Lentz v. United States Air Force
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01660

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2018 at 11:06 PM EDT (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Costs Taxed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None clerk's judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 29 Defendant United States Air Force's Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ORDERED denying as moot Defendant United States Air Forces Motion to Continue Deadlines to Conduct Good Faith Settlement Talks and to File Dispositive Motions (Doc. 37 ). FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/13/18. (EJA)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None supplement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?