Dodge County Hospital Authority v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00048
District Judge Dudley H. Bowen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 2:03 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dodge County Hospital Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Two Ravinia Drive

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Marigliano +1 404 856 0040 +1 404 856 0066 jmarigliano@pmhplaw.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Certified Copy. (CTO -43) MDL No. 2804. (pts) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/25/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Blank forms new civil case filings) (thb) Modified on 6/25/2018 (thb). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (thb) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by Dodge County Hospital Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 13 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?