Porsche Financial Services, Inc. v. Qutob
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG18920489

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 17, 2018 at 1:35 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Porsche Financial Services, Inc. Porsche Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Qutob, Mike, Defendant
No Logo Miller Esq, Stacey A, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Collections
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Court File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Initial Case Management Conference 02/01/2019 02:30 PM D- 518 (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Porsche Financial Services, Inc. (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Complaint - Collections Filed (16 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?