Malpasso v. Pallozzi
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01064
District Judge Marvin J. Garbis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2018 at 9:39 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Brian Kirk Malpasso, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Nicole Jo Moss +1 202 220 9600 nmoss@cooperkirk.com
, , , John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
, , , Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
, , , David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
No Logo Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Nicole Jo Moss +1 202 220 9600 nmoss@cooperkirk.com
, , , John D. Ohlendorf +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 johlendorf@cooperkirk.com
, , , Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
, , , David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com
v.
No Logo William M. Pallozzi, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None response
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. William M. Pallozzi waiver sent on 4/13/2018, answer due 6/12/2018.(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Ohlendorf. Directing attorney John Ohlendorf to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                            PAPERLESS ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Peter Patterson. Directing attorney Peter Patterson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David H Thompson. Directing attorney David H Thompson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
                                Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Rifle Association of America for Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc..(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                  NOTICE by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc. Of Request For Waiver Of Service (Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None QC Notice - Miscellaneous
                                    QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc., Brian Kirk Malpasso was filed incorrectly. "Notice of Request for Waiver of Service" and "Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest" are not filed as attachments to a Complaint. Refile Notice of Request for Waiver of Service and Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest as two separate docket entries. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John D. Ohlendorf (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7266997.) by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter A. Patterson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7266982.) by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David H. Thompson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7266956.) by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.(Moss, Nicole) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against William M. Pallozzi ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7266711.), filed by Brian Kirk Malpasso, Maryland State Rifle and Pistol Association, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3,(ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement), # 5 Civil Cover Sheet,(ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR # 6 Notice of Request for Waiver of Service))(Moss, Nicole) Modified on 4/13/2018 (slss, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?