District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Maryland District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. Omotunde, et al
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:96-cr-00177-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Reeves Harding +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 3124 robert.harding@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Baltimore
Filed 5/8/1996
County Prince George's
Terminated 10/21/1999
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h) - CONSPIRACY TO LAUNDER MONETARY INSTRUMENTS
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-7477.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h) - Conspiracy to Launder Monetary Instruments
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(B)(i) - Laundering of Monetary Instruments - Interstate Commerce; 182 - Aiding and Abetting
Count 7s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(B)(i) - Laundering of Monetary Instruments - Interstate Commerce; 182 - Aiding and Abetting
Count 9s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-3300.F
Offense Level 4
181956(a)(1)(B)(i) - Laundering of Monetary Instruments - Interstate Commerce; 182 - Aiding and Abetting
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
CASE reassigned from Judge Blake to Judge Unassigned (cag, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
    CASE reassigned from unassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Case Assigned/Reassigned
      CASE reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake (cag, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Appeal Record Returned
        Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [477-1] appeal by Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Appeal Record Returned
          Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [451-1] appeal by Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (sls, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
            CASE reassigned from Judge Blake to Judge Unassigned (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/7/2000 Appeal Record Returned
              Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [429-1] appeal by Christopher Polycarp Tizhe (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 436 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 USCA Judgment
                JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji Re: [399-1] appeal, copy of the opinion attached hereto. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 425 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000 Certificate of Clerk
                  SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF CLERK certifying record is complete for appeal purposes for [399-1] appeal as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 418 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Transcript -Appeal
                    TRANSCRIPT filed as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji for dates of 10/14/99 Re: [399-1] appeal (FILED SEPARATELY) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 408 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Certificate of Clerk
                      CERTIFICATE OF CLERK certifying record is complete for appeal purposes for [399-1] appeal as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 403 Filed: 11/29/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Transcript Request - Appeal
                        Transcript requested in appeal as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji [399-1] appeal (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 USCA Case Number
                          USCA Case Number as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji Re: [399-1] appeal USCA Number: 99-4815 (Case Manager: Margaret Thomas) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to USCA: [399-1] appeal (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 399 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s FILING FEE $ (IFP) (Rec'd 10/20/99) (c/s 10/20/99-ss) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 398 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
                                JUDGMENT Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s. Imprisonment 57 months; Supervised Release 3 years; Special Assessment $50.00 ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/21/99) (cm microfilmed af) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 3/25/2003 Sentencing
                                  Sentencing as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. held before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 Dismissal of Counts
                                    DISMISSAL of Count(s) as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji Terminated motions terminating [271-1] motion to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speedy Trial Act as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13), terminating [269-1] motion for Disclosure of Guideline Information as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13), terminating [268-1] motion for Severance as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13), terminating [263-1] motion to Adopt and Conform to Motions of Other Defendants as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13), terminating [249-1] motion to Continue Trial Date as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13), terminating [248-1] motion to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Motions as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13), terminating [223-1] motion as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) Counts Dismissed: Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 2s, 4, 7s, 9s (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 397 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, Dismissing the Fourth Superseding Indictment ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/20/99) (cm microfilmed af) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 2/23/2000 Sentencing
                                        Sentencing: Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count 1s held before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ER: P. Thompson) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/13/1999 Remark
                                          SENTENCING POSPONED as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 389 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                            CJA 20 as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Appointment of Attorney Randolph O. Gregory Sr. Voucher # 1062841 ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 5/10/99) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 388 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji granting [387-1] motion to Strike the Appearance of Counsel as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 5/5/99) (cm by chambers) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 387 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999, Terminated: 5/5/1999 Motion to Strike
                                                EX PARTE MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to Strike the Appearance of Counsel (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 386 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji granting [385-1] motion to Extend Time to File Comments on Presentence Report as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 4/15/99) (cm by chambers) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 385 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999, Terminated: 4/16/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                    MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to Extend Time to File Comments on Presentence Report (2c/s) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 382 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Sentencing OrderCourt Filing
                                                      Guideline Sentencing Order as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 2/23/99) (cm 2/24/99 kam) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 381 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999, Terminated: 2/18/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji granting [381-1] motion for a Presentence Report as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) ( Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 2/18/99) (cm by chambers) (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 381 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999, Terminated: 2/18/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          Letter MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji for a Presentence Report (amf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 377 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 Transcript -Appeal
                                                            TRANSCRIPT filed as to Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji and Helen Olapade for dates of 1/23/98, 2/9/98, 2/10/98, 2/11/98, 2/12/98, 2/17/98, 2/18/98, 2/19/98, 2/23/98, 2/24/98, 2/25/98, 2/26/98, 3/2/98, 3/3/98, 3/4/98, 3/5/98, 3/9/98, 3/10/98 and 7/24/98 Re: [367-1] appeal (All Filed Separately) (sls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/10/1998
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 343 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER for Interim Payments to Appointed Counsel as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, 4/8/98) (c/m 4/24/98 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 321 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/16/1998 Exhibit
                                                                Goverment's Exhibit list (Mitchell) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/16/1998
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 318 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Sealed Document +
                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 317 Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Sealed Document +
                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: 3/13/1998 Remark
                                                                      Oral Motion of United States to revoke bail as to Defendant BASHORUN -"GRANTED"-, for reasons stated in open Court. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/13/1998 Remark
                                                                        Verdict Sheet submitted to the Jury for their consideration. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998 Remark
                                                                          Renewed Oral Motion of Defendant's BASHORUN & OLOPADE for Judgment of Acquittal - "DENIED"-, for reasons stated in open Court. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Remark
                                                                            Oral Motion of Defendant OLOPADE for Judgment of Acquittal -argued- "DENIED, for reasons stated in open Court. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Remark
                                                                              Oral Motion of Defendant BASHORUN for Judgment of Acquittal -argued - "DENIED", for reasons stated in open Court. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 304 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Exhibit
                                                                                Government's Exhibit list with Plea Agreement as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Oral Order
                                                                                  ORAL ORDER "GRANTING" Motion of United States to Compel and "ORDERING" Abiodun Ogundipe to testify in the ongoing trial of USA v. ABIODUN BASHORUN, et al, Criminal No. CCB-96-0177 . (Judge Catherine C. Blake 2/23/98) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                                                    Motion hearing held re: Motion of United States to Compel Testimony of potential witness, Abiodun Ogundipe held before Blake, J. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Nolle Prosequi
                                                                                      Imposition of Sentence suspended pending presentence investigation as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Arraignment
                                                                                        Rearraignment as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, Guilty: Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s Terminated motions , and Not Guilty: Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 2s, 7s, 9s held before Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/20/98. (Court Reporter/ER: Paul Mackaro) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                          Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Case not concluded, to resume on Monday, February 23, 1998 @ 10:00 a.m. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                            Jury trial - Day 7 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                              Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Case not concluded to resume on Thursday, February 19, 1998 @ 10:00 a.m. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/18/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                                Jury trial - Day 6 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                  Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Case not concluded to resume on Wednesday, February 18, 1998 @ 10:00 a.m. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: 2/17/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                                    Jury trial - Day 5 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                      Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Case not concluded, to resume on Tuesday, February 17, 1998 @ 10:00 a.m. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Remark
                                                                                                        Verbal Stipulation entered into by all parties that the below listed exhibits were recovered by Agent Christopher J. Buzzeo on 4/18/96 after a search of the home of Christopher P. Tizhe, his wife and Helen Olopade. The exhibits are numbers 915, 918, 919, 920, 928, 929, 930, 931, 923, 927, 932, 912 and 926. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: 2/12/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                                          Jury trial - Day 4 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun and Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                            Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun and Philip Olukayod Kuforiji :Case not concluded to resume on Thursday, February 12, 1998 @ 10:00 A.M. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                                              Jury trial - Day 3 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Case not concluded, to resume on Wednesday, February 11, 1998 @ 10:30 a.m. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Opening Statements
                                                                                                                  Opening Statements made by counsel for Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji and the USA. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Jury Impaneled
                                                                                                                    Jury impaneled and sworn as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun and Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Voir Dire Begun
                                                                                                                      Jurors (Panel #2) Sworn and Examined on Voir Dire as to Helen Iyabode Olopade (6) count(s) 1ssss, 5ssss, 14ssss, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (7) count(s) 1ssss, 10ssss, 11ssss, 12ssss, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s, 2s, 7s, 9s Terminated motions before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                        Jury trial - Day 2 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                          Minute entry as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Jurors excused for the evening with instructions to report on Tuesday, February 10, 1998 @ 1:00 P.M. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Voir Dire Begun
                                                                                                                            Jurors (1/2 of Panel) Sworn and Examined on Voir Dire as to Helen Iyabode Olopade (6) count(s) 1ssss, 5ssss, 14ssss, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (7) count(s) 1ssss, 10ssss, 11ssss, 12ssss, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s, 2s, 7s, 9s Terminated motions before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Voir Dire Begun
                                                                                                                              Jurors (1/2 of Panel) Sworn and Examined on Voir Dire as to Helen Iyabode Olopade (6) count(s) 1ssss, 5ssss, 14ssss, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (7) count(s) 1ssss, 10ssss, 11ssss, 12ssss, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s, 2s, 7s, 9s Terminated motions before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                Jury trial - Day 1 - held before Judge Catherine C. Blake as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun and Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (Court Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/23/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                  Motion hearing held as to Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji re: [270-1] motion to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speedy Trial Act, [268-1] motion for Disclosure of Guideline Information, [267-1] motion for Severance, [261-1] motion to Adopt and Conform to Motions of Other Defendants before Blake, J. (Reporter: Paul Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 288 Filed: 1/21/1998, Entered: 1/22/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Consolidated RESPONSE by USA to the Motions Filed by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (c/d Chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 272 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 271 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speedy Trial Act with Points and Authorities. (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 270 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji in support of [268-1] motion for Disclosure of Guideline Information (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 269 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji for Disclosure of Guideline Information (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 268 Filed: 11/7/1997, Entered: 11/10/1997 Motion to Sever Defendant
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji for Severance with Points and Authorities (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 266 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 265 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997, Terminated: 10/21/1999 Motion to Adopt Motion of Other Defendant
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to Adopt and Conform to Motions of Other Defendants and proposed Order. (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/10/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji scheduling motions deadlines by defendants are due on 10/14/97. Government's response is due 11/7/97. Motions hearing and pretrial conference to be set. Trial set for 2/9/98. (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, 9/9/97) (c/m by chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        CJA 20 as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji :Appointment of Attorney Kenneth D. Auerbach Voucher # 0855977 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg, 9/5/97) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 250 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [247-1] motion for Allen Orenberg to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Allen Howard Orenberg for Philip Olukayod Kuforiji as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, 8/28/97)(c/m 8/29/97 ms) ) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                            Motion hearing held as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji on 8/28/97 before Judge Blake re: [249-1] motion to Continue Trial Date - held SUB-CURIA; [248-1] motion to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Motions - held SUB-CURIA; [247-1] motion for Allen Orenberg to Withdraw as Attorney - GRANTED for reasons stated in open Court (Marginal Order) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997, Terminated: 10/21/1999 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION with Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to Continue Trial Date and proposed Order. (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997, Terminated: 10/21/1999 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION with Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Motions and proposed Order. (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997, Terminated: 8/29/1997 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION with Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji for Allen Orenberg to Withdraw as Attorney and proposed Order. (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 08/25/1997
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 243 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                    WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued for 9/15/97 as to Matthew Olaniayan and Order (Rosenberg, MJ) thereon directing issuance of said Writ as prayed. (c/d USMS 8/18/97) (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                      Arraignment as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, Not Guilty: count(s) 1s, 2s, 7s, 9s of 5th Superseding Indictment held before Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg on 7/25/97. Defendant continued in detention. (Court Reporter/ER: Tape) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 234 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: 7/3/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, Setting Trial Schedule - Motions due 9/5/97; Motions Hearing set for 9/29/97; Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/97; Proposed Joint Voir Dire, Government's Proposed Jury Instructions and any Motions in Limine due at Pretrial Conference. Trial is scheduled to begin 10/6/97. (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, 7/3/97) (c/m by chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 230 Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: 5/19/1997 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji in opposition to Government's Motion for a Continuance of Trial and Motion for Severance of Defendants. (2 c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 5/14/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                            FIFTH SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Adeniyi Momodu Allison (2) count(s) 1sssss, 5sssss, Helen Iyabode Olopade (6) count(s) 1ssss, 5ssss, 14ssss, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (7) count(s) 1ssss, 10ssss, 11ssss, 12ssss, Samuel Shola Jacobs (8) count(s) 1ssss, 3ssss, 4ssss, 8ssss, 13ssss, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu (11) count(s) 1ssss, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 1s, 2s, 7s, 9s, Ademola Jacobs (14) count(s) 1, 3, 6, 13 (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER DENYING Application for Reviw of Conditions of Release as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (See Marginal Order Paper #223). (Judge Catherine C. Blake, 5/7/97) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Arguments of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                Argument of Counsel made by Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, USA on 5/7/97. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute entry as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Defendant's Application for Review of Conditions of Release (Paper 223). (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/7/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Detention hearing as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji held before Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/7/97. (Court Reporter/ER: K. Moye) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 228 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/7/1997 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA for Continuance of Trial Date in Case until January or February, 1998 (2 c/s). (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Papers as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji consisting of Criminal Complaint, Affidavit and Warrant for Arrest. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997, Terminated: 10/21/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Application for Review of Conditions of Release and Memorandum of Supporting Points and Authorities and proposed Order as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (2 c/s). (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance for Philip Olukayod Kuforiji by Attorney Allen H. Orenberg. (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/4/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, that Order dated February 27, 1997 shall also apply to proceedings as to Philip Kuforiji (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake, 4/3/97). (c/m by chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                Arraignment as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, Not Guilty: As to Count 4 held before Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg on 4/4/97. Defendant continued in detention. (Court Reporter/ER: Tape) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 220 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DETENTION pending further Order of the Court as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg, 3/28/97). (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 219 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION Pending Hearing Pursuant to Bail Reform Act as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg, 3/25/97). (c/m by chambers) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 218 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 20 as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Appointment of Attorney Allen Howard Orenberg Voucher # 0742627 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg, 3/28/97). (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997 Detention Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Detention hearing as to Philip Olukayod Kuforiji held before Magistrate Judge Paul M. Rosenberg on 3/28/97. Defendant ordered detained by the Court. (Court Reporter/ER: Tape) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Excerpt from Testimony of Rotimi Sanni Held for dates of January 8, 1997 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/30/1997
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 191 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                            WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued for 1/29/97 as to Olabode Fashewe and Order (Blake, J.) thereon directing issuance of said Writ as prayed. (c/d US Marshal, 1/15/97 ms). (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 190 Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                              WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued for 1/15, 16 & 22/97 as to David Jide Phillips and Order (Rosenberg, USMJ) thereon directing issuance of said Writ as prayed. (c/d US Attorney, 1/14/97). (mms, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 188 Filed: 1/13/1997, Entered: 1/13/1997 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued for 1/14/97 as to David Jide Phillips and Order (Rosenberg, USMJ) thereon directing issuance of said Writ as prayed. (c/d US Attorney). (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 187 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued for January 14, 1997 as to DAVID JIDE PHILLIPS and Order (Rosenberg, MJ) dated 1/10/97 directing issuance of said Writ as prayed. (Agents to transport; 3 cert. copies given to USAO kam) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 178 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued for January 17, 1997 as to DAVID JIDE PHILLIPS and Order (Rosenberg, MJ) dated 1/7/97 directing issuance of said Writ as prayed. (c/d USM 1/8/97 mdw) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS RESPONSE by USA and Exhibits A-D. (c/s) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Held before the Court (Blake, J.) for dates of December 20, 1996. (FILED SEPARATELY) (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/2/1997 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MARGINAL ORDER "GRANTING" Motion of Baltimore Sun Company to Intervene and that the hearing will be open and the documents filed under seal 11/8/96 are UNSEALED. (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 1/2/97) (c/m) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 169 Filed: 1/2/1997, Entered: 1/2/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of the Baltimore Sun Company for Leave to Intervene and For Access to Sealed Pleadings and Memorandum in Support of Motion . (c/s) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: 12/31/1996 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 165 Filed: 12/27/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER "GRANTING" [155-1] motion for An Order to Obtain Voice Exemplars as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde (1), Caleb Bamidele Omotunde (3), Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde (4), Christopher Polycarp Tizhe (5), Ehi Joseph Macaulay (9), Tony Kunle Oderinde (10), Matthew O. Esekie (12); Counsel Christopher Davis' request for a trascript of the hearing on 12/20/96 as to Defendant TIZHE is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 12/27/96) (c/m 12/27/96 bc) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit list by Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, USA. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji. (2 c/s) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute entry as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji : Order to Follow re: Ruling of Pending Motions in Open Court this date. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Arguments of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Argument of Counsel made by Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, USA (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry : Hearing re: Pending Motions (Reporter: P. Mackaro) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 12/19/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, that Counsel for the above named defendants be allowed to submit interim CJA Form 20 . (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 12/13/96; Chief Judge J. Harvie Wilkinson, III 12/18/96) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 149 Filed: 11/26/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji, that a pretrial conference and motions hearing has been scheduled for Friday, December 20, 1996 . (Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 11/26/96) (c/m 11/26/96 bc) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 143 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum issued as to ROTISSI SANNI OLAYIWOLA for December 30, 1996 and Order (Rosenberg, MJ) dated 11/13/96 directing issuance of said Writ. (c/d to USM 11/14/96) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996, Terminated: 5/1/1998 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde, Adeniyi Momodu Allison, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe, Helen Iyabode Olopade, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun, Samuel Shola Jacobs, Ehi Joseph Macaulay, Tony Kunle Oderinde, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu, Matthew O. Esekie, Philip Olukayod Kuforiji for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Defense Motions and Proposed Order . (2 c/s) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FOURTH SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Christopher Olusegun Omotunde (1) count(s) 1ssss, 2ssss-3ssss, 4ssss, 14ssss-15ssss, Adeniyi Momodu Allison (2) count(s) 1ssss, 4ssss, 5ssss-21ssss, Caleb Bamidele Omotunde (3) count(s) 1sss, 4sss, Omotayo Olutoyin Omotunde (4) count(s) 1sss, 4sss, Christopher Polycarp Tizhe (5) count(s) 1sss, 4sss, Helen Iyabode Olopade (6) count(s) 4sss, 21sss, Abiodun Saheed Bashorun (7) count(s) 4sss, Samuel Shola Jacobs (8) count(s) 1sss, 4sss, Ehi Joseph Macaulay (9) count(s) 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 4sss, Tony Kunle Oderinde (10) count(s) 1sss, 4sss, Abimbola Olasunbo Omololu (11) count(s) 4sss, Matthew O. Esekie (12) count(s) 1ss , Philip Olukayod Kuforiji (13) count(s) 4 . (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: 5/21/1996 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1,242 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?