Gathmann, et al v. Melex USA, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-01738-FAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cathleen Gathmann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James F. McCadden +8288 828 828 8701
No Logo Jay Gathmann, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Foreign Trade Enterprise Pezetel, LTD., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Semmes, Bowen & Semmes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Newman Farquharson +1 410 539 5040 +1 410 539 5223 pfarquharson@semmes.com
No Logo Melex Usa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon and Forsyth LLP(7 Times Sq.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Semmes, Bowen & Semmes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Newman Farquharson +1 410 539 5040 +1 410 539 5223 pfarquharson@semmes.com
Space Robert Edward Scott, Jr. +1 410 576 4725 +1 410 539 5223 rscott@semmes.com
No Logo Panstwowe Zaklady Lotnicze [PZL] "Warszawa-Okecie" S.A., Defendant
No Logo Kevin St. Clair Hess, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Amelia Ledig +1 703 691 3565 +1 703 691 8918
Space John Williamson Moore, III +1 804 261 5264 +1 804 261 5264
Space Charles H. Smith 1 +10 +10 1000
Space John J. Tigert +1 703 691 3565
No Logo King Consulting Services, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Amelia Ledig +1 703 691 3565 +1 703 691 8918
Space John Williamson Moore, III +1 804 261 5264 +1 804 261 5264
Space Charles H. Smith 1 +10 +10 1000
Space John J. Tigert +1 703 691 3565
No Logo Phoenix Aviation, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Williamson Moore, III +1 804 261 5264 +1 804 261 5264
Space Charles H. Smith 1 +10 +10 1000
No Logo Melex Usa, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Space Christopher R. Christensen +1 212 490 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by Semmes, Bowen & Semmes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Newman Farquharson +1 410 539 5040 +1 410 539 5223 pfarquharson@semmes.com
Space Robert Edward Scott, Jr. +1 410 576 4725 +1 410 539 5223 rscott@semmes.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/12/1995
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $7000000
Nature of Suit 315 - Personal Injury: Airplane Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Harford
Terminated 10/30/1996
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 109/385/95CV4030[CC Baltimore Co. MD.]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 72 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER "DISMISING" the cse as SETTLED without prejudice as to all claims; "DIRECTONG" each party to bear their own costs unless otherwise agreed; "ALLOWING" any party to move to reopen for good cause within 45 days of the date of this order. (signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 10/28/96 c/m 10/30/96-dm micro 10/31/96-lew)) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Settlement Conference
      Settlement conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 71 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
        ANSWER by Phoenix Aviation to [36-1] third-party complaint by Melex USA, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 70 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996, Terminated: 10/17/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 3rd party defendants' [70-1] motion for Charles H. Smith, John W. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 10/17/96) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 70 Filed: 10/17/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996, Terminated: 10/17/1996 motion to appear pro hac vice
            MOTION by King Consulting, Kevin St. Clair Hess, Phoenix Aviation for Charles H. Smith, John W. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 69 Filed: 10/3/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
              ORDER REASSINGNING CASE REFFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Susan K. Gauvey (signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Klein Jr. 10/2/96 c/m 10/3/96-hsg) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 68 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Clarence E. Goetz for settlement conference. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 9/23/96 c/m 9/30/96-hsg) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Motion for Leave to File
                  MOTION by Foreign Trade for Leave to File 3rd party complaint filed with exhibits A-B. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/09/1996
                    LREF
                    Blank 66 Filed: 8/30/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996 Answer to Amended Complaint
                    ANSWER by Foreign Trade (Attorney Paul Newman Farquharson) to amended complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Summons Returned Executed
                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Foreign Trade 8/16/96 Answer due on 9/5/96 for Foreign Trade (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 64 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                        MEMORANDUM "PERTAINING" to the Stipulation Agreement this date. (signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 8/14/96 c/m 8/14/96) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION AGREEMENT "STATING" tht Condon et al will accept service for Pezetel of the 2nd amended complaint; "VOLUNTARILY" dismissing the complaint in K-96-1917. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 8/14/96 c/m 8/15/96-dm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/26/1996
                            LREF
                            Blank 62 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM and ORDER "REFERRING" to the telephone conference of July 30, 1996 as therein set forth ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) dated July 30, 1996 (c/m 8/7/96 dam) (rank, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/26/1996
                              LREF
                              Blank 61 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                              Return of service unexecuted as to Foreign Trade (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/26/1996
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996 Telephone Conference
                                Tele-conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 60 Filed: 7/17/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996 Status Report
                                  STATUS REPORT by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 59 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                    MOTION by Foreign Trade to Consolidate Case with AMD-96-1917 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 58 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/19/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of request for duplicate summons by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONSES(both 60 and 90 days) issued for Foreign Trade to be served in multiple locations. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 6/3/1996 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Summons Issued
                                              SUMMONSES (90 days) issued for Panstwowe Zaklady, Foreign Trade (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM RE: Court's order of 5/7/96. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 5/20/96 c/m 5/23/96-dm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [48-1] motion for Christopher R. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 5/20/96 c/m 5/24/96-dm) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 Remark
                                                    Request for issuance of summons to Panstwowe and Foreign Trade. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann , (Answer due 5/25/96 for Panstwowe Zaklady, for Melex USA, Inc. ) amending [12-1] amended complaint by Cathleen Gathmann, Jay Gathmann against Foreign Trade (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996 Response
                                                        RESPONSE by Melex USA, Inc. to [45-1] motion for Leave to File second amended complaint to add new party by Cathleen Gathmann, Jay Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 5/14/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996, Terminated: 5/24/1996 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          MOTION by Melex USA, Inc. for Christopher R. Christensen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/14/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MARGINAL ORDER granting [45-1] motion of plaintiff for Leave to File second amended complaint to add new party effective May 15, 1896, without further Order of this Court, unless cause in writing to the contrary be shaown on or before May 14, 1996 ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman ) dated May 17, 1996 (c/m 5/10/96 dam) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE of agreement by Melex USA, Inc., King Consulting, Kevin St. Clair Hess, and Phoenix Aviation for the plaintif to amend the complaint. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996, Terminated: 5/13/1996 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                MOTION by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann for Leave to File second amended complaint to add new party (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying [39-1] motion to Strike [36-1] third-party complaint by Melex USA, Inc.; "DIRECTING"the parties to file a status report on or before 6/6/96 as to their service efforts; existing scheduking order stays in effect. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 3/13/96 c/m 3/14/96-sv) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1996, Entered: 3/13/1996 Telephone Conference
                                                                    Tele-conference held before Kaufman, SJ. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 Response in Opposition
                                                                      RESPONSE by King Consulting, Kevin St. Clair Hess, Phoenix Aviation in opposition to Melex's [42-1] Scheduling order (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SECOND AMENDED SUBSTITUTE SCHEDULING ORDER issued. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 3/4/96 c/m 3/8/96-lew) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Melex USA, Inc. for Leave to File 3rd party complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Melex USA, Inc. in opposition to [39-1] motion to Strike [36-1] third-party complaint by Melex USA, Inc. by Phoenix Aviation (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                              MOTION by Melex USA, Inc. for Desmond T. Barry, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice receipt #130118 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: 2/28/1996, Terminated: 3/15/1996 Motion to Strike
                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Phoenix Aviation to Strike [36-1] third-party complaint by Melex USA, Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 Summons Issued
                                                                                  3rd party SUMMONS issued for Phoenix Aviation (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/22/1996
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM "DIRECTING" the Clerk to issue summons on the new 3rd party defendant named in the 2/2/96 filing by Melex if no opposition is received by 2/26/96. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 2/15/96 c/m 2/15/96-dc) ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/22/1996
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                      THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Melex USA, Inc. against Phoenix Aviation (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Local Rule
                                                                                        AMENDED Local Rule 103.3 statment of Melex (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                          ANSWER by King Consulting, Kevin St. Clair Hess (Attorney Kathryn A. Ledig, John J. Tigert) to [22-1] third-party complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [30-1] joint motion to Extend Time for third-party defendants to respond to 3rd party plaintiff's complaint; scheduling order means "as is" unless changes are submitted in writing by counsel by 12/22/95. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 12/15/95 c/m 12/18/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                                              2nd SUMMONS (90 days) issued for Panstwowe Zaklady (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995 Remark
                                                                                                Request for reissuance of summons as to out of county defendant. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/27/1995
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995, Terminated: 12/22/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION to Extend Time for third-party defendants to respond to 3rd party plaintiff's complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE on 3rd party summons executed as to King Consulting 11/14/95 Answer due on 1/14/96 for King Consulting (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      AMENDED SUBSTITUTE SCHEDULING ORDER issued. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 11/28/95 c/m 12/4/95-lew) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kevin St. Clair Hess 11/16/95 Answer due on 12/6/95 for Kevin St. Clair Hess (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          REVISED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER issued. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 11/17/95 c/m 11/17/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/30/1995 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM "EXPLAINING" to counsel the reasons and conditions behind the amended scheduling order be entered this date. ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 11/17/95 c/m 11/17/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 12/4/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                              MOTION by Melex USA, Inc. to Extend Time for service on third-party complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 11/13/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                THIRD PARTY SUMMONS(ES) issued for King Consulting, Kevin St. Clair Hess (30 days) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                  THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Melex USA, Inc. against King Consulting, Kevin St. Clair Hess (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting plaintiff's [19-1] motion for Leave to File 3rd party complaint ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 10/31/95 c/m 11/1/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting plaintiff's [18-1] motion to Extend Time for service of process on defendant PLZ up to and including 6/1/96; if more time is need a request is due no later than 5/15/96.( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 10/30/95 c/m 11/1/95-lew) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995, Terminated: 11/1/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Melex USA, Inc. for Leave to File 3rd party complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995, Terminated: 10/31/1995 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                          MOTION by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann to Extend Time for service of process on defendant PLZ (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                            Letter of rogatory issued to the appropriate Judicial Authority of the Country of Poland. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Affidavit
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann Re: [15-1] application for lette of rogatory. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/10/1995 Application for Writ of Garnishment
                                                                                                                                APPLICATION FOR Letter of rogatory by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/25/1995 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by Melex USA, Inc. to amended complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) (90 days) issued for Panstwowe Zaklady. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann , (Answer due 9/9/95 for Melex USA, Inc. ) amending [3-1] complaint against Panstwowe Zaklady. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/1995, Entered: 8/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MARGINAL ORDER granting [10-1] motion of plaintiffs for Leave to File Amended Complaint effective September 6, 1995, without further order of this court unless cause to the contrary be shown in writing by September 5, 1995 ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman August 28, 1995) (c/m 8/29/95-dc) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995, Terminated: 8/30/1995 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann for Leave to File Amended Complaint . (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/30/1995
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 7/5/95 ) (c/m 7/11/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER/MOTION by Melex USA, Inc. to Modify [6-1] Scheduling order and "APPROVAL". (signed Judge Frank A. Kaufman 7/5/95) (c/m 7/11/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/12/1995
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/28/1995 Local Rule
                                                                                                                                                Local Rule 103.3 Certification of Defendant. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/26/1995, Entered: 6/28/1995 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr. Judge Frank A. Kaufman 6/21/95 ) (c/m 6/22/95-dc) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/19/1995 Answer
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Melex USA, Inc. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Removal mailed to counsel. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Melex USA, Inc. 5/15/95. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                          DEMAND for jury trial by Jay Gathmann, Cathleen Gathmann. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Melex USA, Inc.. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant. FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 119472. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                  Above pleadings are all copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore County. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?