United States v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-02942

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 29, 2018 at 3:06 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dept of Justice Tax Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah T. Mayhew +1 202 616 1929 +1 202 514 5238 sarah.t.mayhew@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo EASTERN SAVINGS BANK, FSB, Defendant
No Logo Ethan H. Armijos, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Ny State Dept Of Taxation And Finance, Defendant
No Logo Nassau County, New York, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Cevallos, Defendant
No Logo Sanford Sandy Lieberman, Defendant
No Logo Vrenny F.A. Litrell, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Order of recusal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order(Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SUMMONS ISSUED as to N.Y. State Dept. of Taxation & Finance. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanford Sandy Lieberman. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nassau County, New York. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vrenny F.A. Litrell. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethan H. Armijos. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patricia Cevallos. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eastern Savings Bank, FSB. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint,, by United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Proposed Summons, # 6 Proposed Summons) (Mayhew, Sarah) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT against Ethan H. Armijos, Patricia Cevallos, Jane Doe, Eastern Savings Bank, FSB, Sanford Lieberman, Vrenny F.A. Litrell, N.Y. State Dept. of Taxation & Finance, Nassau County, New York, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Eastern Saving Bank, # 3 Proposed Summons Eathan Armijos, # 4 Proposed Summons Nassau County, NY, # 5 Proposed Summons Patricia Cevallos, # 6 Proposed Summons Vrenny Litrell, # 7 Proposed Summons NYS Dept. of Taxation and Finance, # 8 Proposed Summons Sanford Lieberman) (Mayhew, Sarah) Modified on 5/18/2018 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 9 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?