Georgia Muslim Voter Project et al v. Kemp et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-04789-LMM
District Judge Leigh Martin May, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 19, 2018 at 1:46 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Georgia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Young +1 770 303 8111 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 syoung@acluga.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DALE E. HO +1 212 549 2693 +1 212 549 2651 dale.ho@aclu.org
No Logo Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Young +1 770 303 8111 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 syoung@acluga.org

Toggle Switch Represented by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION-SAN FRANCISCO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DALE E. HO +1 212 549 2693 +1 212 549 2651 dale.ho@aclu.org
v.
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Brian Kemp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cristina Correia +1 404 656 6676 ccorreia@law.ga.gov
No Logo Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Space Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Carothers & Mitchell, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Carothers +1 770 932 3552 +1 770 932 6348 richard.carothers@carmitch.com
Space Brian R. Dempsey +1 770 661 0529 +1 770 661 8529 Brian.dempsey@carmitch.com
Office Atlanta
Filed 10/16/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Fulton
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag 4months
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 return of service executed
Return of Service Executed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Young, Sean)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Notice of appearance
    NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Strickland, Frank)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Notice of appearance
      NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina Correia on behalf of Brian Kemp (Correia, Cristina)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Dempsey on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Dempsey, Brian)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Tyson, Bryan)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Carothers on behalf of Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections (Carothers, Richard)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
              APPLICATION for Admission of Sophia Lin Lakin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8214228)by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Young, Sean)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                ORDER Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' [5] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. A Motion Hearing is set for 10/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2107 before Judge Leigh Martin May. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order, the Complaint, and the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by close of business on Thursday, October 18, 2018. Plaintiffs should file proof of service on the docket once Defendants have been served with this Order and the pleadings. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response Brief on Monday, October 22, 2018 by 12:00 p.m. If Plaintiffs are inclined to file a Reply Brief, its reply shall be due by 9:00 a.m. on Tuesday, October 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/17/2018. (rvb)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Motion for TRO
                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED with Brief In Support by Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Georgia Muslim Voter Project. (Attachments: # (1) Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A - Ali Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit B - Cho Declaration, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit C - Iowa decision, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit D - California decision, # (6) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Sean)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                    STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/16/2018. (rvb)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                      Electronic Summons Issued as to Gwinnett County Board of Voter Registration and Elections. (btql)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                        Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (btql)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Muslim Voter Project, Asian-Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8209899) (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 37 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?