United Services Automobile Associat v. Solarcity Corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18916359

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:30 PM DT (1.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United Services Automobile Association United Services Automobile Association, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Ishares Trust
Officer/Director, Zag.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Schwab Strategic Trust
Officer/Director, USAA Casualty Insurance Co
v.
No Logo Fronius Usa LLC, Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fronius Usa LLC, Cross Complainant
No Logo Shureen, D. Douglas, Attorney
No Logo Sidran, David R., Attorney
No Logo Walsh, Maura M., Attorney
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Cross Defendant
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other PI/PD/WD Tort
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None ?
      Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
        Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed (5 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None ?
          Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 67 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
            Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 04/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 514
              Blank 66 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None ?
              Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 06/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 514
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 64 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 514 (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Statement of United Services Automobile Association Filed (6 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 60 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Hearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 302
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Returned Mail: Trial Setting Order Filed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Returned Mail: Trial Setting Order Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Order Trial Setting Order Filed (4 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing (Amended) -Case Management Conf. Cont on 3/27/20 has been vacated & (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                      Returned Mail: Notice of Reassignment of Judge Filed (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 514 (2 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/26/2020 08:30 AM D- 514 (2 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 302
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Case Management Conf Continuance 03/27/2020 09:00 AM D- 18
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Case Management Conference Order Issued (6 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (4 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        Case Management Statement of Fronius USA LLC, Fronius USA LLC Filed (3 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          Case Management Statement of United Services Automobile Association Filed (6 Pages)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            Motion to Compel (Motion) - Granted in Part (5 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              Case Management Conf Continuance 05/24/2019 09:00 AM D- 18
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                Case Management Conference Order Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    ATTENDANCE SHEET Filed (1 Page)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Motion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Opposition To Tesla Energy Operations, Inc's Motion To Compel Binding Arbitration And To Stay The In (8 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Notice of errata to proof of service Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Miscellaneous of Errata to Proof of Service Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed (22 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Proposed Order Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Declaration in Support of Lilla Shkolnikov Filed (42 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Opposition to Defendant Tesla Enrtgy Operations, Inc Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration and to St (10 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Declaration Filed (8 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Miscellaneous errata to request for judicial notice Filed (41 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 03/26/2019 03:00 PM D- 18
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (129 Pages)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Case Management Conf Continuance 03/26/2019 03:00 PM D- 18
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Case Management Conf Continuance 03/26/2019 03:00 PM D- 18
                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Civil Jury Trial 04/06/2020 08:30 AM D- 18
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Order Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Tesla Energy Operations, Inc (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Association of Attorneys Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement of Tesla Energy Operations, Inc Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/24/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement of Fronius USA LLC Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement of United Services Automobile Association Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Notice of Postiing Jury Fees Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Proof of Service by Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla Energy Operations, Inc (8 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Solarcity Corporation Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  Summons on Cross Complaint Issued (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    Cross-Complaint Filed for Fronius USA LLC (18 Pages)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      Answer to Complaint Filed for Fronius USA LLC (5 Pages)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Conference 01/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 18 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for United Services Automobile Association (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed (9 Pages)

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?