CITY OF WESTFIELD, INDIANA v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02576
District Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 12:06 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CITY OF WESTFIELD, INDIANA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP - Indianapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Manuel Herceg +1 317 713 3500 +1 317 713 3699 mherceg@taftlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chou-il Lee +1 317 713 3519 +1 317 713 3599 clee@taftlaw.com
v.
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ACTAVIS LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ACTAVIS LLC
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allergan PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALLERGAN PLC
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cardinal Health, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cephalon, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CEPHALON, INC.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA INC.
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
No Logo JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHNSON JOHNSON +1 925 432 7447
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mallinckrodt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MALLINCKRODT LLC
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mallinckrodt PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MALLINCKRODT PLC
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKesson Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space McKesson Corporation
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noramco, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NORAMCO, INC.
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Purdue Pharma LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PURDUE PHARMA, INC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PURDUE PHARMA INC.
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Letter to Clerk - Electronic Case Transfer (OUT)
Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, IN RE; MDL 2804 per CTO #53 on 9/12/2018. (CKM) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None
    CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of OHIO. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL NO - 2804 Per Certified Transfer Order #53. (CKM) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Procedures and PracticesCourt Filing
      PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None
        MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Chou-il Lee on behalf of Plaintiff City of Westfield, Indiana. (Lee, Chou-il) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of Plaintiff City of Westfield, Indiana. (Herceg, Manuel) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Complaint
              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5026805) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herceg, Manuel) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 13 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?