Marshall v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-01818

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2019 at 1:49 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 2605
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF No. 32 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 1/8/2019. (jdt)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and Leave to Amend; and Order of Referral. The motion to dismiss (Docket no. 23 ) is granted in part. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Marshall is ordered to show cause why this action should not be dis missed for failure to prosecute. She is also ordered to show cause why she should not be sanctioned for disobedience to Civil Local Rule 7.1(f)(3)(c) and for disobedience to the Court's earlier order to show cause. She may do so by filing a memo randum of points and authorities by 1/16/2019. The pending motion for determination of the discovery dispute (Docket no. 24 ) and the joint motion to modify the scheduling order (Docket no. 32 ), and all associated matters remain referred to Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/7/2019. (jdt)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?