McCrory v. BG&E

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-03991-AMD
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo PATRICK MCCRORY, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederic Michael Brandes +1 410 561 0290 +1 410 561 0424
v.
No Logo Baltimore Gas & Electric, Company, Defendant

Represented by Law Office of L Ellis Justis Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L Ellis Justis, Jr. +1 410 442 2066 +1 410 442 5989
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 12/28/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Carroll
Terminated 2/6/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: 4/1/1997 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and APPROVAL J. DAVIS dated 3/31/97. (c/m ba) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/6/1997 OrderCourt Filing
SETTLEMENT ORDER dated 2/6/97, ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED with each party to bear its own costs; the entry of this Order is without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 30 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis ) (c/m & microfilmed 2/6/97) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 2/10/1997 Terminated Case
Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 OrderCourt Filing
Marginal ORDER dated 1/29/97 granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion is extended for two weeks. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis ) (c/m ba) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 1/29/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997, Terminated: 1/29/1997 Motion for Extension of Time
Letter MOTION by Patrick McCrory to Extend Time to respond to motion (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION with memorandum in support by BG&E for Summary Judgment and attachments. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996, Terminated: 11/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [17-1] motion of defendant for an extension of 120 days to complete discovery ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 11/6/96; c/m 11/6/96 bel ) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996, Terminated: 11/6/1996 Motion for Extension of Time
Letter MOTION by BG&E an extension of 120 days to complete discovery (recv'd in chambers 11/5/96) (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996, Terminated: 10/31/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Withdraw [15-1] motion to Compel by BG&E. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 10/31/96 )(c/m 10/31/96-bel) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996, Terminated: 10/31/1996 Motion to Withdraw
MOTION by BG&E to Withdraw [15-1] motion to Compel by BG&E (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996, Terminated: 10/31/1996 Motion to Compel
MOTION by BG&E to Compel and Rule 37(a)(2)(B) Certification. (c/s) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996, Terminated: 6/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [14-1] letter/motion by Defendant to Extend the Scheduling Order by 90 days. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 6/19/96 ) (c/m 6/19/96-bel) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/1996, Entered: 6/20/1996, Terminated: 6/19/1996 Motion for Extension of Time
LETTER/MOTION by BG&E to Extend the Scheduling Order by 90 days . (cag, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/1/1996 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 4/29/96; c/m sv ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 4/30/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996, Terminated: 2/6/1997 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by Patrick McCrory in opposition to [7-1] motion to Dismiss by BG&E and exhibits 1 thru 4 (o/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/30/1996
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 4/30/1996 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by BG&E (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [7-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 4/25/96; c/m bel ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 4/24/1996, Entered: 4/24/1996, Terminated: 2/6/1997 Response
RESPONSE (Reply) by BG&E to [8-1] plaintiffs opposition to their motion to dismiss (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/23/1996, Terminated: 2/6/1997 Response in Opposition
RESPONSE by Patrick McCrory in opposition to [7-1] motion of BG&E to Dismiss (o/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/13/1996, Terminated: 4/25/1996 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION by BG&E to Dismiss (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996 Local Rule
Local Rule 103.3 Certification filed by defendant. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: 3/5/1996 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BG&E 2/29/96 Answer due on 3/20/96 for BG&E (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 Summons Issued
SUMMONS (20 days) issued for BG&E (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996 Remark
Request for summons to be issued as to defendant BG & E (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Summons Issued
SUMMONS (20 days) issued for BG&E (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/28/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 128380 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 22 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?