Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. et al v. Kemp
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-04727-ELR
District Judge Eleanor L. Ross, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 19, 2018 at 1:46 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phi Nguyen +1 770 818 6147 pnguyen@advancingjustice-atlanta.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Farrell +1 212 832 6037 gregory.farrell@hugheshubbard.com
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org
Space Vilia Hayes +1 212 837 6839 vilia.hayes@hugheshubbard.com
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 202 736 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com
No Logo Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phi Nguyen +1 770 818 6147 pnguyen@advancingjustice-atlanta.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Farrell +1 212 832 6037 gregory.farrell@hugheshubbard.com
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org
Space Vilia Hayes +1 212 837 6839 vilia.hayes@hugheshubbard.com
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 202 736 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com
No Logo Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 202 736 2200
Space Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org
Space Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by advancingjustice-atlanta.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phi Nguyen +1 770 818 6147 pnguyen@advancingjustice-atlanta.org

Toggle Switch Represented by campaignlegal.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Farrell +1 212 832 6037 gregory.farrell@hugheshubbard.com
Space Vilia Hayes +1 212 837 6839 vilia.hayes@hugheshubbard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org
No Logo Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phi Nguyen +1 770 818 6147 pnguyen@advancingjustice-atlanta.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Farrell +1 212 832 6037 gregory.farrell@hugheshubbard.com
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org
Space Vilia Hayes +1 212 837 6839 vilia.hayes@hugheshubbard.com
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 202 736 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com
No Logo New Georgia Project, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phi Nguyen +1 770 818 6147 pnguyen@advancingjustice-atlanta.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Farrell +1 212 832 6037 gregory.farrell@hugheshubbard.com
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org
Space Vilia Hayes +1 212 837 6839 vilia.hayes@hugheshubbard.com
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 202 736 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com
No Logo ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phi Nguyen +1 770 818 6147 pnguyen@advancingjustice-atlanta.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Farrell +1 212 832 6037 gregory.farrell@hugheshubbard.com
Space Mark P. Gaber +1 202 736 2200 mgaber@campaignlegal.org
Space Vilia Hayes +1 212 837 6839 vilia.hayes@hugheshubbard.com
Space J. Gerald Hebert +1 202 736 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon M. Greenbaum +1 202 662 8325 jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JULIE M HOUK +1 202 662 8392 +1 202 783 0857 jhouk@lawyerscommittee.org
Space JOHN M POWERS +1 202 662 8389 jpowers@lawyerscommittee.org
Space EZRA ROSENBERG erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Campaign Legal Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Lang +1 202 736 2200 dlang@campaignlegalcenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Sells +1 404 480 4212 +1 404 480 4212 bryan@bryansellslaw.com
v.
Kemp, Brian P. Kemp, Brian P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Brian Kemp"
Office Atlanta
Filed 10/11/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Denial or abridgement of right to vote on account of race or color through voting qualifications
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Fulton
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags 4months,SUBMDJ
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [5] APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203971). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. et al (jkm)
    LREF
    Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
    APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [6] APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203994). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. et al (jkm)
      LREF
      Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
      APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [4] APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203943). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. (jkm)
        LREF
        Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [3] APPLICATION for Admission of John Michael Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203904). Attorney Bryan Ludington Sells added appearing on behalf of Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. et al (jkm)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 waiver of service executed
          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., New Georgia Project, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc.. Brian Kemp waiver mailed on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Sells, Bryan)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
            APPLICATION for Admission of Ezra David Rosenberg Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8210183)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
              APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Gerald Hebert Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8206593)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                APPLICATION for Admission of Vilia B. Hayes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8206587)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                  APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory C. Farrell Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8206581)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                    APPLICATION for Admission of Jon Greenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8206572)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                      Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Kemp. (cmd)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Order
                        NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                          APPLICATION for Admission of Mark P. Gaber Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203994)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                            APPLICATION for Admission of Danielle M. Lang Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203971)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                              APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Marie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203943)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                APPLICATION for Admission of John Michael Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8203904)by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc.. (Sells, Bryan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Proposed Summons
                                  PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, New Georgia Project, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc. (Sells, Bryan)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                    Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to J. Gerald Hebert as to New Georgia Project, Inc. regarding [7] Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (mlb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                      Submission of the [1] COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (aaq)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc., ProGeorgia State Table, Inc., Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc., New Georgia Project, Inc. and Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8201820) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - SSA Report, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Notice Letter, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?