Pulse Nite Club v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-06193
District Judge William H. Pauley, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 9:03 AM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 30-30 Club Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Daniel A. Silver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel A. Silver +1 860 225 3518 +1 860 348 0612 Daniel@lawsilver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Luke C Lirot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Luke C Lirot +1 813 221 9533
No Logo Pulse Nite Club, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Daniel A. Silver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel A. Silver +1 860 225 3518 +1 860 348 0612 Daniel@lawsilver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Luke C Lirot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Luke C Lirot +1 813 221 9533
v.
No Logo City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robin Binder +1 212 788 0818 +1 212 791 9714 rbinder@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robin Binder +1 212 788 0818 +1 212 791 9714 rbinder@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Patricia Lancaster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Robin Binder +1 212 788 0818 +1 212 791 9714 rbinder@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331cv
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) All Defendants pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Pulse Nite Club, Inc..(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 4/27/2018 (km). (Entered: 04/26/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Notice of Case reassignment to Judge William H. Pauley III . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Robin Binder, Luke Lirot, Daniel A. Silver . (laq) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Notice of Case Assignemnt to Judge Allen G. Schwartz . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Robin Binder, Luke Lirot, Daniel A. Silver . (gmo) (Entered: 08/30/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 1 time.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?