TWARDY v. OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-14214
District Judge Renee Marie Bumb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 20, 2018 at 11:05 PM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FRANCIS TWARDY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOSHUA THOMAS +1 215 806 1733 joshualthomas@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Altisource Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ocwen Financial Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ORDER THIS MATTER appears before the Court upon the filing of a new complaint and attendant application to proceed in forma pauperus ("IFP"). The IFP application did not use the correct form. The correct form may be found on the District Court's website, or may be obtained from the Clerk's Office. Plaintiff is hereby directed, within 14 days of this order, to either (a) complete and file on the docket the correct form; or (b) pay the appropriate filing fee. Counsel is also hereby reminded, pursuant to Section IV. of the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures, that "within thirty (30) days of filing the complaint" plaintiff must file a RICO case statement in accordance with Appendix O of the Local Civil Rules for the District of New Jersey.. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/25/2018. (Costigan, Roberta) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    COMPLAINT against ALTISOURCE SOLUTIONS, INC., OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION in its individual capacity and as successor in interest to HOMEWARD RESIDENTIAL HOLDINGS LLC f/k/a AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICING, INC., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, in its individual and alleged capacity as Trustee for ABFC 2006-OPT2 TRUST, ASSET BACKED FUNDING CORPORATION ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-OPT2 with JURY DEMAND, filed by FRANCIS TWARDY. (Attachments: # 1 Application IFP)(THOMAS, JOSHUA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2018: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ). (Entered: 09/23/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 5 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?