THE BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FRANKLIN v. PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01647

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 17, 2018 at 12:16 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THE BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FRANKLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HOVDE DASSOW & DEETS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT T. DASSOW +1 317 818 3100 +1 317 818 3111 rdassow@hovdelaw.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ACTAVIS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ACTAVIS LLC
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allergan PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALLERGAN PLC
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cardinal Health, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cephalon, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CEPHALON, INC.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
No Logo H.D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H.D. SMITH WHOLESALE DRUG CO.
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
No Logo JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHNSON JOHNSON +1 925 432 7447
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mallinckrodt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MALLINCKRODT LLC
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mallinckrodt PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MALLINCKRODT PLC
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKesson Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space McKesson Corporation
No Logo MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MIAMI-LUKEN, INC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MIAMI-LUKEN, INC.
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noramco, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NORAMCO, INC.
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PURDUE PHARMA, INC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PURDUE PHARMA INC.
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Purdue Pharma LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
No Logo RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC.
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
No Logo THE KROGER CO., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Kroger Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE KROGER CO.
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wal-mart, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WAL-MART, INC.
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1367
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Letter to Clerk - Electronic Case Transfer (OUT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None
      MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Dassow on behalf of Plaintiff THE BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF FRANKLIN. (Dassow, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Complaint
          COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4904941) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dassow, Robert) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 12 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?