United States v. Hunter
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cr-03677-W-1

Tags
Last Updated February 25, 2021 at 11:58 AM ST (3.7 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily W. Allen +1 202 307 0946 emily.allen@usdoj.gov
Space Phillip L B Halpern +1 619 557 5610 +1 619 557 7055 Phillip.Halpern@usdoj.gov
Space W Mark Conover +1 619 557 5200 +1 619 557 2757 mark.conover@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Duncan D. Hunter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seltzer Caplan McMahon & Vitek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Baker Adams +61968 530 03x3035 +1 619 685 3100 padams@scmv.com
Space Ricardo Arias Gutierrez +1 619 685 3172 +1 619 702 6841 arias@scmv.com
Space Gregory Vega +1 619 685 3040 +1 619 702 6814 vega@scmv.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Duncan D. Hunter (1)
Office San Diego
Filed 8/21/2018
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - Conspiracy to Commit Offenses
Count 2-44
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343; 182 - Wire Fraud; Aiding and Abetting
Count 45-57
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519; 182 - Falsification of Records; Aiding and Abetting
Count 58-60
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 13-9999.F
Offense Level 4
5230109(d), 30114(b)(1); 182 - Prohibited Use of Campaign Contributions; Aiding and Abetting
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags PROTO
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Judgment Returned Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Bond Exoneration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Dismiss. (Other 1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Probation - Pre-Sentence Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Probation - Pre-Sentence Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 111 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Notice of Change of HearingCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING as to Defendant Duncan D. Hunter. Change of Plea Hearing set for 12/3/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Change in type of hearing only)(no document attached) (bjb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 110 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Motion Hearing as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 11/25/2019. Defense oral motion to continue-Granted. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Court Reporter Chari Bowery). (AUSAs Emily Allen, Phillip Halpern, and Mark Conover). (Defense Attorneys Paul Pfingst and Devin Burstein). (no document attached) (bjb)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Reply to Response
                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [105] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Halpern, Phillip) (jdt).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Response In Opposition
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [105] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Burstein, Devin) (jdt).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gregory A. Vega. by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Gregory A. Vega, # (2) Proof of Service)(Vega, Gregory) (jdt).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                  MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Halpern, Phillip) (jdt).
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [103] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Duncan D. Hunter (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/8/2019.(mtb)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019, Terminated: 11/8/2019 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                      MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to allow official travel (unopposed) by Duncan D. Hunter. (Burstein, Devin) (jdt).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Acknowledgment of Next Court Date
                                                        Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Duncan D. Hunter to appear on 11/25/19. (Burstein, Devin) (jdt).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Duncan D. Hunter. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Notice - other
                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by USA (Silverman, Bradley) (jao).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul Joseph Pfingst appearing for Duncan D. Hunter (Pfingst, Paul)Attorney Paul Joseph Pfingst added to party Duncan D. Hunter(pty:dft) (jao).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019, Terminated: 10/29/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing of Defendant Margaret E. Hunter by Margaret E. Hunter as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Acknowledgment)(Smith, Logan) (jao).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Status Hearing) as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 10/7/2019 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Frank J. Rangus. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (akr)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan:Status Hearing Re: Trial Date as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 10/7/2019. Defense oral motion to continue-Granted. Jury Trial is reset for 1/22/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Court Reporter Frank Rangus). (AUSAs Phillip Halpern, Mark Conover, and Emily Allen). (Defense Attorneys Gregory Vega and Devin Burstein). (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Duncan D. Hunter. Status Hearing re: Trial Date is set for 10/7/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 USCA order
                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [78] Notice of Appeal. Hunter's motion to file an oversized brief is granted. The government's motion to file a declaration with attachments under seal is granted. The Clerk will file the document, and the motion to seal itself, under seal. The government's motion to set an expedited briefing schedule is granted. The briefs addressing the government's motion to dismiss are treated as briefs on the merits. In addition, the parties may file simultaneous supplemental briefs not to exceed 20 pages within 14 days. We defer consideration of whether the USCA has jurisdiction over this appeal until the case is heard on the merits. This case will be placed on a December argument calendar. (akr)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 8/13/2019 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Juliet Y. Eichenlaub. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2019. (akr)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Status Hearing as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 8/13/2019. Defense oral motion to continue the Jury Trial-Granted. Jury Trial reset for 1/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Court Reporter Juliet Eichenlaub). (AUSA Emily Allen and Phillip Halpern). (Defense Attorney Dvin Burstein and Greg Vega). (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Status report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT regarding trial jointly submitted by Duncan D. Hunter (Burstein, Devin) (jrm).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: 8/9/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Duncan D. Hunter. Status Hearing re: Trial date set for 8/13/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Duncan D. Hunter for proceedings held on 7/8/19 re [78] Notice of Appeal. (Burstein, Devin). (akr).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019, Terminated: 10/1/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing of Defendant Margaret E. Hunter by Margaret E. Hunter as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Acknowledgment of Joint Motion to Continue Sentencing Hearing)(Smith, Logan) (jao).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: 7/24/2019 USCA order
                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [78] Notice of Appeal. Appellant's opposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the USCA's July 23, 2019, order to show cause and appellee's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is granted. Appellant's response is now due September 6, 2019. Failure to comply with the July 23, 2019, order may result in the dismissal of the appeal for failure to prosecute. Appellee's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction will be addressed by separate order. Briefing remains suspended pending further court order. (akr)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: 7/23/2019 USCA order
                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [78] Notice of Appeal. A review of the record suggests that the USCA may lack jurisdiction over the appeal because the USDC's order, denying appellant's motion to dismiss the indictment, entered on July 9, 2019, is not appealable as a final judgment or an order that comes within the collateral order doctrine. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of the appeal for failure to prosecute. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the USCA. (akr)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019 USCA Time Schedule Order
                                                                                          USCA Time Schedule Order for [78] Notice of Appeal filed by Duncan D. Hunter. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court (see attached), provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 8/9/2019 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.2); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 9/9/2019.) (cc: Court Reporters). (Attachments: # (1) Transcript Designation and Ordering Form). (akr)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/22/2019 USCA Case Number
                                                                                            USCA Case Number 19-50242 for [78] Notice of Appeal filed by Duncan D. Hunter. (akr)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Duncan D. Hunter re [75] Order. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-12742040.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (Burstein, Devin). (akr).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: 7/19/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Devin Jai Burstein appearing for Duncan D. Hunter (Burstein, Devin)Attorney Devin Jai Burstein added to party Duncan D. Hunter(pty:dft) (jms).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 7/8/2019 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Wakefield. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2019. (akr)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Denying [38] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speech or Debate Clause of the Constitution filed by Duncan D. Hunter; and Denying [40] MOTION for Disclosure and Production of Grand Jury Materials filed by Duncan D. Hunter. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/9/2019. (jrm) (jao).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss 2Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Denying [44] Motion to Dismiss Counts 58 through 60 as to Duncan D. Hunter (1). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/9/2019.(jao)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/9/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss 1Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Motion Hearing held 07/08/19. Denying [36] Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to recuse the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of California; Denying [37] Motion to Allow Change of Venue; Denying [38] Motion to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speech or Debate Clause of the Constitution; Denying [40] Motion for Disclosure and Production of Grand Jury Materials; Denying [44] Motion to Dismiss Counts 58-60; Denying [45] Motion to Dismiss Counts 45-57 for Failure to State an Offense. Jury Trial set for 9/10/19 9am confirmed. (Court Reporter Gayle Wakefield). (AUSA Mark Conover and Emily Allen). (Defense Attorneys Gregory Vega, Philip Adams, and Ricardo Gutierrez). (no document attached) (bjb) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct hearing type(bjb).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 7/1/2019 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Wakefield. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (akr)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: 7/1/2019 order on motion for bill of particularsCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to Duncan D. Hunter held on 7/1/2019. Denying [39] Motion for Bill of Particulars; Denying [42] Motion to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment; Defense withdraw [43] Motion to Dismiss Counts 2,3, and 45 of the Indictment for violation of the Statute of Limitation; Finding as moot [46] Motion to Exclude Evidence or Argument of Advice of Counsel; Defer ruling on [46] Motion to Allow Leading Questions of Certain Witnesses; Granting [46] Motion to Admit Evidence of Defendants Statements; Granting [46] Motion to Admit Testimony as Substantive Evidence; Granting [46] Motion to Allow Testimony and Witnesses to be Recalled Testimony; Granting [46] Motion to Admit Expert Testimony about Computer Forensics; Defer ruling on [46] Motion to Admit Records Pursuant to Rule 902; Defer ruling on [46] Motion to Admit Electronic Evidence; Granting [46] Motion to Admit Summaries and Charts; Granting [46] Motion to Admit Exhibits in Opening Statements; Granting [46] Motion for Attorney Voir Dire; Granting [46] Motion to Preclude Certain Defense Evidence; Finding as moot [46] Motion for Order Regarding Schedule for Pretrial Disclosures; Defer ruling on [47] Motion to Admit Co-conspirator Statements and Spousal Testimony; Granting [48] Motion to Admit Evidence of Personal Finances; Granting [49] Motion to Admit Evidence of Use of Campaign Funds to Pursue Personal Relationships; Granting [50] Motion to Exclude Improper Evidence Concerning Character and Good Acts; Granting [51] Motion to Exclude Evidence Concerning Alleged Political Bias or Motives of the Prosecution Team; Finding as moot [52] Motion to Exclude Evidence Regarding Other Congressmembers' Misuse of Campaign Funds; Finding as moot [52] Motion to Exclude Testimony as to Legal Conclusions Concerning Defendant's Guilt or Innocence; Defer ruling on [52] Motion to Exclude Testimony as to Defendant's Belief That His Actions Were Lawful. Motion Hearing continued to 7/8/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Court Reporter Gayle Wakefield). (AUSAs Emily Allen and Mark Conover). (Defense Attorneys Greg Vega, Philip Adams, and Ricardo Gutierrez). (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [38] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speech or Debate Clause of the Constitution, [40] MOTION for Disclosure and Production of Grand Jury Materials (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 through 18)(Allen, Emily) (jao).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [37] MOTION to Allow Change of Venue (Allen, Emily) (jao).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [36] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Recuse the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of California (Conover, W) (jao).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [44] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 58-60 (Conover, W) (jao).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [45] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4557 for Failure to State an Offense (Conover, W) (jao).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [47] MOTION to Admit Coconspirator Statements and Spousal Testimony (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [49] MOTION to Admit Evidence of Use of Campaign Funds to Pursue Personal Relationships (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [48] MOTION to Admit Evidence of Personal Finances (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [50] MOTION to Exclude Improper Evidence Concerning Character and Good Acts (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [51] MOTION to Exclude Evidence Concerning Alleged Political Bias or Motives of the Prosecution Team (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [46] In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Argument of Advice of CounselIn Limine MOTION to Allow Leading Questions of Certain WitnessesIn Limine MOTION to Admit Evidence of Defendants StatementsIn Limine MOTION to Admit Testimony as Substantive EvidenceIn Limine MOTION to Allow Testimony and Witnesses to be RecalledIn Limine MOTION to Admit Expert Testimony About Computer ForensicsIn Limine MOTION to Admit Records Pursuant to Rule 902In Limine MOTION to Admit Electronic EvidenceIn Limine MOTION to Admit Summaries and ChartsIn Limine MOTION to Admit Exhibits in Opening StatementsIn Limine MOTION for Attorney Voir Dire In Limine MOTION to Preclude Certain Defense EvidenceIn Limine MOTION for Order Regarding Schedule for Pre-Trial Disclosures (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by Duncan D. Hunter re [52] MOTION to Exclude Evidence Regarding Other Congressmembers' Misuse of Campaign Funds MOTION to Exclude Testimony as to Legal Conclusions Concerning Defendant's Guilt or Innocence MOTION to Exclude Testimony as to Defendant's Belief That His Actions Were Lawful (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [39] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Allen, Emily) (jrm).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [43] MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three, and Forty-Five of the Indictment for Violation of the Statute of Limitations (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Allen, Emily) (jrm).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [41] MOTION for Discovery and Motion for Leave to File Additional Motions (Allen, Emily) (jrm).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019 Response In Opposition
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter re [42] MOTION to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment (Allen, Emily) (jrm).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: 6/26/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Bradley Geoff Silverman appearing for USA. (Silverman, Bradley)Attorney Bradley Geoff Silverman added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter (Silverman, Bradley) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Exclude 1
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Exclude Evidence Regarding Other Congressmembers' Misuse of Campaign Funds, MOTION to Exclude Testimony as to Legal Conclusions Concerning Defendant's Guilt or Innocence, MOTION to Exclude Testimony as to Defendant's Belief That His Actions Were Lawful by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Exclude 1
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude Evidence Concerning Alleged Political Bias or Motives of the Prosecution Team by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Exclude 1
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Improper Evidence Concerning Character and Good Acts by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Admit Evidence
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Admit Evidence of Use of Campaign Funds to Pursue Personal Relationships by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Admit Evidence
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Admit Evidence of Personal Finances by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 Motion to Admit 1
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Admit Coconspirator Statements and Spousal Testimony by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Exclude Evidence
                                                                                                                                                              In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Argument of Advice of Counsel, In Limine MOTION to Allow Leading Questions of Certain Witnesses, In Limine MOTION to Admit Evidence of Defendants Statements, In Limine MOTION to Admit Testimony as Substantive Evidence, In Limine MOTION to Allow Testimony and Witnesses to be Recalled, In Limine MOTION to Admit Expert Testimony About Computer Forensics, In Limine MOTION to Admit Records Pursuant to Rule 902, In Limine MOTION to Admit Electronic Evidence, In Limine MOTION to Admit Summaries and Charts, In Limine MOTION to Admit Exhibits in Opening Statements, In Limine MOTION for Attorney Voir Dire , In Limine MOTION to Preclude Certain Defense Evidence, In Limine MOTION for Order Regarding Schedule for Pre-Trial Disclosures by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter. (Conover, W)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Counts 4557 for Failure to State an Offense by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/9/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Counts 58-60 by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Counts Two, Three, and Forty-Five of the Indictment for Violation of the Statute of Limitations by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Surplusage from the Indictment by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Discovery and Motion for Leave to File Additional Motions by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Disclosure and Production of Grand Jury Materials by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/1/2019 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 Motion to Dismiss Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Indictment for Violation of Speech or Debate Clause of the Constitution by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 Motion to Allow
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Allow Change of Venue by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: 6/24/2019, Terminated: 7/8/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Recuse the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of California by Duncan D. Hunter. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities)(Vega, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                    **Document Withdrawn** NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Bradley Geoff Silverman appearing for USA. (Silverman, Bradley)Attorney Bradley Geoff Silverman added to party USA(pty:pla)(jao). Modified to remove attorney B.Silverman from the docket on 6/26/2019 (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Acknowledgment of Next Court Date
                                                                                                                                                                                      Acknowledgment of next court date by defendant Duncan D. Hunter to appear on July 1, 2019. (Vega, Gregory) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute ORDER as to Duncan D. Hunter and Margaret E. Hunter. Due to the unavailability of the Court, the Motion hearing set for 7/29/19 has been vacated. Parties are to file motions and motions in limine by 6/24/19. Responses are due by 6/28/2019. Defense counsel is to have their client sign an acknowledgment of next court date, 7/1/19 9am, and file the acknowledgments no later than Monday, 6/17/19. Motion Hearing and Motion In Limine Hearing is set for 7/1/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/10/19. (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Order on Motion to Exclude 1Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting [28] Motion to Exclude Time under The Speedy Trial Act as to Duncan D. Hunter (1), Margaret E. Hunter (2). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 12/6/2018.(jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018, Terminated: 12/7/2018 Motion to Exclude 1
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Allen, Emily) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: 12/3/2018 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Status Hearing as to Duncan D. Hunter and Margaret E. Hunter held on 12/3/2018, ( Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan., Motions to be filed by 6/24/19, Response due 7/15/19 by 5:00 p.m., Reply due 7/22/19 by 9:00 a.m. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.), Excludable(s) started as to Duncan D. Hunter and Margaret E. Hunter : XT1 - Continuance granted, failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice 12/03/18 to 7/29/19. (Court Reporter/ECR Mauralee Ramirez). (Plaintiff Attorney Emily Allen, Mark Conover). (Defendant Attorney Gregory Vega, Ricardo Gutierrez, Logan Smith). (no document attached) (llb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018, Terminated: 9/26/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue the Status Hearing and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Allen, Emily) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Status HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Status Hearing as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter held on 9/24/2018. Defendants' oral request to continue-Granted. Status Hearing set for 12/3/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Time is excluded: XT1 - Continuance granted, failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice 9/24/18 to 12/03/18. (Court Reporter James Pence). (AUSAs Emily Allen, Phillip Halpern, Mark Conover). (Defense Attorneys Gregory Vega, Ricardo Arias Gutierrez(1), Thomas McNamara(2)). (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Excluding Time Under Speedy Trial Act re [21] Motion to Continue as to Duncan D. Hunter (1), Margaret E. Hunter (2). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/6/2018.(jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018, Terminated: 9/6/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Continue and Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. (Allen, Emily) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Motion SettingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas J. Whelan: Motion Setting as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter held on 9/4/2018. Status Hearing set for 9/24/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Excludable(s) started as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter: XT1 - Continuance granted, failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice 9/4/18 - 9/24/18. (Court Reporter James Pence). (AUSAs Phillip Halpern, Emily Allen, and Mark Conover). (Defendant's Attorneys Gregory Vega(1), Thomas McNamara (2)). (no document attached) (bjb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation For Order Authorizing Disclosure of Grand Jury Matter and Sealed Documents and For Protective Order. (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Authorizing Disclosure and Protective Order Regarding Discovery as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/28/2018. (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018 warrant returned unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Warrant Returned Unexecuted, in case as to Duncan D. Hunter (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Philip Baker Adams appearing for Duncan D. Hunter (Adams, Philip)Attorney Philip Baker Adams added to party Duncan D. Hunter(pty:dft) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 bondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appearance Bond Filed as to Duncan D. Hunter in amount of $ $15,000 P/S, Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/23/2018. (Document applicable to USA, Duncan D. Hunter.) (anh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Abstract of Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Duncan D. Hunter. Defendant appeared in Court, fingerprint and release. (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Duncan D. Hunter (1) $15,000 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/23/2018. (jao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 English
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter (no document attached) (aje)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Arraignment on Indictment and Initial Appearance as to Duncan D. Hunter (1) Count 1,2-44,45-57,58-60 and Margaret E. Hunter (2) Count 1,2-44,45-57,58-60 held on 8/23/2018. Not Guilty plea entered. Attorney Gregory A Vega and Ricardo Arias Gutierrez present and retained as counsel for Duncan D. Hunter. Attorney Thomas W McNamara and Logan Daniel Smith present and retained as counsel for Margaret E. Hunter. Bond set as to Duncan D. Hunter (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRA and Margaret E. Hunter (2) $10,000 PS secured by 1 FRA. Bond must be submitted by close of business 8/28/18. ( Motion Setting set for 9/4/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan) (CD# 8/23/2018 WVG 18-1:10:31-10:40). (Plaintiff Attorney Phillip Halpern AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Gregory Vega RET, Ricardo Arias RET; Dft2 Thomas McNamara RET, Logan Smith RET). (aje)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: 8/23/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Emily Allen appearing for USA. (Allen, Emily)Attorney Emily Allen added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Phillip L B Halpern appearing for USA. (Halpern, Phillip)Attorney Phillip L B Halpern added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE W Mark Conover appearing for USA. (Conover, W)Attorney W Mark Conover added to party USA(pty:pla) (jao).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 warrant issuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo in case as to Duncan D. Hunter. (jrm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Set/Reset Duty HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Duncan D. Hunter, Margaret E. Hunter: Arraignment on Indictment set for 8/23/2018 before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (no document attached) (lao)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT as to Duncan D. Hunter (1) count(s) 1, 2-44, 45-57, 58-60, Margaret E. Hunter (2) count(s) 1, 2-44, 45-57, 58-60. (jrm)(jrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?