Elton v. Musk et al
State Civil Lawsuit Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2018-0749-JRS
Vice Chancellor Judge Joseph R. Slights III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 18, 2019 at 1:38 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zachary Elton, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonio J. Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad W. Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp
Ahuja, Deepak P. Ahuja, Deepak P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Deepak Ahuja"
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Fireeye, Inc.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Ehrenpreis, Ira Ehrenpreis, Ira, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"
Murdoch, James R. Murdoch, James R., Defendant
Officially listed as "James Murdoch"
Unknown Role, News Corp
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
No Logo Linda Johnson Rice, Defendant
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robyn M. Denholm"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Unknown Role, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Echelon Corp
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Steve Jurvetson"
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Nominal Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Opposition
Plaintiffs' Opposition to Proposed Intervenor's Motion Seeking Modification of the Court's December 7, 2018 Order
    Blank 14 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Letter
    Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Robert J. Kriner, Jr., regarding Plaintiffs' response to Jeffrey H. Kripitz's Letter
      Blank 13 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
      Letter to the Honorable Judge Joseph R. Slights III from Nathan A. Cook regarding the Stipulation and Order regarding Service of Complaints and Stay of Proceedings
        Blank 12 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order
        Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Service of Complaints and Stay of Proceedings)
          Blank 11 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
          Entry of Appearance of William M. Lafferty, Susan W. Wasco, and Sabrina M. Hendershot of Morris, Nichols, Arsht and Tunnell LLP on behalf of Defendant Elon Musk (with Certificate of Service)
            Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None
            Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Service of Complaints and Stay of Proceedings
              Blank 9 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
              Entry of Appearance of Daniel A. Mason and Matthew D. Stachel to represent defendants Brad W. Buss, Robyn M. Denholm, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Steve Jurvetson, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, and Kimbal Musk and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. with Certificate of Service
                Blank 8 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Motion
                Motion to Intervene and To Stay Proceedings, with Certificate of Service
                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Issuance of Summons
                  11-16-18: Issued 3114 Summons to SPS 1 original (10 copies)
                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Letter
                    Letter from P. Bradford deLeeuw to Vice Chancellor Slights re consolidation and organization of plaintiffs' counsel
                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                      Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights from Tiffany J. Cramer, Esquire, dated November 8, 2018, enclosing courtesy copies
                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Motion to Consolidate
                        Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Actions and Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs, Co-Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for Plaintiffs
                          Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Summons Instructions
                          Plaintiff's Summons Instruction Letter to Defendants
                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None
                            Amended Supplemental Information Pursuant to Rule 3(A) of the Rules of the Court of Chancery (with Statement of Good Cause)
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Complaint
                              Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duties

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 434 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?