Peters v. Board of Directors of Raytown Consolidated School District No. 2
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00816

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 25, 2019 at 5:40 PM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Proposed Bill of Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 8 and 9 motions to stay. The case is stayed until January 14, 2018, so that Plaintiffs can find new counsel. A copy of this order was mailed to Plaintiffs on December 6, 2018. Signed on December 6, 2018, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Stay
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Rule 16 Notice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of MAPADMIN
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?