J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Jessica Sierra
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-04590-WDK-FMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 12, 2021 at 5:05 PM ST (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 521
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Judgment/Renewal of Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          JUDGMENT by Judge William D. Keller, in favor of J & J Sports Productions, Inc. against Jessica Sierra, Jose Jesus Sierra in the principal amount of $13,188.00, attorneys fees of $1,391.28, costs to be submitted in cost bill. for a total judgment of $14,579.28. Related to: Order on Motion for Default Judgment, 12 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (shb)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?