Regina Florence v. Experian Information Solutions
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 18-15413

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 13, 2019 at 11:09 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Added attorney Amanda Kelly Rice, Cheryl L. O'Connor for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., in case 18-15413. [10816509] (NAC) [Entered: 03/28/2018 03:09 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amanda K. Rice for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 03/28/2018. [10816427] [18-15413] (Rice, Amanda) [Entered: 03/28/2018 02:45 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Cheryl L. O'Connor for Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Date of service: 03/28/2018. [10816419] [18-15413] (O'Connor, Cheryl) [Entered: 03/28/2018 02:43 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [10810768] (VS) [Entered: 03/23/2018 01:45 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Filed (ECF) Appellants Regina H. Florence and William F. Florence Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/14/2018. [10798732] [18-15413] (Knepper, Matthew) [Entered: 03/14/2018 04:35 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Added attorney Matthew I. Knepper for Regina H. Florence William F. Florence, in case 18-15413. [10798451] (CW) [Entered: 03/14/2018 02:41 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew I. Knepper for Appellants Regina H. Florence and William F. Florence. Date of service: 03/14/2018. [10798352] [18-15413] (Knepper, Matthew) [Entered: 03/14/2018 02:04 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/20/2018. Appellants Regina H. Florence and William F. Florence opening brief due 05/14/2018. Appellee Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answering brief due 06/14/2018. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [10797248] (RT) [Entered: 03/13/2018 05:24 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?