Doe v. UC Berkeley
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18902343

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 16, 2018 at 11:31 PM EDT (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Doe, John, Petitioner
No Logo Regents Of The California, Respondent
UC Berkeley UC Berkeley, Respondent
No Logo Hathaway, Mark M., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Writ of Mandate
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 11 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Compliance Hearing 09/17/2018 09:15 AM D- 511
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 8 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Hearing Continued to Case Management Conference dept: 511 date: 08/08/2018 time: 09:00 AM
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Case Management Statement of John Doe Filed (7 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Proof of Service on Complaint As to Regents of the California Filed (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Case Management Conference 07/11/2018 09:00 AM D- 511 (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Doe (3 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Petition for Writ of Mandate Filed (34 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?