New York Times Company v. U.S. Department Of Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-07439
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2019 at 2:19 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charlie Savage, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The New York Times Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Diana Victoria Baranetsky +1 212 556 5188 victoria.baranetsky@nytimes.com
, Jeremy Alexander Kutner +1 212 556 5188 +1 212 556 4634 jeremy.kutner@nytimes.com
, Tali Ravit Leinwand +1 212 556 7061 +1 212 556 1009 tali.leinwand@nytimes.com
, Ian MacDougall +1 202 714 3777 ian.macdougall@nytimes.com
, , , David Edward McCraw +1 212 556 4031 +1 212 556 4634 mccraw@nytimes.com
v.
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "New York Times Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ballard Spahr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jay Ward Brown +1 202 508 1136 +1 202 661 2299 brownjay@ballardspahr.com
, , , , , , , , , Matthew Edward Kelley +1 202 508 1112 +1 202 661 2299 kelleym@ballardspahr.com
, , , , , , , , , Michael D. Sullivan +1 202 508 1116 +1 202 661 2299 sullivanm@ballardspahr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Peter M. Skinner +1 212 637 2601 +1 212 637 2730 pskinner@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finger & Slanina LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , David L. Finger +1 302 573 2525 +1 302 573 2524 dfinger@delawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fishman Haygood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alysson Leigh Mills +1 504 586 5253 +1 504 586 5250 amills@fishmanhaygood.com
, , Loretta G. Mince +1 504 586 5252 lmince@fishmanhaygood.com
, , , , , James Richard Swanson +1 504 586 5252 +1 504 586 5250 jswanson@fishmanhaygood.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster, Swift,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Charles E. Barbieri +1 517 371 8100 +1 517 371 8200 cbarbieri@fosterswift.com
, , , , , Scott R. Lovernick - SUSPENDED +1 517 371 8100

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert P. Latham +1 214 953 6095 +1 214 661 6663 blatham@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Evan Miller +1 202 879 3840 +1 202 626 1700 emiller@jonesday.com
Space Jacob Moshe Roth +1 202 879 7658 +1 202 626 1700 yroth@jonesday.com
Space Mark Christopher Savignac +1 202 879 3821 msavignac@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , Rodger Dallery Smith, II +1 302 658 9200 rdsefiling@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gregory I Rasin +1 212 545 4016 +1 212 490 0991 grasin@proskauer.com
, , , Jacquelyn R Weisman +1 212 969 3346 +1 212 969 2900 jweisman@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Steven Lieberman +1 202 783 6040 slieberman@rothwellfigg.com
, , Steven M Lieberman +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 slieberman@rfem.com
, , Lisa N Phillips PHV +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 lphillips@rfem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 150

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Keith W Schneider +1 614 224 1222 +1 614 224 1236 kwschneider@ms-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 510

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Nicole Armenta Auerbach +1 212 850 6100 +1 212 850 6299 nauerbach@lskslaw.com
, , , Gayle Chatilo Sproul +1 215 988 9778 gsproul@lskslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The New York Times Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Edward McCraw +1 212 556 4031 +1 212 556 4634 mccraw@nytimes.com
Space Kenneth A Richieri +1 212 556 1995 +1 212 556 4634 richierk@nytimes.com
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Education"

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Build., Ste.7516

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elan S Levey +1 213 894 3997 +1 213 894 7819

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn Kenneth Schreiber

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Glenn Kenneth Schreiber

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Beth Blackburn +1 816 426 3130 +1 816 426 3165
, Richard E O'Neal +1 205 244 2001 +1 205 244 2175 Richard.O'Neal@usdoj.gov
, Eugene A. Seidel +1 334 441 5845 +1 251 441 5051 eugene.seidel@usdoj.gov
Space Cari F. Walsh +1 816 426 4307 +1 816 426 3165

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office, EDKY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon L. Fyffe +1 859 233 2661 +1 859 233 2533 USAKYE.ECFCivil@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , Jean-David Barnea +1 212 637 2679 +1 212 637 2717 jean-david.barnea@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Bradley M Bole +1 407 648 7514 +1 407 648 7588
Space Christopher R. Donato +1 617 748 3303 +1 617 748 3972
, , Stephen Michael Doyle +1 334 223 7280 +1 334 223 7418 stephen.doyle@usdoj.gov
, Matthew Mailloux +1 718 254 6176 +1 718 254 7483 matthew.mailloux@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharanya Mohan +1 212 637 2737 +1 212 637 2786 sharanya.mohan@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Eastern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie Dyani Hendry +1 718 254 6040 +1 718 254 7489

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Education

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space U. S. Department of Education

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
Space James Sullivan +1 704 344 6222
, , , , Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by US Attorney - CR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space US Attorney - CR +1 319 363 6333
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing INS Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Noticing INS Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by Rika Valdman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Rika Valdman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Gregory G Brooker +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 greg.brooker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Zachary David Clopton +1 312 353 6630 zachary.clopton@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen Emanuel Frank +1 617 748 3244 stephen.frank@usdoj.gov
, , , , , David W Fuller +1 612 664 5627 +1 612 664 5787 david.fuller@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Dennis Heffron scott.heffron@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela T Johann +1 415 436 7025 +1 415 436 6748 pamela.johann@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/05/2013 Mary J Madigan +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 maryjo.madigan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Pamela Marentette +1 612 664 5652 Pamela.Marentette@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharanya Mohan +1 212 637 2737 +1 212 637 2786 sharanya.mohan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Erika R Mozangue +1 612 664 5600 erika.mozangue@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sarah Sheive Normand +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 sarah.normand@usdoj.gov
, Doreen M. Rachal +1 617 748 3282 doreen.rachal@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jennifer A. Serafyn +1 617 748 3188 +1 617 748 3969 jennifer.serafyn@usdoj.gov
, , , Thomas P. Walsh +1 312 353 5300 thomas.walsh2@usdoj.gov
, , , , , James Alan Weinkle +1 305 961 9290 +1 305 530 7139 James.Weinkle@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Northern District Of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Ellen Blain +1 212 637 2743 +1 212 637 2730 Ellen.Blain@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury +1 212 637 2633 +1 212 637 2750 arastu.chaudhury@usdoj.gov
Space Andrea Iris Newmark +1 202 514 4267 +1 202 616 8470 andrea.newmark@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christine Schessler Poscablo +1 212 637 2674 +1 212 637 0033 christine.poscablo@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Benjamin Leon Berwick +1 202 305 8573 +1 202 616 8470 benjamin.l.berwick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Elliott Marc Davis +1 202 616 4206 +1 202 616 5200 elliott.m.davis@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Matthew Allan Josephson +1 912 652 4422 +1 912 652 4991 matthew.josephson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Judson Owen Littleton +1 202 305 8714 +1 202 616 8470 Judson.O.Littleton@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
, , Bahram Samie +1 612 664 5600 +1 612 664 5788 bahram.samie@usdoj.gov
Space Karen A. Smith +1 202 307 6483 +1 202 307 6588 karen.a.smith@usdoj.gov
, Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick H. Turner +1 202 305 0641 +1 202 514 4231 frederick.turner@usdoj.gov
, , , , Spencer Elijah Wittman Amdur +1 202 616 7420 spencer.amdur@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Victoria L. Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Victoria L. Francis
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties' respective counsel that: 1. The above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice against defendants U.S. Department of Education and U.S. Department of Justice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each side bearing its own fees and costs. 2. This Stipulation may be signed in counterparts. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/17/2018) (ama) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMO ENDORSED on re: 12 Letter filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. ENDORSEMENT: The Initial conference previously scheduled for 12/8/17 is adjourned. The motions schedule above shall govern. So Ordered.( Cross Motions due by 2/26/2018., Motions due by 1/29/2018., Responses due by 2/26/2018, Replies due by 3/26/2017.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/27/2017) (js) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from David E. McCraw dated 11/22/2017 re: Joint Proposed Schedule. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice.(Mohan, Sharanya) (Entered: 11/09/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Adjournment is granted. The IPTC is rescheduled to 12/8/2017 at 4 pm. The 10/30 deadline for the joint briefing schedule is adjourned to 11/22/2017. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/30/2017) (js) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit joint letter and for adjournment of conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Sharanya Mohan dated October 24, 2017. Document filed by U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice.(Mohan, Sharanya) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharanya Mohan on behalf of U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER: Accordingly, the Court hereby directs the parties to confer and file a joint letter stating whether you agree and, if so, proposing a briefing schedule in this matter. The joint letter shall be filed by the parties not later than Monday, October 30, 2017. Additionally, it is hereby ORDERED that lead counsel for all parties shall appear for a conference on Thursday, November 2, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/02/2017) (ama) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice. (kl) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Education; U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice; Department of Education, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (McCraw, David) Modified on 9/29/2017 (pc). (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Grupo Financiero Inbursa de S.A.B. de C.V for New York Times Company. Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice, Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14183881)Document filed by New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/26/2018. (js)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 12/8/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (js)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Department Of Justice, Department of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Parties listed on the docket entry for the summons must be written exactly as they appear on the complaint caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?