Walton v. State of California, Department of Transportation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18889158

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 16, 2018 at 10:12 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Walton, Allison F., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alameda County Transportation Commission, Defendant
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Jenny, Scott E., Attorney
No Logo Obaid, Sammy T., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other PI/PD/WD Tort
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing Vacated: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 10/05/2018 10:00 AM D- 6
    Blank 21 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Reservation Set for dept: 6 date: 10/05/2018 time: 10:00 AM
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda County Transportation Commission (9 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 18 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Case Management Conf Continuance 12/06/2019 08:30 AM D- 6
            Blank 17 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 10/21/2019 09:00 AM D- 302
              Blank 16 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Civil Jury Trial 12/16/2019 08:30 AM D- 6
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proof of Service by Mail Filed (5 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Case Management Statement of State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (6 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Management Statement of Allison F. Walton Filed (6 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Answer to Complaint Filed for State of California, Department of Transportation (6 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Transportation Commission Filed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/31/2018 03:00 PM D- 6 (2 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Initial Case Management Conference 05/31/2018 02:30 PM D- 19 (2 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (8 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Allison F. Walton (3 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?