Jones v. Dallas Veterans Hospital VA North Texas Health Care System
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-01306
District Judge A. Joe Fish, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 12:38 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jason Patrick Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Patrick Jones

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Patrick Jones
v.
No Logo Dallas Veterans Hospital VA North Texas Health Care System, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ +1 817 252 5286 brian.stoltz@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: re 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendant's Motion on or before 6/28/2018. See Local R. Civ. P. 7.1(e)(as modified). Defendant may file a reply by 7/12/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/5/2018) (ndt) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dallas Veterans Hospital VA North Texas Health Care System with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dallas Veterans Hospital, VA North Texas Health Care System re 1 Notice of Removal. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas Veterans Hospital, VA North Texas Health Care System. (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Mail returned as undeliverable. 7 Order received back from Jason Patrick Jones as attempted - not known; unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (axm) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 193rd District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-18-05510 filed by Dallas Veterans Hospital, VA North Texas Health Care System. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Sheet Supplement, # 3 Index of State Court Records, # 4 State Court Docket Sheet, # 5 State Court Filing - Inability to Pay, # 6 State Court Filing - Original Petition, # 7 State Court Filing - Citation, # 8 State Court Filing - Case Filing Cover Sheet, # 9 State Court Filing - Return of Service) (Stoltz-DOJ, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?