Garden City Boxing Club, Inc. v. Perez
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-03713-FB-CLP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 7:14 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak is adopted; that judgment is hereby entered in favor of pltff, Garden City Boxing Club, Inc., and against defts, Rafael Perez and El V italina Restaurant, awarding pltff statutory damages of $12,000.00, attorneys' fees of $1,000.00, costs of $450.00, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of nine percent per annum, running from 11/27/2004, the date of the violation, until the date the judgment is paid. Ordered by Clerk of Court, on 8/30/2006. Copies mailed w/appeals packet.(Barrett, C.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM and ORDER ADOPTING 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/1/2006. Copies mailed by Chambers. (J. Hamilton notified)(Barrett, C.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Rafael Perez. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 12/16/2005. Copies mailed by Chambers.(Barrett, C.)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?