles), atty Robert M Mayman as local counsel. Approved by Judge David O. Carter (Fee pd) (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Robert Meadows (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Robert Meadows to 2nd amended complaint [53-1]; jury demand (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter extending time to answer amended complaint [53-1] to 10/10/01 as to defendants Jeffrey Stevens, Jeff Gettle (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) DENYING Dft Felix Su's Motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1], & in the alt for an order requiring Plf to provide a more definite statement [101-2] by Judge David O. Carter; (see doc for specifics) CR: Not Present (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by defendant Felix Su to plf's opp to motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1], & in the alt for an order requiring Plf to provide a more definite statement [101-2]; Decls of William D Evans, Linda Bewley (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Jared Forcier to 2nd amended complaint [53-1] (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff on 9/17/01 of Decl of Bruce Allen Turner Re opp to Mot to dism; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael e Houck by plaintiff Re opp to Motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1], [101-2] (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Bruce Allen Turner by plaintiff Re opp to Motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1], [101-2] (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilsdon by plaintiff Re opp to Motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1], [101-2] (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by plaintiff Directv Inc to dft Felix Su's Motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1], [101-2] (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Answer rcd 9/14/01 is NOT to be fld but instead REJECTED & is ORD rtn to cnsl (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter staying case w/respect to dfts Derek E Trone & Future capital Corp until 1/1/02; (see doc for specifics) (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DENIED PROPSD ORDER by Judge David O. Carter to cont Mot to dism of dft Felix Su DENIED (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DENIED STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Continuing Dft Felix Su's Motion to dism DENIED (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION filed to continue Dft Felix Su's Motion to dism ; Lodged Order (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION filed to continue Dft Felix Su's Motion to dism (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants James Lucia, Sandy New, Property Traders Inc, S & J Lucia Family (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendants James Lucia, Sandy New, Property Traders Inc, S & J Lucia Family to 2nd amended complaint [53-1]; jury demand (ad) (Entered: 10/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter setting scheduling conf for 8:30 12/17/01 (rmi) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (In Chambers) by Judge David O. Carter: Crt sets following briefing sched. Plf shall file its opp to motion NLT 9/17/01. Dft Su shall file his rply NLT 9/19/01. Hearing on dft Felix Su's motion to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C [101-1] is contd to 8:30am on 9/24/01. CR: Not Present (PSEND) (mt) (Entered: 09/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter extending time to answer 2nd amended complaint [53-1] to 9/14/01 as to defendant Seal GG (ad) (Entered: 09/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE executed ; Service by Federal on 8/13/01 via personal by serving summs & 2nd A/C, etc to (not specified); (incomplete proof of service/dft's name was omitted from proof of svc) (insufficient for dflt purposes) (rmi) (Entered: 09/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter of forfeiting impounded articles (re dft PCE & Assocates Inc and Scott A. Roberts) (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge David O. Carter angst dft, PCE & Associates Inc and Scott Roberts (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Seal Q (ad) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Seal Q to 2nd amended complaint [53-1] (ad) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Seal K (ad) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by defendant Seal J to dismiss Plf's 2nd A/C, in the alt for an order requiring Plf to provide a more definite statement ; Decl of Felix Su; motion hearing set for 8:30 9/17/01 (ad) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Seal K to 2nd amended complaint [53-1]; jury demand (ad) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal JJ; Service on 7/31/01 via substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd A/C to John Doe, Occupant, Refused true name & is believed to be the Defendant; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SECOND NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) of dft Heidi Mathes dba Mathes Income Tax from this action, w/o prej; Ent: 8/23/01 (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal I; Service on 8/7/01 via personal service by serving Sms & 2nd A/C; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 7/26/01 of Sms & 2nd A/C; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal Q; Service on 7/30/01 via substituted service by serving S/C to Tina Doane - Wife; Due Diligence Declaration attached (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal N; Service by Federal on 7/26/01 via Substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to not indicated; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal K; Service on 7/27/01 via personal service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Martin Su, Brother; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal H; Service on 7/30/01 via substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Noreen Deerey, Wife of Art J Deerey; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal J; Service on 7/27/01 via substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Martin Su, Brother; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal L; Service on 7/27/01 via substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Katie Heuer, Live in babysitter; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal X; Service on 7/27/01 via substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Inez Rough, co-owner; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal T; Service on 7/29/01 via personal service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal Q; Service on 7/30/01 via substituted service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Tina Doane, Wife; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seal Y; Service on 7/30/01 via personal service by serving Sms & 2nd Amd Cmp to Barbara, Manager ("The Home Office"); (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Plf's Motion for prelim inj against dft Mark McHugh as fol: Dft McHugh is hereby ENJOINED from manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in any of the fol items: (see doc for fur details); This inj takes effect immediately & shall remain in effect pending the trial in this case or fur order of this Court; The $100,000 bond previously posted by plf DIRECTV shall remain in place & shall satisfy any claims relating to the Prelim Inj & the Order Continuing Impoundment auth by this Order (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: OSC RE PRELIM INJ as to Dft Mark McHugh: Motion for prelim inj against dft McHugh is granted by Judge David O. Carter; CR: Debbie Gale (ad) (Entered: 08/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter extending time to answer 2nd amended complaint [53-1] to 9/2/01 as to defendant Seal GG (ad) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter extending time to answer 2nd amended complaint [53-1] to 9/10/01 as to defendants Seal AA, Seal BB (ad) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilsdon by plaintiff (Re 8/13/01 Hearing) (ad) (Entered: 08/15/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Directv Inc (Re 8/13/01 Hearing for Prelim Inj against Dft Mark McHugh) (ad) (Entered: 08/15/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER Re Prelim Inj against PCE & Associates Inc by Judge David O. Carter: Dft PCE & Associates Inc is hereby ENJOINED pending trial in this action or fur Ord of this Crt from manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in any to the items identified in the Writ of Seizure, including, w/o limitation: (see doc for fur details); This inj takes effect immediately & shall remain in effect pending trial in this action or fur Ord of this Crt. This inj shall be issued by the Crt upon auth under FRCP 65(b), the Digital Millennium Copyright Act, 17 USC 1203(b)(1), the Fed Communications Act, 47 USC 605(e)(3)(B)(i), the TRO issued by the Crt on 7/5/01, & the Consent to Prelim Inj & Ord of Impoundment by Dft PCE & Associates Inc, previously fld w/the Crt; The items seized from Dft on 7/25/01, shall remain IMPOUNDED pending trial in this action or fur Ord of this Crt; Plf DIRECTV'S bond in the amt of $100,000, shall be maintained pending fur Ord of the Crt; IT IS SO ORDERED. (ad) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Seal Z by the Law Office of Jeffery T Kipi, atty Jeffery T Kipi. Designating the Law firm Edwards & Hayden, atty Mark E Edwards as local counsel. Approved by Judge David O. Carter (Fee pd) (ad) (Entered: 08/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter that doc entitled consent prelim received 7/31/01 is to be filed & processed (mt) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT by defendant PCE & Associates Inc (mt) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: OSC RE PRELIM INJ AS TO CERTAIN DFTS: The TRO, to the extent it still exists, is DISSOLVED & Prelim Inj is DENIED as to dft Jim Stevens dba American Card Programmers, Parcel Handlers LTD, & Robert Meadows dba Meadco. Plf may seek Prelim Inj against Meadows on regular ntc; The TRO is EXTENDED as to dft PCE & Associates Inc to 8/6/01 at 12:00 to allow the ptys time to file a stip order of Prelim Inj & Impoundment; For good cause shown because of uncertainty as to whether svc on dft Mark McHugh dba CanSat2000 is effective, given the Hague Convention & whether he has had enough time to prepare for this hrg, the TRO is EXTENDED as to dft Mark MHugh dba CanSat2000 to 8/13/01 at 5:00; The hrg on the OSC Re Prelim Inj as to dft Mark McHugh dba CanSat2000 is cont to 8/13/01 at 8:30 by Judge David O. Carter; CR: Debbie Gale (ad) (Entered: 08/03/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDERING CLERK TO UNSEAL CERTAIN DOCS: As the seizure has now been accomplished & the pty has been served, the Clk shall UNSEAL the fol docs: 2nd A/C, fld 7/3/01 (doc no 53); Plf's ex parte appl for TRO fld, 7/3/01 (doc no 47); Memo in suppt of ex parte appl, fld 7/3/01 (doc no 48); Decl of Michael E Williams in suppt of ex parte appl for TRO, fld 7/3/01 (doc no 49); Propsd Ord, pifnu 7/3/01; Propsd Ords & Ord, fld 7/5/01 (doc no 54 & 55) by Judge David O. Carter; CR: Not Present (SEND) (ad) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilsdon by plaintiff (Re 7/30/01 Hearing) (ad) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff (Re 7/30/01 Hrg on 2nd Prelim Inj & Impoundment Order) (ad) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendants Seal CC, Seal DD, Seal EE by the Law firm Huish Campbell, atty Karl N Huish. Designating the Law office of Robert M Mayman, atty Robert M Mayman as local counsel. Approved by Judge David O. Carter (Fee pd) (ad) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER Forfeiting impounded articles (Re Dfts Bruce Allen Turner, Vector Technologies Inc & Global Capital Corp) by Judge David O. Carter: As partial consideration in the sttlmnt of plf DIRECTV Inc's claims against the Turner Dfts, the Turner Dfts irrevocably forfeit to DIRECTV any right, claim or interest they have or may believe they have in the articles that were seized on 5/25/01, purs to Writ of Seizure; The Crt shall retain jurisdiction to entertain such fur proceedings & to ent such fur orders as may be necessary or appropriate to implement and/or enforce the provisions of this Ord Forfeiting Impounded Articles. The Turner Dfts specifically consent to personal jurisdiction & venue in the USDC, for the Central Dist of CA (SEND) (ad) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Re Dfts Bruce Allen Turner, Vector Technologies Inc & Global Capital Corp) by Judge David O. Carter: 1. Dfts Bruce Allen Turner, Vector Technologies Inc, & Global Capital Corp, & any persons or entities controlled directly or indriectly by them are hereby permanently enjoined & restrained from: (see doc for fur details); 2. The Permanent Inj shall apply to the Turner Dfts' activities worldwide, & shall apply w/the same force & effect to the DIRECTV Latin America (aka Galaxy Latin America) satellite system, & to any other direct broadcast satellite system or related bus in which DIRECTV has a financial or other interest, now or in the future; 3. The Turner Dfts, & any persons or entities controlled directly or indirectly by them, are hereby permanently enjoined & restrained from: (see doc for fur details); 4. In the event that the Turner Dfts become aware that an enterprise in which they have invested or hold any financial interest is engaged in any of the activities prohibited by this Perm Inj, the Turner Dfts agree to immediately divest themselves of any such investment or financial interst & to promptly notify DIRECTV of the same; 5. The Crt shall retain jurisdiction to entertain such fur proceedings & to ent such fur orders as may be necessary or appropriate to implement and/or enforce the provisions of this Perm Inj; The Turner Dfts specifically consent to personal jurisdiction & venue in the USDC, for the Central Dist of CA; 6. Upon proof of any violations by the Turner Dfts of the provisions of this Perm Inj, the Crt shall be authorized to award damages to DIRECTV for losses sustained prior to the date of this Perm Inj, in addition to any other damages or other releif authorized by law; (SEND) (ad) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: (1) Dfts Trone & Future Capital are hereby ENJOINED from manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in any of the items identified in the Writ of Seizure. This inj takes effect immediately & shall remain in effect pending trial or fur order of this Crt, the TRO issued by the Crt on 5/24/01, & the Consent to Prelim Inj & Order of impoundment by Dfts Derek E Trone & Future Capital Corp; (2) The items seized from dfts Trone & Future Capital on 5/25/01 purs to the Writ of Seizure issued by this Crt, shall remain IMPOUNDED pending trial in this action or fur order of this Crt, The Writ of Seize & Impound Articles issued by the Crt on 5/25/01, & the Consent to Prelim Inj & Ord of impoundment by Dfts Trone & Future Capital Corp; (3) Plf DIRECTV's bond in the amt of $100,000 proof of which was previously fld w/this Crt, shall be maintained pending fur Ord of this Crt; The hrg set for 7/30/01 is removed from the Crt's cal as to these 2 defendants only (SEND) (ad) (Entered: 07/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) RE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION FOR KARL N HUISH & STIP OF DISMISSAL: Karl N Huish, atty for all 3 dfts is located in Phoenix, AZ & thus can only appear bef this Crt aft applying to appear pro hac vice. No such appl is on file for Mr Huish & no local cnsl has been designated by him; The Crt will hold the stipulated perm inj in abeyance pending the receipt of a pro hac vice appl from Mr Huish; The Crt also notes that if this stipulated perm inj represents a sttlmnt of this case as to these 3 Dfts, the ptys shall lodge a stipulated order of dismissal signed by DirecTV & these 3 Dfts. If the Crt does not receive such an order, the Crt will assume that the amt of damages remains to be litigated & these 3 Dfts will remain as pending, active ptys by Judge David O. Carter; CR: Not Present (SEND) (ad) (Entered: 07/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Directv Inc (mg) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff on 7/20/01 of Stip & Order Re Prelim Inj; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIM INJUNCTION & Order of Impoundment by Dfts Derek E Trone & Future Capital Corp (ad) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Seal II (ad) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T Wilson by plaintiff Directv Inc Re Plf's Application for order of default against dft Parcel Handlers Ltd [61-1] (ad) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION by plaintiff Directv Inc for Order of Default Re Dft Parcel Handlers Ltd (ad) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Re Doc withheld from case file (ad) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER TO MODIFY COURT'S ORDER RE SEIZED ITEMS by Judge David O. Carter: it is hereby ordered that the Crt's 5/24/01 Order be modified to the extent that the items seized purs thereto may be relocated to a secured warehouse facility, located at 737 Hawaii, El Segundo, CA; DIRECTV is hereby designated to act as substitute custodian (ad) (Entered: 07/17/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael E Williams by plaintiff Directv Inc re unsealing docs (mt) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter that doc entitled decl of Michal E Williams received 7/12/01 is to be fld & processed (mt) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO DFT HEIDI E MATHES: Plf's original dismissal of Dft Mathes was w/o prej, & thus it is possible Plf intends now to sue Mathes again; However, it is also possible that Plf did not intend to re-sue Mathes & that it was an error for Plf to include her in the caption of the 2nd A/C; Mathes is currently an active Dft; If Plf intends to dism her, Plf shall file a new ntc of dismissal; by Judge David O. Carter; CR: Not Present (SEND) (ad) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WRIT OF SEIZURE filed (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Plf's 2nd Ex parte application for temporary restraining order [47-1], writ of seizure [47-2], & order to show cause [47-3] (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT [13-1] by plaintiff Directv Inc . Summons not issued (mt) Modified on 08/23/2001 (Entered: 07/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re doc w/held from case file re decl of Kevin Izadshenas re ex parte appl by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 07/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re doc w/held from case file re decl of Kim Takacs re 2nd ex parte appl by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 07/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE re doc w/held from case file re 2nd decl of Scott C McNeal re exparte appl by plaintiff Directv Inc (mt) (Entered: 07/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael E Williams by plaintiff in suppt of ex parte motion for temporary restraining order [47-1], writ of seizure [47-2], & order to show cause [47-3] (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of ex parte application for temporary restraining order [47-1], writ of seizure [47-2], & order to show cause [47-3] (ad) (Entered: 08/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for temporary restraining order, writ of seizure, & order to show cause (mt) Modified on 08/23/2001 (Entered: 07/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)as to defendant Heidi E Mathes (kh) (Entered: 07/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting plf's appl for lv to file under seal of crt [38-1]; ord that the clrk is directed to place under seal of the crt the fol docs: (see doc for specifics); plf's cnsl shall file a decl w/the crt specifically listing the docs to be unsealed w/the date of filing when they can be unsealed (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, the crt hereby gr plf's appl for lv to file 2nd A/C, svc of early discovery, & ord preserving evid according to the terms set forth in the stip of the ptys; dfts who were served w/the FAC shall have til 8/9/01 to resp to the SAC; plf may serve its first req for prod forthwith which dfts shall resp to has provided in the FRCP & L.R.; dfts shall preserve everything identified in the req pend prod in this actn or fur ord of the crt (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter continuing IN COURT HEARING RE: Directv's request for Prelim Inj & an ord for the cont impoundment of contraband to 7/30/01 ; on or bef 7/16/01 dft shall serve & file their opp to Directv's req for a prelim inj & an ord for the contd impoundment of contraband; (see doc for fur specifics); (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 6/29/01 of prop ord re filing of 2nd A/C, etc (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael E. Williams by plaintiff Directv Inc in suppt of stipulation re filing of 2nd A/C, svc of early discovery & ord preserving evid [40-1] (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION filed re filing of 2nd A/C, svc of early discovery & ord preserving evid (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Directv Inc in support of motion application for lv to file under seal of crt [38-1] (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION by plaintiff Directv Inc for lv to file under seal of crt (rmi) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) re defendant Heidi E Mathes (kh) (Entered: 07/03/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIM INJ BASED ON CONSENT OF CERTAIN DFTS: (1) Dfts are hereby ENJOINED from manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing or otherwise trafficking in any of the items identified in the Writ of Seizure. This inj takes effect immediately & shall remain in effect pending trial in this action or fur order of this Crt; (2) Plf DIRECTV'S bond in the amt of $100,000 proof of which was previously fld w/this Crt, shall be maintained pending fur order of this Crt (ad) (Entered: 06/28/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 6/1/01 of summs, ord gr exparte appl, etc,. (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
DENIED PROPSD ORDER by Judge David O. Carter Re Issuance of Prelim Inj based on consent of certain dfts DENIED because the Writ of Seizure is not attached as Exh A. Plf shall file a new order that specifies in its text the items; The order also shall be signed by all ptys who are stipulating to it, even those that have previously fld consents (ad) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Sms & 1st A/C executed upon defendant Bruce Allen Turner on 6/3/01 by personal service; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Global Capital Corporation on 6/3/01 by personal service by delivering Sms & 1st A/C to Bruce Allen Turner, Authorized Agent; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Parcel Handlers Ltd on 5/31/01 by personal service by delivering Sms & 1st A/C to G Rick Boucher; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Vector Technologies on 6/3/01 by personal service by delivering Sms & 1st A/C to Bruce Allen Turner, Authorized Agent; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIM INJ & Order of Impoundment by Dfts Jennifer & William Zinn (ad) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: OSC RE PRELIM INJ: Crt ORDERS all remaining dfts to appear on 7/16/01 at 8:30 for the OSC Re P/I; by Judge David O. Carter; CR: Debbie Gale (ad) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: THE IN COURT HEARING Re DIRECTV Inc's req for a prelim inj & to fur show cause w/respect to Derek E Trone & Future Capital Corp is cont to 8:30 7/16/01 ; Extending time to answer 1st amended complaint [13-1] to 7/2/01 as to dfts Derek E Trone, Future Capital Corp ; Plf shall have until 7/9/01 to file any reply to Dfts' opp; The ptys agree that the TRO & impoundment order that is currently in effect shall remain in effect unitl DIRECTV's req for prelim inj is heard; (see doc for fur details) (ad) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STATUS REPORT by plaintiff Directv Inc (Re 6/4/01 Hearing) (ad) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT TO PRELIM INJUNCTION by Dft Scott Madvig (ad) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERT OF SERVICE by plaintiff Directv Inc on 6/1/01 of decl of Scott T. Wilsdon re 6/4/01 (rmi) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T. Wilsdon by plaintiff Directv Inc re 6/4/01 hrg (rmi) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Re doc withheld from case file (ad) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Re doc withheld from case file (ad) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE Re Doc withheld from case file (ad) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter GRANTING Plf's Motion for leave to to file Decls of Larry E Rissler, Kevin Izadshenas, & Scott C McNeal under seal of the Crt [14-1]; IT IS HEREBY ORD that the Clk is directed to place unders eal of the crt the fol docs fild in suppt of Plf's Ex Parte Appl: (1) the Decl of Larry E Rissler, (2) the Decl of Kevin Izadshenas, & (3) the Decl of Scott C McNeal & accompanying exhs (ad) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF UNDERTAKING in amount of $100,000.00 (Bond No. 515.010) from American Contractors Indemnity as to plaintiff (ad) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by plaintiff Directv Inc of Lodging revised Writ to seize & impound articles; Propsd Ord granting Plf's Ex Parte appl for TRO, Writ of seizure & OSC (ad) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATION by plaintiff of cnsl purs to FRCP 65(b) (ad) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff of motion for leave to to file Decls of Larry E Rissler, Kevin Izadshenas, & Scott C McNeal under seal of the Crt [14-1] (ad) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by plaintiff for leave to to file Decls of Larry E Rissler, Kevin Izadshenas, & Scott C McNeal under seal of the Crt ; Lodged Ord (ad) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Directv Inc terminating defendants Rick Trone, Advent Products Inc, Greg A Fischer; adding Derek E Trone, Future Capital Corp, Bruce Allen Turner, Vector Technologies, Global Capital Corp, Jim Stevens, Robert Meadows, Scott Madzig, Parcel Handlers Ltd. Summons not issued (ad) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for plaintiff Directv Inc by the Law firm Yarmuth Wilsdon Calfo, atty Deborah T Boylston. Designating the Law firm Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, atty Michael Williams as local counsel. Approved by Judge David O. Carter. (Fee pd) (ad) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for plaintiff Directv Inc by the Law firm Yarmuth Wilsdon Calfo, atty Scott T Wilsdon. Designating the Law firm Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, atty Michael Williams as local counsel. Approved by Judge David O. Carter. (Fee pd) (ad) (Entered: 05/29/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting plf's exparte motion for temporary restraining order [4-1], dfts are hereby enjoined from: (see doc for specifics); granting plf's exparte motion writ of seizure [4-2] as fol: the clrk of the crt shall delivery to the U.S. Marshal &/or other state, county or local law enforcement auth a writ of seizure (see doc for fur specifics); plf, Directv is ord to file w/in 5 days proof of bond in the amt of $100,000. & shall maintain such bond pend fur ord of this crt; granting plf's exparte motion for order to show cause [4-3], dfts are ord to appear on 6/4/01 at 8:30 a.m. for a hrg on Directv's req for a prelim inj; (see doc for fur specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting plfs' exparte motion for temporary restraining order [4-1], dfts are hereby enjoined from: (see doc for specifics); granting plf's exparte motion writ of seizure [4-2] as fol: the clrk of the crt shall delivery to the U.S. Marshall a writ of seizure directing the Marshall (see doc for specifics); granting exparte motion for order to show cause [4-3]; plf Directiv is ord to file w/in 5 days proof of bond in the mat of $100,000.00 & shall maintain such bond pend fur ord of this crt; dfts are ord to appear: IN COURT HEARING RE: Directiv's req for prelim inj on 8:30 6/4/01 ; dfts shall serve & file any papers i opp nlt 2 crt days prior to the hrg; plf shall serve & file any prly papers nlt 1 crt day prior to hrg; (see doc for specifics) (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael E. Houck by plaintiff Directv Inc re exparte motion for temporary restraining order [4-1], exparte motion writ of seizure [4-2], exparte motion for order to show cause [4-3] (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPPL DECLARATION of Scott T. Wilsdon by plaintiff Directv Inc in suppt of exparte motion for temporary restraining order [4-1], exparte motion writ of seizure [4-2], exparte motion for order to show cause [4-3] (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Scott T. Wilsdon by plaintiff Directv Inc re exparte motion for temporary restraining order [4-1], exparte motion writ of seizure [4-2], exparte motion for order to show cause [4-3] (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by plaintiff Directv Inc of exparte motion for temporary restraining order [4-1], exparte motion writ of seizure [4-2], exparte motion for order to show cause [4-3] (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Directv Inc for temporary restraining order, writ of seizure & for order to show cause (rmi) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: IT IS HEREBY ORD: the (2) Appls of non-resident atty to appear in a specific case rcd 4/13/01 are NOT to be fld but instead REJECTED & is ORD rtn to cnsl (ad) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Directv Inc (kh) (Entered: 04/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) issd referred to Discovery Arthur Nakazato (kh) (Entered: 04/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2,533 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?