Sibley v. Johnson & Johnson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01638
District Judge Richard W. Story, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 9:28 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brandon Sibley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carey & Danis & Lowe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah Shoemake Doles +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 721 0905 sdoles@careydanis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey J Lowe +1 314 678 3400 +1 314 678 3401 jlowe@careydanis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alyson M. Petrick +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 721 0905 apetrick@careydanis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carey Danis & Lowe -MO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J. Cross +1 314 725 7700 +1 314 721 0905 across@careydanis.com
v.
No Logo Ethicon, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow O'Mara Stevens & Cannada, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Dye +1 601 948 5711 rick.dye@butlersnow.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM M. GAGE +1 601 948 4561 +1 601 985 4500 william.gage@butlersnow.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Brian Jackson +1 615 651 6700 +1 615 651 6701 brian.jackson@butlersnow.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis B Swearingen +1 615 503 9134 +1 615 503 9101 travis.swearingen@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Halli Dee Cohn +1 404 885 2549 +1 404 885 3900 halli.cohn@troutmansanders.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S Eric Rumanek +1 404 885 2606 +1 404 962 6980 eric.rumanek@troutmansanders.com
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow O'Mara Stevens & Cannada, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Dye +1 601 948 5711 rick.dye@butlersnow.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM M. GAGE +1 601 948 4561 +1 601 985 4500 william.gage@butlersnow.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Brian Jackson +1 615 651 6700 +1 615 651 6701 brian.jackson@butlersnow.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis B Swearingen +1 615 503 9134 +1 615 503 9101 travis.swearingen@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Halli Dee Cohn +1 404 885 2549 +1 404 885 3900 halli.cohn@troutmansanders.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S Eric Rumanek +1 404 885 2606 +1 404 962 6980 eric.rumanek@troutmansanders.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 12 and Updated Plaintiff Profile Form Order. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/04/18. (Attachments: # 1 Updated Plaintiff Profile Form)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(aaq) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 11. PATHOLOGY PROTOCOL FOR PRESERVATION AND TESTING OF EXPLANTS AND TISSUE SAMPLES TAKEN FROM PLAINTIFFS. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each member related care previously transferred to, removed to, or filed in this Court. In cases subsequently filed in this Court, it shall be the responsibility of the parties to review and abide by all pretrial orders previously entered by the Court. The orders may be assessed through the CM/ECF system and the Court's website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/17md2782. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by S. Eric Rumanek on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Rumanek, S.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Appearance by Halli Dee Cohn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Cohn, Halli) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Dye on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Dye, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Travis B. Swearingen on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Swearingen, Travis) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 10 - Plaintiff Fact Sheet and Defendant Fact Sheet. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Fact Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Fact Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 9 and Updated Plaintiff Profile Form Order. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brandon Sibley. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7819548.) DIRECT FILE MDL - Eastern Texas, Tyler. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?