Rothenberg v. State of California, Department of Transportat
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18917021

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 17, 2018 at 1:11 AM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rothenberg, Lawrence J.p., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Pralourng, Savee, Defendant
No Logo Reyes, Aida M., Defendant
No Logo State Of California, Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Wilson, Lemuel Sirvonn Jr., Defendant
No Logo Berg, William L, Attorney
No Logo Parsons, Nicole E., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Auto Tort
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Hearing Confirmed for 11/08/2018 03:00 PM D- 18
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Filed for Defendant (7 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lemuel Sirvonn Wilson Jr. Filed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Proof of Service on Complaint As to State of California, Department of Transportation Filed (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Proof of Service on Complaint As to Savee Pralourng Filed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of of Change of Attorney Handling Lawsuit Filed (3 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Initial Case Management Conference 01/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 18 (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Complaint - Auto Tort Filed (13 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lawrence J.P. Rothenberg (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?