J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. James
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-05359-NGG-ST

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 4:05 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, The court has reviewed both the record and the R&R and, finding no clear error, ADOPTS the R&R, Dkt. 15 . Plaintiffs Motions (Dkts. 10 , 14 ) are GRANTED. The court AWARDS Plaintiff $6,600.00, consist ing of $2,200.00 in statutory damages and $4,400.00 in enhanced damages, and GRANTS Plaintiff's request to file a motion for costs and attorney's fees by no later than fourteen days after the judgment becomes final. The Clerk of Court is respectfully DIRECTED to enter judgment and close this case. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/10/2018. (Fwd. for jgt.). (Layne, Monique) ).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?