Pierik v. GE Healthcare Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11709
District Judge Indira Talwani, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 8:33 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Pierik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Wagstaff, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly A. Dougherty +1 508 230 2700 kim.dougherty@andruswagstaff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Jason Richards +1 850 916 7450 +1 850 916 7449 jrichards@awkolaw.com
No Logo Pearl Pierik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Wagstaff, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly A. Dougherty +1 508 230 2700 kim.dougherty@andruswagstaff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Jason Richards +1 850 916 7450 +1 850 916 7449 jrichards@awkolaw.com
v.
No Logo Bracco Diagnostics Inc., Defendant
No Logo GE Healthcare AS, Defendant
GE HEALTHCARE Inc. GE HEALTHCARE Inc., Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added R. Jason Richards. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of R. Jason Richards Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7278409 by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., GE Healthcare AS, GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company, McKesson Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Manolakis, Ashley) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7272577 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Dougherty, Kimberly) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 8/14/2018 in order to flatten to PDF) (Manolakis, Ashley). Modified on 8/14/2018 (Manolakis, Ashley). (Entered: 08/13/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 3 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?