Martin v. Kemp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-04776-LMM
District Judge Leigh Martin May, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 4:11 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dana Bowers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce P. Brown +1 404 584 0400 bbrown@brucepbrownlaw.com
No Logo Jasmine Clark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce P. Brown +1 404 584 0400 bbrown@brucepbrownlaw.com
No Logo Jeanne Dufort, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce P. Brown +1 404 584 0400 bbrown@brucepbrownlaw.com
No Logo Rhonda J. Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce P. Brown +1 404 584 0400 bbrown@brucepbrownlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
No Logo Smythe Duval, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce P. Brown +1 404 584 0400 bbrown@brucepbrownlaw.com
No Logo The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce P. Brown +1 404 584 0400 bbrown@brucepbrownlaw.com
v.
No Logo Alice O'Lenick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carothers & Mitchell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Carothers +1 770 932 3552 +1 770 932 6348 richard.carothers@carmitch.com
Space Brian R. Dempsey +1 770 661 0529 +1 770 661 8529 Brian.dempsey@carmitch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Space Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
No Logo Beauty Baldwin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carothers & Mitchell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Carothers +1 770 932 3552 +1 770 932 6348 richard.carothers@carmitch.com
Space Brian R. Dempsey +1 770 661 0529 +1 770 661 8529 Brian.dempsey@carmitch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Space Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
No Logo Ben Satterfield, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carothers & Mitchell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Carothers +1 770 932 3552 +1 770 932 6348 richard.carothers@carmitch.com
Space Brian R. Dempsey +1 770 661 0529 +1 770 661 8529 Brian.dempsey@carmitch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Space Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Brian Kemp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary of State of Georgia Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
Secretary of State of Georgia Russell D. Willard +1 404 656 3300 rwillard@law.ga.gov
No Logo David J. Worley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
Space Russell D. Willard +1 404 656 3300 rwillard@law.ga.gov
No Logo John Mangano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carothers & Mitchell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Carothers +1 770 932 3552 +1 770 932 6348 richard.carothers@carmitch.com
Space Brian R. Dempsey +1 770 661 0529 +1 770 661 8529 Brian.dempsey@carmitch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Space Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
No Logo Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
Space Russell D. Willard +1 404 656 3300 rwillard@law.ga.gov
No Logo Rebecca N. Sullivan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
Space Russell D. Willard +1 404 656 3300 rwillard@law.ga.gov
No Logo Seth Harp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RONALD J STAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
Space Russell D. Willard +1 404 656 3300 rwillard@law.ga.gov
No Logo Stephen Day, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carothers & Mitchell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Carothers +1 770 932 3552 +1 770 932 6348 richard.carothers@carmitch.com
Space Brian R. Dempsey +1 770 661 0529 +1 770 661 8529 Brian.dempsey@carmitch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Space Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
No Logo Campaign Legal Center, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by campaignlegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com
Office Atlanta
Filed 10/15/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Fulton
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag 4months
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Intervenor Complaint
Intervenor COMPLAINT against Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, filed by Fazal Khan, Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Attachment 1)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
LREF
Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress and Fazal Khan's Motion to Intervene [45]. Intervenors' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [45-5] is GRANTED as to the birth year issues and DENIED as to the remaining requests for relief. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket the Complaint in Intervention [45-2]. Plaintiffs Rhonda J. Martin, Dana Bowers, Jasmine Clark, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, and the Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.'s Motion and Amended Motion for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order [42, 44] is GRANTED as to the birth year issue and DENIED as to the remaining requests for relief. Defendants Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield and Beauty Baldwin (the Gwinnett County BORE Members) are hereby ENJOINED from rejecting absentee ballots containing an error or omission relating to the absentee voter's year of birth and are ORDERED to count such ballots in the November 6, 2018 election. Defendants are ORDERED to delay certification until such ballots have been counted. Nothing in this Order affects or otherwise extinguishes this Court's prior injunction related to signature matching. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/13/2018. (rvb)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Reply Brief
    REPLY BRIEF re [44] Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Motion to Amend
      First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 response in opposition to motion
        RESPONSE in Opposition re [45] MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina) Text modified on 11/13/2018 (btql).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Response to motion
          RESPONSE re [45] MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs, [44] Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , [42] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Second Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
            APPLICATION for Admission of Brian Simmonds Marshall Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266165)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
              APPLICATION for Admission of K'Shaani Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266163)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                APPLICATION for Admission of Aria C. Branch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266161)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                  APPLICATION for Admission of Marc E. Elias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266157)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: 11/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                    APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce V. Spiva Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8266091)by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Cope, Veronica)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/11/2018, Entered: 11/11/2018, Terminated: 11/13/2018 Motion to intervene
                      MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs with Brief In Support by Carolyn Bourdeaux for Congress, Fazal Khan. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, # (3) Exhibit 2 to Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, # (4) Text of Proposed Order, # (5) Exhibit Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause and for a Preliminary Injunction, # (6) Exhibit Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause and for a Preliminary Injunction)(Cope, Veronica)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/11/2018, Entered: 11/11/2018, Terminated: 11/13/2018 Motion for TRO
                        Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for TRO)(Brown, Bruce)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/11/2018, Entered: 11/11/2018 Notice of filing
                          NOTICE Of Filing by Rhonda J. Martin re [42] Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Exhibits in Support of Motion (Brown, Bruce)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/11/2018, Entered: 11/11/2018, Terminated: 11/13/2018 Motion for TRO
                            Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Brief In Support by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting TRO)(Brown, Bruce)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                              ORDER DENYING [19] AMENDED Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This Order does not affect the injunction already in place regarding signature mismatches. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/2/2018. (btql)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Notice - other
                                NOTICE by Dana Bowers, Campaign Legal Center, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc. re [19] Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Sixth Circuit opinion in Husted)(Powers, John)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Reply Brief
                                  REPLY BRIEF re [19] Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dana Bowers, Jasmine Clark, Jeanne Dufort, Smythe Duval, Rhonda J. Martin, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jennifer Nwachukwu, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Pooja Choudhuri, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jacob Conarck, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Ryan Snow, # (5) Exhibit 5 - First Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Michael P. McDonald, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Isabel Hidalgo, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Declaration of James A. Edwards, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Broughton Brooks, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Oanh Tran, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Guido Aguilar, # (11) Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Matilda S. Rouse, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Thomas P. Grant, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Nicolas Bailey, # (14) Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Norma Bristow, # (15) Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Alec Brindell, # (16) Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Lana Goitia, # (17) Exhibit 17 - Supplemental declaration of Amber McReynolds, # (18) Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Godwin I. Ogboma Akhirome, # (19) Exhibit 19 - Supplemental declaration of Marilyn Marks)(Powers, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: # (20) Exhibit 4- Declaration of Ryan Snow) (rvb). Modified on 10/31/2018 to add exhibit 4 (rvb).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                    ORDER DENYING [27] Motion to Stay Pending Appeal of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/30/2018. (btql)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [19] Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Gwinnett Response in GMVP Litigation, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of Lynn Ledford from GMVP Response)(Tyson, Bryan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [19] Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Correia, Cristina)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [27] Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 USCA Acknowledgment
                                            USCA Acknowledgment of [29] Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Kemp. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14503-GG. (pjm)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                              Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, USCA Appeal Fees, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [29] Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of filing
                                                NOTICE Of Filing NOA Transmittal Letter re: [29] Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Order on Application for Admission PHV
                                                  ORAL ORDER granting [8] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Powers ; granting [14] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Danielle M. Lang; granting [15] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Mark P. Gaber. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/29/2018. (rvb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Order on Application for Admission PHV
                                                    ORAL ORDER granting [8] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Powers ; granting [14] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Danielle M. Lang; granting [15] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Mark P. Gaber. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/29/2018. (rvb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Appeal Record Certified
                                                      Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal, [29] Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 18-14503-GG. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Dempsey on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Dempsey, Brian)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Carothers on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Carothers, Richard)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice of appeal
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [26] Temporary Restraining Order, [23] Order by Brian Kemp. Transcript Order Form due on 11/9/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Order (Doc. 23), # (2) Exhibit Order (Doc. 26))(Correia, Cristina)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/23/2018, before Judge Leigh Martin May. Court Reporter Montrell Vann, Telephone number 404-215-1549. Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) (mv)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Payment of Appeal Fees
                                                                Payment of Appeal Fees re [29] Notice of Appeal by Brian Kemp. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-8234701. (Correia, Cristina)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [15] APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221963). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Campaign Legal Center (jkm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                    APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [14] APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221943). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Campaign Legal Center (jkm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [8] APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8220294). Attorney Bruce P. Brown added appearing on behalf of Rhonda J. Martin (jkm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a response by noon on Monday, October 29, 2018 to the [27] Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/26/2018. (rvb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018, Terminated: 10/30/2018 Motion To Stay
                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunctive Relief with Brief In Support by Brian Kemp. (Correia, Cristina)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Temporary Restraining OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/25/2018. (btql)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                              RESPONSE re [23] Order,, Objections Related to Form of Relief filed by Brian Kemp. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Chris Harvey)(Correia, Cristina)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018 Response (Non-Motion)
                                                                                RESPONSE re [23] Order,, Objections to Form of Proposed Injunction filed by Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Lynn Ledford)(Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER addressing the signature mismatch argument from the [19] Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The Court proposes entering the proposed injunction as detailed within this order. As the parties have not had an opportunity to be heard on the exact terms of the Court's proposal, the parties have until noon on Thursday, October 25, 2018, to provide the Court with any objections to the form. See Order for further detail. All other Elector claims will be addressed by the Court at a later time, after Defendants have had an opportunity to be heard ( See dkt. [21]). Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/24/2018. (rvb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc Plaintiffs' [18] Motion for Leave to File to Hearing Brief. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/24/2018. (rvb)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2018. Oral argument was held on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction [19]. The Court heard from Plaintiffs' and Defendants' counsel. The motion was taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(btql)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to file a Response Brief to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction [19] by Monday, October 29, 2018 by 12:00 p.m. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, their reply shall be due by close of business on Wednesday, October 31, 2018. After the motion is fully briefed, the Court will determine if a hearing is necessary and issue an order on an expedited basis. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [4] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the CourtroomCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM for a hearing set for 10/23/2018. Counsel shall bring a copy of this order with them to the courthouse. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018, Terminated: 11/2/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                            Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rhonda J. Martin, Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, Jasmine Clark, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Bruce) Modified on 10/23/2018 to edit filers (btql).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018, Terminated: 10/24/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Hearing Brief with attached Hearing Brief by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting Campaign Legal Center [13] Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2018. (rvb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018, Terminated: 10/23/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                  MOTION To Bring Electronic Equipment Into the Courthouse by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Bruce)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Declarations in Support re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rhonda J. Martin (Brown, Bruce) Text modified on 10/23/2018 (btql).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018, Terminated: 10/29/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221963)by Campaign Legal Center. (Sells, Bryan)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018, Terminated: 10/29/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8221943)by Campaign Legal Center. (Sells, Bryan)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018, Terminated: 10/23/2018 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' [4] MOTION for a Preliminary Injunction by Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: # (1) Brief of proposed amicus curiae)(Sells, Bryan) Text modified on 10/23/2018 (btql).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Ludington Sells on behalf of Campaign Legal Center (Sells, Bryan)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Ware Lewis on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Lewis, Anne)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rhonda J. Martin, Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, Jasmine Clark, The Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc. (Brown, Bruce) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/23/2018 to edit filers (btql).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Strickland, Frank)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018, Terminated: 10/29/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8220294)by Rhonda J. Martin. (Brown, Bruce)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Declarations in Support re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rhonda J. Martin (Brown, Bruce) Text modified on 10/22/2018 (btql).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Willard on behalf of Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Willard, Russell)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018, Terminated: 10/23/2018 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Rhonda J. Martin. (Attachments: # (1) Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Brown, Bruce)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Seth Harp, Brian Kemp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Correia, Cristina)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/16/2018. (rvb)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Dana Bowers, Smythe Duval, Jeanne Dufort, Rhonda J. Martin, Jasmine Clark. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8207977) (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?