County of Multnomah v. Purdue Pharma, LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-02010
Magistrate Judge John Jelderks, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 16, 2018 at 2:53 AM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo County of Multnomah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 209 S.W. Oak Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A. Kahl +1 971 634 0829 +1 503 227 6840 nick@nickkahl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brent L. Crumpton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Brent Lindsey Crumpton +1 205 222 4456 blc@crumptonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Craig L Lowell +1 205 314 0500 +1 205 254 1500 clowell@wigginschilds.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Nash LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas H. Pyle +1 503 224 5858 +1 503 224 0155 nicholas.pyle@millernash.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce A. Rubin +1 503 224 5858 +1 503 224 0155 bruce.rubin@millernash.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Justin C. Sawyer +1 503 205 2340 +1 503 224 0155 justin.sawyer@millernash.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Pilar C. French +1 503 778 2170 +1 503 778 2200 frenchp@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter D. Hawkes +1 503 778 2100 +1 503 778 2200 hawkesp@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hans N. Huggler +1 503 778 2179 +1 503 778 2200 hugglerh@lanepowell.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by STOEL RIVES LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel C. Lee +1 503 224 3380 +1 503 220 2480 rachel.lee@stoel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Per A. Ramfjord +1 503 294 9257 +1 503 220 2480 per.ramfjord@stoel.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
No Logo Corvallis Internal Medicine, P.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watkinson Laird Rubenstein Baldwin & Burgess, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James R. Dole +1 541 484 2277 +1 514 484 2282 jdole@wlrlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIA I MANELA +1 541 484 2277
No Logo Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Hernandez +1 503 226 5707 +1 503 248 9085 samuel.hernandez@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by troutman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/27/2018, TERMINATED: 02/27/2018 Roman D. Hernandez +1 503 290 2327 +1 503 290 2405 roman.hernandez@troutman.com
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Hernandez +1 503 226 5707 +1 503 248 9085 samuel.hernandez@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/27/2018, TERMINATED: 02/27/2018 Roman D. Hernandez +1 503 290 2327 +1 503 290 2405 roman.hernandez@troutman.com
No Logo Fusion Wellness Clinic, Defendant
No Logo Gallant Internal Medicine, P.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watkinson Laird Rubenstein Baldwin & Burgess, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James R. Dole +1 541 484 2277 +1 514 484 2282 jdole@wlrlaw.com
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Matthew Donohue +1 503 243 2300 +1 503 241 8014 matt.donohue@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOSEPH L. FRANCO +1 503 243 2300 +1 503 241 8014 Joe.Franco@hklaw.com
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey S. Eden +1 503 796 2837 +1 503 796 2900 jeden@schwabe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Margaret A. Hoffmann +1 503 796 2868 +1 503 796 2900 mhoffmann@schwabe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J. Lee +1 503 222 9981 +1 503 796 2900 ajlee@schwabe.com
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey S. Eden +1 503 796 2837 +1 503 796 2900 jeden@schwabe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Margaret A. Hoffmann +1 503 796 2868 +1 503 796 2900 mhoffmann@schwabe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J. Lee +1 503 222 9981 +1 503 796 2900 ajlee@schwabe.com
No Logo Julie Ann Demille, Defendant
No Logo M.D. James Gallant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watkinson Laird Rubenstein Baldwin & Burgess, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James R. Dole +1 541 484 2277 +1 514 484 2282 jdole@wlrlaw.com
No Logo M.D. Roy Blackburn, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Stuart Rosenblum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett Bigelow & Leedom, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy J. DeLisa +1 206 622 5511 +1 206 622 8986 adelisa@bbllaw.com
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Shubert & Barer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen Carroll Bricken +1 503 228 3939 +1 503 226 0259 kbricken@gsblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Conti +1 503 228 3939 +1 503 226 0259 pconti@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael L. Fitzgerald +1 617 951 7108 +1 617 235 0426 michael.fitzgerald@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball Janik, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dwain Mark Clifford +1 503 228 2525 +1 503 226 3910 dclifford@balljanik.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James T. McDermott +1 503 228 2525 +1 503 226 3910 jmcdermott@balljanik.com
No Logo Oregon TLC, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Oregon TLC, S-Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pacific Medical Evaluation and Review Company, Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Angeli Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Angeli +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 david@angelilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Colin H. Hunter +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 colin@angelilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward A. Piper +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 ed@angelilaw.com
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Angeli Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Angeli +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 david@angelilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Colin H. Hunter +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 colin@angelilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward A. Piper +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 ed@angelilaw.com
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Angeli Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Angeli +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 david@angelilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Colin H. Hunter +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 colin@angelilaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward A. Piper +1 503 954 2232 +1 503 227 0880 ed@angelilaw.com
No Logo Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett Bigelow & Leedom, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy J. DeLisa +1 206 622 5511 +1 206 622 8986 adelisa@bbllaw.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Watson Pharma, Inc."
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory A. Chaimov +1 503 778 5328 +1 503 778 5299 gregorychaimov@dwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas A Kampars +1 503 241 2300 nicholaskampars@dwt.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to MDL 2804. Certified on 4/5/18 by Deputy Clerk Robert Pitts for the Northern District of Ohio. (dsg) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Related document(s): 57 Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Declaration of Kathleen Bricken . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Related document(s): Objections to Findings & Recommendation 57 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Objections to Findings & Recommendation: Motion to Remand to State Court 7, Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 53 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hernandez, Samuel) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: Findings & Recommendation 53 referral to Chief Judge Mosman is WITHDRAWN. Findings & Recommendation 53 is referred to Judge Marco A. Hernandez for review. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: Findings & Recommendation 53, Motion to Remand to State Court 7, Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 referred to Chief Judge Michael W. Mosman for review. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand # 7 should be GRANTED, its request for attorneys' fees and costs should be DENIED, and Mallinckrodt's Motion to Stay # 16 should be DENIED as moot. This Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due February 28, 2018. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. Signed on 2/14/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion Hearing held on 2/7/18 before Judge John Jelderks, Court Reporter Ryan White, telephone number 503-326-8184 or email ryan_white@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 2/22/2018. Redaction Request due 3/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2018. (White, Ryan) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MINUTES of Proceedings: Motion Hearing Held before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. ORDER - Finding as Moot Motion to Expedite/Accelerate 17 . The Judge's rulings, as stated on the record, will be incorporated in his Finding and Recommendations that will follow. Brent L. Crumpton and Nicholas A. Kahl present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew O'Connor and Kathleen Carroll Bricken present as counsel for defendant(s) Mallinckrodt LLC, a Delaware limited liability company.(Court Reporter Ryan White.)Magistrate Judge John Jelderks presiding. (pg) (Entered: 02/08/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding 49 Reply to Motion. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment(replacement contains signature). The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Reply to Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Bricken, Kathleen) (Main Document 49 replaced on 1/25/2018) (cw). (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Appearance of Roman D. Hernandez appearing on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument is set for 2/7/2018 at 01:30PM in Portland Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge John Jelderks regarding Motion to Remand to State Court 7 and Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Response in Opposition to Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Consideration and, Alternatively, for Extension of Response Deadline 17 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum 16 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court 7 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Notice of Appearance of Rachel C. Lee appearing on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. and Per A. Ramfjord Filed by on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Lee, Rachel) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of Defendant Mallinckrodt's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion 40 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court 7 . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael L. Fitzgerald (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mlfitzgerald. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael L. Fitzgerald for Mallinckrodt LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5267519 issued. Signed on 1/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notification of CM/ECF Account for Brien T. O'Connor (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: btoconnor. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brien T. O'Connor for Mallinckrodt LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5267511 issued. Signed on 1/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notification of CM/ECF Account for Andrew O'Connor (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: oconnora. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew O'Connor for Mallinckrodt LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5267503 issued. Signed on 1/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 01/04/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Corvallis Internal Medicine, P.C.. (Manela, Julia) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael L. Fitzgerald . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5267519. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brien T. O'Connor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5267511. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew O'Connor . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5267503. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notification of CM/ECF Account for Brent L. Crumpton (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: blcrumpton. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brent L. Crumpton for County of Multnomah. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5260481 issued. Signed on 1/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Notification of CM/ECF Account for Craig L. Lowell (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cllowell. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jtj) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig L. Lowell for County of Multnomah. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5260479 issued. Signed on 1/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Supplemental Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Stay. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay 16, Motion to Expedite 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Hunter, Colin) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Stuart Rosenblum, Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC. (DeLisa, Amy) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Hernandez, Roman) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Amy J. DeLisa appearing on behalf of Stuart Rosenblum, Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC Filed by on behalf of Stuart Rosenblum, Stuart M. Rosenblum, M.D., LLC. (DeLisa, Amy) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Corvallis Internal Medicine, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Service) (Dole, James) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Notice of Appearance of James R. Dole appearing on behalf of James Gallant Filed by on behalf of James Gallant. (Dole, James) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Declaration of Kathleen C. Bricken in Support of Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Motion for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Stay. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay 16, Motion to Expedite 17 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Consideration and, Alternatively, for Extension of Response Deadline. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Motion for Stay and Supporting Memorandum. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Hawkes, Peter) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Allergan Finance, LLC. (Pyle, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/26/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.. (Franco, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance of Joseph L. Franco appearing on behalf of INSYS Therapeutics, Inc. Filed by on behalf of INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.. (Franco, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent L. Crumpton . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5260481. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig L. Lowell . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5260479. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by McKesson Corporation. (Clifford, Dwain) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Declaration of Nicholas A. Kahl In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and Memorandum of Law. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand 7 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance of Nicholas A. Kahl appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kahl, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement of Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, and Actavis Pharma, Inc. fka Watson Pharma, Inc.. Filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Cephalon, Inc.. Filed by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Kampars, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/18/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/18/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (joha) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Notice of Removal of Case Number 17CV33413 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5255323 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (1 of 1), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Index, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (1 of 25), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (2 of 25), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (3 of 25), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (4 of 25), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (5 of 25), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (6 of 25), # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (7 of 25), # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (8 of 25), # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (9 of 25), # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (10 of 25), # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (11 of 25), # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (12 of 25), # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (13 of 25), # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (14a of 25), # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (14b of 25), # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (15 of 25), # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (16 of 25), # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (17 of 25), # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (18 of 25), # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (19 of 25), # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (20 of 25), # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (21 of 25), # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (22 of 25), # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (23 of 25), # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (24 of 25), # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (25 of 25), # 31 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (1 of 15), # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (2 of 15), # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (3 of 15), # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (4 of 15), # 36 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (5 of 15), # 37 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (6 of 15), # 38 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (7 of 15), # 39 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (8 of 15), # 40 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (9 of 15), # 41 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (10 of 15), # 42 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (11 of 15), # 43 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (12 of 15), # 44 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (13 of 15), # 45 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (14 of 15), # 46 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (15 of 15), # 47 Exhibit Exhibit Cover Sheet, # 48 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (1 of 1), # 49 Civil Cover Sheet). (Bricken, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?