United States v. Centola
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-01099
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 9:49 AM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip C. Cheng +1 617 748 3101 philip.cheng@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph Centola, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph Centola: Initial Appearance set for 8/8/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order to Unseal Case as to Joseph Centola. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Joseph Centola; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to Joseph Centola. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SEALED COMPLAINT as to Joseph Centola (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Paul T. Barton, # 2 JS45)(Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 1 Motion to Seal as to Joseph Centola (1)Allowed... (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Seal as to Joseph Centola by USA. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?